Bryan Whiley v. John Daniel Larson et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 541413
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Cynthia M. Lee
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Whiley, Bryan, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices Of Brian L. Larsen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian L Larsen +1 415 493 2500
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Larson, John Daniel, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
Attributes
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
Timeline
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration (c)
Arbitration Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-20-2015 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 3.815)
Arbitrator Philip Allan Segal Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Jun-19-2015 Through Sep-17-2015.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Defendant(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Eric Marshall Abramson.
Defendant(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Eric Marshall Abramson.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Gary Elliott Moss.
Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Gary Elliott Moss.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
Re Send Panel Of Arbitrators. Rejection Date Jun-18-2015. Arbitration Order To Show Cause Set For Jul-14-2015 Is Off Calendar.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration
Arbitration Order To Show Cause Set For Jul-14-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (ccp 1141.11(d))
Arbitrator Claudia W. Brisson Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Jan-26-2015 Through Apr-26-2015.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Order To Arbitration
Assigned To Arbitration For Jan-26-2015. The Dec-31-2014 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Blank 7 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Larson, John Daniel
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Larson, John Daniel Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Larson, John Daniel
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Whiley, Bryan Served Nov-01-2014, Personal Service On Defendant Larson, John Daniel
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014
Request To Waive Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Order For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Granted Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Complaint
Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Whiley, Bryan As To Defendant Larson, John Daniel Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-31-2014
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 175 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?