United States of America v. Aamir et al
Criminal Case Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cr-20039-BAF-MKM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 4:54 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Aouate +1 313 226 9100 linda.aouate@usdoj.gov
Space James McDonald +1 202 598 2441 james.mcdonald@usdoj.gov
Space Niall M O'Donnell +1 202 353 0506 niall.odonnell@usdoj.gov
Space Shubhra Shivpuri +1 202 616 2600 +1 202 279 1348 shubhra.shivpuri@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Muhammad Aamir, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David D. O'Brien +1 734 668 7761 obrien@millercanfield.com
Space Thomas C. O'Brien +1 734 668 8979 obrient@millercanfield.com
No Logo Syed Shah, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. McCarthy +1 313 535 1300 +1 301 464 0501 mjfmccltd@yahoo.com
No Logo Tariq Tahir, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Collins & Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN S COLLINS +1 602 788 7227 +1 602 569 6091 jcollins@collinslegal.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Detroit
Filed 1/15/2013
County Wayne
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
Count 16
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1347.F
Offense Level 4
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2s
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Defendant Custody Status Released
Count 17
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Count 2-7
Count 8-15
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (285) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Reset Hearings as to Usman Butt: Sentencing set for 11/18/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
    LREF
    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
    Reset Hearings as to Syed Shah: Sentencing set for 11/18/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
      LREF
      Blank  Status Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Status Conference as to Tariq Tahir held on 8/26/2015, BOND as to Tariq Tahir (6) Revoked(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Shubhra Shivpuri) (CMul)
        LREF
        Blank  Plea Hearing
        Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing as to Tariq Tahir held on 8/20/2015 Disposition: Held and adjourned(Court Reporter: Carol Sapala) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffrey Collins) (AUSA: Shubhra Shivpuri) (CMul)
          LREF
          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
          Reset Hearings as to Tayyab Aziz: Sentencing set for 11/24/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
            LREF
            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
            Reset Hearings as to Tariq Tahir: Plea Hearing set for 8/20/2015 10:45 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
              LREF
              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
              Reset Hearings as to Tariq Tahir: Sentencing set for 8/20/2015 10:45 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                LREF
                Blank  Plea Hearing
                Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing as to Tariq Tahir held on 8/18/2015 Disposition: Adjourned to 8/20/2015 at 10:45 am.(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Shubhra Shivpuri, Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                  Reset Hearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Sentencing set for 11/24/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                    Reset Hearings as to Muhammad Aamir: Sentencing set for 12/1/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 179 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER to modify conditions of release as to Tayyab Aziz Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (CMul)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying conditions of release as to Tayyab Aziz Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying [175] Motion to Amend/Correct as to Tayyab Aziz (5). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                          Reset Hearings as to Tayyab Aziz: Sentencing set for 9/16/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Motion Hearing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing as to Tayyab Aziz held on 4/22/2015 re [175] MOTION to Amend/Correct Order Setting Conditions of Release filed by Tayyab Aziz Disposition: Motion denied(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Mark Kriger) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                              ResetHearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Sentencing set for 9/16/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                Reset Hearings as to Usman Butt: Sentencing set for 9/15/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of hearing on [175] MOTION to Amend/Correct Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Tayyab Aziz. Response due by 4/20/2015 Motion Hearing set for Wednesday 4/22/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015, Terminated: 4/23/2015 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Order Setting Conditions of Release by Tayyab Aziz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - copy of order) (Kriger, Mark)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Pretrial Conference as to Tariq Tahir held on 3/24/2015 Disposition: Trial date set for 8/18/2015(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                        Reset Hearings as to Tariq Tahir: Final Pretrial / Plea Hearing set for 3/24/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                          Reset Hearings as to Muhammad Aamir: Sentencing set for 10/6/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                            Reset Hearings as to Muhammad Aamir: Sentencing set for 6/3/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Pretrial Conference as to Tariq Tahir held on 3/10/2015 Disposition: Adjourned to 3/24/2015 at 11:00 a.m.; and new trial date TBD(Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell; James McDonald) (CMul)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                Reset Hearings as to Syed Shah: Sentencing set for 4/14/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding pretrial release conditions as to Hemal Bhagat Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                    ResetHearings as to Tayyab Aziz: Sentencing set for 6/23/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Status Conference as to Tariq Tahir held on 1/21/2015 Disposition: New counsel made appearance.(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (Court Interpreter: was not available) (CMul)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                        Reset Hearings as to Tayyab Aziz: Sentencing set for 3/18/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Usman Butt, ( Sentencing set for 4/29/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Stipulation
                                                            STIPULATION Adjourning Sentencing by Usman Butt. (Muawad, Elias)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                              Set Hearings as to Tariq Tahir: Status Conference re: counsel set for 1/21/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing as to Tariq Tahir held on 1/7/2015 re [165] MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Doraid Elder filed by Tariq Tahir Disposition: Motion granted; defendant to retain counsel by 1/21/2015(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Doraid Elder) (AUSA: Nial O'Donnell) (Court Interpreter: Cynthia Khan) (CMul)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                  Reset Hearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Sentencing set for 5/19/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Transcript
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Rule 11 Plea Agreement held on October 21, 2014 as to Tayyab Aziz. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joan L. Morgan) (Number of Pages: 21) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 12/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2015. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Morgan, J)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                      Reset Hearings as to Muhammad Aamir: Sentencing set for 6/9/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Tayyab Aziz, Sentencing set for 3/3/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Guilty Plea Questionnaire
                                                                          GUILTY plea questionnaire as to Tayyab Aziz (CMul)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Plea Agreement
                                                                            PLEA AGREEMENT as to Tayyab Aziz (CMul)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Plea Hearing Plea Entered
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing, Plea Entered by Tayyab Aziz (5) Guilty Count 1(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Mark Kriger) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell; James McDonald) (CMul)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ATTORNEY RHONDA BRAZILE by Raquel Ellington (Brazile, Rhonda)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Tariq Tahir, Sentencing set for 3/16/2016 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                    Reset Hearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Sentencing set for 1/20/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION to Judicial Order of Removal and Concurrence of Immigration and Customs Enforcement by Tariq Tahir. (CMul) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                        Reset Hearings as to Tayyab Aziz: Plea Hearing set for 10/22/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          PLEA AGREEMENT as to Tariq Tahir (CMul) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                            Reset Hearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Sentencing set for 10/29/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER DECLARING DEFENDANT COMPETENT as to Tariq Tahir Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                Reset Hearings as to Tayyab Aziz: Plea Hearing set for 10/22/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release - Remove GPS monitor and comply with curfew conditions. as to Tariq Tahir. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Order to UnsealCourt Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER TO UNSEAL [149] Sealed Matter as to Usman Butt. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (DPer)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Tariq Tahir, Competency Hearing set for 11/18/2015 02:00 PM and Pretrial Conference / Plea Hearing set for 11/18/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER Reinstating and Continuing Bond as to Tariq Tahir (6) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting [151] MOTION To Remove Tether Requirement filed by Syed Shah. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Preliminary ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Usman Butt. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Entry of Preliminary Order of Forfeiture by United States of America as to Usman Butt. (Aouate, Linda) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Tariq Tahir, Competency / Plea Hearing set for 9/16/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Order to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  [UNSEALED 10/03/14] ORDER with stipulation to seal documents [154], [155], [156],[157], and [158] as to Usman Butt. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (DPer)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                    [UNSEALED 10/03/14] WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Usman Butt (DPer)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                      [UNSEALED 10/03/14] ACKNOWLEDGMENT of superseding information by Usman Butt. (DPer)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Memorandum
                                                                                                                        [UNSEALED 10/03/14] COOPERATION AGREEMENT by Usman Butt. (DPer)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Guilty Plea Questionnaire
                                                                                                                          [UNSEALED 10/03/14] GUILTY plea questionnaire as to Usman Butt (DPer)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                            [UNSEALED 10/03/14] PLEA AGREEMENT as to Usman Butt (DPer)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Superseding Information
                                                                                                                              SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Usman Butt (2) count(s) 1s, 2s. (DWor)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Guilty Plea Questionnaire
                                                                                                                                GUILTY plea questionnaire as to Muhammad Aamir (CMul)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Muhammad Aamir, Sentencing set for 1/13/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Muhammad Aamir (CMul) (Main Document 144 replaced on 8/26/2014) (CMul).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT of first superseding information by Muhammad Aamir. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Muhammad Aamir (CMul)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Plea Hearing Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing, Plea Entered by Muhammad Aamir (1) Guilty Count 1s,2s(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Thomas O'Brien) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Arraignment as to Muhammad Aamir (1) Count 1s,2s held on 8/20/2014 Bond Continued(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Thomas O'Brien) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Superseding Information
                                                                                                                                              SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Muhammad Aamir (1) count(s) 1s, 2s. (KKra)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Order to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Vacating [104] Order on Motion for use of supplemental jury questionnaire as to Tayyab Aziz. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                  Reset Hearings as to Muhammad Aamir: Plea Hearing set for 8/20/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                    Reset Hearings as to Syed Shah: Sentencing set for 4/7/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearings as to Usman Butt: Plea Hearing set for 8/27/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                        Set Hearings as to Muhammad Aamir: Plea Hearing set for 8/27/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Sentencing set for 11/4/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of temporary modification as to Hemal Bhagat Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER Attorney Thomas C. O'Brien and David D. O'Brien for Muhammad Aamir added; Attorney Gerald J. Gleeson, II and Matthew F. Leitman terminated as to Muhammad Aamir. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Order of ForfeitureCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Preliminary ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Hemal Bhagat. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Application
                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION Unopposed Application for Entry of Preliminary Order of Forfeiture by United States of America as to Hemal Bhagat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Aouate, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Hemal Bhagat, Sentencing set for 7/29/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing as to Hemal Bhagat held on 1/14/2014 re [130] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release filed by Hemal Bhagat Disposition: Request granted to expand the travel restrictions to the State of Michigan and grants request to remove the tether.(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Michael Rex) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (MVer)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of hearing on [130] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Hemal Bhagat. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: 12/27/2013 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of hearing on [130] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Hemal Bhagat. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013, Terminated: 1/14/2014 Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release by Hemal Bhagat. (Rex, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Hemal Bhagat Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing as to Muhammad Aamir held on 11/13/2013 re [123] MOTION for hearing regarding potential conflicts of interest in defense counsel's representation filed by United States of America (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Matthew Leitman) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: 11/11/2013 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of hearing on [123] MOTION for hearing regarding potential conflicts of interest in defense counsel's representation as to Muhammad Aamir. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                    Reset Hearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Sentencing set for 2/4/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Muhammad Aamir re [123] MOTION for hearing regarding potential conflicts of interest in defense counsel's representation (Leitman, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of hearing on [123] MOTION for hearing regarding potential conflicts of interest in defense counsel's representation as to Muhammad Aamir. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013, Terminated: 11/13/2013 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for hearing regarding potential conflicts of interest in defense counsel's representation by United States of America as to Muhammad Aamir. (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Status Conference as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir held on 10/9/2013 Disposition: Trial deadlines discussed(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Matthew Leitman; Elias Muawad (phone); Mark Kriger; Doraid Elder) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Raquel Ellington. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (DWor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT as to Raquel Ellington. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JPur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Sentencing held as to Raquel Ellington. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazille) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Order of ForfeitureCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Preliminary ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Raquel Ellington. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by United States of America as to Raquel Ellington (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION Unopposed Application for Entry of Preliminary Order of Forfeiture by United States of America as to Raquel Ellington. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Aouate, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reset Hearings as to Raquel Ellington: Sentencing set for 9/17/2013 01:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Raquel Ellington, Sentencing set for 9/17/2013 01:30 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying pretrial conditions as to Hemal Bhagat Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER for temporary modification of pretrial release as to Hemal Bhagat Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEA AGREEMENT as to Hemal Bhagat. (Goltz, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Hearing Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing, Plea Entered by Hemal Bhagat (3) Guilty Count 1, (Sentencing set for 11/12/2013 @ 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman) (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Michael Rex) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (Goltz, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reset Hearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Plea Hearing set for 8/14/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [80] Motion to Dismiss as to Muhammad Aamir (1). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Order on Motion - FreeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [79] Motion use of supplemental juror questionnaire as to Tayyab Aziz (5). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: 7/25/2013 Order on Motion - FreeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [82] Motion to sever charges and dismiss as to Usman Butt (2). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on August 20, 2013 and Trial on September 10, 2013 is Cancelled as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir held on 7/24/2013 re [79] MOTION Unopposed For Use of Supplemental Jury Questionnaire filed by Tayyab Aziz, [82] MOTION to Sever Charges and to Dismiss Counts 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15 and 17 filed by Usman Butt, and [80] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 16 of the Indictment and to Sever All Charges Against Defendants Two Through Five filed by Muhammad Aamir (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Matthew F. Leitman, Elias Muawad, Mark Kriger, Doraid Elder) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell, James McDonald, Charles Duross) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Plea Hearing Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing, Plea Entered by Syed Shah (4) Guilty Count 1(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Michael J. McCarthy) (AUSA: James MacDonald for Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing as to Hemal Bhagat held on 7/23/2013 Disposition: Adjourned to 7/31/2013(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Michael Rex) (AUSA: Matthew Thuesen for Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Hemal Bhagat, Plea Hearing set for 7/23/2013 10:30 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE by Usman Butt re [82] MOTION to Sever Charges and to Dismiss Counts 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15 and 17 and Certificate of Service (Muawad, Elias)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Usman Butt . (Muawad, Elias)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE by Muhammad Aamir re [80] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 16 of the Indictment and to Sever All Charges Against Defendants Two Through Five (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: U.S. v. Davis) (Leitman, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/5/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by United States of America as to Muhammad Aamir re [80] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 16 of the Indictment and to Sever All Charges Against Defendants Two Through Five (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/5/2013 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by United States of America as to Usman Butt re [82] MOTION to Sever Charges and to Dismiss Counts 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15 and 17 (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Pretrial Services form 8Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release - the defendant to pay all, or part of the cost of monitoring as to Hemal Bhagat. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER revoking [29] Bond as to Raquel Ellington (7) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Order of Detention Pending TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF DETENTION as to Raquel Ellington Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER as to Raquel Ellington vacating [83] Order of Detention Pending Trial. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Pretrial Release Violation Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Pretrial Release Violation Hearing as to Raquel Ellington held on 6/18/2013 Disposition: Remanded to Custody(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazille) (AUSA: N'iall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013, Terminated: 7/25/2013 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Sever Charges and to Dismiss Counts 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15 and 17 by Usman Butt. (Muawad, Elias)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013, Terminated: 7/25/2013 Joinder in Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER in [79] MOTION Unopposed For Use of Supplemental Jury Questionnaire filed by Tayyab Aziz by Muhammad Aamir as to Muhammad Aamir, Tayyab Aziz. (Leitman, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013, Terminated: 7/25/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 16 of the Indictment and to Sever All Charges Against Defendants Two Through Five by Muhammad Aamir. (Leitman, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013, Terminated: 7/25/2013 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Unopposed For Use of Supplemental Jury Questionnaire by Tayyab Aziz. (Kriger, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison L. Kriger appearing for Tayyab Aziz . (Kriger, Allison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Raquel Ellington - Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Order of Detention Pending TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Raquel Ellington Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (KKra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Raquel Ellington, Pretrial Release Violation Hearing set for 6/18/2013 10:30 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY ORDER Vacating [77] Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Raquel Ellington. Entered by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Raquel Ellington held on 6/10/2013 Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Tape #: DRG 6/10/2013) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazil) (AUSA: Maggie Smith) (FMos) Modified on 6/20/2013 to reflect correct disposition )(FMos).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Raquel Ellington, Sentencing set for 9/17/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Guilty Plea Questionnaire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GUILTY plea questionnaire as to Raquel Ellington (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Raquel Ellington (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Plea Hearing Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing, Plea Entered by Raquel Ellington (7) Guilty Count 1(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazille) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Bond Hearing as to Raquel Ellington held on 6/5/2013 Disposition: Bond Continued(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazille) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: 5/21/2013 Pretrial Services form 8Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release - Bond Conditions Modified as to Tayyab Aziz. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Pretrial Services form 8Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release - Bond Review Hearing as to Raquel Ellington. ( Bond Hearing set for 6/5/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER for temporary modification of conditions of pretrial release to allow for travel as to Hemal Bhagat Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Hemal Bhagat, signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (MWil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark J. Kriger appearing for Tayyab Aziz . (Kriger, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Discovery Notice by AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCOVERY NOTICE by United States of America as to Raquel Ellington (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Discovery Notice by AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY NOTICE by United States of America as to Tayyab Aziz (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Discovery Notice by AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCOVERY NOTICE by United States of America as to Hemal Bhagat (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Discovery Notice by AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCOVERY NOTICE by United States of America as to Usman Butt (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Discovery Notice by AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY NOTICE by United States of America as to Muhammad Aamir (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Indictment by Raquel Ellington. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Bond as to Tayyab Aziz in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Tayyab Aziz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Indictment by Tayyab Aziz. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER COMMITTING DEFENDANT TO UNITED STATES BUREAU OF PRISONSFOR MENTAL EXAMINATION AND REPORT and TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tariq Tahir Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Indictment by Muhammad Aamir. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 Order Revoking BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REVOKING BOND as to Tariq Tahir. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew F. Leitman appearing for Muhammad Aamir (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerald J. Gleeson, II appearing for Muhammad Aamir (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Status Conference as to Tariq Tahir held on 8/26/2015, BOND as to Tariq Tahir (6) Revoked(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Shubhra Shivpuri) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Tariq Tahir, Status Conference set for 8/26/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rhonda R. Brazile appearing for Raquel Ellington . (Brazile, Rhonda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Pretrial Services form 8Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release - Bond conditions to include mental health evaluation, treatment and report; and submit to location monitoring as to Tariq Tahir. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 1/17/13 as to Muhammad Aamir. (KKra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing as to Tariq Tahir held on 8/20/2015 Disposition: Held and adjourned(Court Reporter: Carol Sapala) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffrey Collins) (AUSA: Shubhra Shivpuri) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 1/17/13 as to Usman Butt. (KKra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Hearings as to Tariq Tahir: Plea Hearing set for 8/20/2015 10:45 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reset Hearings as to Tariq Tahir: Sentencing set for 8/20/2015 10:45 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 1/17/13 as to Raquel Ellington. (KKra) (Main Document 32 replaced on 1/22/2013) (KKra). (Main Document 32 replaced on 1/22/2013) (KKra).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing as to Tariq Tahir held on 8/18/2015 Disposition: Adjourned to 8/20/2015 at 10:45 am.(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Shubhra Shivpuri, Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Notice of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney: Shubhra Shivpuri added. (Shivpuri, Shubhra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 1/17/13 as to Hemal Bhagat. (KKra) (Main Document 31 replaced on 1/22/2013) (KKra).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Discovery Notice by AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISCOVERY NOTICE by United States of America as to Tariq Tahir (McDonald, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Arraignment as to Tayyab Aziz (5) Count 1,17-18 held on 1/22/2013 - Bond Continued. Disposition: Not Guilty plea entered.(Court Reporter: Janice Coleman) (Defendant Attorney: Alison Kreeger (not retained at this time)) (AUSA: Matthew Thuesen) (JJoh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Notice of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney: Shubhra Shivpuri added. (Shivpuri, Shubhra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Initial Appearance as to Tayyab Aziz. Bond Info: Tayyab Aziz (5) $10,000 unsecured.(Court Reporter: Janice Coleman) (Defendant Attorney: Alison Kreeger) (AUSA: Matthew Thuesen) (JJoh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Tariq Tahir, Jury Trial set for 8/18/2015 09:00 AM through 8/21/2015 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Arraignment as to Raquel Ellington (7) Count 1,2-15,16 held on 1/22/2013 - Bond Continued. Disposition: Not Guilty plea entered.(Court Reporter: Janice Coleman) (Defendant Attorney: Rhonda Brazile) (AUSA: Matthew Thuesen) (JJoh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Indictment by Tariq Tahir. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Arraignment as to Muhammad Aamir (1) Count 1,2-15,16 held on 1/22/2013 - Bond Continued. Disposition: Not Guilty plea entered.(Court Reporter: Janice Coleman) (Defendant Attorney: Gerald Gleason) (AUSA: Matthew Thuesen) (JJoh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reset Hearings as to Syed Shah: Sentencing set for 11/18/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: 1/21/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elias Muawad appearing for Usman Butt (Muawad, Elias)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Pretrial Conference as to Tariq Tahir held on 3/24/2015 Disposition: Trial date set for 8/18/2015(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reset Hearings as to Tariq Tahir: Final Pretrial / Plea Hearing set for 3/24/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 174 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Syed Shah, ( Sentencing set for 9/8/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Pretrial Conference as to Tariq Tahir held on 3/10/2015 Disposition: Adjourned to 3/24/2015 at 11:00 a.m.; and new trial date TBD(Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell; James McDonald) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey G. Collins appearing for Tariq Tahir (Collins, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reset Hearings as to Syed Shah: Sentencing set for 4/14/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/2/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [151] MOTION To Remove Tether Requirement filed by Syed Shah Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Status Conference as to Tariq Tahir held on 1/21/2015 Disposition: New counsel made appearance.(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Jeffery Collins) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (Court Interpreter: was not available) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [165] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Doraid B. Elder withdrawn from case. as to Tariq Tahir (6). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Bond as to Hemal Bhagat in the amount of $50,000 unsecured entered. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting [151] MOTION To Remove Tether Requirement filed by Syed Shah. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 151 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014, Terminated: 10/1/2014 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION To Remove Tether Requirement by Syed Shah. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (McCarthy, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Hemal Bhagat. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Hearings as to Tariq Tahir: Status Conference re: counsel set for 1/21/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Syed Shah, ( Sentencing set for 4/7/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Indictment by Hemal Bhagat. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing as to Tariq Tahir held on 1/7/2015 re [165] MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Doraid Elder filed by Tariq Tahir Disposition: Motion granted; defendant to retain counsel by 1/21/2015(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Doraid Elder) (AUSA: Nial O'Donnell) (Court Interpreter: Cynthia Khan) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of hearing on [165] MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Doraid Elder as to Tariq Tahir. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Rex appearing for Hemal Bhagat (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Hearings as to Syed Shah: Sentencing set for 4/7/2015 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014, Terminated: 1/16/2015 Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Doraid Elder by Tariq Tahir. (Elder, Doraid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Syed Shah, ( Sentencing set for 8/12/2014 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Documents Received as to Tayyab Aziz (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir Pretrial / Plea Hearing set for 3/10/2015 11:00 AM Jury Trial set for 3/24/2015 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Order of ForfeitureCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Preliminary ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Syed Shah. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Detention Hearing as to Hemal Bhagat held on 1/18/2013. Disposition: Bond Set $10,000 Unsecured Bond entered with conditions. (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (Tape #: RSW 1/18/2013) (Defendant Attorney: Michael Rex) (AUSA: John Neal) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir Jury Trial set for Monday, 10/20/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman See document for additional deadlines/hearings. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION Unopposed Application for Entry of Preliminary Order of Forfeiture by United States of America as to Syed Shah. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Aouate, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Arraignment as to Hemal Bhagat (3) Counts 1,8-15,16,17 held on 1/18/2013. Disposition: Plea of Not Guilty Entered. (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (Tape #: RSW 1/18/2013) (Defendant Attorney: Michael Rex) (AUSA: John Neal) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 7/15/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Pretrial Services form 8Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release - to include payment and costs of Location Monitoring as to Syed Shah. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Detention Hearing as to Syed Shah held on 1/18/2013. Bond Info: Syed Shah $10,000 Unsecured Bond entered with conditions. (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (Tape #: RSW 1/18/2013) (Defendant Attorney: Michael McCarthy) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Syed Shah, Sentencing set for 11/19/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Arraignment as to Syed Shah (4) Count 1,8-15,16,17 held on 1/18/2013 Disposition: Plea of Not Guilty Entered. (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (Tape #: RSW 1/18/2013) (Defendant Attorney: Michael McCarthy) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Status Conference as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir held on 10/9/2013 Disposition: Trial deadlines discussed(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Matthew Leitman; Elias Muawad (phone); Mark Kriger; Doraid Elder) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Guilty Plea Questionnaire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    GUILTY plea questionnaire as to Syed Shah (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Bond as to Raquel Ellington in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Status Conference set for 10/9/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Only counsel need appear. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLEA AGREEMENT as to Syed Shah (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Raquel Ellington. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Status Conference set for Wednesday, 9/11/2013 02:00 PM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order Appointing Federal Defender's OfficeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Raquel Ellington. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing plea cutoff deadline and jury trial as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Hearing Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Plea Hearing, Plea Entered by Syed Shah (4) Guilty Count 1(Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Michael J. McCarthy) (AUSA: James MacDonald for Niall O'Donnell) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Status Conference set for 9/10/2013 10:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Defendants are not needed, only counsel need appear. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles E. Duross appearing on behalf of United States of America as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington . (Duross, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO APPEAR as to Syed Shah, Plea Hearing set for 7/24/2013 09:30 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Note: Courtroom #242 (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on August 20, 2013 and Trial on September 10, 2013 is Cancelled as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir held on 7/24/2013 re [79] MOTION Unopposed For Use of Supplemental Jury Questionnaire filed by Tayyab Aziz, [82] MOTION to Sever Charges and to Dismiss Counts 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15 and 17 filed by Usman Butt, and [80] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 16 of the Indictment and to Sever All Charges Against Defendants Two Through Five filed by Muhammad Aamir (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Matthew F. Leitman, Elias Muawad, Mark Kriger, Doraid Elder) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell, James McDonald, Charles Duross) (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Notice of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney: James McDonald added. (McDonald, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of hearing on [80] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 16 of the Indictment and to Sever All Charges Against Defendants Two Through Five, [82] MOTION to Sever Charges and to Dismiss Counts 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15 and 17, and [79] MOTION Unopposed For Use of Supplemental Jury Questionnaire as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Note Change Courtroom #242. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order of Temporary DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Hemal Bhagat Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, extending response deadline to motions Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order Appointing Federal Defender's OfficeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Hemal Bhagat. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of hearing on [80] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 16 of the Indictment and to Sever All Charges Against Defendants Two Through Five, [82] MOTION to Sever Charges and to Dismiss Counts 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15 and 17, [79] MOTION Unopposed For Use of Supplemental Jury Questionnaire as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington. Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/24/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Bond as to Usman Butt in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: 6/4/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Government's Forfeiture Bill of Particulars by United States of America as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington (Aouate, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Usman Butt. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/22/2013 Notice of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney: Linda Aouate added. (Aouate, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Indictment by Usman Butt. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington, ( Motions due by 6/14/2013) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Discovery Notice by AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCOVERY NOTICE by United States of America as to Syed Shah (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elias Muawad appearing for Usman Butt (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington Motions due by 5/31/2013 Plea/Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2013 11:00 AM Plea due by 8/20/2013 Jury Trial set for 9/10/2013 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Bond as to Muhammad Aamir in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington ( Motions due by 3/29/2013) Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (MWil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 20 as to Syed Shah: Appointment of Attorney Michael J McCarthy, in place of Federal Defender. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Muhammad Aamir. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of attorney as to Tariq Tahir. Attorney Doraid B. Elder for Tariq Tahir added, Attorney Tariq S. Hafeez terminated as to Tariq Tahir. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (DWor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 1/17/13 as to Syed Shah. (KKra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elias Muawad appearing for Muhammad Aamir (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Discovery Notice by AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY NOTICE by United States of America as to Tariq Tahir (O'Donnell, Niall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Bond as to Syed Shah in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington Plea Hearing/Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2013 11:00 AM Plea due by 3/19/2013 Jury Trial set for 4/2/2013 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (CMul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Syed Shah. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 1/17/13 as to Tariq Tahir. (KKra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Indictment by Syed Shah. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Initial Appearance as to Raquel Ellington. Bond Info: Raquel Ellington (7) $10,000 Unsecured Bond entered with conditions. Arraignment set for 1/22/2013 01:00 PM (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Natasha Webster) (AUSA: Matt Thuesen) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. McCarthy appearing for Syed Shah (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Bond as to Tariq Tahir in the amount of $10,000 unsecured entered. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Arraignment as to Tariq Tahir (6) Count 1,2-15,16 held on 1/17/2013. Disposition: Plea of Not Guilty Entered. Bond Continued. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Tariq Hafeez) (AUSA: Matt Thuesen) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Tariq Tahir. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Initial Appearance as to Tariq Tahir. Bond Info: Tariq Tahir (6) $10,000 Unsecured Bond entered with conditions. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Tariq Hafeez) (AUSA: Matt Thuesen) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Detention Hearing as to Syed Shah held on 1/18/2013. Bond Info: Syed Shah $10,000 Unsecured Bond entered with conditions. (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (Tape #: RSW 1/18/2013) (Defendant Attorney: Michael McCarthy) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Acknowledgment of Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Indictment by Tariq Tahir. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Initial Appearance as to Syed Shah. Syed Shah (4) Temporarily Detained. Detention Hearing set for 1/18/2013 01:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Natasha Webster) (AUSA: Matt Thuesen) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Arraignment as to Syed Shah (4) Count 1,8-15,16,17 held on 1/18/2013 Disposition: Plea of Not Guilty Entered. (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (Tape #: RSW 1/18/2013) (Defendant Attorney: Michael McCarthy) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order of Temporary DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Syed Shah Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tariq S. Hafeez appearing for Tariq Tahir (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Hemal Bhagat: Detention Hearing set for 1/18/2013 01:00 PM (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Muhammad Aamir (1) count(s) 1, 2-15, 16, Usman Butt (2) count(s) 1, 2-15, 16, 17-18, Hemal Bhagat (3) count(s) 1, 2-15, 16, 17, Syed Shah (4) count(s) 1, 2-15, 16, 17, Tayyab Aziz (5) count(s) 1, 17-18, Tariq Tahir (6) count(s) 1, 2-15, 16, Raquel Ellington (7) count(s) 1, 2-15, 16. [Time Stamped on 1/15/13] (DTyl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Order Appointing Federal Defender's OfficeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Syed Shah. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Initial Appearance as to Hemal Bhagat. Hemal Bhagat (3) Temporarily Detained. Arraignment set for 1/18/2013 01:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Natasha Webester) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (JCur) Modified on 1/17/2013 (JCur). [CORRECTED BOND INFO].
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Order to UnsealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER WITH MOTION to Unseal indictment and arrest warrants as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DTyl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Arraignment as to Usman Butt (2) Count 1,2-15,16,17-18 held on 1/17/2013. Disposition: Plea of Not Guilty Entered. Bond Continued. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Elias Muawad) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Initial Appearance as to Usman Butt. Bond Info: Usman Butt (2) $10,000 Unsecured Bond entered with conditions. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Elias Muawad) (AUSA: Niall O'Donnell) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Arraignment as to Tariq Tahir (6) Count 1,2-15,16 held on 1/17/2013. Disposition: Plea of Not Guilty Entered. Bond Continued. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Tariq Hafeez) (AUSA: Matt Thuesen) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Initial Appearance as to Muhammad Aamir. Bond Info: Muhammad Aamir (1) $10,000 Unsecured Bond entered with conditions. Arraignment set for 1/22/2013 01:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Elias Muawad) (AUSA: Matt Thuesen) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Initial Appearance as to Syed Shah. Syed Shah (4) Temporarily Detained. Detention Hearing set for 1/18/2013 01:00 PM. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Natasha Webster) (AUSA: Matt Thuesen) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: Initial Appearance as to Tariq Tahir. Bond Info: Tariq Tahir (6) $10,000 Unsecured Bond entered with conditions. (Court Reporter: Joan Morgan) (Defendant Attorney: Tariq Hafeez) (AUSA: Matt Thuesen) (JCur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Order to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER WITH MOTION to Seal indictment and arrest warrants as to Muhammad Aamir, Usman Butt, Hemal Bhagat, Syed Shah, Tayyab Aziz, Tariq Tahir, Raquel Ellington. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DTyl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 598 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?