David J Tierney et al v. Kevin Chan et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 15 543721
Superior Court Judge John K. Stewart, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge John K. Stewart
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Tierney, Christina R, Plaintiff

Represented by Bennett & Johnson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Cross Bennett +1 510 444 5020

Represented by Law Offices Of Richard W. Meier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meier, Richard William +1 510 834 3600
No Logo Tierney, David J, Plaintiff

Represented by Bennett & Johnson Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Cross Bennett +1 510 444 5020

Represented by Law Offices Of Richard W. Meier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meier, Richard William +1 510 834 3600
v.
No Logo Bali Limousines Inc, Defendant
No Logo Chan, Kevin, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Eagle Limo And Sedan Service Erroneously Sued Herein As Eagle Limo/car Service, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Law Office Of Lori R. Mayfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Appleton, Christophe Alan +1 415 290 0891
No Logo Eagle Limo Inc, Defendant
No Logo Eagle Limo/car Service Inc, Defendant
No Logo Macdonald, Patrick, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Gregory V. Debernard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lane, David P. +1 415 788 1313
No Logo Pierce, Alexander, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Sisco, Gloria, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Yfiter, Tesfai Amine, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo Bali Limousines Inc, Cross Defendant
No Logo Chan, Kevin, Cross Defendant
No Logo Eagle Limo Inc, Cross Defendant
No Logo Eagle Limo/car Service Inc, Cross Defendant
No Logo Macdonald, Patrick, Cross Defendant
No Logo Roes 1 To 50, Inclusive, Cross Defendant
No Logo Yfiter, Tesfai Amine, Cross Defendant
No Logo Pierce, Alexander, Cross Complainant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Sisco, Gloria, Cross Complainant

Represented by Law Offices Of Catherine A. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
Attributes
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
Timeline
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (11) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Summons Issued
Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015
Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 15217086) Filed By Defendant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Proof of Service
Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 15217086) Filed By Defendant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Exhibit
Exhibit A Pertain To Declaration Of Catherine A. Walsh In Support Thereof (transaction Id # 15217086) Filed By Defendant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Declaration
Declaration Of Catherine A. Walsh In Support There Of (transaction Id # 15217086) Filed By Defendant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendant Jason L.
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion (transaction Id # 15217086) Filed By Defendant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Notice of Motion
Motion To Strike Complaint (transaction Id # 15217086) Filed By Defendant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria Hearing Set For Sep-25-2015 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015
Jury Fees (transaction Id # 15211064) Deposited By Defendant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Cross Complaint For Comparative Equitable Comparative Equitable Indemn
Cross Complaint (transaction Id # 15211064) Filed By Cross Complainant Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria As To Cross Defendant Chan, Kevin Yfiter, Tesfai Amine Eagle Limo/car Service Inc Eagle Limo Inc Bali Limousines Inc Macdonald, Patrick
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Answer
Answer To Complaint (transaction Id # 15211064) Filed By Defendant Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed (transaction Id # 15209074) Filed By Plaintiff Tierney, David J Tierney, Christina R
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 15208032), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Tierney, David J Tierney, Christina R Served Jul-21-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Pierce, Alexander
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015
Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Tierney, David J
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Case Management Conference Statement
Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 57607274) Filed By Defendant Eagle Limo And Sedan Service Erroneously Sued Herein As Eagle Limo/car Service, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 15203080), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Tierney, David J Tierney, Christina R Served May-19-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Bali Limousines Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 15203080), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Tierney, David J Tierney, Christina R Served May-15-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Sisco, Gloria
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Case Management Statement
Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 100002452) Filed By Defendant Macdonald, Patrick Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 8.0 Days
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Case Management Conference Of Aug-05-2015 Continued To Sep-16-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendants Chan & Yf
Dismissal Without Prejudice (transaction Id # 15173069) As To Defendant Chan, Kevin Yfiter, Tesfai Amine
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015
Jury Fees (transaction Id # 57429626) Deposited By Defendant Eagle Limo And Sedan Service Erroneously Sued Herein As Eagle Limo/car Service, Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Answer
Answer To Complaint (transaction Id # 57429626) Filed By Defendant Eagle Limo And Sedan Service Erroneously Sued Herein As Eagle Limo/car Service, Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015
Jury Fees (transaction Id # 100000564) Deposited By Defendant Macdonald, Patrick
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Cross-complaint For Complete Indemnity, Partial Indemnity, And Declara
Cross Complaint (transaction Id # 100000564) Filed By Cross Complainant Macdonald, Patrick As To Cross Defendant Chan, Kevin Roes 1 To 50, Inclusive
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Patrick Macdonalds Answer To Complaint
Answer To Complaint (transaction Id # 100000564) Filed By Defendant Macdonald, Patrick
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Case Management Conference Of Jun-24-2015 Continued To Aug-05-2015 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Request For Dismissal
Dismissal Without Prejudice (transaction Id # 15123149) As To Defendant Eagle Limo Inc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Substitution of Attorney
Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 15102133): Meier, Richard William Substituted For Bennett, Richard Cross As Attorney For Tierney, Christina R
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Substitution of Attorney
Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 15102132): Meier, Richard William Substituted For Bennett, Richard Cross As Attorney For Tierney, David J
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Complaint
Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Tierney, David J Tierney, Christina R As To Defendant Chan, Kevin Yfiter, Tesfai Amine Eagle Limo/car Service Inc Eagle Limo Inc Bali Limousines Inc Macdonald, Patrick Pierce, Alexander Sisco, Gloria Does 1 To 100, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jun-24-2015 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-23-2015 Case Management Statement Due On Jun-01-2015
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 35 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?