John (todd) Zboray v. Sectorbase.com, Inc. A Delaware Corp.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 02 500468
Superior Court Judge Richard E. Best, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zboray, John (todd), Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by State Of California Labor Commissioner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space State Of California Labor Commissioner +1 415 557 2042
v.
No Logo Revere Data, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Dave Neville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
No Logo Sectorbase.com, Inc. A Delaware Corp., Defendant
Cause of Action Labor Judgment
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (10) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005
Notice Of Withdrawal Of Memorandum Of Costs On Appeal
    Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Remittitur
    Remittitur Affirmed
      Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Order
      Order Restoring Appeal To Active Status, Etal (a103946 #4)
        Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Order
        Order Dismissing Appeal (a103946 #4)
          Blank 39 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
          Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Neville, Dave
            Blank 38 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004
            Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Neville, Dave
              Blank 37 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003
              Notice Of Certification Filed
                Blank 36 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003
                Appeal Record Certified To Coa (a103946-4, Ct2 & Rt1)
                  Blank 35 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003
                  Respondent's Fees For Clerk's Transcript
                    Blank 34 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003
                    Costs Of Preparation On Appeal Deposited, Tran # W2503c17a239, Tag # 007493 (tag #22193)
                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003
                      Notice Of Default On Appeal Sent To Appellant
                        Blank 32 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003
                        Refund/reimbursement Of $293.00 For Transaction W2803a01a006 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Horowitz & Rubinoff, Tag 21798, Otsp04000385, Warrant #02516474, Dated Nov-06-2003
                          Blank 31 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003
                          Refund/reimbursement Of $32.00 For Transaction W2803a01a006 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Csr Batara, Tag 21798, Prsp04000711-10, Warrant #02516883, Dated Nov-06-2003
                            Blank 30 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003
                            Directory Ntc To Reporter To Prepare Transcript - Deposit (l. Batara)
                              Blank 29 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003
                              Reporters Costs Deposited By Appellant, Tran # W2803a01a006, Tag # 006729 (tag #21798)
                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Request For Clerks/reporter Transcript
                                Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript Filed
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003
                                  Clerk's Ntc Of Filing Of Ntc Of Appeal
                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript
                                    Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript, Tran # W2803905a007, Tag # 006422 Tag #21244 Filed By Plaintiff Zboray, John (todd)
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003
                                      Proof Of Personal Service Of Order Denying Motion To Amend The Judgment To Revered Data Llc As A Judgment Debtor
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003
                                        Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Neville, Dave
                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Order
                                          Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Defendant/judgment Debtor {no Sase Provided; No Copies Provided Either)
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003
                                            Mini-minutes For May-15-2003 9:30 Am
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003
                                              Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff John (todd) Zboray Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As Defendant/judgment Debtor. Appearance For Plaintiff-moving Party & For Defendant-opposing Party. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling - Deny-failed To Shift Burden. Substantial Evidence Doesn't Support Succession Liabilty. Prevailing Party To Prepare Order. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Leland Batara, Csr #3759
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003
                                                Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Defendant/judgment Debtor
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                  First Filing Fee For Deft Filed By Defendant Revere Data, Llc
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                    Revere Data, Llc's Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Deft/judgment Debtor Filed By Defendant Revere Data, Llc
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                      Declaration Of John Wilson In Support Of Revere Data, Llc's Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Deft/judgment Debtor Filed By Defendant Revere Data, Llc
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                        Declaration Of Robb Scott In Support Of Revere Data, Llc's Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Deft/judgment Debtor Filed By Defendant Revere Data, Llc
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                          Declaration Of Cullen Coates In Support Of Revere Data, Llc's Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Deft/judgment Debtor Filed By Defendant Revere Data, Llc
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                            Declaration Of Dave Neville In Support Of Revere Data, Llc's Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Deft/judgment Debtor Filed By Defendant Revere Data, Llc
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                              Declaration Of Michael Engmann In Support Of Revere Data, Llc's Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Deft/judgment Debtor Filed By Defendant Revere Data, Llc
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                                                                Declaration Of Steven Shum In Support Of Revere Data, Llc's Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As A Deft/judgment Debtor Filed By Defendant Revere Data, Llc
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003
                                                                  Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff John (todd) Zboray Motion To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As Defendant/judgment Debtor Continued From May-02-2003 To Law And Motion At May-15-2003, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302, Per Agreement Of Parties.
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003
                                                                    Motion Notice; To Amend The Judgment To Add Revere Data, Llc As Defendant/judgment Debtor;, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Zboray, John (todd) Hearing Set For May-02-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002
                                                                      Order Of Examination Apr-30-2002 Discharged As To Defendant Sectorbase.com, Inc. A Delaware Corp., Discharged In Court; All Parties Appeared
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002
                                                                        Notice Of Continuance Of Appearance & Examination Of Steven Shum
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002
                                                                          Added To Calendar For Cont'd Order To Appear For Examination, Per Agreement Bet Parties; Added To Calendar Per M/p Request Oex Hearing Set For Apr-30-2002 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 610
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002
                                                                            Proof Of Personal Service Party Served-steven Shum; Appl And Order For Appearance And Examination Filed By Plaintiff Zboray, John (todd)
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002
                                                                              Order Of Examination Issued (by Serving Steven Shum, Cfo) Filed By Plaintiff Zboray, John (todd) As To Defendant Sectorbase.com, Inc. A Delaware Corp. Oex Hearing Set For Apr-10-2002 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 610
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002
                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Notion Of Entry Of Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Zboray, John (todd) Served Feb-13-2002, Personal Service On Defendant Sectorbase.com, Inc. A Delaware Corp.
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002
                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Judgment On Final Order, Decision Or Award Of The Labor Commissioner
                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Labor Judgment
                                                                                    Under Application To The Clerk For Judgment Under Sec 585(1) C.c.p., It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Recover From Defendant Sectorbase.com, Inc. A Delaware Corp. $167,451.04 Principal, $15,289.02 Interest, $203.00 Costs, Total Judgment $182,943.06, Total: $182943.06
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/2/2002
                                                                                      Request That Clerk Enter Judgment And Judgment On Final Order, Decision Or Award Of The Labor Commissioner Filed By Plaintiff Zboray, John (todd) As To Defendant Sectorbase.com, Inc. A Delaware Corp. Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?