Darrell Irving et al v. Jasmin Collins

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 540830
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Irving, Brianna, Plaintiff

Represented by Joseph Jung & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Joseph Jung +1 510 658 2500
No Logo Irving, Darrell, Plaintiff

Represented by Joseph Jung & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Joseph Jung +1 510 658 2500
v.
No Logo Collins, Jasmin, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
Attributes
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
Timeline
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Feb-22-2016 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Aug-19-2015 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 15202065) Filed By Defendant Collins, Jasmin Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
Case Management Conference Set For Aug-19-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The Jul-21-2015 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Continued Order To Show Cause
Order To Show Cause Set For May-12-2015 Continued To Jul-21-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015
Jury Fees (transaction Id # 15132079) Deposited By Defendant Collins, Jasmin
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Answer
Answer To Complaint (transaction Id # 15132079) Filed By Defendant Collins, Jasmin
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015
Mini Minutes For May-12-2015 10:30 Am For Dept 610
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Continued Order To Show Cause
Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-24-2015 Continued To May-12-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). The Mar-24-2015 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Proof Of Service On Jasmin Collins
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 15054217), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Irving, Darrell Irving, Brianna Served Jan-27-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Collins, Jasmin
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: 1/27/2015 Order to Show Cause
Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-24-2015 In Department 610 At 10:30 Am For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Feb-11-2015 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Case Management Conference Of Dec-31-2014 Continued To Feb-11-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Complaint
Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Irving, Darrell Irving, Brianna As To Defendant Collins, Jasmin Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-31-2014 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-29-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Dec-08-2014

Statistics

This case has been viewed 118 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?