Freddie A Bautista v. Vanessa Vignon et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 537504
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Bautista, Freddie A, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices Of Manuel Rivas, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rivas, Manuel +1 415 439 8874

Represented by Millington Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Millington, Kimberly A. +1 415 248 5315
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant
No Logo Vignon, Vanessa, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
Other Parties
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Claimant

Represented by Ccsf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lew, Debra Dee +1 415 554 4495
Attributes
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
Timeline
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration
Arbitration Order To Show Cause Of Jul-07-2015 Continued To Nov-10-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Jurisdiction Of The Arbitrator Is Extended Through Oct-09-2015. Arbitration Order To Show Cause On Jul-07-2015 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Declaration
Declaration Of Kimberly A. Millington In Response To Order To Show Cause Re Arbitraton (transaction Id # 100000813) Filed By Plaintiff Bautista, Freddie A
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration
Arbitration Order To Show Cause Set For Jul-07-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 3.815)
Arbitrator Charlene Phyllis Rosack Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Dec-12-2014 Through Mar-12-2015.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
Panel Of Arbitrators Assigned. Rejection Date Dec-11-2014.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Substitution of Attorney
Substitution Of Attorney: Millington, Kimberly A. Substituted For Rivas, Manuel As Attorney For Bautista, Freddie A
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Order To Arbitration
Assigned To Arbitration For Dec-01-2014. The Nov-05-2014 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Medical Reimbursement Lien San Francisco Health Code Sec 124
Medical Reimbursement Lien San Francisco Health Code Sec 124
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Notice of Unavailability
Notice Of Unavailability Of Rivas, Manuel On Oct-17-2014 Through Oct-28-2014 Filed By Plaintiff Bautista, Freddie A
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
Case Management Conference Set For Nov-05-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The Oct-07-2014 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Response to Order to Show Cause
Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Bautista, Freddie A
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Vignon, Vanessa
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Vignon, Vanessa
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Bautista, Freddie A Served Aug-06-2014, Personal Service On Defendant Vignon, Vanessa
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Order to Show Cause
Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-07-2014 In Department 610 At 10:30 Am For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Aug-27-2014 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Bautista, Freddie A Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: 7/8/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Bautista, Freddie A
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Bautista, Freddie A Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: 6/30/2014 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Case Management Conference Of Jul-16-2014 Continued To Aug-27-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Complaint
Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Bautista, Freddie A As To Defendant Vignon, Vanessa Does 1 To 50 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-16-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-15-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Jun-23-2014
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 120 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?