Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp. v. John Garamendi Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 03 503311
Superior Court Judge James L. Warren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Liller Mendelson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn Sue Petrouski +1 415 433 1940
No Logo Department of Insurance, Respondent
No Logo Garamendi, John An Insurance Commissioner, Department, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the California Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gifford, Paul D +1 510 622 2253
No Logo State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Non-profit, Public Enterprise Fund, Respondent
No Logo State of California, Respondent
No Logo Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau, An Unincorporated, Non-profit Association, Respondent
No Logo State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Non-profit, Public Enterprise Fund, Other

Toggle Switch Represented by State Compensation Insurance Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Demartini, Vera C +1 510 839 5000
No Logo The Workers Compensation Insurance Rating The Workers Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California, Real Party In Interest

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of John N. Frye

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John N. Frye +1 650 577 0889 +1 650 345 9875 JFryeLaw@cs.com
Cause of Action Writs Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./admin. Agen
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (13) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Remittitur
Remittitur Affirmed
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 41 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004
    Certification Notice Issued
      Blank 40 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004
      Records Certified To Coa A106648 #4 (1 Vol Ct + 3 Vols Admin Records/1 Vol Rt)
        Blank 39 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
        Respondent's Copy Of Transcript
          Blank 38 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
          Respondent's Copy Of Transcripts
            Blank 37 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
            Costs Of Preparation On Appeal Deposited, Tran # W2804708a003, Tag # 009601 Receipt No. 24959
              Blank 36 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004
              Refund/reimbursement Of $286.00 Re 24323 For Transaction W2804513a002 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To John Alan Constant, Prsp04002130-02, Warrant #02708970, Dated Jul-07-2004
                Blank 35 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004
                Refund/reimbursement Of $39.00 Re 24323 For Transaction W2804513a002 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Christina T. Paxton Csr, Prsp04002130-01, Warrant #02709864, Dated Jul-07-2004
                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004
                  Notice Re Respondent's Copy Of Transcripts
                    Blank 33 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004
                    Clerk's Estimate Of Cost Of Appeal Record
                      Blank 32 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004
                      Clerk's Ntc To Counsel Re Missing Documents
                        Blank 31 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004
                        Directory Ntc To Reporter To Prepare Transcript - Deposit (paxton)
                          Blank 30 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004
                          Clerk's Ntc Of Filing Of Ntc Of Appeal
                            Blank 29 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004
                            Reporters Costs Deposited By Appellant, Tran # W2804513a002, Tag # 009035 Tag 24323
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Request For Clerks/reporter Transcript
                              Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript
                                Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript, Tran # W2804512a001, Tag # 009033 (tag #24322) Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered:
                                  The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: See Scanned Document
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Order Denying Peremptory Writ Of Manadate
                                    Order Denying Peremptory Writ Of Manadate
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004
                                      Law And Motion 301, Stipulation To Continue Hearing On Motion For Writ Of Mandate Filed 02/03/04 - Duplicate Entry.
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Court Filing
                                        Law And Motion, 301, Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation's Motion For Writ Of Mandate: Denied. Attorney Frye To Submit A Proposed Order. Judge: James L. Warren Reporter: Christina Paxton, Csr #1558
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004
                                          Mini-minutes For Feb-04-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004
                                            Mini-minutes For Feb-04-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004
                                              Motion Stipulation To Continue Hearing On Motion To Mandate For Writ Of Mandate, Proof Of Service Filed By Other State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Non-profit, Public Enterprise Fund Hearing Set For Feb-04-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                Reply Brief In Support Of Its Motion For Writ Of Mandate Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp.
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004
                                                  Joinder In Opposition To Petition For Writ Of Mandate Filed By Other State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Non-profit, Public Enterprise Fund
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004
                                                    Law And Motion, 301, Notice Of Motion For Writ Of Mandate, Advanced From Feb-06-2004 To Law And Motion At Feb-04-2004 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 Per Request Of Moving Party, Electro Rent Corporation.
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004
                                                      Real Party In Interest The Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California's Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To The Motion For Writ Of Mandate Filed By Real Party In Interest The Workers Compensation Insurance Rating The Workers Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004
                                                        Respondent Insurance Commissioner's Opposition To Petitioner's Motion For Peremptory Writ Filed By Respondent Garamendi, John An Insurance Commissioner, Department
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004
                                                          Proof Of Service By Mail Letter Re: Continunance Of Hearing Date Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp.
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004
                                                            Law And Motion 301, Notice Of Motion For Writ Of Mandate Continued From Jan-14-2004 To Law And Motion At Feb-06-2004, 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 Per Request Of Moving Party, Electro Rent Corporation.
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003
                                                              Notice Of Filing Of Administrative Record Of Proceedings Before Insurance Commissioner (ccp 1089.5: (a)
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003
                                                                Notice Of Motion For Writ Of Mandate, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp. Hearing Set For Jan-14-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 Answer
                                                                  Answer To Petition For Writ Of Mandate/ Prohibition/ Certification Filed By Respondent Garamendi, John An Insurance Commissioner, Department
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Response Filed By Other
                                                                    Response Filed By Other State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Non-profit, Public Enterprise Fund
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003
                                                                      Response Of The Workers Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California To The Verified Petition For Writ Of Mandate Filed By Respondent The Workers Compensation Insurance Rating The Workers Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California As To Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp.
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003
                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Verified Petition For Writ Of Mandate Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp. Served Sep-19-2003, Personal Service On Respondent Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau, An Unincorporated, Non-profit Association
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003
                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Summons And Petition For Writ Of Mandate Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp. Served Sep-19-2003, Personal Service On Real Party In Interest Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau, An Unincorporated, Non-profit Association
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003
                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Summons And Petition For Writ Of Mandate Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp. Served Sep-19-2003, Personal Service On Respondent State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Non-profit, Public Enterprise Fund
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003
                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Verified Petition For Writ Of Mandate Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp.
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003
                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Verified Petition For Writ Of Mandate Service On Mary F. Chapman, Esq., Senior Staff Counsel Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp. Served Jul-25-2003, Substitute Service On Corporation On Respondent State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Non-profit, Public Enterprise Fund
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003
                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Verified Petition For Writ Of Mandate Service On Vera C. Demartine, Staff Counsel For State Compensation Inc. Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp. Served Jul-25-2003, Substitute Service On Corporation On Respondent State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Non-profit, Public Enterprise Fund
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003
                                                                                    Petition For Writ Of Mandate/ Prohibition/ Certification Filed By Petitioner Electro Rent Corporation, A Corp. As To Respondent Garamendi, John An Insurance Commissioner, Department Department Of Insurance State Of California Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?