Michael Spillane v. Jeffrey Capaccio Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 537745
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Spillane, Michael, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Terence A. Redmond

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Redmond, Terence Anthony +1 415 395 9000
v.
No Logo Capaccio, Jeffrey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Ginder Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wilcoxson, John G. +1 949 287 5540
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Defendant
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The Treasurer And Tax Collector- Legal Section

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lew, Debra Dee +1 415 554 4495
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Nov-16-2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206.
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
    Medical Reimbursement Lien Filed By Claimant City And County Of San Francisco
      Blank 14 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Court Filing
      Objection Hearing Mar-04-2015; Judge John K. Stewart; Clerk Kcox; Proceedings Not Reported (610)
        Blank 13 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015
        Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Mar-04-2015 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Objection To Trial Date
          Objection To Trial Date; (transaction Id # 15050180) Filed By Plaintiff Spillane, Michael
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
            Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Aug-10-2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Is Removed From Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
              Stipulation Of The Parties To Mediate In Lieu Of Judicial Arbitration; Filed By Defendant Capaccio, Jeffrey
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 9 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015
                Fee Paid On Stipulation Of The Parties To Mediate In Lieu Of Judicial Arbitration And To Extend The Completion Date; (proposed) Order (transaction Id # 15034018) Filed By Defendant Capaccio, Jeffrey
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 3.815)
                  Arbitrator Edward Charles Casey Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Oct-17-2014 Through Jan-15-2015.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Mark Richard Carbone.
                    Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Mark Richard Carbone.
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
                      Panel Of Arbitrators Assigned. Rejection Date Oct-16-2014.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Order To Arbitration
                        Assigned To Arbitration For Oct-06-2014. The Aug-06-2014 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Answer
                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Capaccio, Jeffrey
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Proof of Service of Summons & Com
                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Spillane, Michael Served May-12-2014, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Capaccio, Jeffrey
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Complaint
                                Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Spillane, Michael As To Defendant Capaccio, Jeffrey Does 1 To 20 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-06-2014 Proof Of Service Due On May-02-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-14-2014
                                  Request RequestSpace

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 287 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?