Cheryl Hines v. Raymond James & Associates, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 540738
Superior Court Judge Ernest H. Goldsmith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hines, Cheryl, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Defendant
Raymond James & Associates Inc. Raymond James & Associates Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Cause of Action Wrongful Discharge
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Feb-04-2015 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
    Case Management Conference Of Dec-24-2014 Continued To Feb-04-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). Notice Sent By Court.
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Request For Dismissal
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice (transaction Id # 56423227)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 18 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Court Filing
        Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings Is Off Calendar Per Moving Parties' Request. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported. (302/ehg)
          Blank 17 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Court Filing
          Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.'s Motion For Sanctions Is Off Calendar Per Moving Parties' Request. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported. (302/ehg)
            Blank 16 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014
            Mini Minutes For Dec-02-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
              Blank 15 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014
              Mini Minutes For Dec-02-2014 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Proof of Service
                Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 56359164) Filed By Plaintiff Hines, Cheryl
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Declaration
                  Declaration Of Bonita Moore In Support Of Plaintiff Cheryl Hines Consolidated Opposition To Defendant Raymond James Associates, Inc.s Motion To Compel Arbitration And Motion For Sanctions (transaction Id # 56359164) Filed By Plaintiff Hines, Cheryl
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Declaration
                    Declaration Of Cheryl Hines In Support Of Plaintiff Cheryl Hines Consolidated Opposition To Defendant Raymond James Associates, Inc.s Motion To Compel Arbitration And Motion For Sanctions (transaction Id # 56359164) Filed By Plaintiff Hines, Cheryl
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Plaintiff Cheryl Hines’ Consolidated Opposition To Defendant Raymond
                      Opposition To Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration And Motion For Sanctions (transaction Id # 56354514) Filed By Plaintiff Hines, Cheryl
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014
                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014
                          Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014
                            Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. Hearing Set For Dec-02-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014
                              Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014
                                Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014
                                  Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Sanctions, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. Hearing Set For Dec-02-2014 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Proof of Service of Summons
                                    Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 56068112), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Hines, Cheryl Served Sep-15-2014, Personal Service On Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014
                                      Objection To Pro Tem Judgmnt Filed By Plaintiff Hines, Cheryl
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
                                        Notice To Plaintiff
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/25/2014 Complaint
                                          Wrongful Discharge, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Hines, Cheryl As To Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. Does 1 To 10, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-24-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-23-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Dec-01-2014
                                            Request RequestSpace

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?