USA v. Costas Provisions Co, et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:95-cr-10278
District Judge Edward F. Harrington, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 11:11 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Costas Provisions Corporation, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Butters, Brazilian & Small LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Thomas J Butters +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 butters@buttersbrazilian.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Edward F. Harrington . JUDGMENT entered Costas Provisions Co (1) count(s) 1-4, 5 , 6 , 7 , 8 , 9 , 10 , 11 , 12 . The defendant pleaded guilty to Counts 1-14. Defendant is hereby placed on probation for a term of 60 months with the following special conditions: Costas P.C. must institute and maintain an effective rodent control program, and file monthly reports with the U.S. Probation Office and the U.S. Depart. of Agriculture (USDA) attesting to the same; and Costas P.C. must maintain generally sanitary conditions throughout all of its warehouse facilities where food products are stored. Standard conditions of supervision apply. Defendant shall pay a fine in the amount of $75,000 and special assessment of $1,750. cc/cl (seh) (Entered: 07/19/1996)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: None
    Letter (non-motion) filed by USA by Sheila W. Sawyer as to Costas Provisions Co, George Frangiadakis , dated: 5/8/96, re: change of plea. (seh) (Entered: 07/19/1996)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Edward F. Harrington . CLERK'S NOTES as to Costas Provisions Co, George Deligiannides, George Frangiadakis , re: change of plea hearing and disposition; Corporate vote filed; U.S. letters of 5/8/96 filed. Court ordered: Defendant #1: 5 years probation; fine of $75,000; special assessment of $1,750. Defendant #2: 2 years probation; fine of $5,000; special assessment of $350. Defendant #3: 2 years probation; fine of $5,000; special assessment of $300. Court Reporter: PCP cc/cl (seh) (Entered: 07/19/1996)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: None
        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Costas Provisions Co , filed. (seh) (Entered: 07/16/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
          Judge Edward F. Harrington . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Costas Provisions Co, George Deligiannides, George Frangiadakis . Time ordered excluded from 6/5/96 to 6/21/96. cc/cl (seh) (Entered: 06/28/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/5/1996, Entered: None
            MOTION by USA , as to Costas Provisions Co, George Deligiannides, George Frangiadakis for scheduling conference , filed. (seh) (Entered: 06/05/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: None
              MOTION by USA , as to Costas Provisions Co, George Deligiannides, George Frangiadakis for scheduling conference , filed. (seh) (Entered: 12/28/1995)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: None
                Certification of George M. Burditt, Esq. in Good Standing, FILED. (ktb) (Entered: 10/12/1995)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: None
                  MOTION by Costas Provisions Co, George Frangiadakis for George M. Burditt to appear pro hac vice, ASSENTED TO by the gov't , filed. (ktb) (Entered: 10/12/1995)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Edward F. Harrington . After review of this case pursuant to the provision of Rule 18:3401(f)... it is ordered that this case be continued before USDJ. Case assigned to Judge Edward F. Harrington pursuant to Rule 7(b)(5) of the Rules for Magistrates in the USDC for the District of Massachusetts. (fbd) (Entered: 10/12/1995)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                      File referred to Judge Edward F. Harrington for determination as to whether the case should be contiued before the District Court or referred to a Magistrate of this Court. (fbd) (Entered: 10/12/1995)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: None
                        Notice of change of address for Thomas J. Butters by Thomas J. Butters, FILED, c/s. (ktb) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: None
                          Government's Proposed Conditions of Release, FILED. (ktb) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: None
                            Corporate Vote by the shareholders, officers and directors of Costas Provisions Corporation, authorizing Thomas J. Butters, Esq. to enter a plea of not guilty to each charge of the Information on behalf of the Corporation, FILED. (ktb) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance of counsel for Costas Provisions Co, George Deligiannides by Attorney Thomas Butters, Esq., FILED. (ktb) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . CLERK'S NOTES as to Costas Provisions Co, George Deligiannides, George Frangiadakis , re: Initial Appearance/Arraignment;, set Discovery Motions deadline to 10/31/95 for Costas Provisions Co, for George Deligiannides, for George Frangiadakis , set Discovery Motions Response deadline to 11/8/95 for Costas Provisions Co, for George Deligiannides, for George Frangiadakis ; Court Reporter: TAPE (ktb) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge Mark L. Wolf . ORDER OF REFERENCE entered. Case referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Collings . (fbd) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: None
                                    INFORMATION filed as to Costas Provisions Co, George Deligiannides, George Frangiadakis Costas Provisions Co (1) count(s) 1-4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, George Deligiannides (2) count(s) 1-4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, George Frangiadakis (3) count(s) 1-4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14 (fbd) (Entered: 10/10/1995)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 1,228 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?