John Doe v. Kink.com et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 15 545540
Superior Court Judge John K. Stewart, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge John K. Stewart
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Doe, John, Plaintiff

Represented by Kaster, Thomas Joseph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ribera, Sandra L +1 415 525 4462
v.
No Logo Acworth, Peter, Defendant
No Logo Armory Studios, Llc, Defendant
No Logo Cybernet Entertainment LLC, Defendant
No Logo Darkholme, Van, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Karl, Hogan Aka Van Darkholme, Defendant
No Logo Kink Studios, Llc, Defendant
No Logo Kink.com, Defendant
No Logo Kinkmen.com, Defendant
Attributes
Cause of Action Fraud
Timeline
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Notice Of Acknowledgment Of Receipt-civil
Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt, Signed Jul-10-2015, Served Jul-10-2015 (transaction Id # 57594233) Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Armory Studios, Llc
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Notice Of Acknowledgement And Receipt- Civil
Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt, Signed Jul-10-2015, Served Jul-01-2015 Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 57579086) Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Karl, Hogan Aka Van Darkholme
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Notice Of Acknowledgement And Receipt- Civil
Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt, Signed Jul-10-2015, Served Jul-01-2015 Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 57579086) Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Acworth, Peter
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Notice Of Acknowledgement And Receipt- Civil
Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt, Signed Jul-10-2015, Served Jul-01-2015 Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 57579086) Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Cybernet Entertainment, Llc
Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Notice Of Acknowledgement And Receipt- Civil
Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt, Signed Jul-10-2015, Served Jul-01-2015 Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 57579086) Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Kinkmen.com
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Notice Of Acknowledgement And Receipt- Civil
Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt, Signed Jul-10-2015, Served Jul-01-2015 Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 57579086) Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Kink Studios, Llc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Notice Of Acknowledgement And Receipt- Civil
Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt, Signed Jul-10-2015, Served Jul-01-2015 Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 57579086) Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Kink.com
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint For Damages
1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 57478931) Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Kink.com Kink Studios, Llc Kinkmen.com Cybernet Entertainment, Llc Armory Studios, Llc Acworth, Peter Does 1 To 50, Inclusive Karl, Hogan Aka Van Darkholme
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 57472056), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John Served Jun-23-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Kink Studios, Llc
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 57472056), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John Served Jun-23-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Kinkmen.com
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 57472056), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John Served Jun-23-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Cybernet Entertainment, Llc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 57472056), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John Served Jun-23-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Armory Studios, Llc
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 57472056), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John Served Jun-23-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Acworth, Peter
Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 57472056), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John Served Jun-22-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Darkholme, Van
Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Proof of Service of Summons
Summons On Complaint (transaction Id # 57472056), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John Served Jun-23-2015, Personal Service On Defendant Kink.com
Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Complaint
Fraud, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Doe, John As To Defendant Kink.com Kink Studios, Llc Kinkmen.com Cybernet Entertainment, Llc Armory Studios, Llc Acworth, Peter Darkholme, Van Does 1 To 50, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Sep-30-2015 Proof Of Service Due On Jun-29-2015 Case Management Statement Due On Sep-08-2015

Statistics

This case has been viewed 401 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?