Annie Adams v. Homeward Residential, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 14-13036

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 12:54 PM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107707731 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
ORDER: Appellant’s agreed motion to dismiss this appeal with prejudice, with each party to bear his, her, or its own attorneys’ fees and costs, is GRANTED. [7285996-2] SM and BBM
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107676552 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
    Notice of Mandatory ECF sent to Earl Price Underwood Jr..
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107676520 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION to dismiss appeal with prejudice filed by Appellant Annie B. Adams. Motion is Unopposed [7285996-1]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107619789 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
        APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kenneth J. Riemer for the Appellant, Annie Adams (ECF: Kenneth Riemer)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107566526 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen K. Pudner for Homeward Residential, Inc.. (ECF: Stephen Pudner)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107565193 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen K. Pudner Appellee (ECF: Stephen Pudner)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107558851 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
              Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Annie B. Adams. The appellants brief is due on or before 08/18/2014. The appendix is due on or before 08/25/2014.
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 22 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?