Bay Area Air Quality Management District v. Public Employment Relations Board

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 02 500562
Superior Court Judge A James Robertson Ii, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge A James Robertson Ii
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Bay Area Air Quality Management District, Plaintiff

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Berliner +1 310 981 2000
No Logo Bay Area Air Quality Management District, Petitioner

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Berliner +1 310 981 2000
v.
No Logo Bay Area Air Quality Management District Employees' Association, Respondent

Represented by Robert James Bezemek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bezemek, Robert James +1 510 763 5690
No Logo Public Employment Relations Board, Respondent

Represented by Pub Employmnt Relations Brd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert G Thompson +1 916 322 3198
Attributes
Cause of Action Writs Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./admin. Agen
Timeline
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Dismissal Of Entire Action With Prejudice
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Order
Order On Petitioner's Petition For Writ Of Prohibition
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002
Mini-minutes For Feb-28-2002 3:30 Pm For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002
Law And Motion 302, Writ Of Prohibition - Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling: Writ Of Prohibition Treated As A Plea In Abatement And Granted Staying Administrative Action As To All Matters In Prior Filed Legal Action 310305. Perb Has Jurisdiction Over Violation Arising Prior To July 1, 2001. Petitioner To Prepare Order. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Answer
Answer Filed By Respondent Public Employment Relations Board
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002
Mini-minutes For Feb-14-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002
Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Writ Of Prohibition Continued From Feb-14-2002 To Law And Motion At Feb-28-2002, 3:30 Pm In Dept. 302. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002
Answer Of Defendant/respondent Bay Area Air Quality Management District Employees' Association To Petition For Writ Of Prohibition And Complaint For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002
Reply To Respondent's Opposition To Petition For Writ
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002
Added To Calendar For Writ Of Prohibition Hearing Set For Feb-14-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To Petn For Writ Of Prohibition Or Writ Of Mandate
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002
Declaration Of Jeff Gove, Bob Adams And Robert J. Bezemek In Opposition To Petition For Writ Of Prohibition; Proof Of Service Filed By Petitioner Bay Area Air Quality Management District
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002
Employees' Association's Memo Of P/a In Opposition To Petition For Writ Of Prohibition; Appendix Of Cases And Other Authorities Filed By Petitioner Bay Area Air Quality Management District
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002
Proof Of Personal Service Of Ex Parte Application For Writ Of Prohibition; Temporary Restraining Order; P/a; Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Bay Area Air Quality Management District
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002
Notice Of Ruling Filed By Petitioners
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002
Preliminary Opposition Of Respondent To The Granting Of The Tro (and Petition For Writ Of Prohibition); Proof Of Service Filed By Respondent Bay Area Air Quality Management District Employees' Association
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002
First Appearance Fee Paid By Respondent Bay Area Air Quality Management District Employees' Association
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002
Ex Parte Application For Order For Writ Of Prohibition ; Or In Teh Alternative, Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum Of P/a; Declaration Of Steven M. Berliner And Lucy Siraco, Points And Authorities Filed By Petitioner Bay Area Air Quality Management District
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002
Petition For Writ Of Mandate/ Prohibition/ Certification Filed By Petitioner Bay Area Air Quality Management District As To Respondent Public Employment Relations Board Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 87 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?