In Re: Armando Avelar
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 04 503941
Superior Court Judge James L. Warren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Avelar, Armando, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Matthew Wertheim, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Wertheim +1 415 775 8950
v.
No Logo Ac Transit, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ac Transit, Legal Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathleen Ann Wadhams +1 510 891 4827
No Logo Does 1 To 5, Defendant
State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by State Compensation Insurance Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosen, Jeffrey A +1 415 565 1238
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005
Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For May-16-2005 - No Appearance. Complt-in-intervention Dismissed On 4/19/05, And Complaint Dismissed On 4/29/05.
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Dismissal
    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint And Entire Action
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Dismissal
      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 23 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005
        Notice Of Attorneys In Lieu Of Subpoena To Compel Attendance (ccp 1987 (b)(c)) - Filed By Pltf In Intervention, State Compensation Insurance Fund
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial After Trial De Novo Request
          Case Removed From Pending Trial De Novo Calendar - Set For Trial If Objection: Hearing Set For Feb-04-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 212 Jury Trial Set For May-16-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 21 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004
            Trial De Novo Filed By Defendant Ac Transit Arbitration Order To Show Cause Of Jan-24-2005 Is Off Calendar
              Blank 20 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
              Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Nov-29-2004 - Award Of Arbitrator Filed.
                Blank 19 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004
                Arbitrator's Fee Statement Sent To J. Kevin Morrison
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Complaint In Intervention
                  Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor State Compensation Insurance Fund As To Defendant Ac Transit Does 1 To 5
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004
                    Award Filed By Arbitrator With Statement Of Decision
                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004
                      Defendant(s)-ac Transit Rejected Proposed Arbitrator, John K. Morrison (untimely); Could Not Be Processed.
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration (c)
                        Arbitration Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-24-2005 At 3:30 Pm In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 1605)
                          Arbitrator John K Morrison Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Sep-24-2004 Through Dec-23-2004.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004
                            Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator John Harold Peterson.
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
                              Panel Of Arbitrators Assigned. Rejection Date Sep-23-2004.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Order To Arbitration And Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference
                                Assigned To Arbitration For Sep-13-2004. Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference Set For Nov-29-2004 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Aug-27-2004 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004
                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Avelar, Armando Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Answer
                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Ac Transit
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                                      Law And Motion 301, Petitioner Armando Avelar's Motion For Order Granting Petition To File Late Claim Against Governmentt Entity: Granted; No Opposition Filed. Order Signed. Judge: James L. Warren Reporter: Christina Paxton, Csr #1558
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                        Added To Calendar For Case Management Conference. Hearing Set For Aug-27-2004 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Order Granting Petition To File Late Claim Against Govt. Entity
                                          Order Granting Petition To File Late Claim Against Govt. Entity
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                            Mini-minutes For Mar-30-2004 9:30 Am
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                              Summons Issued To Plaintiff Avelar, Armando
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Complaint
                                                Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Avelar, Armando As To Defendant Ac Transit Does 1 To 5
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                  Notice Of Motion For Order Granting Petition To File Late Claim Against Govt. Entity, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Hearing Set For Mar-30-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004
                                                    Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint (petition To File Late Claim) Filed By Plaintiff Avelar, Armando As To Defendant Ac Transit No Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Not Filed

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?