Jennifer Mayfield Rubenstein v. Eric F. Davis et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 539582
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Rubenstein, Jennifer Mayfield, Plaintiff

Represented by Dunn & Panagotacos LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constantine Panagotacos +1 415 982 2100
No Logo Rubenstein, Michael, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Altimar Acquisition Corp.

Represented by Dunn & Panagotacos LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constantine Panagotacos +1 415 982 2100
v.
No Logo Davis, Eric E, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
Attributes
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
Timeline
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Apr-07-2015 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Mar-03-2015 Continued To Apr-07-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Request For Dismissal
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice (transaction Id # 56839735)
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 3.1385 Set For Mar-03-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. The Jan-21-2015 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Notice of Settlement
Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Rubenstein, Jennifer Mayfield Rubenstein, Michael
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Case Management Conference Of Dec-10-2014 Continued To Jan-21-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Davis, Eric E
Blank 6 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Davis, Eric E
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Davis, Eric E
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Case Management Conference Of Oct-29-2014 Continued To Dec-10-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Rubenstein, Jennifer Mayfield Rubenstein, Michael Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: 5/30/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: 5/30/2014 Complaint
Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Rubenstein, Jennifer Mayfield Rubenstein, Michael As To Defendant Davis, Eric E Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-29-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-29-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Oct-06-2014

Statistics

This case has been viewed 314 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?