USA v. Spath
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:13-cr-00292
Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 1:16 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Stephan Spath, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward B MacMahon Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/01/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin and Curlett LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Steven Hale Levin +1 410 545 5871 +1 410 685 2222 slevin@levincurlett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/25/2013, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Amy Steffan Fitzgibbons +1 301 344 6600 +1 301 344 0019 amy_fitzgibbons@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 310

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexey V Tarasov +1 832 623 6250 +1 832 495 4168 alexey.tarasov@russianamericanbusiness.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 88 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Stephan Spath (1), Count(s) 1, 1s-5s, 2, 6s, 8s, DISMISSED; Count(s) 7s, IMPRISONMENT for a total term of 24 months. The Defendant is to receive credit for detention beginning June 12, 2013; SUPERVISED RELEASE for a life term; ASSESSMENT in the amount of $100.00; RESTITUTION in the amount of $750.00. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/22/2014. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Stephan Spath. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/19/2014. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/19/2014 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MARGINAL ORDER Granting 84 Joint Motion to Include Restitution in the Judgment as to Stephan Spath (1). Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/19/2014. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Sentencing as to Stephan Spath held on 12/19/2014 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (Court Reporter: Renee Ewing-4B) (chs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          Joint MOTION Restitution in Judgement by USA as to Stephan Spath. Responses due by 1/5/2015 (O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION for Forfeiture of Property by USA as to Stephan Spath. Responses due by 1/5/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Stephan Spath (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Levin, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                Correspondence re: Government Follow-Up Regarding Defendant's Medical Assistance (O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                  Corrected Correspondence re: Government Response Concerning Medical Assistance (O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                    Correspondence re: Government Response Concerning Medical Assistance (O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                      Correspondence re: Medical Assistance (Levin, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Regular Sentencing Order "SETTING" Sentencing for December 19, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. as to Stephan Spath. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 06/30/2014. (chs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                          -SEALED- PLEA SUPPLEMENT as to Stephan Spath (chs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                            PLEA AGREEMENT as to Stephan Spath (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A: Statement of Facts)(chs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Re-arraignment/Guilty Plea as to Stephan Spath (1) Count 1s-5s,6s,7s-8s held on 6/30/2014, Plea entered by Stephan Spath (1) Guilty as to Count Count 7s. before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (Hatcher-4B.) (chs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                Correspondence re: participation in plea hearing (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  PAPERLESS ORDER as to Stephan Spath SCHEDULING REARRAIGNMENT on June 30, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4B in light of the parties' notification that a plea agreement has been executed. The currently scheduled motions hearing and trial ARE CANCELLED. The Government SHALL SUBMIT the executed plea agreement to Chambers as soon as possible. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 06/23/2014. (jwr, Chambers) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                    Request for Scheduling (Levin, Steven) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Arraignment as to Stephan Spath (1) Count 1s-5s,6s,7s-8s held on 6/16/2014, Plea entered by Stephan Spath Not Guilty on counts 1s-8s before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo. (Dziopa-4A) (ads, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING telephone conference as to Stephan Spath on June 17, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. The Government will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on June 16, 2014. (pag, chambers) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven Hale Levin as Retained Counsel appearing for Stephan Spath (Levin, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 65 Motion to Withdraw Document as to Stephan Spath (1). Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on June 11, 2014. (at, Chambers) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Withdraw Document 52 NOTICE of Appeal of Pretrial Detention 51 Order of Detention by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 6/27/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) Modified on 6/11/2014 to modify link text. (rss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Stephan Spath (Hayes, Kelly) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Proposed VERDICT (Hayes, Kelly) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Stephan Spath (Hayes, Kelly) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Disclosure of Surveillance Evidence by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Disclosure of Demonstrative Evidence by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Disclosure of 404(b) Information by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Redlined Superseding Indictment filed by USA on 5/19/2014as to Stephan Spath. (am2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Superseding INDICTMENT as to Stephan Spath (1) count(s) 1s-5s, 6s, 7s-8s. (am2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Stephan Spath re 37 MOTION to Exclude Evidence, 41 MOTION for Discovery , 39 MOTION in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Hayes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE re 52 Notice of Appeal of Pre-Trial Detention, NOTICE OF HEARING as to Stephan Spath(Hearing set for 6/16/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B, 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770, before Judge Paul W. Grimm.) (at, Chambers) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appeal of Pretrial Detention 51 Order of Detention (Tarasov, Alexey) Modified on 5/5/2014 (am2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Stephan Spath. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 4/11/14. (am2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Review of Detention Hearing as to Stephan Spath held on 4/11/2014 before Magistrate Judge William Connelly. (Ionetz - 3B) (jcs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER setting pretrial deadlines and scheduling trial to begin on July 8, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. as to Stephan Spath. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/31/2014. (am2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER as to Stephan Spath. A Detention Hearing is scheduled to be held on Friday, April 11, 2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on March 27, 2014. (kdms, Chambers) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Correspondence re: Proposed Pretrial Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 40 Motion as to Stephan Spath (1); GRANTING 44 Motion for Leave to File as to Stephan Spath (1). Counsel to submit a revised scheduling order in accordance w/ conference call of 3/24/2014. Amended Motion for Pretrial Release will be referred to a Magistrate Judge for a bail review hearing. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 03/24/2014. (pag, chambers) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Conference Call as to Stephan Spath for Monday, March 24, 2014 at 5:30 p.m. Counsel for the Government is to initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 03/21/2014.(Grimm, Paul)(dsy) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion for Pretrial Release by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 4/4/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Motion for Pretrial Release)(Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Correspondence re: Filing Attachments to Suppression Motion, Document # 37 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Suppression Motion (doc. # 37), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Suppression Motion (doc. # 37), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Suppression Motion (doc. # 37), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Suppression Motion (doc. # 37))(Tarasov, Alexey) Modified on 3/31/2014 (am2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Alibi (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit as to alibi)(Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Discovery by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 4/3/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION Right to Make Future Motions by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 3/31/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION in Limine by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 3/31/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Bond by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 3/31/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude Evidence by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 3/31/2014 (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File pretrial motions by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 3/28/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER as to Stephan Spath MODIFYING ECF No. 32 as follows: the Government's submission of proposed voir dire, jury instructions, and a verdict form is due on or before June 9, 2014, and any objections from Defendant are due on or before June 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 02/25/2014. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Stephan Spath. Motions now are due on or before March 14, 2014. Responses now are due on or before March 31, 2014. Replies remain due on April 11, 2014. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 02/14/2014.(Grimm, Paul)(dsy) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 3/3/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Letter ORDER regarding trial as to Stephan Spath. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/18/2013. (am2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexey V Tarasov as Retained Counsel appearing for Stephan Spath (Tarasov, Alexey) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Edward B MacMahon, Jr withdrawn from case. as to Stephan Spath (1). Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/1/2013. (mps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER RESCHEDULING telephone conference as to Stephan Spath for November 18, 2013 at 12:30 PM. The Government shall initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on November 1, 2013. (jwr, Chambers) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edward B. MacMahon, Jr. by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 11/18/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING telephone conference as to Stephan Spath on November 18, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. The Government will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on October 30, 2013. (at, Chambers) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER RESCHEDULING telephone status conference as to Stephan Spath for Tuesday, October 29, at 4:00 p.m. Government is to initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on October 23, 2013. (at, Chambers) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER as to Stephan Spath RESCHEDULING the status call set for October 21, 2013 to Monday, October 28, 2013 at 1:30 PM at the request of the parties. The Government shall initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on October 18, 2013. (jwr, Chambers) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              PAERLESS ORDER as to Stephan Spath SCHEDULING a status call for Monday, October 21, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. The Government will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/01/2013. (Grimm, Paul)(dsy) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER as to Stephan Spath SCHEDULING a status call for September 30, 2013 at 3:45 p.m. The Government will initiate the call Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on August 29, 2013. (Grimm, Paul)(ast) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER as to Stephan Spath SCHEDULING a status call for Thursday, August 29, 2013, at 2:30 p.m. The Government will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on August 21, 2013. (Grimm, Paul)(ast) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER as to Stephan Spath SCHEDULING a status call for Thursday, August 29, 2013, at 1:00 p.m. The Government will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on July 29, 2013. (Grimm, Paul) (mol) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion to Strike appearance of Amy Fitzgibbons as to Stephan Spath (1). Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on July 25, 2013. (Grimm, Paul)(ast) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Appearance by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 8/12/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzgibbons, Amy) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward B MacMahon, Jr as Retained Counsel appearing for Stephan Spath (MacMahon, Edward) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct , Supplement, Withdraw, or File Additional Motions by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 8/5/2013 (Fitzgibbons, Amy) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Suppress Tangible and Derivative Evidence by Stephan Spath. Responses due by 8/5/2013 (Fitzgibbons, Amy) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Arraignment as to Stephan Spath (1) Count 1,2 held on 6/27/2013, Plea entered by Stephan Spath Not Guilty on counts 1 & 2. before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. (Sigona.) (rms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 6/12/2013 in case as to Stephan Spath. (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy Steffan Fitzgibbons as Public Defender appearing for Stephan Spath (Fitzgibbons, Amy) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kelly OConnell Hayes appearing for USA. (Hayes, Kelly) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 6/12/2013 in case as to Stephan Spath (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF DETENTION BY AGREEMENT as to Stephan Spath. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 6/12/2013. (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) Modified date on 6/13/2013 (ebs2, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Stephan Spath. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 6/12/2013. (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) Modified date on 6/13/2013 (ebs2, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Stephan Spath. (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) Modified date on 6/13/2013 (ebs2, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Correspondence from Magistrate Judge William Connelly to the German Embassy re: Notification of Arrest and Detention(c/m 6/13/2213 )(ebs2, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Initial Appearance as to Stephan Spath (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 6/12/2013 before Magistrate Judge William Connelly. (Sigona.) (rmss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Appearance as to Stephan Spath (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 6/12/2013 before Magistrate Judge William Connelly. (Sigona.) (rmss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by the Government and Order to Seal Case as to Stephan Spath. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 6/10/2013. (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED INDICTMENT as to Stephan Spath (1) count(s) 1, 2. (ebs2, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?