Roy Abila Jr v. Amber J. Leonard Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 539670
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Abila Jr, Roy, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob, Shapiro +1 415 692 8124
v.
No Logo Does 1 Thorugh Ten, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Leonard, Amber J., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Gregory V. Debernard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
No Logo Wardell, Clayton Q., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Gregory V. Debernard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Notice Re: Extension Of Arbitrator's Jurisdiction
Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Extended To Oct-16-2015. Notice Sent By Court.
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Acceptance Of Plaintiffs Offer To Compromise
    Offer To Compromise And Acceptance Of Offer To Compromise (transaction Id # 100003616) Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy As To Defendant Leonard, Amber J.
      Blank 26 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015
      Mini Minutes For Aug-13-2015 09:00 Am For Dept 302
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 25 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Court Filing
        Discovery, 302, Plaintiff Roy Abila''s Motion To Compel Further Response To Request, Demand Inspection, Production Of Documents Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Prevailing Party Shall Prepare And Submit A Proposed Order. Judge Pro Tem: Nils Rosenquest, Clerk: Sean Kane, Not Reported. (302/jpt)
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 24 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015
          Order And Stipulation To Extend Jurisdiction Of Arbitrator
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 23 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015
            Fee Paid To Stip And Order To Extend Jurisdiction (transaction Id # 15202030) Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Declaration
              Declaration Of Jacob Shapiro In Support Of Motion To Compel (transaction Id # 15181088) Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy
                Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Compel
                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Compel (transaction Id # 15181088) Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel
                  Motion To Compel Further Response To Request, Demand Inspection, Production Of Documents (transaction Id # 15181088) Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy Hearing Set For Aug-13-2015 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Statement Of Items In Dispute
                    Statement Of Items In Dispute In Support Of Motion To Compel (transaction Id # 15181088) Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 3.815)
                      Arbitrator David Edward May Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction May-15-2015 Through Aug-13-2015.
                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Robert Reeves Cross.
                        Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Robert Reeves Cross.
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
                          Panel Of Arbitrators Assigned. Rejection Date May-14-2015.
                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Order To Arbitration
                            Assigned To Arbitration For May-04-2015. The Apr-08-2015 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 Case Management Statement
                              Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 15068035) Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Case Management Statement
                                Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 15063037) Filed By Defendant Leonard, Amber J. Wardell, Clayton Q. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Order Setting Case Management Conference
                                  Case Management Conference Set For Apr-08-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The Mar-03-2015 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Amber J. Leonard And Clayton Q. Wardells Answer To First Amended Compl
                                    Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 15035222) Filed By Defendant Leonard, Amber J. Wardell, Clayton Q.
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Notice Of Posting Jury Fees And Demand For Jury Trial
                                      Jury Fees And Demand For Jury Trial (transaction Id # 15035222) Deposited By Defendant Leonard, Amber J.
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Order to Show Cause
                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-03-2015 In Department 610 At 10:30 Am For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s) As To 1st Amended Complaint. The Jan-07-2015 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                          Case Management Conference Of Nov-05-2014 Continued To Jan-07-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Case Management Statement
                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy Jury Demanded
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014
                                              Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Summons Issued
                                                Summons Issued On First Amended Complaint To Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Complaint
                                                  1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy As To Defendant Leonard, Amber J. Wardell, Clayton Q. Does 1 Thorugh Ten, Inclusive
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Substitution of Attorney
                                                    Substitution Of Attorney: Jacob, Shapiro Substituted For Pro Per As Attorney For Abila Jr, Roy
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/4/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: 6/4/2014 Complaint
                                                        Contract/warranty, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Abila Jr, Roy As To Defendant Leonard, Amber J. Wardell, Clayton Q. Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Nov-05-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Aug-04-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Oct-14-2014

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?