John Crandon et al v. Rafi Ohannes Keuftedjian

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 14 541669
Superior Court Judge John K. Stewart, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge John K. Stewart
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Crandon, John, Plaintiff

Represented by The Dolan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher B. Dolan +1 415 421 2800 +1 415 412 2830 chris@cbdlaw.com
No Logo Crandon, Joyce, Plaintiff

Represented by The Dolan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher B. Dolan +1 415 421 2800 +1 415 412 2830 chris@cbdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Keuftedjian, Rafi Ohannes, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
Attributes
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
Timeline
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed (transaction Id # 57441652) Filed By Plaintiff Crandon, John Crandon, Joyce
Blank 14 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015
Master Jury Calendar Set For Aug-24-2015 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Feb-08-2016 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Stipulated Ex Parte Order Filed 06/11/15. (206)
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Order
Order On Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial And Related Discovery Deadlines Pursuant To Parties' Stipulation
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte
Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial And Related Discovery Deadlines As Stipulated To By All Parties, Or, For An Order Shortening Time On Motion For Same (transaction Id # 57379183) Filed By Plaintiff Crandon, John Crandon, Joyce
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Declaration
Declaration Of Natalie M. Lupo In Support Of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial And Related Discovery Deadlines As Stipulated To By All Parties, Or, For An Order Shortening Time On Motion For Same (transaction Id # 57379183) Filed By Plaintiff Crandon, John Crandon, Joyce
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial And Related Discover
Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial And Related Discovery Deadlines As Stipulated To By All Parties, Or, For An Order Shortening Time On Motion For Same (transaction Id # 57379183) Filed By Plaintiff Crandon, John Crandon, Joyce
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Aug-24-2015 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Feb-18-2015 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 56702887) Filed By Defendant Keuftedjian, Rafi Ohannes Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015 Plaintiffs John And Joyce Crandons Cmc Statement
Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 56695781) Filed By Plaintiff Crandon, John Crandon, Joyce Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Keuftedjian, Rafi Ohannes
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Keuftedjian, Rafi Ohannes
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Crandon, John Served Oct-01-2014, Personal Service On Defendant Keuftedjian, Rafi Ohannes
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014
Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Crandon, John
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Complaint
Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Crandon, John Crandon, Joyce As To Defendant Keuftedjian, Rafi Ohannes Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Feb-18-2015 Proof Of Service Due On Nov-17-2014 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-26-2015

Statistics

This case has been viewed 278 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?