DIRECTV, LLC v. Yuen
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-07699

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 9:17 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 6/29/2017: For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 22 is denied. A status hearing is set for 7/11/17 at 9 a.m. Mailed notice(air, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Strike
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?