Nancy Anaya Et Al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 539551
Superior Court Judge Ernest H. Goldsmith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anaya, Nancy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DL Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Lilienstein ,. +1 415 678 5050 +1 415 358 8484 david@dllawgroup.com
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DL Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Lilienstein ,. +1 415 678 5050 +1 415 358 8484 david@dllawgroup.com
No Logo Owens Jr., Joseph, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DL Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Lilienstein ,. +1 415 678 5050 +1 415 358 8484 david@dllawgroup.com
No Logo Smith, Stephen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DL Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Lilienstein ,. +1 415 678 5050 +1 415 358 8484 david@dllawgroup.com
v.
No Logo AIG DIRECT INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LANE J. ASHLEY +1 213 250 1800 +1 213 250 7900 ashley@lbbslaw.com
No Logo American International Group, Inc. Dba Aig Life Insurance Company, Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph Wells Robinson +1 415 433 0990 +1 415 434 1370 Ralph.Robinson@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LANE J. ASHLEY +1 213 250 1800 +1 213 250 7900 ashley@lbbslaw.com
No Logo The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen W. Yiu +1 415 703 5385 +1 415 703 5480 karen.yiu@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lombardi Loper & Conant LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce P. Loper +1 510 433 2600
Cause of Action Subrogation/insurance
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (20) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Feb-08-2016 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Jul-15-2015 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Case Management Statement
    Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 57485879) Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a. Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Case Management Statement
      Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 57479278) Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Case Management Statement
        Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 57467039) Filed By Defendant The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Hours
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 51 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015
          Jury Fees (transaction Id # 57414183) Deposited By Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd.
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Case Management Statement
            Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 57414183) Filed By Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Case Management Statement
              Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 57405026) Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a. Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
                Case Management Conference Set For Jul-15-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The Jun-16-2015 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Insurance Commissioner’s Answer To First Amended Complaint For Breac
                  Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 57143454) Filed By Defendant The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Continued Order To Show Cause
                    Order To Show Cause Set For Apr-28-2015 Continued To Jun-16-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) The Commissioner Of The California Department Of. The Apr-28-2015 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Proof of Service
                      Proof Of Service: Response To Continued Osc (transaction Id # 57057282) Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Plaintiffs Response To Continued Order To Show Cause
                        Plaintiffs Response To Continued Order To Show Cause (transaction Id # 57057282) Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 43 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015
                          Issuing Commission To Take Deposition Out Of State Under Ccp 2026 Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                            Blank 42 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015
                            Issuing Commission To Take Deposition Out Of State Under Ccp 2026 Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                              Blank 41 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015
                              Issuing Commission To Take Deposition Out Of State Under Ccp 2026 Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                Blank 40 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015
                                Issuing Commission To Take Deposition Out Of State Under Ccp 2026 Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015
                                  Issuing Commission To Take Deposition Out Of State Under Ccp 2026 Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015
                                    Issuing Commission To Take Deposition Out Of State Under Ccp 2026 Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Proof Of Service Re California Insurance Commissioner
                                      Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 56745214) Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph Served Feb-04-2015, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Feb-10-2015 Continued To Apr-28-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance As To First Amended Complaint. The Feb-10-2015 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Plaintiffs Surreply To Order To Show Cause
                                          Plaintiffs Surreply Re: Order To Show Cause Re: Service On The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance (transaction Id # 56725691) Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                            Response To Order To Show Cause (transaction Id # 56719817) Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Proof of Service
                                              Proof Of Service By Mail Of Stipulation And Protective Order (transaction Id # 56622192) Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                Stipulation And Protective Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Stipulation And [proposed] Protective Order
                                                  Fee For Stipulation And [proposed] Protective Order (transaction Id # 56572857) Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Order to Show Cause
                                                      Order To Show Cause Set For Feb-10-2015 In Department 610 At 10:30 Am For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) The Commissioner Of The California Department Of As To 1st Amended Complaint. The Dec-31-2014 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Answer
                                                        Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Answer
                                                          Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Answer
                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Answer
                                                              Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa.
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014
                                                                Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                    Case Management Conference Of Oct-29-2014 Continued To Dec-31-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014
                                                                      Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa.
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Case Management Statement
                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014
                                                                          Mini Minutes For Oct-01-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014
                                                                            Mini Minutes For Oct-01-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Court Filing
                                                                              Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Bank Of America, N.a.'s Motion To Strike Complaint Is Off Calendar. A First Amended Complaint Was Filed On September 30, 2014. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert, Not Reported. (302)
                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Court Filing
                                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Bank Of America, N.a.'s Demurrer To Complaint Is Off Calendar. A First Amended Complaint Was Filed On September 30, 2014. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert, Not Reported. (302)
                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014
                                                                                  Pos Of First Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Complaint
                                                                                    1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph Does 1 To 50 As To Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Bank Of America, N.a. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc. Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd. The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance Does 1 To 50, Inclusive
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Answer
                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa.
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Answer
                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014
                                                                                          Stipulation To Dismiss Without Prejudice; Pos Filed By Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014
                                                                                            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a.
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014
                                                                                              Motion To Strike Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a. Hearing Set For Oct-01-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014
                                                                                                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a.
                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014
                                                                                                  Demurrer To Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities Ntc Of Demurrer Filed By Defendant Bank Of America, N.a. Hearing Set For Oct-01-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Answer
                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd.
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Of Summons And Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph Served Jun-19-2014, Mail On Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Summons And Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph Served Jun-10-2014, Mail On Defendant American International Group, Inc. Dba Aig Life Insurance Company Bank Of America, N.a. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc. Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd.
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014
                                                                                                          Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                              Subrogation/insurance, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Anaya, Nancy Smith, Stephen Owens Jr., Joseph Does 1 To 50 As To Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburg H, Pa. American International Group, Inc. Dba Aig Life Insurance Company Bank Of America, N.a. Aig Direct Insurance Services, Inc. Wells Fargo Bank, Ltd. The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance Does 1 To 50, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-29-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-28-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Oct-06-2014
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?