IN RE: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2017 at 12:23 AM ST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Executive Committee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HammondLaw, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julian Ari Hammond +1 310 601 6766 +1 310 295 2835 JHammond@hammondlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by John Arthur Eaves, Jr., Attorneys at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Arthur Eaves, Jr. +1 601 355 7961

Toggle Switch Represented by LITE DEPALMA GREENBERG LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katrina Carroll +1 312 750 1591 +1 973 623 0858

Toggle Switch Represented by PNC Park

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary F. Lynch +1 412 322 9243 +1 412 231 0246

Toggle Switch Represented by Zimmerman Law Office, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. +1 312 440 0020 +1 312 440 4180 tom@attorneyzim.com
No Logo Lead Settlement Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dowd & Dowd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Dowd +1 314 621 2500 +1 314 621 2503 doug@dowdlaw.net
Space William T. Dowd +1 314 621 2500 +1 314 621 2503 bdowd@dowdlaw.net
Space Alexander R. Lumaghi +1 314 621 2500 +1 314 621 2503

Toggle Switch Represented by Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J Quinn +1 312 932 3232 +1 312 932 3233

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Taylor Christopher Bartlett +1 205 326 3336 +1 205 380 8085 tbartlett@hgdlawfirm.com
Space WILLIAM LEWIS GARRISON, JR. +1 205 326 3336 lewis@hgdlawfirm.com
Space Christopher Boyce Hood +1 205 326 3336 +1 205 327 3332 chood@hgdlawfirm.com
Space Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. DRISCOLL +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 john@thedriscollfirm.com
Space Tara King +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233
Space Gregory J. Pals +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 greg@thedriscollfirm.com
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff(s), Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dowd & Dowd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas P. Dowd +1 314 621 2500 +1 314 621 2503 doug@dowdlaw.net
No Logo Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM LEWIS GARRISON, JR. +1 205 326 3336 lewis@hgdlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. DRISCOLL +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 john@thedriscollfirm.com
v.
No Logo Defendants' Lead Counsel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A Atkins +1 212 373 3183 +1 212 373 2225 ratkins@paulweiss.com
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Defendants, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P. Cassetta +1 314 259 2823 +1 314 552 8823 Richard.Cassetta@bryancave.com
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (COUNSEL ASSIGNMENT(S)) Assigning Christopher J. Quinn for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; Gregory J Pals for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; John J Driscoll for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; Tara King for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; Taylor C. Bartlett for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; William Lewis Garrison, Jr for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; Steven W Ritcheson for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; Christopher Boyce Hood for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; Alexander R. Lumaghi for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; Douglas P Dowd for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel; William T. Dowd for Plaintiff Lead Settlement Counsel Signed by U.S. District Judge John A. Ross and filed in the transferee court on 7/21/2017. (LAH) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 77 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:17-cv-02492 (Atkins, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 80 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-6) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in CAC/2:17-cv-02492, 78 in MDL No. 2669) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/13/2017. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:17-cv-02492 (LAH) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-6) re: pldg. (1 in CAC/2:17-cv-02492, 78 in MDL No. 2669) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 4/12/2017. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/5/2017. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:17-cv-02492 (LAH) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-6) - 1 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 4/5/2017. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:17-cv-02492 (LAH) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Robert A. Atkins, counsel for: Defendants Avid Life Media Inc. and Avid Dating Life Inc. -- California Central District Court (2:17-cv-02492) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions (Exhibit A), # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit B (Complaint - CDCA 2:17-2492)) (Atkins, Robert) Modified on 4/4/2017 (LH). ADDED PARTY TYPE (Entered: 04/03/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (COUNSEL ASSIGNMENT(S)) Assigning Douglas P. Dowd for Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff(s); Richard P. Cassetta for Liaison Counsel for Defendant(s); Robert A. Atkins for Defendants' Lead Counsel; John J. Driscoll for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel; W. Lewis Garrison, Jr for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel; John Arthur Eaves, Jr for Plaintiffs' Executive Committee; Gary F. Lynch for Plaintiffs' Executive Committee; Katrina Carroll for Plaintiffs' Executive Committee; Julian Ari Hammond for Plaintiffs' Executive Committee; Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for Plaintiffs' Executive Committee Signed by U.S. District Judge John A. Ross and filed in the transferee court on 2/5/2016. (dn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 75 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-5) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in LAE/2:16-cv-16077, 73 in MDL No. 2669) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 11/30/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, LAE/2:16-cv-16077 (dn) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-5) re: pldg. (1 in LAE/2:16-cv-16077, 73 in MDL No. 2669) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 11/29/2016. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 11/22/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, LAE/2:16-cv-16077 (dn) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-5) - 1 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 11/22/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, LAE/2:16-cv-16077 (dn) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Robert A. Atkins, counsel for: Defendants Avid Life Media Inc. and Avid Dating Life Inc. -- Louisiana Eastern District Court (2:16-cv-16077) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions Exhibit A, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit B (Complaint - EDLA 2:16-16077)) (Atkins, Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 71 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-4) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ARE/5:16-cv-00225, 69 in MDL No. 2669) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 8/2/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ARE/5:16-cv-00225 (DP) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-4) re: pldg. (1 in ARE/5:16-cv-00225, 69 in MDL No. 2669) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 8/1/2016. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 7/25/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ARE/5:16-cv-00225 (dn) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-4) - 1 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 7/25/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ARE/5:16-cv-00225 (dn) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Robert A. Atkins, counsel for: Defendants Avid Life Media, Inc. and Avid Dating Life, Inc. -- Arkansas Eastern District Court (5:16-cv-00225) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions Exhibit A, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit B (Complaint - EDAR 5:16-00225)) (Atkins, Robert) (JPML PREVIOUSLY NOTIFIED OF CASE) Modified on 7/22/2016 (dn). (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG (FROM DISTRICT COURT - ARE) -- 1 Action(s) -- -- Arkansas Eastern District Court (5:16-cv-00225) (Attachments: # 1 Complaint ARE 5:16-225) (dn) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 66 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                  CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-3) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ALN/2:16-cv-00152, 64 in MDL No. 2669) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/10/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/2:16-cv-00152 (dn) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                                    ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-3) re: pldg. (1 in ALN/2:16-cv-00152, 64 in MDL No. 2669) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 2/9/2016. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/2/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/2:16-cv-00152 (dn) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                                      CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-3) - 1 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/2/2016. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/2:16-cv-00152 (dn) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Robert A. Atkins, counsel for: Defendants Avid Life Media Inc. and Avid Dating Life, Inc. -- Alabama Northern District Court (2:16-cv-00152) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions (Exhibit A), # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit B (Complaint - NDAL 2:16-00152)) (Atkins, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
                                          CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-2) - 2 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in CAC/2:15-cv-09475, 1 in ILN/1:15-cv-11305, 58 in MDL No. 2669) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/29/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:15-cv-09475, ILN/1:15-cv-11305 (dld) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                            CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-1) - 13 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ARE/4:15-cv-00640, 11 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 2 in CAC/2:15-cv-08208, 1 in CAC/2:15-cv-08456, 4 in CAC/5:15-cv-02295, 2 in GAS/4:15-cv-00299, 15 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 4 in ILN/1:15-cv-08270, 3 in ILN/1:15-cv-08842, 11 in MD/8:15-cv-02693, 55 in MDL No. 2669, 8 in MSS/3:15-cv-00658, 11 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 11 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/22/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ARE/4:15-cv-00640, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/2:15-cv-08208, CAC/2:15-cv-08456, CAC/5:15-cv-02295, GAS/4:15-cv-00299, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, ILN/1:15-cv-08270, ILN/1:15-cv-08842, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (dn) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                              OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 12/3/2015 before the Panel at New Orleans, LA. Court Reporter/Transcriber Toni Doyle Tusa, 500 Poydras Street, Room HB-275, New Orleans, LA 70130, (504) 589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the Panel's office or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Redaction due 12/28/2015. Redaction Request due 1/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi, on 12/21/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (RH) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-2) re: pldg. (1 in CAC/2:15-cv-09475, 1 in ILN/1:15-cv-11305, 58 in MDL No. 2669) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 12/28/2015. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/21/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:15-cv-09475, ILN/1:15-cv-11305 (dn) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                  CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-2) - 2 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/21/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:15-cv-09475, ILN/1:15-cv-11305 (dn) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG -- 2 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Kevin D. Rising, counsel for: Defendants Avid Life Media, Inc. and Avid Dating Life, Inc. -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:15-cv-11305), California Central District Court (2:15-cv-09475) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Complaint - ND IL 1:15-11305), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Complaint - CD CA 2:15-9475)) (Rising, Kevin) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                      ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-1) re: pldg. (1 in ARE/4:15-cv-00640, 11 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 2 in CAC/2:15-cv-08208, 1 in CAC/2:15-cv-08456, 4 in CAC/5:15-cv-02295, 2 in GAS/4:15-cv-00299, 15 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 4 in ILN/1:15-cv-08270, 3 in ILN/1:15-cv-08842, 11 in MD/8:15-cv-02693, 55 in MDL No. 2669, 8 in MSS/3:15-cv-00658, 11 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 11 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 12/21/2015. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/14/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ARE/4:15-cv-00640, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/2:15-cv-08208, CAC/2:15-cv-08456, CAC/5:15-cv-02295, GAS/4:15-cv-00299, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, ILN/1:15-cv-08270, ILN/1:15-cv-08842, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (dn) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                        CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-1) - 13 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/14/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ARE/4:15-cv-00640, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/2:15-cv-08208, CAC/2:15-cv-08456, CAC/5:15-cv-02295, GAS/4:15-cv-00299, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, ILN/1:15-cv-08270, ILN/1:15-cv-08842, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (dn) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Transferring 5 action(s) to Judge John A. Ross in the E.D. Missouri.Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 12/9/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (TB) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            CONSENT ORDER re: pldg(s). 1 Consenting to transfer of litigation to Judge John A. Ross in the Missouri Eastern District Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge, USDC Catherine D Perry on 12/9/15. (TB) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 49 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Gary F. Lynch on behalf of Plaintiff Grant Deloach (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, GAS/4:15-cv-00299 (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. ( 50 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Plaintiff Grant Deloach FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  PLEADING WITHDRAWN (see pldg. 52 in MDL No. 2669)NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 49 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Gary F. Lynch on behalf of Plaintiff Grant Deloach (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Lynch, Gary) Modified on 12/8/2015 (dn). (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 3 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Kevin D. Rising, Counsel for: Defendants Avid Life Media, Inc., and Avid Dating Life, Inc. -- Arkansas Eastern District Court (4:15-cv-00640), California Central District Court (2:15-cv-08456), Georgia Southern District Court (4:15-cv-00299) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Docket Sheet and Complaint - ARE 4:15-00640, # 4 Exhibit 2 (Docket Sheet and Complaint - CAC 2:15-08456, # 5 Exhibit 3 (Docket Sheet and Complaint - GAS 15-cv-00299) (Rising, Kevin) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 44 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/5:15-cv-02295 (Garrison, William) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 44 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/5:15-cv-02295 (Garrison, William) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (15 in ALN/6:15-cv-01464, 15 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405, 14 in CAC/8:15-cv-01347, 26 , 32 in MDL No. 2669, 14 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132, 14 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750), ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Kevin Dale Rising on behalf of Defendants Avid Life Media Inc, et al.Avid Dating Life, Inc., [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/2:15-cv-08208, CAC/5:15-cv-02295, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, ILN/1:15-cv-08270, ILN/1:15-cv-08842, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, TXN/3:15-cv-02750, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Rising, Kevin) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMD, ADDED MDL LINK Modified on 11/17/2015 (RH). (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 1 , 22 , 32 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by John Parker Yates on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464 (Yates, John) ADDED MDL LINKS Modified on 11/17/2015 (RH). (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney W. Lewis Garrison, Jr., Counsel for: Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro -- California Central District Court (5:15-CV-02295) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Complaint) (Garrison, William) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (9 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 24 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Joseph Jeremy Siprut on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ILN/1:15-cv-07760 (Siprut, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (6 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 25 in MDL No. 2669, 6 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 6 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386), ( 32 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Phillip Kim on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, et al.Jane Doe, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2 [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 40 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Joseph Jeremy Siprut on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Pauly (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ILN/1:15-cv-08842 (Siprut, Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Joseph J. Siprut, Counsel for: Plaintiff Michael Pauly -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:15-cv-08842) (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Complaint) (Siprut, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (9 in CAC/8:15-cv-01347, 23 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by William Bernard Federman on behalf of Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, et al.J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5 [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/8:15-cv-01347 (Federman, William) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (8 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405, 19 in MDL No. 2669), (15 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405) Filed by Julian Ari Hammond on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe 1, et al.Jane Doe, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Other) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:15-cv-06405 (Hammond, Julian) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Plaintiff Christopher Russell (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, MD/8:15-cv-02693 (Mason, Gary) (EVENT TYPE EDITED) Modified on 11/4/2015 (dn). (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 32 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Gary Edward Mason on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Russell (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, MD/8:15-cv-02693 (Mason, Gary) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- JPML has identified the following action(s) for inclusion in this MDL: California Central District Court (2:15-cv-08208) (Attachments: # 1 Complaint CAC 2:15-8208) (dn) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 32 in MDL No. 2669, 14 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750), ( 21 in MDL No. 2669, 8 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750) Filed by William Lewis Garrison, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (Garrison, William) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 31 in MDL No. 2669), ( 1 in MDL No. 2669), ( 25 in MDL No. 2669, 11 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132), ( 32 in MDL No. 2669, 14 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132), ( 27 in MDL No. 2669, 13 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132), ( 21 in MDL No. 2669, 7 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132), ( 26 in MDL No. 2669, 12 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132), ( 24 in MDL No. 2669, 10 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132), ( 19 in MDL No. 2669, 6 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132), ( 23 in MDL No. 2669, 9 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132) Filed by John J. Driscoll on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, MOE/4:15-cv-01132 (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 12/3/2015 in New Orleans, Louisiana. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 11/16/2015.Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 10/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (RH) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ILN/1:15-cv-08270 (Gordon, Richard) (EVENT TYPE EDITED) Modified on 10/2/2015 (dn). (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 29 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Richard R Gordon on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ILN/1:15-cv-08270 (Gordon, Richard) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Richard R. Gordon, Counsel for: Plaintiff John Doe -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:15-cv-08270) (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Complaint) (Gordon, Richard) (PARTY TYPE ADDED) Modified on 10/1/2015 (dn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/1/2015) (dn). (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 20 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Gary Edward Mason on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Russell (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, MD/8:15-cv-02693 (Mason, Gary) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. (8 in ALN/6:15-cv-01464, 9 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405, 3 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 8 in CAC/8:15-cv-01347, 7 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 1 in MD/8:15-cv-02693, 21 in MDL No. 2669, 7 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132, 1 in MSS/3:15-cv-00658, 3 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 8 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750, 3 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386), (13 in ALN/6:15-cv-01464, 13 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405, 7 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 12 in CAC/8:15-cv-01347, 11 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 5 in MD/8:15-cv-02693, 26 in MDL No. 2669, 12 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132, 5 in MSS/3:15-cv-00658, 7 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 12 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750, 7 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386), (12 in ALN/6:15-cv-01464, 12 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405, 6 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 11 in CAC/8:15-cv-01347, 10 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 4 in MD/8:15-cv-02693, 25 in MDL No. 2669, 11 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132, 4 in MSS/3:15-cv-00658, 6 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 11 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750, 6 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386), (7 in ALN/6:15-cv-01464, 8 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405, 2 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 7 in CAC/8:15-cv-01347, 6 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 19 in MDL No. 2669, 6 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132, 2 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 7 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750, 2 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386), (11 in ALN/6:15-cv-01464, 11 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405, 5 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 10 in CAC/8:15-cv-01347, 9 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 3 in MD/8:15-cv-02693, 24 in MDL No. 2669, 10 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132, 3 in MSS/3:15-cv-00658, 5 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 10 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750, 5 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386), (10 in ALN/6:15-cv-01464, 10 in CAC/2:15-cv-06405, 4 in CAC/2:15-cv-06619, 9 in CAC/8:15-cv-01347, 8 in ILN/1:15-cv-07760, 2 in MD/8:15-cv-02693, 23 in MDL No. 2669, 9 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132, 2 in MSS/3:15-cv-00658, 4 in NYS/1:15-cv-07017, 9 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750, 4 in VAE/2:15-cv-00386), (9 in ALN/6:15-cv-01464, 22 in MDL No. 2669, 8 in MOE/4:15-cv-01132), ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, TXN/3:15-cv-02750, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Defendants Avid Life Media Inc, et al.Avid Dating Life, Inc. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, TXN/3:15-cv-02750, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Rising, Kevin) (DUPLICATE PARTIES DELETED) Modified on 9/18/2015 (dn). (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Plaintiffs John Doe No. 1, et al.John Doe No. 2, John Doe, Jane Doe [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Related Actions, # 2 Exhibit 2- U.S. District Court, Judicial Caseload Profile, # 3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, TXN/3:15-cv-02750, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Kim, Phillip) (EVENT TYPE EDITED) Modified on 9/18/2015 (dn). (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Plaintiff John Doe Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, TXN/3:15-cv-02750, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Carroll, Katrina) (EVENT TYPE EDITED) Modified on 9/18/2015 (dn). (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, et al.J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5 [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Chart, # 2 Exhibit B - Chart, # 3 Exhibit C - Case List, # 4 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, TXN/3:15-cv-02750, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Federman, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Report entitled, "U.S. District Courts -- Median Tim Intervals...", # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, MOE/4:15-cv-01132 (Yates, John) (Attachment Description Edited) Modified on 9/17/2015 (dn). (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MD/8:15-cv-02693, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, MSS/3:15-cv-00658, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, TXN/3:15-cv-02750, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Garrison, William) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 2 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Julian Hammond, Counsel for: Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 and Jane Doe -- Mississippi Southern District Court (3:15-cv-00658), Maryland District Court (8:15-cv-02693) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Complaint MS S.D. Case No. 3:15-cv-00658, # 4 Complaint MD Case No. 8:15-cv-02693) (Hammond, Julian) CORRECTED CASE NUMBERS Modified on 9/16/2015 (QB). (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) ) Filed by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, TXN/3:15-cv-02750, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Hammond, Julian) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2669), ( 11 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Phillip Kim on behalf of Plaintiffs John Doe, et al.Jane Doe, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2 [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:15-cv-06619, NYS/1:15-cv-07017, VAE/2:15-cv-00386 (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by John J. Driscoll on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, MOE/4:15-cv-01132 (Driscoll, John) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Avid Life Media Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (Rising, Kevin) (DUPLICATE PARTIES REMOVED) Modified on 9/10/2015 (dn). (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Avid Life Media, Inc. for Avid Dating Life Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760 (Rising, Kevin) (DUPLICATE PARTIES REMOVED) Modified on 9/10/2015 (dn). (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Kevin Dale Rising on behalf of Defendants Avid Life Media Inc., et al.Avid Dating Life, Inc. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, ILN/1:15-cv-07760, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (Rising, Kevin) (DUPLICATE PARTIES REMOVED) Modified on 9/10/2015 (dn). (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by John Parker Yates on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464 (Yates, John) (Attachment Description Edited) Modified on 9/10/2015 (dn). (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by William Bernard Federman on behalf of Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, et al.J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5 [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/8:15-cv-01347 (Federman, William) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 3 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Phillip Kim, Counsel for: Plaintiffs John Does 1 and 2, John Does, and Jane Doe -- California Central District Court (2:15-cv-06619), Virginia Eastern District Court (2:15-cv-00386), New York Southern District Court (1:15-cv-07017) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Complaint C.D.C.A 2:15-cv-06619, # 4 Complaint E.D.V.A. 2:15-cv-00386, # 5 Complaint S.D.N.Y. 1:15-cv-07017) (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 8 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Plaintiff John Doe -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ILN/1:15-cv-07760 (Carroll, Katrina) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 8 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Katrina Carroll on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ILN/1:15-cv-07760 (Carroll, Katrina) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Katrina Carroll, Counsel for: Plaintiff, John Doe -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:15-cv-07760) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Complaint N.D. Il 15-cv-7760) (Carroll, Katrina) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ( 5 in MDL No. 2669, 3 in TXN/3:15-cv-02750) Filed by Plaintiff John Doe -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (Garrison, William) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 4 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Plaintiff John Doe -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:15-cv-06405 (Hammond, Julian) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by William Lewis Garrison, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (Garrison, William) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2669) Filed by Julian Ari Hammond on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, CAC/2:15-cv-06405 (Hammond, Julian) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2669) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 9/10/2015. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 9/10/2015. Responses due on or before 9/17/2015. Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi, on 8/27/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2669, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (LAH) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MDL Number 2669 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( 1 in Pending No. 102) Associated Cases: Pending No. 102, ALN/6:15-cv-01464, CAC/2:15-cv-06405, CAC/8:15-cv-01347, MOE/4:15-cv-01132, TXN/3:15-cv-02750 (LAH) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 5 Action(s) -- from Missouri Eastern District Court (4:15-cv-01132), California Central District Court (8:15-cv-01347,2:15-cv-06405), Texas Northern District Court (3:15-cv-02750), Alabama Northern District Court (6:15-cv-01464) - Suggested Transferee Court: E.D. Missouri - Filed by: Plaintiff Jane Doe (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Oral Argument Statement, # 4 Proof of Service, # 5 Exhibit 1 - Complaint - MOED 4:15-cv-01132-JAR, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Complaint - CACD 8:15-cv-01347-JVS-DFM, # 7 Exhibit 3 - Complaint - CACD 2:15-cv-06405-PSG-AJW, # 8 Exhibit 4 - Complaint - TXND 3:15-cv-02750-N, # 9 Exhibit 5 - Complaint - ALND 6:15-cv-01464-LSC)(Driscoll, John) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?