Lam Nguyen v. Jennifer C Ireland Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 13 536305
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Nguyen, Lam, Plaintiff

Represented by Innabi Law Group, Apc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amer Innabi +1 818 241 5500 +1 818 241 5551 amer@innabi-lg.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant
No Logo Ireland, Jennifer C, Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Claimant

Represented by Tax Collector - Legal Section

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lew, Debra Dee +1 415 554 4495
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of May-21-2014 Is Off Calendar - Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 8 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014
    Medical Reimbursement Lien Filed By Claimant City And County Of San Francisco
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Dismissal Of Entire Action
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 6 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014
        Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Ireland, Jennifer C
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Judem
          Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Ireland, Jennifer C
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Answer
            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Ireland, Jennifer C
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Proof of Service of Summons
              Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Nguyen, Lam Served Dec-24-2013, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Ireland, Jennifer C
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 Notice To Plaintiff
                Notice To Plaintiff
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013 Complaint
                  Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Nguyen, Lam As To Defendant Ireland, Jennifer C Does 1 To 50 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For May-21-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Feb-18-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Apr-28-2014
                    Request RequestSpace

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 20 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?