Robert Larsen v. Laura Bradley Conway et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 539203
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Larsen, Robert, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Titan Machinery Inc.

Represented by Butler Viadro

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Peralta +1 510 287 2400
v.
No Logo Conway, Laura Bradley, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Does 1 To 25, Incl., Defendant
No Logo Suzuki, Yuri, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Mark T. Lobre

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Har, Brian J +1 415 777 3114
Other Parties
No Logo Conway, Laura Bradley, Cross Defendant
No Logo Foes 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Cross Defendant
No Logo Roes 1 To 25, Inclusive, Cross Defendant
No Logo Suzuki, Yuri, Cross Complainant

Represented by Law Offices Of Mark T. Lobre

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Har, Brian J +1 415 777 3114
Attributes
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
Timeline
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (7) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Dismissal
Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint Parties To Bear Their Own Costs And Fees (transaction Id # 100003613) As To Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley
Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case
Notice Of Settlement (transaction Id # 100003424) Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Proof of Service
Proof Of Service Of Stipulation That Settlement Was Entered Into In Good Faith (transaction Id # 15189043) Filed By Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Stipulation That Settlement Was Entered Into In Good Faith
Fee Paid On Stipulation That Settlement Was Entered Into In Good Faith (transaction Id # 15189043) Filed By Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Sep-14-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Oct-08-2014 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Blank 21 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Plaintiff Robert Larsens Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 56027853) Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert Served Jul-13-2014, Personal Service On Defendant Suzuki, Yuri
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Exhibit
Exhibit 3 In Support Of Notice Of Third Party Action (transaction Id # 55760221) Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Exhibit
Exhibit 2 In Support Of Notice Of Third Party Action (transaction Id # 55760221) Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Exhibit
Exhibit 1 In Support Of Notice Of Third Party Action (transaction Id # 55760221) Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Plaintiffs Notice Or Third Party Action
Notice Of Third Party Action (transaction Id # 55756701) Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Summons Issued
Summons Issued On Cross Complaint Of Yuri Suzuki To Cross Complainant Suzuki, Yuri
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Cross Complaint
Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Suzuki, Yuri As To Cross Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley Roes 1 To 25, Inclusive
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Answer
Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Suzuki, Yuri
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Suzuki, Yuri
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Demand For Jury
Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Suzuki, Yuri
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Suzuki, Yuri
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Summons Issued
Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Conway, Laura Bradley
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Cross Complaint
Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Conway, Laura Bradley As To Cross Defendant Suzuki, Yuri Foes 1 Through 100, Inclusive
Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley
Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 55527071), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert Served May-22-2014, Certified Or Registered Mail - Out Of State On Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: 5/30/2014 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 55520748), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert Served May-28-2014, Personal Service On Defendant Suzuki, Yuri
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Complaint
Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Larsen, Robert As To Defendant Conway, Laura Bradley Suzuki, Yuri Does 1 To 25, Incl. Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-08-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-08-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Sep-15-2014

Statistics

This case has been viewed 167 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?