Carlos Flores et al v. Colin Lowenberg

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 540451
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Flores, Carlos, Plaintiff

Represented by Lipton & Piper, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Lee Piper +1 415 362 6286 +1 415 362 6819 jon@acelawyers.com
No Logo Perez, Guadalupe, Plaintiff

Represented by Lipton & Piper, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Lee Piper +1 415 362 6286 +1 415 362 6819 jon@acelawyers.com
No Logo Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor, Plaintiff

Represented by Lipton & Piper, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Lee Piper +1 415 362 6286 +1 415 362 6819 jon@acelawyers.com
v.
No Logo Lowenberg, Colin, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
Other Parties
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Claimant

Represented by Of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lew, Debra Dee +1 415 554 4495
Attributes
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015
Added To Calendar For Hearing Re: Status Of Filing Of Receipt And Acknowledgment Of Order For The Deposit Of Money Into Blocked Account For The Benefit Of Minor: Aldahir Ramirez Hearing Set For Nov-19-2015 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Order
Order To Deposit Money Into Blocked Account For The Benefit On Minor: Aldahir Ramirez
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Order
Order Approving Compromise Of Pending Action Of Minor: Aldahir Ramirez
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Expedited Peition To Approve Compromise Of Pending Action For A Minor
Expedited Peition To Approve Compromise Of Pending Action For A Minor (transaction Id # 57650900) Filed By Plaintiff Perez, Guadalupe
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (guadalupe Perez Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez) Filed By Plaintiff Perez, Guadalupe
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Order
Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For An Order Appointing A New Guardian Ad Litem For Plaintiff Aldahir Ramirez
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Supplemental Declaration
Supplemental Declaration Of Jonathan L. Piper In Support Of The Ex Parte Application For An Order Appointing A New Guardian Ad Litem For Plaintiff Aldahir Ramirez (transaction Id # 57590666) Filed By Plaintiff Flores, Carlos Perez, Guadalupe Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Declaration
Declaration Of Jonathan Piper In Suppport Of The Ex Parte Application To Appoint A New Guardian Ad Litum For Plaintiff Aldahir Ramirez (transaction Id # 57528292) Filed By Plaintiff Flores, Carlos Perez, Guadalupe Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Ex Parte Aplicatiion For An Order Appointing A New Guardian Ad Litum F
Ex Parte Application For Order Appointing A New Guardian Ad Litum For Plaintiff Aldahir Ramirez (transaction Id # 57528292) Filed By Plaintiff Flores, Carlos Perez, Guadalupe Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015
Master Jury Calendar Set For Jun-15-2015 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Oct-05-2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Stipulated Ex Parte Order Filed 04/23/15. (206)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Order
Order To Continue Trial Date And Discovery Cutoff Dates Pursuant To Parties' Stipulation
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Declaration In Support Of The Application For A Continuance
Declaration In Support Of The Application For A Continuance (transaction Id # 57120216) Filed By Plaintiff Flores, Carlos Perez, Guadalupe Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial Date; Memorandum Of
Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial Date; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support (transaction Id # 57119628) Filed By Plaintiff Flores, Carlos Perez, Guadalupe Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jun-15-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Dec-10-2014 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Lowenberg, Colin Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Flores, Carlos Perez, Guadalupe Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Lowenberg, Colin
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Lowenberg, Colin
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Summons Issued
Summons Issued To Plaintiff Flores, Carlos Perez, Guadalupe Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 Generic Civil Filing (with Fee)
Medical Reimbursement Lien Filed By Claimant City And County Of San Francisco
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Petition Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem
Petition And Order For Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem (alberto Ramirez Appointed As Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez) Filed By Plaintiff Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014
Fee Paid On Order For Guardian Ad Litem Application Filed By Plaintiff Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Complaint
Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Flores, Carlos Perez, Guadalupe Ramirez, Alberto Guardian Ad Litem For Aldahir Ramirez, A Minor As To Defendant Lowenberg, Colin No Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-10-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-08-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Nov-17-2014
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 158 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?