Yeti Coolers, LLC v. RTIC Coolers, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00597-RP
District Judge Robert Pitman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2018 at 12:09 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yeti Coolers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Daniel Gray +1 512 322 2639 +1 512 322 8385 joseph.gray@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mysha Lubke +1 512 322 2541 +1 512 322 3641 mysha.lubke@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J Berghammer +1 312 463 5406 +1 312 463 5706 jberghammer@bannerwitcoff.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L. Krashin +1 312 463 5466 mkrashin@bannerwitcoff.com
v.
No Logo RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bailey Harris +1 713 654 5300 +1 713 652 0109 bharris@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Weston Musselman, Jr. +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 pwm@fr.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1121
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (506) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before March 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
    Text Order GRANTING [386] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion in Limine #4 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This order seals only those documents specifically mentioned in Defendants' Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
      LREF
      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
      Text Order GRANTING [384] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion in Limine #3 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This order seals only those documents specifically mentioned in Defendants' Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
        LREF
        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
        Text Order GRANTING [383] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to YETI's Motion in Limine No. 2 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This order seals only those documents specifically mentioned in Defendants' Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
          LREF
          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
          Text Order GRANTING [380] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to YETI's Motion in Limine No. 6 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This order seals only those documents specifically mentioned in Defendants' Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
            LREF
            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
            Text Order GRANTING [377] Text Order GRANTING [376] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to YETI's Motion in Limine No. 7 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This order seals only those documents specifically mentioned in Defendants' Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
              LREF
              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
              Text Order GRANTING [376] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to YETI's Motion in Limine No. 4 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This order seals only those documents specifically mentioned in Defendants' Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 386 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Response to MIL #8, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Response to MIL #8, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A (sealed), # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit C (sealed), # (6) Sealed Document Prop Order to Response to MIL #8) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [347] MOTION in Limine #8 to Exclude a Portion of the Report and Opinion Testimony of Sarah Butler filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A - sealed, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C - sealed, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # (7) Sealed Document Unredacted Response to Motion in Limine #8, # (8) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (9) Sealed Document Exibit A, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (11) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Response to MIL No. 3, # (3) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration ISO Response to MIL No. 3, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (9) Sealed Document Prop Order re Response to MIL No. 3) (Brenckman, Elizabeth)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 383 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                      Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re Mot to FUS Response to MIL #2, # (2) Sealed Document Response to MIL #2, # (3) Sealed Document Gaddis Decl ISO Response to MIL #2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit #2 (Sealed), # (5) Sealed Document Prop Order to Response to MIL #2) (Ben-Ezra, Jackob)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 382 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [340] MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Pertaining to Defendants' Dismissed Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability Counterclaims filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gaddis Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5 (Sealed), # (7) Exhibit 6 (Sealed), # (8) Exhibit 7 (Sealed), # (9) Exhibit 8 (Sealed), # (10) Exhibit 9 (Sealed), # (11) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # (12) Sealed Document Unredacted Response to Motion in Limine #3, # (13) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration, # (14) Sealed Document Exhiit 5, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (19) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [338] MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude Evidence Related to the Inter Partes Review Proceedings of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,910,819 and 9,187,232 filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Ben-Ezra Decl ISO Response to MIL #1, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Proposed Order Denying YETI's MIL #1 re IPR Proceedings)(Ben-Ezra, Jackob)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 380 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                            Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Response to MIL #6, # (3) Sealed Document Decl ISO Response to MIL #6, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 2 (sealed), # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 3 (sealed), # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 8 (sealed), # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 9 (sealed), # (8) Sealed Document Prop Order to Response to MIL #6) (Harris, Bailey)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [339] MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Alleging that YETI Changed the Definition of its Trade Dress filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gaddis Decl ISO Response to MIL #2, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2 (filed under seal), # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Proposed Order to Response to MIL #2)(Ben-Ezra, Jackob) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # (6) Sealed Document Unredacted Response to Motion in Limine #2, # (7) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaraton, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (9) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 378 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [354] Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude Activities of YETI and its Founders Relating to Icey-Tek (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gaddis Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2 (sealed), # (4) Exhibit 3 (sealed), # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8 (sealed), # (10) Exhibit 9 (sealed), # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # (13) Sealed Document Unredacted Response to Motion in Limine #6, # (14) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (19) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 377 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Response to MIL #7, # (3) Sealed Document Decl ISO Response to MIL #7, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1 (sealed), # (5) Sealed Document Prop Order to Response to MIL #7) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017, Terminated: 2/2/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Response to MIL No. 4, # (3) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration ISO Response to MIL No. 4, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (7) Sealed Document Prop Order re Response to MIL No. 4) (Brenckman, Elizabeth)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 375 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [341] MOTION in Limine #4 to Exclude Communications and Conduct from Compromise Negotiations filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gaddis Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3 (SEALED), # (5) Exhibit 4 (SEALED), # (6) Exhibit 5 (SEALED), # (7) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # (8) Sealed Document Unredacted Response to Motion in Limine #4, # (9) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (13) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response to Motion
                                        RESPONSE to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [345] MOTION in Limine #7 to Exclude the Wealth of YETI's Principals and the Monies Received by Them from Third Party Investments filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gaddis Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1 - SEALED, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # (6) Sealed Document Unredacted Response to Motion in Limine #7, # (7) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (9) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [342] MOTION in Limine #5 to Exclude Defendants' New and Untimely Invalidity Theory filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC CORRECTED BRIEF (Harris, Bailey)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [342] MOTION in Limine #5 to Exclude Defendants' New and Untimely Invalidity Theory filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Fish Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                                              RESPONSE in Support, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [239] Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC YETI's Advisory Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar (Krashin, Michael)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Brief
                                                BRIEF regarding [239] Sealed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Bittner, Michael) Modified on 2/2/2017 to correct link (td).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [362] MOTION to Strike [319] Sealed Document, Yeti's Untimely Survey and Related Testimony, Argument and Evidence filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS: Please see attached for instructions on submitting exhibits for trial. (jg3)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Text Order GRANTING [335] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Janice V. Mitrius entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                        Text Order GRANTING [337] Joint Motion to Formalize Pre-Trial Exchanges and Schedule entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In filing the proposed jury instructions and verdict forms, the parties should submit a joint version in a redline, table, or other format that highlights the areas of agreement and disagreement between the parties' proposals. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          Agreed MOTION for Juror Questionnaire by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 1/28/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER DENYING [238] Sealed Motion to Exclude (Rebecca Kirk Fair). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 1/28/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER DENYING [208] Sealed Motion to Exclude (Wayne Hoyer). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 1/28/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER DENYING [227] Sealed Motion to Exclude (Peter Golder). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER DENYING [237] Sealed Motion to Exclude (Yoram Wind). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Motion to Strike
                                                                    MOTION to Strike [319] Sealed Document, Yeti's Untimely Survey and Related Testimony, Argument and Evidence by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER DENYING [210] Sealed Motion to Exclude (Michael A. Kamins). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER DENYING [211] Sealed Motion to Exclude (Cunningham); DENYING [225] Sealed Motion to Exclude (Cunningham). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER re [239] Sealed Motion to exclude a portion of the testimony of Ronald Vollmar filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. - advisories due no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [229] Sealed Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Tülin Erdem. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER DENYING [207] Sealed Motion to Exclude (Jeffrey M. Samuels). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [247] Sealed Motion to Exclude (David Kazmer). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING [183] Motion to exclude (Joe Martino); GRANTING [199] Motion to exclude (Kirk D. Deeter); GRANTING [205] Sealed Motion to exclude (Dan Nelson); GRANTING [206] Sealed Motion to exclude (Jim Draper). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 354 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                    Sealed Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude Activities of YETI and its Founders Relating to Icey-Tek filed (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (11) Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017, Terminated: 1/26/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                      Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine, # (3) Affidavit Gaddis Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 6, # (6) Exhibit 9, # (7) Exhibit 11, # (8) Sealed Document Prop Order re Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine) (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2017: # (9) Sealed Document Unredacted Motion in Limine, # (10) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gaddis Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3 - SEALED, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6 - SEALED, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9 - SEALED, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11 - SEALED, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017, Terminated: 1/26/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                          Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude YETI's Purported Evidence of Actual Confusion, # (3) Sealed Document Appendix, # (4) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Prop Order re Motion to Exclude YETI's Purported Evidence of Actual Confusion) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017, Terminated: 1/26/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                            Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion in Limine Regarding Expert Testimony, # (3) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (8) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [343] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion in Limine #6 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. For future submissions, the Court would prefer any sealed motion to be attached as an exhibit to an unsealed and redacted version of the motion. The parties should redact only information that is legitimately designated as protected under the protective order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [351] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude YETI's Purported Evidence of Actual Confusion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This Order seals only the documents listed in Defendants' Unopposed Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [349] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion in Limine Regarding Expert Testimony entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This Order seals only the documents listed in Defendants' Unopposed Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [353] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine entered by Judge Robert Pitman. This Order seals only the documents listed in Defendants' Unopposed Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine To Exclude YETI's Purported Evidence of Actual Confusion by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Affidavit Gaddis Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 1 - SEALED, # (4) Exhibit 2 - SEALED, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4 - SEALED, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Exhibit 13, # (16) Exhibit 14, # (17) Exhibit 15, # (18) Exhibit 16, # (19) Exhibit 17, # (20) Exhibit 18, # (21) Exhibit 19, # (22) Exhibit 20, # (23) Exhibit 21, # (24) Exhibit 22, # (25) Exhibit 23, # (26) Exhibit 24, # (27) Exhibit 25, # (28) Exhibit 26, # (29) Exhibit 27, # (30) Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2017: # (31) Sealed Document Unredacted Motion in Limine to Exclude Yeti's Purported Evidence of Actual Confusion, # (32) Sealed Document Appendix, # (33) Sealed Document Declaration of John Michael Gaddis, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (35) Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit 2, # (36) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (37) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2017: # (38) Sealed Document Unredacted Motion in Limine, # (39) Sealed Document Appendix, # (40) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration, # (41) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (42) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (43) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (44) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 348 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Regarding Expert Testimony by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Gaddis Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1 (SEALED), # (3) Exhibit 2 (SEALED), # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4 (SEALED), # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10 (SEALED), # (12) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2017: # (13) Sealed Document Unredacted Motion in Limine, # (14) Sealed Document GaddisDeclaration, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (19) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine #8 to Exclude a Portion of the Report and Opinion Testimony of Sarah Butler by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                            Proposed Voir Dire by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Brenckman, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine #7 to Exclude the Wealth of YETI's Principals and the Monies Received by Them from Third Party Investments by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017, Terminated: 1/26/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude Activities of YETI and its Founders Relating to Icey-Tek, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine #5 to Exclude Defendants' New and Untimely Invalidity Theory by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine #4 to Exclude Communications and Conduct from Compromise Negotiations by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Pertaining to Defendants' Dismissed Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability Counterclaims by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Alleging that YETI Changed the Definition of its Trade Dress by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude Evidence Related to the Inter Partes Review Proceedings of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,910,819 and 9,187,232 by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017, Terminated: 1/31/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Formalize Pre-Trial Exchanges and Schedule by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [326] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Sara Fish, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017, Terminated: 2/1/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100, Receipt #1542-9228057) by Kevin J. Meek for Janice V. Mitrius by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan D Albright on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. Attorney Alan D Albright added to party James Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Alan D Albright added to party John Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Alan D Albright added to party RTIC Coolers, LLC(pty:dft) (Albright, Alan)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [247] Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [325] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. § 282 by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [329] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Binal J. Patel entered by Judge Robert Pitman.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [326] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017, Terminated: 1/20/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Binal J. Patel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9216449) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2017at 2:00 PM (time change only) before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Notice to the Parties Regarding Sealed Filings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/14/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED SEALED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' [226] MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. § 102(b) (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara C. Fish, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) Modified on 1/17/2017 to correct date (td).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                        Text Order WITHDRAWING [300] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Strike and Objections, entered by Judge Robert Pitman, in light of [309] Defendants' Corrected Motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                          Text Order GRANTING [309] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Corrected Motion to Strike and Objections to Portions of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE AND OBJECTIONS TO PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' [231] MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT YETIS ASSERTED TRADE DRESS IS NOT PROTECTABLE BECAUSE IT HAS NOT ACQUIRED SECONDARY MEANING. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                              YETI'S SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS DAUBERT [239] MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND OPINION TESTIMONY OF RONALD VOLLMAR RELATING TO APPORTIONMENT OF DEFENDANTS' PROFITS. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                YETI'S SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS [229] MOTION TO STRIKE THE REPORT OF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF, TLIN ERDEM. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                  YETI'S SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSED DAUBERT [228] MOTION TOEXCLUDE THE REPORT AND OPINION TESTIMONY OF DENNIS KOVACH. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                    YETI'S SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS DAUBERT [227] MOTION TO EXCLUDETHE REPORT AND OPINION TESTIMONY OF PETER GOLDER. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 320 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS [237] MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF YETIS EXPERT YORAM WIND. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 319 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Yeti's Reply in Support of Its [238] Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of RTIC'S Expert Rebecca Kirk Fair (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin). Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[301] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed.(td) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 318 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Defendants' Reply in Support of Its [231] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because It Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Appendix A, # (2) Sealed Document Appendix B) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 317 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' [232] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standards. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 316 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Defendants' Reply in Support of [230] Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 315 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED Defendants' Reply in Support of [226] Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b) (Attachments: #(1) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara C. Fish, #(2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1).(td)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 314 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Defendants' Reply in Support of [225] Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 313 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Defendants' Reply in Support of Their [210] Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Michael A. Kamins. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 312 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Defendants' Reply in Support of Their [208] Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Yeti's Expert Wayne Hoyer. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 311 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Their [183], [199], [205], [206] Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Yeti's Alleged Experts Jim Draper, Joe Martino, Kirk Deeter, and Dan Nelson. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 310 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Defendants' Reply in Support of Their [211] Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017, Terminated: 1/14/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order - Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Corrected Motion to Strike and Objections to Portions of Plaintiffs Summary Judgment Evidence in Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b), # (3) Sealed Document Sara Fish Decl, # (4) Sealed Document Ex A, # (5) Sealed Document Prop Order - Motion to Strike) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [247] Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Dr. David Kazmer (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Ben-Ezra Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order - Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Motion to Strike and Objections to Portions of Plaintiffs Summary Judgment Evidence in Response to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl, # (4) Sealed Document Ex A, # (5) Sealed Document Ex B, # (6) Sealed Document Ex C, # (7) Sealed Document Prop Order on Motion to Strike) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [307] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Strike and Objections entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [306] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [305] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Dr. Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Text Order GRANTING [304] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Text Order GRANTING [303] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [302] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of RTIC's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [301] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [299] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [298] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [297] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [296] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Text Order GRANTING [294] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Text Order GRANTING [293] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [292] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [291] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Their Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of YETI's Experts Jim Draper, Joe Martino, Kirk Deeter, and Dan Nelson entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [290] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Tulin Erdem, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of RTIC's Expert Rebecca Kirk Fair, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 9) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/14/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Strike re MSJ Invalidity Evid re Crawford Decl, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara Fish - Motion to Strike re MSJ Invalidity Evid re Crawford Decl, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply ISO its Mot for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Appendix A: Certain Footwear Prods., Inv. No. 337-TA-936 (ITC), # (4) Sealed Document Appendix B: Diamond/Swann ed. book chapter: Design Issues for Controls) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Reply In Support of Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment That Yetis Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Famous Under Federal And State Trademark Dilution Standards) (Brenckman, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply in Support of Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectiable Due to Functionality) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 USC 102(b), # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara C. Fish, # (4) Sealed Document Exhhibit 1) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Support, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Wayne Hoyer, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Wayne Hoyer) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document RTIC Consolidated Reply in Support of their Motions to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Yeti's Alleged Experts Draper, Martino, Deeter and Nelson, # (2) Proposed Order) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 1/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion) (Brenckman, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Advisory to the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADVISORY TO THE COURT by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING [242] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Yeti's Sealed Opposition to [242] Defendant's Motion for Stay Pending resolution of PTO Proceedings. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[272] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [272] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [232] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standards. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [268] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [226] Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b). Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [267] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [210] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Michael A. Kamins. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [266] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [231] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [265] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [230] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Due to Functionality. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [264] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [183], [199], [205], [206] Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Messrs., Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [263] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [211] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [262] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [237] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [261] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [225] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [260] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 275 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Response in Opposition to #229 Yeti's Sealed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[259] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 274 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Response in Opposition to [227] Yeti's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[258] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 273 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Response in Opposition to [238] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[256] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017, Terminated: 1/9/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (19) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants' Sealed Response in Opposition to [239] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar Relating to Apportionment of Defendants' Profits. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (2) Exhibit A-1, # (3) Proposed Order) (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 270 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Response in Opposition to [208] Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Yeti's Expert Wayne Hoyer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4) (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 269 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Response in Opposition to [228] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sara C. Fish, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order) (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [268] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standard entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [267] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b) entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [266] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [265] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because It Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Text Order GRANTING [264] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Text Order GRANTING [263] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Messrs. Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [262] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Likelihood of Confusion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [261] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [260] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [259] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to YETI's Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [258] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [256] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Text Order GRANTING [255] RTIC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Certain of Its Oppositions to Plaintiff's Daubert Motions entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Text Order GRANTING [254] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [253] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [252] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re Fame, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document 101, # (5) Sealed Document 102, # (6) Sealed Document 103, # (7) Sealed Document 104, # (8) Sealed Document 105, # (9) Sealed Document 106, # (10) Sealed Document 107, # (11) Sealed Document 109, # (12) Sealed Document 110, # (13) Sealed Document 111, # (14) Sealed Document 112, # (15) Sealed Document 113, # (16) Sealed Document 114, # (17) Sealed Document 115, # (18) Sealed Document 116, # (19) Sealed Document 117, # (20) Sealed Document 118, # (21) Sealed Document 119, # (22) Sealed Document 120, # (23) Sealed Document 121-1, # (24) Sealed Document 121-2, # (25) Sealed Document 121-3, # (26) Sealed Document 121-4, # (27) Sealed Document 121-5, # (28) Sealed Document 121-6, # (29) Sealed Document 121-7, # (30) Sealed Document 121-8, # (31) Sealed Document 121-9, # (32) Sealed Document 121-10, # (33) Sealed Document 121-11, # (34) Sealed Document 121-12, # (35) Sealed Document 121-13, # (36) Sealed Document 121-14, # (37) Sealed Document 121-15, # (38) Sealed Document 122, # (39) Sealed Document 126, # (40) Sealed Document 127, # (41) Sealed Document 128, # (42) Sealed Document 129, # (43) Sealed Document 130, # (44) Sealed Document 131, # (45) Sealed Document 133, # (46) Sealed Document 134, # (47) Sealed Document 135, # (48) Sealed Document 136, # (49) Sealed Document 137, # (50) Sealed Document 138, # (51) Sealed Document 139, # (52) Sealed Document 140-1, # (53) Sealed Document 140-2, # (54) Sealed Document 141, # (55) Sealed Document 142, # (56) Sealed Document 150, # (57) Sealed Document 151, # (58) Sealed Document 152, # (59) Sealed Document 153, # (60) Sealed Document 154, # (61) Sealed Document 155, # (62) Sealed Document 156, # (63) Sealed Document 157, # (64) Sealed Document 158, # (65) Sealed Document 159, # (66) Sealed Document 160, # (67) Sealed Document 161, # (68) Sealed Document 162, # (69) Sealed Document 163, # (70) Sealed Document 164, # (71) Sealed Document 165, # (72) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # (3) Sealed Document T. Rechtien Declaration in Support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. 2, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. 3, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. 4, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. 5, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. 6, # (10) Sealed Document Ex. 7, # (11) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 1 of 3), # (12) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 2 of 3), # (13) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 3 of 3), # (14) Sealed Document Ex. 9 (Part 1 of 2), # (15) Sealed Document Ex. 9 (Part 2 of 2), # (16) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Michael Kamins, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is no Protectable because it has not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document V. Webb Declaration in Support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is no Protectable because it has not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. 101, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. 102, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. 103, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. 104, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. 105, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 1 of 9), # (10) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 2 of 9), # (11) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 3 of 9), # (12) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 4 of 9), # (13) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 5 of 9), # (14) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 6 of 9), # (15) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 7 of 9), # (16) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 8 of 9), # (17) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 9 of 9), # (18) Sealed Document Ex. 107, # (19) Sealed Document Ex. 108, # (20) Sealed Document Ex. 109, # (21) Sealed Document Ex. 110, # (22) Sealed Document Ex. 111, # (23) Sealed Document Ex. 112, # (24) Sealed Document Ex. 113, # (25) Sealed Document Ex. 114, # (26) Sealed Document Ex. 115, # (27) Sealed Document Ex. 116, # (28) Sealed Document Ex. 117, # (29) Sealed Document Ex. 118, # (30) Sealed Document Ex. 119, # (31) Sealed Document Ex. 120, # (32) Sealed Document Ex. 121, # (33) Sealed Document Ex. 122, # (34) Sealed Document Ex. 123, # (35) Sealed Document Ex. 124, # (36) Sealed Document Ex. 125, # (37) Sealed Document Ex. 126, # (38) Sealed Document Ex. 127, # (39) Sealed Document Ex. 128, # (40) Sealed Document Ex. 129, # (41) Sealed Document Ex. 130, # (42) Sealed Document Ex. 131, # (43) Sealed Document Ex. 132, # (44) Sealed Document Ex. 133, # (45) Sealed Document Ex. 134, # (46) Sealed Document Ex. 135, # (47) Sealed Document Ex. 136, # (48) Sealed Document Ex. 137, # (49) Sealed Document Ex. 138, # (50) Sealed Document Ex. 139, # (51) Sealed Document Ex. 140, # (52) Sealed Document Ex. 141, # (53) Sealed Document Ex. 142, # (54) Sealed Document Ex. 143, # (55) Sealed Document Ex. 144, # (56) Sealed Document Ex. 145, # (57) Sealed Document Ex. 146, # (58) Sealed Document Ex. 147, # (59) Sealed Document Ex. 148, # (60) Sealed Document Ex. 149, # (61) Sealed Document Ex. 150, # (62) Sealed Document Ex. 151, # (63) Sealed Document Ex. 152, # (64) Sealed Document Ex. 153, # (65) Sealed Document Ex. 154, # (66) Sealed Document Ex. 155, # (67) Sealed Document Ex. 156, # (68) Sealed Document Ex. 157, # (69) Sealed Document Ex. 158, # (70) Sealed Document Ex. 159, # (71) Sealed Document Ex. 160, # (72) Sealed Document Ex. 161, # (73) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Functionality, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 101, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 102, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 103, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 104, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 105, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 106, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 107, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 108, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 109, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 110, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 111, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 112, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 113, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 1, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 2, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 3, # (20) Proposed Order Exhibit 114 - part 4, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 5, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 6, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 7, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 8, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 115, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 116, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 117, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 118, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 119, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 120, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 121, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 122, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 123, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 124, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 125, # (36) Sealed Document Exhibit 126, # (37) Sealed Document Exhibit 127, # (38) Sealed Document Exhibit 128, # (39) Sealed Document Exhibit 129, # (40) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Messrs. Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham concerning Likelihood of Confusion, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham concerning Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (3) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (4) Sealed Document Prop Order - Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (5) Sealed Document Ex A, # (6) Sealed Document Ex B1, # (7) Sealed Document Ex B2, # (8) Sealed Document Ex C1, # (9) Sealed Document Ex C2, # (10) Sealed Document Ex D1, # (11) Sealed Document Ex D2, # (12) Sealed Document Ex E1, # (13) Sealed Document Ex E2, # (14) Sealed Document Ex F, # (15) Sealed Document Ex G1, # (16) Sealed Document Ex G2, # (17) Sealed Document Ex H, # (18) Sealed Document Ex I, # (19) Sealed Document Ex J, # (20) Sealed Document Ex K1, # (21) Sealed Document Ex K2, # (22) Sealed Document Ex L1, # (23) Sealed Document Ex L2, # (24) Sealed Document Ex M, # (25) Sealed Document Ex N, # (26) Sealed Document Ex O) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C-1 to Opposition, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit C-2 to Opposition, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit D-1 to Opposition, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit D-2 to Opposition, # (10) Sealed Document Proposed Order on Opposition) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendant's Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration in Support of Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Proposed Order - Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for RTIC Oppositions to 1) Golder Daubert and 2) Kirk Fair Daubert by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order for Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar re Apportionment of Defendants' Profits, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Yeti's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar, # (4) Exhibit A-1 and A-2, # (5) Proposed Order Proposed Order re Opposition to Yeti's Motion to Exclude Vollmar) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony and Report of Hoyer, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin in support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Wayne Hoyer, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/6/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach (Dkt. No. 228), # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara Fish In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Opposition) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript filed of Proceedings held on December 14, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/26/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2017, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [244] Joint Motion for Pretrial Scheduling Conference entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court hereby sets and directs the parties, or counsel acting on their behalf, to appear by phone for a telephone conference on Tuesday, January 10, 2017, at 9:00 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall be responsible for coordinating the call and providing dial-in information at least 24 hours prior to the hearing to the Courtroom Deputy at julie_golden@txwd.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [250] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Certain of Its Oppositions to Defendants' Motions entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017, Terminated: 1/5/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Certain of its Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [247] Sealed Motion to Exclude filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [246] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' Response is due on January 13, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [243] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings entered by Judge Robert Pitman. YETI's Response is due FRIDAY, JANUARY 6, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [243] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings entered by Judge Robert Pitman. YETI's Response is due FRIDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/1/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Yetti's Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kzmer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6) (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [245] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [241] Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Any Daubert motion or objections concerning Defendants' expert, Sarah Butler, must be filed on or before January 23, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 248 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 1/3/2017 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER MOOTING [154] Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [157] Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING [161] Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING [163] Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART [168] Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART [168] Motion for Contempt; GRANTING [172] Sealed Motion to Continue; GRANTING [178] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Extension of Time)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016, Terminated: 1/1/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David KIamer, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016, Terminated: 1/5/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Pretrial Scheduling Conference by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: 12/29/2016, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [242] MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016, Terminated: 1/9/2017 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016, Terminated: 1/1/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [239] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [237] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [238] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 239 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar Relating the Apportionment of Defendants' Profits. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[236] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 238 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[235] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 237 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind.Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[234] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [236] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [235] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [234] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016, Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016, Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016, Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Wind, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Exclude Wind, # (4) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (6) Sealed Document Prop Order) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [205] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [227] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [199] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Kirk D. Deeter filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [210] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [183] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Joe Martino filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [225] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [208] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [228] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [211] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [229] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [206] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standards. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[220] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 231 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[219] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 230 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Due to Functionality. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[216] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [214] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits for its Motions for Partial Summary Judgment entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [216] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [219] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Text Order GRANTING [220] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 229 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[218] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 228 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[217] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 227 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 1/28/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[215] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 226 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b). Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[213] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 225 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[209] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [222] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [221] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Deficiency NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Bailey Harris: re [216] Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (td) 223 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [221] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey) 224 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [222] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey) 225 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[209] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 226 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b). Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[213] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 227 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/28/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[215] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 228 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[217] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 229 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[218] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [220] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [219] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [216] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [214] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits for its Motions for Partial Summary Judgment entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 230 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Due to Functionality. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[216] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 231 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[219] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 232 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standards. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[220] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 233 Filed: 12/21/2016Entered: 12/22/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [205] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [227] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [199] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Kirk D. Deeter filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [210] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [183] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Joe Martino filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [225] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [208] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [228] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [211] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [229] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [206] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 234 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Wind, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Exclude Wind, # (4) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (6) Sealed Document Prop Order) (Harris, Bailey) 235 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 236 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [234] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [235] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [236] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 237 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind.Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[234] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 238 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016Terminated: 01/28/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[235] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 239 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar Relating the Apportionment of Defendants' Profits. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[236] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 240 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [239] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [237] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [238] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 241 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016Terminated: 01/01/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 242 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016Terminated: 01/09/2017 Motion to Stay MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 243 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/03/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [242] MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 244 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/05/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint MOTION for Pretrial Scheduling Conference by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 245 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/01/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David KIamer, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 246 Filed & Entered: 12/30/2016Terminated: 01/03/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Extension of Time)(Harris, Bailey) 248 Filed: 12/30/2016Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion to Quash ORDER MOOTING [154] Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [157] Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING [161] Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING [163] Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART [168] Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART [168] Motion for Contempt; GRANTING [172] Sealed Motion to Continue; GRANTING [178] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm) Filed & Entered: 01/01/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [241] Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Any Daubert motion or objections concerning Defendants' expert, Sarah Butler, must be filed on or before January 23, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/01/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [245] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 247 Filed: 01/01/2017Entered: 01/03/2017Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Yetti's Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kzmer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6) (dm) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [243] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings entered by Judge Robert Pitman. YETI's Response is due FRIDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply AMENDED Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [243] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings entered by Judge Robert Pitman. YETI's Response is due FRIDAY, JANUARY 6, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text Order GRANTING [246] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' Response is due on January 13, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 249 Filed & Entered: 01/04/2017 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [247] Sealed Motion to Exclude filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dm) 250 Filed & Entered: 01/04/2017Terminated: 01/05/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Certain of its Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Text Order GRANTING [250] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Certain of Its Oppositions to Defendants' Motions entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [244] Joint Motion for Pretrial Scheduling Conference entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court hereby sets and directs the parties, or counsel acting on their behalf, to appear by phone for a telephone conference on Tuesday, January 10, 2017, at 9:00 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall be responsible for coordinating the call and providing dial-in information at least 24 hours prior to the hearing to the Courtroom Deputy at julie_golden@txwd.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 251 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Transcript Filed Transcript filed of Proceedings held on December 14, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/26/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2017, (Rodriguez, Arlinda) 252 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach (Dkt. No. 228), # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara Fish In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Opposition) (Harris, Bailey) 253 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony and Report of Hoyer, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin in support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Wayne Hoyer, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 254 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order for Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar re Apportionment of Defendants' Profits, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Yeti's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar, # (4) Exhibit A-1 and A-2, # (5) Proposed Order Proposed Order re Opposition to Yeti's Motion to Exclude Vollmar) (Harris, Bailey) 255 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for RTIC Oppositions to 1) Golder Daubert and 2) Kirk Fair Daubert by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth) 256 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendant's Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration in Support of Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Proposed Order - Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert) (Harris, Bailey) 257 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Rechtien, Timothy) 258 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C-1 to Opposition, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit C-2 to Opposition, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit D-1 to Opposition, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit D-2 to Opposition, # (10) Sealed Document Proposed Order on Opposition) (Harris, Bailey) 259 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (3) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (4) Sealed Document Prop Order - Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (5) Sealed Document Ex A, # (6) Sealed Document Ex B1, # (7) Sealed Document Ex B2, # (8) Sealed Document Ex C1, # (9) Sealed Document Ex C2, # (10) Sealed Document Ex D1, # (11) Sealed Document Ex D2, # (12) Sealed Document Ex E1, # (13) Sealed Document Ex E2, # (14) Sealed Document Ex F, # (15) Sealed Document Ex G1, # (16) Sealed Document Ex G2, # (17) Sealed Document Ex H, # (18) Sealed Document Ex I, # (19) Sealed Document Ex J, # (20) Sealed Document Ex K1, # (21) Sealed Document Ex K2, # (22) Sealed Document Ex L1, # (23) Sealed Document Ex L2, # (24) Sealed Document Ex M, # (25) Sealed Document Ex N, # (26) Sealed Document Ex O) (Harris, Bailey) 260 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham concerning Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 261 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 262 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham concerning Likelihood of Confusion, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 263 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Messrs. Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 264 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Functionality, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 101, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 102, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 103, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 104, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 105, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 106, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 107, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 108, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 109, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 110, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 111, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 112, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 113, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 1, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 2, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 3, # (20) Proposed Order Exhibit 114 - part 4, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 5, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 6, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 7, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 8, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 115, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 116, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 117, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 118, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 119, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 120, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 121, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 122, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 123, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 124, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 125, # (36) Sealed Document Exhibit 126, # (37) Sealed Document Exhibit 127, # (38) Sealed Document Exhibit 128, # (39) Sealed Document Exhibit 129, # (40) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 265 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is no Protectable because it has not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document V. Webb Declaration in Support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is no Protectable because it has not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. 101, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. 102, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. 103, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. 104, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. 105, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 1 of 9), # (10) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 2 of 9), # (11) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 3 of 9), # (12) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 4 of 9), # (13) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 5 of 9), # (14) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 6 of 9), # (15) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 7 of 9), # (16) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 8 of 9), # (17) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 9 of 9), # (18) Sealed Document Ex. 107, # (19) Sealed Document Ex. 108, # (20) Sealed Document Ex. 109, # (21) Sealed Document Ex. 110, # (22) Sealed Document Ex. 111, # (23) Sealed Document Ex. 112, # (24) Sealed Document Ex. 113, # (25) Sealed Document Ex. 114, # (26) Sealed Document Ex. 115, # (27) Sealed Document Ex. 116, # (28) Sealed Document Ex. 117, # (29) Sealed Document Ex. 118, # (30) Sealed Document Ex. 119, # (31) Sealed Document Ex. 120, # (32) Sealed Document Ex. 121, # (33) Sealed Document Ex. 122, # (34) Sealed Document Ex. 123, # (35) Sealed Document Ex. 124, # (36) Sealed Document Ex. 125, # (37) Sealed Document Ex. 126, # (38) Sealed Document Ex. 127, # (39) Sealed Document Ex. 128, # (40) Sealed Document Ex. 129, # (41) Sealed Document Ex. 130, # (42) Sealed Document Ex. 131, # (43) Sealed Document Ex. 132, # (44) Sealed Document Ex. 133, # (45) Sealed Document Ex. 134, # (46) Sealed Document Ex. 135, # (47) Sealed Document Ex. 136, # (48) Sealed Document Ex. 137, # (49) Sealed Document Ex. 138, # (50) Sealed Document Ex. 139, # (51) Sealed Document Ex. 140, # (52) Sealed Document Ex. 141, # (53) Sealed Document Ex. 142, # (54) Sealed Document Ex. 143, # (55) Sealed Document Ex. 144, # (56) Sealed Document Ex. 145, # (57) Sealed Document Ex. 146, # (58) Sealed Document Ex. 147, # (59) Sealed Document Ex. 148, # (60) Sealed Document Ex. 149, # (61) Sealed Document Ex. 150, # (62) Sealed Document Ex. 151, # (63) Sealed Document Ex. 152, # (64) Sealed Document Ex. 153, # (65) Sealed Document Ex. 154, # (66) Sealed Document Ex. 155, # (67) Sealed Document Ex. 156, # (68) Sealed Document Ex. 157, # (69) Sealed Document Ex. 158, # (70) Sealed Document Ex. 159, # (71) Sealed Document Ex. 160, # (72) Sealed Document Ex. 161, # (73) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 266 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Michael Kamins, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 267 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # (3) Sealed Document T. Rechtien Declaration in Support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. 2, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. 3, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. 4, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. 5, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. 6, # (10) Sealed Document Ex. 7, # (11) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 1 of 3), # (12) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 2 of 3), # (13) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 3 of 3), # (14) Sealed Document Ex. 9 (Part 1 of 2), # (15) Sealed Document Ex. 9 (Part 2 of 2), # (16) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 268 Filed: 01/05/2017Entered: 01/06/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re Fame, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document 101, # (5) Sealed Document 102, # (6) Sealed Document 103, # (7) Sealed Document 104, # (8) Sealed Document 105, # (9) Sealed Document 106, # (10) Sealed Document 107, # (11) Sealed Document 109, # (12) Sealed Document 110, # (13) Sealed Document 111, # (14) Sealed Document 112, # (15) Sealed Document 113, # (16) Sealed Document 114, # (17) Sealed Document 115, # (18) Sealed Document 116, # (19) Sealed Document 117, # (20) Sealed Document 118, # (21) Sealed Document 119, # (22) Sealed Document 120, # (23) Sealed Document 121-1, # (24) Sealed Document 121-2, # (25) Sealed Document 121-3, # (26) Sealed Document 121-4, # (27) Sealed Document 121-5, # (28) Sealed Document 121-6, # (29) Sealed Document 121-7, # (30) Sealed Document 121-8, # (31) Sealed Document 121-9, # (32) Sealed Document 121-10, # (33) Sealed Document 121-11, # (34) Sealed Document 121-12, # (35) Sealed Document 121-13, # (36) Sealed Document 121-14, # (37) Sealed Document 121-15, # (38) Sealed Document 122, # (39) Sealed Document 126, # (40) Sealed Document 127, # (41) Sealed Document 128, # (42) Sealed Document 129, # (43) Sealed Document 130, # (44) Sealed Document 131, # (45) Sealed Document 133, # (46) Sealed Document 134, # (47) Sealed Document 135, # (48) Sealed Document 136, # (49) Sealed Document 137, # (50) Sealed Document 138, # (51) Sealed Document 139, # (52) Sealed Document 140-1, # (53) Sealed Document 140-2, # (54) Sealed Document 141, # (55) Sealed Document 142, # (56) Sealed Document 150, # (57) Sealed Document 151, # (58) Sealed Document 152, # (59) Sealed Document 153, # (60) Sealed Document 154, # (61) Sealed Document 155, # (62) Sealed Document 156, # (63) Sealed Document 157, # (64) Sealed Document 158, # (65) Sealed Document 159, # (66) Sealed Document 160, # (67) Sealed Document 161, # (68) Sealed Document 162, # (69) Sealed Document 163, # (70) Sealed Document 164, # (71) Sealed Document 165, # (72) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [252] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [253] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [254] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Text Order GRANTING [255] RTIC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Certain of Its Oppositions to Plaintiff's Daubert Motions entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [256] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [258] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [259] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to YETI's Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [260] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [261] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [262] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Likelihood of Confusion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [263] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Messrs. Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [264] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [265] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because It Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [266] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [267] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b) entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [268] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standard entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 269 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to [228] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sara C. Fish, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order) (dm) 270 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to [208] Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Yeti's Expert Wayne Hoyer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4) (dm) 271 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Sealed Document Defendants' Sealed Response in Opposition to [239] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar Relating to Apportionment of Defendants' Profits. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (2) Exhibit A-1, # (3) Proposed Order) (dm) 272 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017Terminated: 01/09/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (19) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 273 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to [238] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[256] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 274 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to [227] Yeti's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[258] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 275 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to #229 Yeti's Sealed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[259] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 276 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [225] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [260] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 277 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [237] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [261] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 278 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [211] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [262] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 279 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [183], [199], [205], [206] Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Messrs., Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [263] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 280 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [230] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Due to Functionality. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [264] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 281 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [231] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [265] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 282 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [210] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Michael A. Kamins. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [266] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 283 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [226] Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b). Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [267] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 284 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [232] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standards. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [268] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) Filed & Entered: 01/09/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [272] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 285 Filed & Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Opposition to [242] Defendant's Motion for Stay Pending resolution of PTO Proceedings. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[272] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 286 Filed & Entered: 01/09/2017 Order on Motion to Stay ORDER DENYING [242] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 287 Filed & Entered: 01/09/2017 Order ORDER, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 288 Filed & Entered: 01/10/2017 Scheduling Conference Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td) 289 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017 Advisory to the Court ADVISORY TO THE COURT by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Melsheimer, Thomas) 290 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion) (Brenckman, Elizabeth) 291 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document RTIC Consolidated Reply in Support of their Motions to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Yeti's Alleged Experts Draper, Martino, Deeter and Nelson, # (2) Proposed Order) (Harris, Bailey) 292 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Wayne Hoyer, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Wayne Hoyer) (Harris, Bailey) 293 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins) (Harris, Bailey) 294 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A) (Harris, Bailey) 295 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017 Response in Support of Motion RESPONSE in Support, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey) 296 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 USC 102(b), # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara C. Fish, # (4) Sealed Document Exhhibit 1) (Harris, Bailey) 297 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply in Support of Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectiable Due to Functionality) (Harris, Bailey) 298 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Reply In Support of Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment That Yetis Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Famous Under Federal And State Trademark Dilution Standards) (Brenckman, Elizabeth) 299 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply ISO its Mot for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Appendix A: Certain Footwear Prods., Inv. No. 337-TA-936 (ITC), # (4) Sealed Document Appendix B: Diamond/Swann ed. book chapter: Design Issues for Controls) (Harris, Bailey) 300 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/14/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Strike re MSJ Invalidity Evid re Crawford Decl, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara Fish - Motion to Strike re MSJ Invalidity Evid re Crawford Decl, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A) (Harris, Bailey) 301 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of RTIC's Expert Rebecca Kirk Fair, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 9) (Krashin, Michael) 302 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind) (Harris, Bailey) 303 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder) (Krashin, Michael) 304 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach) (Krashin, Michael) 305 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Tulin Erdem, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1) (Krashin, Michael) 306 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [290] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [291] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Their Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of YETI's Experts Jim Draper, Joe Martino, Kirk Deeter, and Dan Nelson entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [292] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [293] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [294] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [296] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [297] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [298] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [299] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [301] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [302] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of RTIC's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [303] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [304] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [305] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Dr. Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [306] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [307] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Strike and Objections entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 307 Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order - Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Motion to Strike and Objections to Portions of Plaintiffs Summary Judgment Evidence in Response to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl, # (4) Sealed Document Ex A, # (5) Sealed Document Ex B, # (6) Sealed Document Ex C, # (7) Sealed Document Prop Order on Motion to Strike) (Harris, Bailey) 308
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Deficiency NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Bailey Harris: re [213] Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (td) 222 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Deficiency Notice DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Bailey Harris: re [216] Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (td) 223 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [221] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey) 224 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [222] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey) 225 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[209] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 226 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b). Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[213] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 227 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/28/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[215] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 228 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[217] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 229 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[218] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [220] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [219] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [216] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [214] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits for its Motions for Partial Summary Judgment entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 230 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Due to Functionality. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[216] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 231 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[219] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 232 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standards. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[220] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 233 Filed: 12/21/2016Entered: 12/22/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [205] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [227] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [199] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Kirk D. Deeter filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [210] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [183] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Joe Martino filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [225] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [208] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [228] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [211] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [229] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [206] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 234 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Wind, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Exclude Wind, # (4) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (6) Sealed Document Prop Order) (Harris, Bailey) 235 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 236 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [234] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [235] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [236] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 237 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind.Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[234] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 238 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016Terminated: 01/28/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[235] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 239 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar Relating the Apportionment of Defendants' Profits. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[236] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 240 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [239] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [237] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [238] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 241 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016Terminated: 01/01/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 242 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016Terminated: 01/09/2017 Motion to Stay MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 243 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/03/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [242] MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 244 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/05/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint MOTION for Pretrial Scheduling Conference by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 245 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/01/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David KIamer, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 246 Filed & Entered: 12/30/2016Terminated: 01/03/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Extension of Time)(Harris, Bailey) 248 Filed: 12/30/2016Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion to Quash ORDER MOOTING [154] Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [157] Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING [161] Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING [163] Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART [168] Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART [168] Motion for Contempt; GRANTING [172] Sealed Motion to Continue; GRANTING [178] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm) Filed & Entered: 01/01/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [241] Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Any Daubert motion or objections concerning Defendants' expert, Sarah Butler, must be filed on or before January 23, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/01/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [245] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 247 Filed: 01/01/2017Entered: 01/03/2017Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Yetti's Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kzmer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6) (dm) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [243] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings entered by Judge Robert Pitman. YETI's Response is due FRIDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply AMENDED Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [243] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings entered by Judge Robert Pitman. YETI's Response is due FRIDAY, JANUARY 6, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text Order GRANTING [246] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' Response is due on January 13, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 249 Filed & Entered: 01/04/2017 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [247] Sealed Motion to Exclude filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dm) 250 Filed & Entered: 01/04/2017Terminated: 01/05/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Certain of its Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Text Order GRANTING [250] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Certain of Its Oppositions to Defendants' Motions entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [244] Joint Motion for Pretrial Scheduling Conference entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court hereby sets and directs the parties, or counsel acting on their behalf, to appear by phone for a telephone conference on Tuesday, January 10, 2017, at 9:00 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall be responsible for coordinating the call and providing dial-in information at least 24 hours prior to the hearing to the Courtroom Deputy at julie_golden@txwd.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 251 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Transcript Filed Transcript filed of Proceedings held on December 14, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/26/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2017, (Rodriguez, Arlinda) 252 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach (Dkt. No. 228), # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara Fish In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Opposition) (Harris, Bailey) 253 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony and Report of Hoyer, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin in support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Wayne Hoyer, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 254 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order for Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar re Apportionment of Defendants' Profits, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Yeti's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar, # (4) Exhibit A-1 and A-2, # (5) Proposed Order Proposed Order re Opposition to Yeti's Motion to Exclude Vollmar) (Harris, Bailey) 255 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for RTIC Oppositions to 1) Golder Daubert and 2) Kirk Fair Daubert by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth) 256 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendant's Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration in Support of Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Proposed Order - Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert) (Harris, Bailey) 257 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Rechtien, Timothy) 258 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C-1 to Opposition, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit C-2 to Opposition, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit D-1 to Opposition, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit D-2 to Opposition, # (10) Sealed Document Proposed Order on Opposition) (Harris, Bailey) 259 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (3) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (4) Sealed Document Prop Order - Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (5) Sealed Document Ex A, # (6) Sealed Document Ex B1, # (7) Sealed Document Ex B2, # (8) Sealed Document Ex C1, # (9) Sealed Document Ex C2, # (10) Sealed Document Ex D1, # (11) Sealed Document Ex D2, # (12) Sealed Document Ex E1, # (13) Sealed Document Ex E2, # (14) Sealed Document Ex F, # (15) Sealed Document Ex G1, # (16) Sealed Document Ex G2, # (17) Sealed Document Ex H, # (18) Sealed Document Ex I, # (19) Sealed Document Ex J, # (20) Sealed Document Ex K1, # (21) Sealed Document Ex K2, # (22) Sealed Document Ex L1, # (23) Sealed Document Ex L2, # (24) Sealed Document Ex M, # (25) Sealed Document Ex N, # (26) Sealed Document Ex O) (Harris, Bailey) 260 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham concerning Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 261 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 262 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham concerning Likelihood of Confusion, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 263 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Messrs. Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 264 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Functionality, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 101, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 102, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 103, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 104, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 105, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 106, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 107, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 108, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 109, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 110, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 111, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 112, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 113, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 1, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 2, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 3, # (20) Proposed Order Exhibit 114 - part 4, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 5, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 6, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 7, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 8, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 115, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 116, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 117, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 118, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 119, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 120, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 121, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 122, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 123, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 124, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 125, # (36) Sealed Document Exhibit 126, # (37) Sealed Document Exhibit 127, # (38) Sealed Document Exhibit 128, # (39) Sealed Document Exhibit 129, # (40) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 265 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is no Protectable because it has not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document V. Webb Declaration in Support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is no Protectable because it has not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. 101, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. 102, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. 103, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. 104, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. 105, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 1 of 9), # (10) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 2 of 9), # (11) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 3 of 9), # (12) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 4 of 9), # (13) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 5 of 9), # (14) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 6 of 9), # (15) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 7 of 9), # (16) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 8 of 9), # (17) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 9 of 9), # (18) Sealed Document Ex. 107, # (19) Sealed Document Ex. 108, # (20) Sealed Document Ex. 109, # (21) Sealed Document Ex. 110, # (22) Sealed Document Ex. 111, # (23) Sealed Document Ex. 112, # (24) Sealed Document Ex. 113, # (25) Sealed Document Ex. 114, # (26) Sealed Document Ex. 115, # (27) Sealed Document Ex. 116, # (28) Sealed Document Ex. 117, # (29) Sealed Document Ex. 118, # (30) Sealed Document Ex. 119, # (31) Sealed Document Ex. 120, # (32) Sealed Document Ex. 121, # (33) Sealed Document Ex. 122, # (34) Sealed Document Ex. 123, # (35) Sealed Document Ex. 124, # (36) Sealed Document Ex. 125, # (37) Sealed Document Ex. 126, # (38) Sealed Document Ex. 127, # (39) Sealed Document Ex. 128, # (40) Sealed Document Ex. 129, # (41) Sealed Document Ex. 130, # (42) Sealed Document Ex. 131, # (43) Sealed Document Ex. 132, # (44) Sealed Document Ex. 133, # (45) Sealed Document Ex. 134, # (46) Sealed Document Ex. 135, # (47) Sealed Document Ex. 136, # (48) Sealed Document Ex. 137, # (49) Sealed Document Ex. 138, # (50) Sealed Document Ex. 139, # (51) Sealed Document Ex. 140, # (52) Sealed Document Ex. 141, # (53) Sealed Document Ex. 142, # (54) Sealed Document Ex. 143, # (55) Sealed Document Ex. 144, # (56) Sealed Document Ex. 145, # (57) Sealed Document Ex. 146, # (58) Sealed Document Ex. 147, # (59) Sealed Document Ex. 148, # (60) Sealed Document Ex. 149, # (61) Sealed Document Ex. 150, # (62) Sealed Document Ex. 151, # (63) Sealed Document Ex. 152, # (64) Sealed Document Ex. 153, # (65) Sealed Document Ex. 154, # (66) Sealed Document Ex. 155, # (67) Sealed Document Ex. 156, # (68) Sealed Document Ex. 157, # (69) Sealed Document Ex. 158, # (70) Sealed Document Ex. 159, # (71) Sealed Document Ex. 160, # (72) Sealed Document Ex. 161, # (73) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 266 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Michael Kamins, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 267 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # (3) Sealed Document T. Rechtien Declaration in Support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. 2, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. 3, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. 4, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. 5, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. 6, # (10) Sealed Document Ex. 7, # (11) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 1 of 3), # (12) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 2 of 3), # (13) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 3 of 3), # (14) Sealed Document Ex. 9 (Part 1 of 2), # (15) Sealed Document Ex. 9 (Part 2 of 2), # (16) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 268 Filed: 01/05/2017Entered: 01/06/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re Fame, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document 101, # (5) Sealed Document 102, # (6) Sealed Document 103, # (7) Sealed Document 104, # (8) Sealed Document 105, # (9) Sealed Document 106, # (10) Sealed Document 107, # (11) Sealed Document 109, # (12) Sealed Document 110, # (13) Sealed Document 111, # (14) Sealed Document 112, # (15) Sealed Document 113, # (16) Sealed Document 114, # (17) Sealed Document 115, # (18) Sealed Document 116, # (19) Sealed Document 117, # (20) Sealed Document 118, # (21) Sealed Document 119, # (22) Sealed Document 120, # (23) Sealed Document 121-1, # (24) Sealed Document 121-2, # (25) Sealed Document 121-3, # (26) Sealed Document 121-4, # (27) Sealed Document 121-5, # (28) Sealed Document 121-6, # (29) Sealed Document 121-7, # (30) Sealed Document 121-8, # (31) Sealed Document 121-9, # (32) Sealed Document 121-10, # (33) Sealed Document 121-11, # (34) Sealed Document 121-12, # (35) Sealed Document 121-13, # (36) Sealed Document 121-14, # (37) Sealed Document 121-15, # (38) Sealed Document 122, # (39) Sealed Document 126, # (40) Sealed Document 127, # (41) Sealed Document 128, # (42) Sealed Document 129, # (43) Sealed Document 130, # (44) Sealed Document 131, # (45) Sealed Document 133, # (46) Sealed Document 134, # (47) Sealed Document 135, # (48) Sealed Document 136, # (49) Sealed Document 137, # (50) Sealed Document 138, # (51) Sealed Document 139, # (52) Sealed Document 140-1, # (53) Sealed Document 140-2, # (54) Sealed Document 141, # (55) Sealed Document 142, # (56) Sealed Document 150, # (57) Sealed Document 151, # (58) Sealed Document 152, # (59) Sealed Document 153, # (60) Sealed Document 154, # (61) Sealed Document 155, # (62) Sealed Document 156, # (63) Sealed Document 157, # (64) Sealed Document 158, # (65) Sealed Document 159, # (66) Sealed Document 160, # (67) Sealed Document 161, # (68) Sealed Document 162, # (69) Sealed Document 163, # (70) Sealed Document 164, # (71) Sealed Document 165, # (72) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [252] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [253] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [254] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Text Order GRANTING [255] RTIC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Certain of Its Oppositions to Plaintiff's Daubert Motions entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [256] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [258] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [259] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to YETI's Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [260] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [261] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [262] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Likelihood of Confusion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [263] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Messrs. Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [264] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [265] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because It Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [266] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [267] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b) entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [268] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standard entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 269 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to [228] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sara C. Fish, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order) (dm) 270 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to [208] Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Yeti's Expert Wayne Hoyer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4) (dm) 271 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Sealed Document Defendants' Sealed Response in Opposition to [239] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar Relating to Apportionment of Defendants' Profits. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (2) Exhibit A-1, # (3) Proposed Order) (dm) 272 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017Terminated: 01/09/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (19) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 273 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to [238] Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[256] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 274 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to [227] Yeti's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[258] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 275 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Sealed Response in Opposition to #229 Yeti's Sealed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[259] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 276 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [225] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [260] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 277 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [237] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [261] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 278 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [211] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [262] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 279 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [183], [199], [205], [206] Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Messrs., Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [263] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 280 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [230] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Due to Functionality. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [264] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 281 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [231] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [265] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 282 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [210] Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Michael A. Kamins. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [266] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 283 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [226] Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b). Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [267] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) 284 Filed: 01/06/2017Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Response in Opposition to [232] Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standards. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document [268] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (dm) Filed & Entered: 01/09/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [272] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 285 Filed & Entered: 01/09/2017 Sealed Document Yeti's Sealed Opposition to [242] Defendant's Motion for Stay Pending resolution of PTO Proceedings. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[272] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 286 Filed & Entered: 01/09/2017 Order on Motion to Stay ORDER DENYING [242] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 287 Filed & Entered: 01/09/2017 Order ORDER, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 288 Filed & Entered: 01/10/2017 Scheduling Conference Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td) 289 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017 Advisory to the Court ADVISORY TO THE COURT by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Melsheimer, Thomas) 290 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion) (Brenckman, Elizabeth) 291 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document RTIC Consolidated Reply in Support of their Motions to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Yeti's Alleged Experts Draper, Martino, Deeter and Nelson, # (2) Proposed Order) (Harris, Bailey) 292 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Wayne Hoyer, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Wayne Hoyer) (Harris, Bailey) 293 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins) (Harris, Bailey) 294 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A) (Harris, Bailey) 295 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017 Response in Support of Motion RESPONSE in Support, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey) 296 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 USC 102(b), # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara C. Fish, # (4) Sealed Document Exhhibit 1) (Harris, Bailey) 297 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply in Support of Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectiable Due to Functionality) (Harris, Bailey) 298 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Reply In Support of Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment That Yetis Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Famous Under Federal And State Trademark Dilution Standards) (Brenckman, Elizabeth) 299 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply ISO its Mot for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Appendix A: Certain Footwear Prods., Inv. No. 337-TA-936 (ITC), # (4) Sealed Document Appendix B: Diamond/Swann ed. book chapter: Design Issues for Controls) (Harris, Bailey) 300 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/14/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Strike re MSJ Invalidity Evid re Crawford Decl, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara Fish - Motion to Strike re MSJ Invalidity Evid re Crawford Decl, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A) (Harris, Bailey) 301 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of RTIC's Expert Rebecca Kirk Fair, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 9) (Krashin, Michael) 302 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind) (Harris, Bailey) 303 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder) (Krashin, Michael) 304 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach) (Krashin, Michael) 305 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Tulin Erdem, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1) (Krashin, Michael) 306 Filed & Entered: 01/12/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [290] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [291] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Their Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of YETI's Experts Jim Draper, Joe Martino, Kirk Deeter, and Dan Nelson entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [292] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [293] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [294] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [296] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [297] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [298] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [299] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [301] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [302] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of RTIC's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [303] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [304] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [305] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Dr. Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [306] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [307] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Strike and Objections entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 307 Filed & Entered: 01/13/2017Terminated: 01/13/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order - Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Motion to Strike and Objections to Portions of Plaintiffs Summary Judgment Evidence in Response to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl, # (4) Seale
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Correction - event modified to reflect correct document number: re Text Order GRANTING [218] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Dr. Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [218] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Dr. Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Modified on 12/20/2016 to correct document number (td).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [217] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [215] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [213] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [209] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion for Summary Judgement of No Fame, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (6) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (7) Sealed Document Ex 3, # (8) Sealed Document Ex 4, # (9) Sealed Document Ex 5, # (10) Sealed Document Ex 6, # (11) Sealed Document Ex 7, # (12) Sealed Document Ex 8, # (13) Sealed Document Ex 9, # (14) Sealed Document Ex 10, # (15) Sealed Document Ex 11, # (16) Sealed Document Ex 12, # (17) Sealed Document Ex 13, # (18) Sealed Document Ex 14, # (19) Sealed Document Ex 15, # (20) Sealed Document Ex 16, # (21) Sealed Document Ex 17, # (22) Sealed Document Ex 18-1, # (23) Sealed Document Ex 18-2, # (24) Sealed Document Ex 18-3, # (25) Sealed Document Ex 19-1, # (26) Sealed Document Ex 19-2, # (27) Sealed Document Ex 19-3, # (28) Sealed Document Ex 19-4, # (29) Sealed Document Ex 19-5, # (30) Sealed Document Ex 19-6, # (31) Sealed Document Ex 19-7, # (32) Sealed Document Ex 19-8, # (33) Sealed Document Ex 20, # (34) Sealed Document Ex 21, # (35) Sealed Document Ex 22, # (36) Sealed Document Ex 23-1, # (37) Sealed Document Ex 23-2, # (38) Sealed Document Ex 23-3, # (39) Sealed Document Ex 23-4, # (40) Sealed Document Ex 23-5, # (41) Sealed Document Ex 24, # (42) Sealed Document Ex 25, # (43) Sealed Document Ex 26-1, # (44) Sealed Document Ex 26-2, # (45) Sealed Document Ex 27, # (46) Sealed Document Ex 28, # (47) Sealed Document Ex 29, # (48) Sealed Document Ex 30, # (49) Sealed Document Ex 31, # (50) Sealed Document Ex 32, # (51) Sealed Document Ex 33, # (52) Sealed Document Ex 34, # (53) Sealed Document Ex 35, # (54) Sealed Document Ex 36, # (55) Sealed Document Ex 37, # (56) Sealed Document Ex 38, # (57) Sealed Document Ex 39, # (58) Sealed Document Ex 40, # (59) Sealed Document Ex 41, # (60) Sealed Document Ex 42, # (61) Sealed Document Ex 43, # (62) Sealed Document Ex 44, # (63) Sealed Document Ex 45, # (64) Sealed Document Ex 46, # (65) Sealed Document Ex 47, # (66) Sealed Document Ex 48, # (67) Sealed Document Ex 49, # (68) Sealed Document Ex 50, # (69) Sealed Document Ex 51, # (70) Sealed Document Ex 52) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ - No Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO MSJ - No Secondary Meaning, # (4) Sealed Document Prop Order, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 6-1, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 6-2, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 18, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 23-1, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 23-2, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 24) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ re Functionality, # (3) Sealed Document Sara Fish Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 1, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 2, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 3, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 4, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 1, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 2, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 3, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 4, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 5, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 6, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 7, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (36) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (37) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (38) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (39) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (40) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (41) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (42) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (43) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (44) Sealed Document Exhibit 32 part 1, # (45) Sealed Document Exhibit 32 part 2, # (46) Sealed Document Exhibit 33, # (47) Sealed Document Exhibit 34, # (48) Sealed Document Exhibit 35, # (49) Sealed Document Exhibit 36, # (50) Sealed Document Exhibit 37, # (51) Sealed Document Proposed Order for MSJ) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS FOR ITS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ re Invalidity, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration to MSJ re Invalidity, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 1, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 2, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 3, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 4, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 5, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 6, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 7, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (18) Sealed Document Proposed Order to MSJ re Invalidity) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [197] Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 211 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 210 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Michael A. Kamins. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 18, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 32, # (34) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM), # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM), # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit N, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit O, # (19) Sealed Document Prop Order re Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM)) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 208 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 1/28/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Yeti's Expert Wayne Hoyer. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Fish Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 207 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 206 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Yeti's Alleged Expert Jim Draper. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Fish Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Expert Dan Nelson. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Cunningham (LOC), # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration to Mot to Exclude Cunningham (LOC), # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Cunningham (LOC)) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Kamins Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration to Mot to Exclude Kamins Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 18, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 32, # (36) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Kamins Report) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [204] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [203] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [202] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [201] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [200] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Jim Draper entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [198] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Dan Nelson entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/18/2016, Entered: 12/18/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Hoyer Testimony, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration to Mot to Exclude Hoyer Testimony, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Hoyer Testimony) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/18/2016, Entered: 12/18/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Samuels Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Samuels Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Samuels Report) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/18/2016, Entered: 12/18/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Draper Report, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Nelson Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Draper Report) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/18/2016, Entered: 12/18/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Kirk D. Deeter by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/18/2016, Entered: 12/18/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Nelson Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Nelson Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Nelson Report) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016, Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Modify Schedulng Order (Joint) by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Notice of Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Ryan Nichols by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2016 re [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [157] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [172] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [178] MOTION to Compel filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold - ERO.)(td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [155] MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Berghammer, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [178] MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Proposed Order)(Rechtien, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 188 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Opposition to Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Wittenbraker and Bullock filed. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Eash, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit N, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit O, # (17) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016, Terminated: 12/13/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Ex B to D178) (Musselman, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [180] Motion for leave to File Sealed Document, [185] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Deficiency NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Bailey Harris: re [180] Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (td) 186 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE of Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [180] Motion for leave to File Sealed Document, [185] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey) 187 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016Terminated: 12/13/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Ex B to D178) (Musselman, P.) 188 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Sealed Document SEALED Opposition to Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Wittenbraker and Bullock filed. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Eash, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit N, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit O, # (17) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 189 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [178] MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Proposed Order)(Rechtien, Timothy) 190 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Berghammer, Joseph) 191 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC (Krashin, Michael) 192 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [155] MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Rechtien, Timothy) 193 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2016 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2016 re [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [157] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [172] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [178] MOTION to Compel filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold - ERO.)(td) 194 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2016 Notice of Filing NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Ryan Nichols by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (td) 195 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) 196 Filed & Entered: 12/16/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey) 197 Filed & Entered: 12/16/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Unopposed MOTION to Modify Schedulng Order (Joint) by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) 198 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Nelson Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Nelson Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Nelson Report) (Harris, Bailey) 199 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Motion to exclude MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Kirk D. Deeter by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 200 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Draper Report, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Nelson Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Draper Report) (Harris, Bailey) 201 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Samuels Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Samuels Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Samuels Report) (Harris, Bailey) 202 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Hoyer Testimony, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration to Mot to Exclude Hoyer Testimony, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Hoyer Testimony) (Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [198] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Dan Nelson entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [200] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Jim Draper entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [201] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [202] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [203] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [204] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 203 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Kamins Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration to Mot to Exclude Kamins Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 18, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 32, # (36) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Kamins Report) (Harris, Bailey) 204 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Cunningham (LOC), # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration to Mot to Exclude Cunningham (LOC), # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Cunningham (LOC)) (Harris, Bailey) 205 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Expert Dan Nelson. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 206 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Yeti's Alleged Expert Jim Draper. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Fish Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 207 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 208 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/28/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Yeti's Expert Wayne Hoyer. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Fish Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 209 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM), # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM), # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit N, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit O, # (19) Sealed Document Prop Order re Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM)) (Harris, Bailey) 210 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Michael A. Kamins. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 18, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 32, # (34) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 211 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 212 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ORDER GRANTING [197] Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 213 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ re Invalidity, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration to MSJ re Invalidity, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 1, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 2, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 3, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 4, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 5, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 6, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 7, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (18) Sealed Document Proposed Order to MSJ re Invalidity) (Harris, Bailey) 214 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS FOR ITS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 215 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 216 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ re Functionality, # (3) Sealed Document Sara Fish Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 1, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 2, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 3, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 4, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 1, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 2, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 3, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 4, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 5, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 6, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 7, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (36) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (37) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (38) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (39) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (40) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (41) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (42) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (43) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (44) Sealed Document Exhibit 32 part 1, # (45) Sealed Document Exhibit 32 part 2, # (46) Sealed Document Exhibit 33, # (47) Sealed Document Exhibit 34, # (48) Sealed Document Exhibit 35, # (49) Sealed Document Exhibit 36, # (50) Sealed Document Exhibit 37, # (51) Sealed Document Proposed Order for MSJ) (Harris, Bailey) 217 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 218 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 219 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ - No Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO MSJ - No Secondary Meaning, # (4) Sealed Document Prop Order, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 6-1, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 6-2, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 18, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 23-1, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 23-2, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 24) (Harris, Bailey) 220 Filed: 12/19/2016Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion for Summary Judgement of No Fame, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Proposed Order, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (6) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (7) Sealed Document Ex 3, # (8) Sealed Document Ex 4, # (9) Sealed Document Ex 5, # (10) Sealed Document Ex 6, # (11) Sealed Document Ex 7, # (12) Sealed Document Ex 8, # (13) Sealed Document Ex 9, # (14) Sealed Document Ex 10, # (15) Sealed Document Ex 11, # (16) Sealed Document Ex 12, # (17) Sealed Document Ex 13, # (18) Sealed Document Ex 14, # (19) Sealed Document Ex 15, # (20) Sealed Document Ex 16, # (21) Sealed Document Ex 17, # (22) Sealed Document Ex 18-1, # (23) Sealed Document Ex 18-2, # (24) Sealed Document Ex 18-3, # (25) Sealed Document Ex 19-1, # (26) Sealed Document Ex 19-2, # (27) Sealed Document Ex 19-3, # (28) Sealed Document Ex 19-4, # (29) Sealed Document Ex 19-5, # (30) Sealed Document Ex 19-6, # (31) Sealed Document Ex 19-7, # (32) Sealed Document Ex 19-8, # (33) Sealed Document Ex 20, # (34) Sealed Document Ex 21, # (35) Sealed Document Ex 22, # (36) Sealed Document Ex 23-1, # (37) Sealed Document Ex 23-2, # (38) Sealed Document Ex 23-3, # (39) Sealed Document Ex 23-4, # (40) Sealed Document Ex 23-5, # (41) Sealed Document Ex 24, # (42) Sealed Document Ex 25, # (43) Sealed Document Ex 26-1, # (44) Sealed Document Ex 26-2, # (45) Sealed Document Ex 27, # (46) Sealed Document Ex 28, # (47) Sealed Document Ex 29, # (48) Sealed Document Ex 30, # (49) Sealed Document Ex 31, # (50) Sealed Document Ex 32, # (51) Sealed Document Ex 33, # (52) Sealed Document Ex 34, # (53) Sealed Document Ex 35, # (54) Sealed Document Ex 36, # (55) Sealed Document Ex 37, # (56) Sealed Document Ex 38, # (57) Sealed Document Ex 39, # (58) Sealed Document Ex 40, # (59) Sealed Document Ex 41, # (60) Sealed Document Ex 42, # (61) Sealed Document Ex 43, # (62) Sealed Document Ex 44, # (63) Sealed Document Ex 45, # (64) Sealed Document Ex 46, # (65) Sealed Document Ex 47, # (66) Sealed Document Ex 48, # (67) Sealed Document Ex 49, # (68) Sealed Document Ex 50, # (69) Sealed Document Ex 51, # (70) Sealed Document Ex 52) (Arbaugh, Natalie) Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [209] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [213] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [215] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [217] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [218] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Dr. Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Modified on 12/20/2016 to correct document number (td). Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice of Correction Notice of Correction - event modified to reflect correct document number: re Text Order GRANTING [218] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative to Exclude the Testimony of, Dr. Tulin Erdem entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) (td) 221 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Deficiency Notice DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Bailey Harris: re [213] Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (td) 222 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Deficiency Notice DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Bailey Harris: re [216] Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (td) 223 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [221] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey) 224 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [222] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey) 225 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Isabella Cunningham Concerning Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[209] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 226 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 102(b). Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[213] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 227 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/28/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[215] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 228 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[217] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 229 Filed & Entered: 12/20/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[218] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [220] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not "Famous" entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [219] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [216] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that YETI's Asserted Trade Dress Is Not Protectable Due to Functionality entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [214] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits for its Motions for Partial Summary Judgment entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 230 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Due to Functionality. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[216] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 231 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not Protectable Because it Has Not Acquired Secondary Meaning. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[219] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 232 Filed & Entered: 12/21/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Yeti's Asserted Trade Dress is Not "Famous" Under Federal and State Trademark Dilution Standards. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[220] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 233 Filed: 12/21/2016Entered: 12/22/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [205] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [227] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [199] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Kirk D. Deeter filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [210] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [183] MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Joe Martino filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [225] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [208] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [228] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [211] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [229] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [206] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 234 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Wind, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Exclude Wind, # (4) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (6) Sealed Document Prop Order) (Harris, Bailey) 235 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 236 Filed & Entered: 12/22/2016Terminated: 12/23/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [234] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [235] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/23/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [236] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 237 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Expert Yoram Wind.Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[234] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 238 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016Terminated: 01/28/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Rebecca Kirk Fair. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[235] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 239 Filed: 12/23/2016Entered: 12/27/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar Relating the Apportionment of Defendants' Profits. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #[236] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td) 240 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [239] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [237] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [238] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 241 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016Terminated: 01/01/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 242 Filed & Entered: 12/28/2016Terminated: 01/09/2017 Motion to Stay MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 243 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/03/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [242] MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 244 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/05/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint MOTION for Pretrial Scheduling Conference by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 245 Filed & Entered: 12/29/2016Terminated: 01/01/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David KIamer, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 246 Filed & Entered: 12/30/2016Terminated: 01/03/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Extension of Time)(Harris, Bailey) 248 Filed: 12/30/2016Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion to Quash ORDER MOOTING [154] Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [157] Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING [161] Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING [163] Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART [168] Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART [168] Motion for Contempt; GRANTING [172] Sealed Motion to Continue; GRANTING [178] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm) Filed & Entered: 01/01/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [241] Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Any Daubert motion or objections concerning Defendants' expert, Sarah Butler, must be filed on or before January 23, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/01/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [245] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 247 Filed: 01/01/2017Entered: 01/03/2017Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Yetti's Sealed Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kzmer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6) (dm) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [243] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings entered by Judge Robert Pitman. YETI's Response is due FRIDAY, DECEMBER 6, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply AMENDED Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [243] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of PTO Proceedings entered by Judge Robert Pitman. YETI's Response is due FRIDAY, JANUARY 6, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/03/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text Order GRANTING [246] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of David Kazmer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' Response is due on January 13, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 249 Filed & Entered: 01/04/2017 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [247] Sealed Motion to Exclude filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dm) 250 Filed & Entered: 01/04/2017Terminated: 01/05/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Certain of its Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Text Order GRANTING [250] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Certain of Its Oppositions to Defendants' Motions entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Text Order GRANTING [244] Joint Motion for Pretrial Scheduling Conference entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court hereby sets and directs the parties, or counsel acting on their behalf, to appear by phone for a telephone conference on Tuesday, January 10, 2017, at 9:00 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff shall be responsible for coordinating the call and providing dial-in information at least 24 hours prior to the hearing to the Courtroom Deputy at julie_golden@txwd.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 251 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Transcript Filed Transcript filed of Proceedings held on December 14, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/26/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2017, (Rodriguez, Arlinda) 252 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach (Dkt. No. 228), # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Sara Fish In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Opposition) (Harris, Bailey) 253 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony and Report of Hoyer, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin in support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Wayne Hoyer, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 254 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order for Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Yeti's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar re Apportionment of Defendants' Profits, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Yeti's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar, # (4) Exhibit A-1 and A-2, # (5) Proposed Order Proposed Order re Opposition to Yeti's Motion to Exclude Vollmar) (Harris, Bailey) 255 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for RTIC Oppositions to 1) Golder Daubert and 2) Kirk Fair Daubert by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth) 256 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Defendant's Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration in Support of Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Proposed Order - Opposition to Kirk Fair Daubert) (Harris, Bailey) 257 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [207] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Rechtien, Timothy) 258 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to YETI's Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Bailey K. Harris In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C-1 to Opposition, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit C-2 to Opposition, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit D-1 to Opposition, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit D-2 to Opposition, # (10) Sealed Document Proposed Order on Opposition) (Harris, Bailey) 259 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Motion to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (2) Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (3) Sealed Document Gaddis Declaration ISO Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (4) Sealed Document Prop Order - Defendants' Opposition to Erdem Daubert, # (5) Sealed Document Ex A, # (6) Sealed Document Ex B1, # (7) Sealed Document Ex B2, # (8) Sealed Document Ex C1, # (9) Sealed Document Ex C2, # (10) Sealed Document Ex D1, # (11) Sealed Document Ex D2, # (12) Sealed Document Ex E1, # (13) Sealed Document Ex E2, # (14) Sealed Document Ex F, # (15) Sealed Document Ex G1, # (16) Sealed Document Ex G2, # (17) Sealed Document Ex H, # (18) Sealed Document Ex I, # (19) Sealed Document Ex J, # (20) Sealed Document Ex K1, # (21) Sealed Document Ex K2, # (22) Sealed Document Ex L1, # (23) Sealed Document Ex L2, # (24) Sealed Document Ex M, # (25) Sealed Document Ex N, # (26) Sealed Document Ex O) (Harris, Bailey) 260 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham concerning Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 261 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Yoram Wind, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 262 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham concerning Likelihood of Confusion, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 263 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony and Reports of Messrs. Deeter, Nelson, Draper and Martino, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 264 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Functionality, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 101, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 102, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 103, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 104, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 105, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 106, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 107, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 108, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 109, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 110, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 111, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 112, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 113, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 1, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 2, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 3, # (20) Proposed Order Exhibit 114 - part 4, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 5, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 6, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 7, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 114 - part 8, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 115, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 116, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 117, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 118, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 119, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 120, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 121, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 122, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 123, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 124, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 125, # (36) Sealed Document Exhibit 126, # (37) Sealed Document Exhibit 127, # (38) Sealed Document Exhibit 128, # (39) Sealed Document Exhibit 129, # (40) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 265 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is no Protectable because it has not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document V. Webb Declaration in Support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That YETI's Asserted Trade Dress is no Protectable because it has not Acquired Secondary Meaning, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. 101, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. 102, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. 103, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. 104, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. 105, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 1 of 9), # (10) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 2 of 9), # (11) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 3 of 9), # (12) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 4 of 9), # (13) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 5 of 9), # (14) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 6 of 9), # (15) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 7 of 9), # (16) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 8 of 9), # (17) Sealed Document Ex. 106 (Part 9 of 9), # (18) Sealed Document Ex. 107, # (19) Sealed Document Ex. 108, # (20) Sealed Document Ex. 109, # (21) Sealed Document Ex. 110, # (22) Sealed Document Ex. 111, # (23) Sealed Document Ex. 112, # (24) Sealed Document Ex. 113, # (25) Sealed Document Ex. 114, # (26) Sealed Document Ex. 115, # (27) Sealed Document Ex. 116, # (28) Sealed Document Ex. 117, # (29) Sealed Document Ex. 118, # (30) Sealed Document Ex. 119, # (31) Sealed Document Ex. 120, # (32) Sealed Document Ex. 121, # (33) Sealed Document Ex. 122, # (34) Sealed Document Ex. 123, # (35) Sealed Document Ex. 124, # (36) Sealed Document Ex. 125, # (37) Sealed Document Ex. 126, # (38) Sealed Document Ex. 127, # (39) Sealed Document Ex. 128, # (40) Sealed Document Ex. 129, # (41) Sealed Document Ex. 130, # (42) Sealed Document Ex. 131, # (43) Sealed Document Ex. 132, # (44) Sealed Document Ex. 133, # (45) Sealed Document Ex. 134, # (46) Sealed Document Ex. 135, # (47) Sealed Document Ex. 136, # (48) Sealed Document Ex. 137, # (49) Sealed Document Ex. 138, # (50) Sealed Document Ex. 139, # (51) Sealed Document Ex. 140, # (52) Sealed Document Ex. 141, # (53) Sealed Document Ex. 142, # (54) Sealed Document Ex. 143, # (55) Sealed Document Ex. 144, # (56) Sealed Document Ex. 145, # (57) Sealed Document Ex. 146, # (58) Sealed Document Ex. 147, # (59) Sealed Document Ex. 148, # (60) Sealed Document Ex. 149, # (61) Sealed Document Ex. 150, # (62) Sealed Document Ex. 151, # (63) Sealed Document Ex. 152, # (64) Sealed Document Ex. 153, # (65) Sealed Document Ex. 154, # (66) Sealed Document Ex. 155, # (67) Sealed Document Ex. 156, # (68) Sealed Document Ex. 157, # (69) Sealed Document Ex. 158, # (70) Sealed Document Ex. 159, # (71) Sealed Document Ex. 160, # (72) Sealed Document Ex. 161, # (73) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 266 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Michael Kamins, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) 267 Filed & Entered: 01/05/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # (3) Sealed Document T. Rechtien Declaration in Support of YETI's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. 2, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. 3, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. 4, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. 5, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. 6, # (10) Sealed Document Ex. 7, # (11) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 1 of 3), # (12) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 2 of 3), # (13) Sealed Document Ex. 8 (Part 3 of 3), # (14) Sealed Document Ex. 9 (Part 1 of 2), # (15) Sealed Document Ex. 9 (Part 2 of 2), # (16) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 268 Filed: 01/05/2017Entered: 01/06/2017Terminated: 01/06/2017 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re Fame, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (4) Sealed Document 101, # (5) Sealed Document 102, # (6) Sealed Document 103, # (7) Sealed Document 104, # (8) Sealed Document 105, # (9) Sealed Document 106, # (10) Sealed Document 107, # (11) Sealed Document 109, # (12) Sealed Document 110, # (13) Sealed Document 111, # (14) Sealed Document 112, # (15) Sealed Document 113, # (16) Sealed Document 114, # (17) Sealed Document 115, # (18) Sealed Document 116, # (19) Sealed Document 117, # (20) Sealed Document 118, # (21) Sealed Document 119, # (22) Sealed Document 120, # (23) Sealed Document 121-1, # (24) Sealed Document 121-2, # (25) Sealed Document 121-3, # (26) Sealed Document 121-4, # (27) Sealed Document 121-5, # (28) Sealed Document 121-6, # (29) Sealed Document 121-7, # (30) Sealed Document 121-8, # (31) Sealed Document 121-9, # (32) Sealed Document 121-10, # (33) Sealed Document 121-11, # (34) Sealed Document 121-12, # (35) Sealed Document 121-13, # (36) Sealed Document 121-14, # (37) Sealed Document 121-15, # (38) Sealed Document 122, # (39) Sealed Document 126, # (40) Sealed Document 127, # (41) Sealed Document 128, # (42) Sealed Document 129, # (43) Sealed Document 130, # (44) Sealed Document 131, # (45) Sealed Document 133, # (46) Sealed Document 134, # (47) Sealed Document 135, # (48) Sealed Document 136, # (49) Sealed Document 137, # (50) Sealed Document 138, # (51) Sealed Document 139, # (52) Sealed Document 140-1, # (53) Sealed Document 140-2, # (54) Sealed Document 141, # (55) Sealed Document 142, # (56) Sealed Document 150, # (57) Sealed Document 151, # (58) Sealed Document 152, # (59) Sealed Document 153, # (60) Sealed Document 154, # (61) Sealed Document 155, # (62) Sealed Document 156, # (63) Sealed Document 157, # (64) Sealed Document 158, # (65) Sealed Document 159, # (66) Sealed Document 160, # (67) Sealed Document 161, # (68) Sealed Document 162, # (69) Sealed Document 163, # (70) Sealed Document 164, # (71) Sealed Document 165, # (72) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [252] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [253] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of YETI's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [254] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to YETI's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Ronald Vollmar entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Text Order GRANTING [255] RTIC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Certain of Its Oppositions to Plaintiff's Daubert Motions entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 01/06/2017 Or
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [187] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit B to [178] Defendants' Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [180] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ddd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/13/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [178] MOTION to Compel filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2017 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Joe Martino by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth Brenckman, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [172] Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Affidavit Marinelli Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016, Terminated: 12/13/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Wittenbraker and Bullock, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Eash In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. C to Opposition, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. D to Opposition, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. E to Opposition, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. F to Opposition, # (10) Sealed Document Ex. G to Opposition, # (11) Sealed Document Ex. H to Opposition, # (12) Sealed Document Ex. I to Opposition, # (13) Sealed Document Ex. J to Opposition, # (14) Sealed Document Ex. K to Opposition, # (15) Sealed Document Ex. L to Opposition, # (16) Sealed Document Ex. M to Opposition, # (17) Sealed Document Ex. N to Opposition, # (18) Sealed Document Ex. O to Opposition, # (19) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Opposition) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [155] MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016, Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Affidavit of Sara Fish, # (6) Proposed Order)(Musselman, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [160] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney John R. Lane entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [167] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Scott A. Burrow entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order - Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Brief ISO of Motion to Compel Supplemetal Response to Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of 30(b)(6) Witness on Topic of Trade Dress, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (6) Sealed Document Ex 3, # (7) Sealed Document Ex 4, # (8) Sealed Document Ex 5, # (9) Sealed Document Ex 6, # (10) Sealed Document Ex 7, # (11) Sealed Document Ex 8, # (12) Sealed Document Prop Order - Brief ISO of Motion to Compel Supplemetal Response to Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of 30(b)(6) Witness on Topic of Trade Dress) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen to Compel the Continuation of the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Corey Maynard (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Berghammer, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen and Notice of Withdrawal of YETI's Subpoena to Denise Martin (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on [172] Sealed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen: Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [172] Sealed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 172 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016, Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Motion for Compelling The Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R.M. Webb, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (15) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [171] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016, Terminated: 12/7/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (17) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on [154] Third-Party Denise Marie Martin's Motion to Quash, [157] YETI's Motion to Compel, [161] Defendants' Motion to Compel the Continuation of the 30(b)(6) Deposition of YETI Coolers, LLC's Designated Deponent Corey Maynard, [163] Opposed Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas, and [168] YETI's Second Motion to Compel and Motion for Contempt and Sanctions Regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files. (Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin; Response to any motions due by 5:00 pm on 12/12/2016). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (kkc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016, Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION to Compel , MOTION for Contempt , MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Berghammer, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016, Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Scott A. Burrow ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9095515) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katie L. Becker on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Becker, Katie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016, Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Webb Declaration ISO Motion to Quash, # (2) Exhibit 1 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (3) Exhibit 2 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (4) Exhibit 3 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (5) Exhibit 4 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (6) Exhibit 5 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (7) Exhibit 6 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (8) Exhibit 7 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (9) Exhibit 8 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (10) Proposed Order)(Meek, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 161 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016, Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Propsed Order) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [159] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016, Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of John R. Lane ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9088714) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016, Terminated: 12/5/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Compel, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Compel, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Proposed Order on Motion to Compel) (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [157] Sealed Motion to Compel filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 157 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016, Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 13) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order MOOTING [155] YETI's Redacted Motion to Compel, entered by Judge Robert Pitman, in light of [157] YETI's Sealed Motion to Compel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [156] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016, Terminated: 12/1/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016, Terminated: 12/1/2016 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016, Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript filed of Proceedings held on November 8, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion to Compel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/14/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2017, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Pieter van Es on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (van Es, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [134] Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackob Ben-Ezra on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC (Ben-Ezra, Jackob)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [149] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Jason S. Shull entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [147] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Sheryl Koval Garko entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Text Order GRANTING [146] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Mark S. Puzella entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016, Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Jason S. Shull ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9036191) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: 11/15/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Laatsch Fink on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Fink, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016, Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Sheryl Koval Garko ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9034097) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016, Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Mark S. Puzella ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9034037) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [141] Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Discovery due by 12/6/2016, Motions due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [143] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: 11/8/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2016 re [134] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold - ERO.)(td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016, Terminated: 11/10/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document YETI's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4)(Krashin, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2016: # (6) SEALED Exhibit) (klw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016, Terminated: 11/10/2016 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Resolve Docket No. 128 by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [136] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Katrina G. Eash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [135] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty William Rueger Poynter entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information, [134] Sealed Motion filed ( Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/26/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [134] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016, Terminated: 11/2/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Katrina G. Eash ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8975167) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016, Terminated: 11/2/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of William Rueger Poynter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8975121) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 134 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: 10/24/2016, Terminated: 11/16/2016 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3, # (2) Exhibit 4, # (3) Exhibit 5, # (4) Exhibit 6, # (5) Exhibit 7, # (6) Exhibit 8, # (7) Exhibit 11, # (8) Exhibit 12, # (9) Exhibit 13, # (10) Exhibit 14, # (11) Exhibit 15, # (12) Exhibit 16, # (13) Exhibit 17, # (14) Exhibit 19, # (15) Exhibit 21) (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Text Order GRANTING [133] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016, Terminated: 10/24/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document YETI's Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (17) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016, Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17, # (19) Exhibit 18, # (20) Exhibit 19, # (21) Exhibit 20, # (22) Exhibit 21, # (23) Exhibit 22, # (24) Exhibit 23, # (25) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc S. Cooperman on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Cooperman, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Text Order GRANTING [127] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Two Additional Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016, Terminated: 12/6/2016 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Exhibit 13, # (16) Exhibit 14, # (17) Exhibit 15, # (18) Exhibit 16, # (19) Exhibit 17, # (20) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016, Terminated: 10/14/2016 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT [119] Motion to Compel; GRANTING [125] Joint Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016, Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Withdraw [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Musselman, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text Order GRANTING [123] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Saranya Raghavan entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Fred Smith)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016, Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Saranya Raghavan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8925303) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [121] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Michael A. Bittner entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016, Terminated: 10/5/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh on behalf of Michael A. Bittner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8908140) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [118] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Timothy J. Rechtien entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Kayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016, Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: 9/28/2016, Terminated: 10/4/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Timothy J. Rechtien ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8888387) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [113] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Yeti Coolers, LLC.(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ADOPTING [109] Revised Report and Recommendation filed by Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [115] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Elizabeth Brenckman entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: 9/13/2016, Terminated: 9/19/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris for Elizabeth Brenckman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8842742) by on behalf of RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/5/2016. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [114] Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The dispositive motions deadline is now December 5, 2016. Trial remains set for February 21, 2017. The parties are advised that no further delays will be granted. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016, Terminated: 9/13/2016 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Second [64] Amended Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Yeti Coolers, LLC by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party James Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party John Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party RTIC Coolers, LLC(pty:dft) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Redacted Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Redacted Transcript filed re: [86] Transcript. (Andasola, Pamela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [91] Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [97] Motion to Dismiss and Strike; GRANTING [101] Motion to Redact re [86] Transcript. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Revised Report and Recommendations of the Special Master Regarding United States Patent No.'s, 8,910,819 and 9,187,232 by Karl Bayer (Attachments: # (1) Memo in Support Revised Claim Summary Chart, # (2) Memo in Support)(Bayer, Karl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Report and Recommendations of the Special Master Regarding United States Patent No.'s 8,910,819 and 9,187,232 by Karl Bayer (Attachments: # (1) Memo in Support Claim Summary, # (2) Memo in Support Claim Chart)(Bayer, Karl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE Corrected Rebuttal Post-Markman Brief by RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF by RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Notice of Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing JOINT Notice of Filing of the Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) The Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: 6/7/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF regarding [95] Brief by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 30, # (3) Exhibit 31)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, re [91] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims filed by Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [83] MOTION to Dismiss RTIC's Counterclaims Relating to Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability and MOTION to Strike [70] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Certain of RTIC's Affirmative Defenses) MOTION to Stay filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Berghammer, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: 5/31/2016, Terminated: 8/1/2016 Motion to Redact Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Redact re [86] Transcript by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to [98] Response in Opposition to Motion, by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Deficiency NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Michael Krashin: re [98] Response in Opposition to Motion. (td) 100 Filed & Entered: 05/26/2016 Attachment ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to [98] Response in Opposition to Motion, by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Krashin, Michael) 101 Filed & Entered: 05/31/2016Terminated: 08/01/2016 Motion to Redact Transcript Opposed MOTION to Redact re [86] Transcript by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) 102 Filed & Entered: 05/31/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [83] MOTION to Dismiss RTIC's Counterclaims Relating to Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability and MOTION to Strike [70] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Certain of RTIC's Affirmative Defenses) MOTION to Stay filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Berghammer, Joseph) 103 Filed & Entered: 06/01/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, re [91] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims filed by Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey) 104 Filed & Entered: 06/07/2016 Brief BRIEF regarding [95] Brief by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 30, # (3) Exhibit 31)(Krashin, Michael) 105 Filed & Entered: 06/07/2016 Notice of Filing NOTICE of Filing JOINT Notice of Filing of the Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) The Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Krashin, Michael) 106 Filed & Entered: 06/08/2016 Brief BRIEF by RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Harris, Bailey) 107 Filed & Entered: 06/08/2016 Response RESPONSE Corrected Rebuttal Post-Markman Brief by RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Harris, Bailey) 108 Filed & Entered: 07/05/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE of Filing Report and Recommendations of the Special Master Regarding United States Patent No.'s 8,910,819 and 9,187,232 by Karl Bayer (Attachments: # (1) Memo in Support Claim Summary, # (2) Memo in Support Claim Chart)(Bayer, Karl) 109 Filed & Entered: 07/12/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE of Filing Revised Report and Recommendations of the Special Master Regarding United States Patent No.'s, 8,910,819 and 9,187,232 by Karl Bayer (Attachments: # (1) Memo in Support Revised Claim Summary Chart, # (2) Memo in Support)(Bayer, Karl) 110 Filed & Entered: 08/01/2016 Order on Motion to Dismiss ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [91] Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [97] Motion to Dismiss and Strike; GRANTING [101] Motion to Redact re [86] Transcript. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 111 Filed & Entered: 08/01/2016 Redacted Transcript Redacted Transcript filed re: [86] Transcript. (Andasola, Pamela) 112 Filed & Entered: 08/31/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party James Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party John Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party RTIC Coolers, LLC(pty:dft) (Arbaugh, Natalie) 113 Filed & Entered: 09/06/2016 Amended Answer to Complaint AMENDED ANSWER to Second [64] Amended Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Yeti Coolers, LLC by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. (Harris, Bailey) 114 Filed & Entered: 09/12/2016Terminated: 09/13/2016 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 09/13/2016 Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Text Order GRANTING [114] Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The dispositive motions deadline is now December 5, 2016. Trial remains set for February 21, 2017. The parties are advised that no further delays will be granted. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Filed: 09/13/2016Entered: 09/14/2016 Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/5/2016. (td) 115 Filed & Entered: 09/13/2016Terminated: 09/19/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris for Elizabeth Brenckman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8842742) by on behalf of RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 09/19/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [115] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Elizabeth Brenckman entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 116 Filed: 09/21/2016Entered: 09/22/2016 Order ORDER ADOPTING [109] Revised Report and Recommendation filed by Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 117 Filed & Entered: 09/23/2016 Answer to Counterclaim ANSWER to [113] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Yeti Coolers, LLC.(Krashin, Michael) 118 Filed & Entered: 09/28/2016Terminated: 10/04/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Timothy J. Rechtien ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8888387) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin) 119 Filed & Entered: 09/30/2016Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 120 Filed & Entered: 10/03/2016 Order ORDER REFERRING [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Kayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) Filed & Entered: 10/04/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [118] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Timothy J. Rechtien entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 121 Filed & Entered: 10/04/2016Terminated: 10/05/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh on behalf of Michael A. Bittner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8908140) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) Filed & Entered: 10/05/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [121] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Michael A. Bittner entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 122 Filed & Entered: 10/07/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 123 Filed & Entered: 10/10/2016Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Saranya Raghavan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8925303) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin) 124 Filed & Entered: 10/10/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Fred Smith)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 10/12/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [123] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Saranya Raghavan entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 125 Filed & Entered: 10/12/2016Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Withdraw Joint MOTION to Withdraw [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Musselman, P.) 126 Filed: 10/12/2016Entered: 10/13/2016 Order on Motion to Compel ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT [119] Motion to Compel; GRANTING [125] Joint Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 127 Filed & Entered: 10/13/2016Terminated: 10/14/2016 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 128 Filed & Entered: 10/13/2016Terminated: 12/06/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Exhibit 13, # (16) Exhibit 14, # (17) Exhibit 15, # (18) Exhibit 16, # (19) Exhibit 17, # (20) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 10/14/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Text Order GRANTING [127] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Two Additional Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 129 Filed & Entered: 10/17/2016 Order ORDER REFERRING [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 130 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) 131 Filed & Entered: 10/21/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc S. Cooperman on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Cooperman, Marc) 132 Filed & Entered: 10/21/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Compel Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17, # (19) Exhibit 18, # (20) Exhibit 19, # (21) Exhibit 20, # (22) Exhibit 21, # (23) Exhibit 22, # (24) Exhibit 23, # (25) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 133 Filed & Entered: 10/21/2016Terminated: 10/24/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document YETI's Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (17) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 10/24/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [133] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 134 Filed & Entered: 10/24/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3, # (2) Exhibit 4, # (3) Exhibit 5, # (4) Exhibit 6, # (5) Exhibit 7, # (6) Exhibit 8, # (7) Exhibit 11, # (8) Exhibit 12, # (9) Exhibit 13, # (10) Exhibit 14, # (11) Exhibit 15, # (12) Exhibit 16, # (13) Exhibit 17, # (14) Exhibit 19, # (15) Exhibit 21) (td) 135 Filed & Entered: 10/25/2016Terminated: 11/02/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of William Rueger Poynter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8975121) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 136 Filed & Entered: 10/25/2016Terminated: 11/02/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Katrina G. Eash ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8975167) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 137 Filed & Entered: 10/26/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [134] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 138 Filed & Entered: 10/27/2016 Order ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information, [134] Sealed Motion filed ( Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td) 139 Filed & Entered: 10/28/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey) 140 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 11/02/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [135] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty William Rueger Poynter entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) Filed & Entered: 11/02/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [136] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Katrina G. Eash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 141 Filed & Entered: 11/04/2016Terminated: 11/10/2016 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Resolve Docket No. 128 by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 142 Filed & Entered: 11/07/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4)(Krashin, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2016: # (6) SEALED Exhibit) (klw). 143 Filed & Entered: 11/07/2016Terminated: 11/10/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document YETI's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 144 Filed & Entered: 11/08/2016 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2016 re [134] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold - ERO.)(td) Filed & Entered: 11/10/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [143] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 145 Filed & Entered: 11/10/2016 Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines ORDER GRANTING [141] Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Discovery due by 12/6/2016, Motions due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 146 Filed & Entered: 11/14/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Mark S. Puzella ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9034037) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 147 Filed & Entered: 11/14/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Sheryl Koval Garko ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9034097) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 148 Filed & Entered: 11/15/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Laatsch Fink on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Fink, Katherine) 149 Filed & Entered: 11/15/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Jason S. Shull ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9036191) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin) Filed & Entered: 11/16/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [146] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Mark S. Puzella entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) Filed & Entered: 11/16/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [147] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Sheryl Koval Garko entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) Filed & Entered: 11/16/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [149] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Jason S. Shull entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 150 Filed & Entered: 11/16/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackob Ben-Ezra on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC (Ben-Ezra, Jackob) 151 Filed: 11/16/2016Entered: 11/17/2016 Order on Sealed Motion ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [134] Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm) 152 Filed & Entered: 11/18/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Pieter van Es on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (van Es, J.) 153 Filed & Entered: 11/23/2016 Transcript Filed Transcript filed of Proceedings held on November 8, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion to Compel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/14/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2017, (Rodriguez, Arlinda) 154 Filed & Entered: 11/30/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Quash MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Harris, Bailey) 155 Filed & Entered: 11/30/2016Terminated: 12/01/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 156 Filed & Entered: 11/30/2016Terminated: 12/01/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 12/01/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [156] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/01/2016 Order on Motion to Compel Text Order MOOTING [155] YETI's Redacted Motion to Compel, entered by Judge Robert Pitman, in light of [157] YETI's Sealed Motion to Compel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 157 Filed & Entered: 12/01/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 13) (td) 158 Filed: 12/01/2016Entered: 12/02/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [157] Sealed Motion to Compel filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 159 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2016Terminated: 12/05/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Compel, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Compel, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Proposed Order on Motion to Compel) (Harris, Bailey) 160 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2016Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of John R. Lane ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9088714) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 12/05/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [159] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 161 Filed & Entered: 12/05/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Propsed Order) (td) 162 Filed & Entered: 12/05/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 163 Filed & Entered: 12/05/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Quash Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Webb Declaration ISO Motion to Quash, # (2) Exhibit 1 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (3) Exhibit 2 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (4) Exhibit 3 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (5) Exhibit 4 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (6) Exhibit 5 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (7) Exhibit 6 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (8) Exhibit 7 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (9) Exhibit 8 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (10) Proposed Order)(Meek, Kevin) 164 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Order ORDER REFERRING [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 165 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 166 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katie L. Becker on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Becker, Katie) 167 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Scott A. Burrow ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9095515) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin) 168 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Compel Second MOTION to Compel , MOTION for Contempt , MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Berghammer, Joseph) 169 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 170 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Order Setting Hearing on Motion ORDER Setting Hearing on [154] Third-Party Denise Marie Martin's Motion to Quash, [157] YETI's Motion to Compel, [161] Defendants' Motion to Compel the Continuation of the 30(b)(6) Deposition of YETI Coolers, LLC's Designated Deponent Corey Maynard, [163] Opposed Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas, and [168] YETI's Second Motion to Compel and Motion for Contempt and Sanctions Regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files. (Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin; Response to any motions due by 5:00 pm on 12/12/2016). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (kkc) 171 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016Terminated: 12/07/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (17) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [171] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 172 Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Compelling The Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R.M. Webb, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (15) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 173 Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [172] Sealed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 174 Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016 Order Setting Hearing on Motion ORDER Setting Hearing on [172] Sealed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen: Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td) 175 Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016 Response to Motion RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen and Notice of Withdrawal of YETI's Subpoena to Denise Martin (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 176 Filed & Entered: 12/09/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen to Compel the Continuation of the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Corey Maynard (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Berghammer, Joseph) 177 Filed & Entered: 12/09/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order - Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Brief ISO of Motion to Compel Supplemetal Response to Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of 30(b)(6) Witness on Topic of Trade Dress, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (6) Sealed Document Ex 3, # (7) Sealed Document Ex 4, # (8) Sealed Document Ex 5, # (9) Sealed Document Ex 6, # (10) Sealed Document Ex 7, # (11) Sealed Document Ex 8, # (12) Sealed Document Prop Order - Brief ISO of Motion to Compel Supplemetal Response to Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of 30(b)(6) Witness on Topic of Trade Dress) (Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [167] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Scott A. Burrow entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [160] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney John R. Lane entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 178 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Affidavit of Sara Fish, # (6) Proposed Order)(Musselman, P.) 179 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [155] MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 180 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016Terminated: 12/13/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Wittenbraker and Bullock, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Eash In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. C to Opposition, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. D to Opposition, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. E to Opposition, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. F to Opposition, # (10) Sealed Document Ex. G to Opposition, # (11) Sealed Document Ex. H to Opposition, # (12) Sealed Document Ex. I to Opposition, # (13) Sealed Document Ex. J to Opposition, # (14) Sealed Document Ex. K to Opposition, # (15) Sealed Document Ex. L to Opposition, # (16) Sealed Document Ex. M to Opposition, # (17) Sealed Document Ex. N to Opposition, # (18) Sealed Document Ex. O to Opposition, # (19) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Opposition) (Harris, Bailey) 181 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Affidavit Marinelli Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth) 182 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [172] Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 183 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Motion to exclude MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Joe Martino by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth Brenckman, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth) 184 Filed: 12/12/2016Entered: 12/13/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [178] MOTION to Compel filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [180] Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ddd) Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [187] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit B to [178] Defendants' Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 185 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Deficiency Notice DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Bailey Harris: re [180] Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (td) 186 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE of Corrected Certificate of Service by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC re [180] Motion for leave to File Sealed Document, [185] Deficiency Notice (Harris, Bailey) 187 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016Terminated: 12/13/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Ex B to D178) (Musselman, P.) 188 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Sealed Document SEALED Opposition to Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Wittenbraker and Bullock filed. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Eash, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit N, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit O, # (17) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 189 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [178] MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Proposed Order)(Rechtien, Timothy) 190 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Berghammer, Joseph) 191 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC (Krashin, Michael) 192 Filed & Entered: 12/13/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [155] MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Rechtien, Timothy) 193 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2016 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2016 re [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [157] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [172] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [178] MOTION to Compel filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold - ERO.)(td) 194 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2016 Notice of Filing NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Ryan Nichols by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (td) 195 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) 196 Filed & Entered: 12/16/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey) 197 Filed & Entered: 12/16/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Unopposed MOTION to Modify Schedulng Order (Joint) by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) 198 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Nelson Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Nelson Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Nelson Report) (Harris, Bailey) 199 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Motion to exclude MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Report of YETI's Alleged Expert Kirk D. Deeter by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Bailey K. Harris, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 200 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Draper Report, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Nelson Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Draper Report) (Harris, Bailey) 201 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Samuels Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration ISO Mot to Exclude Samuels Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Samuels Report) (Harris, Bailey) 202 Filed & Entered: 12/18/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Hoyer Testimony, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration to Mot to Exclude Hoyer Testimony, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Hoyer Testimony) (Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [198] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Dan Nelson entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [200] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of YETI's Expert Jim Draper entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [201] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [202] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Wayne Hoyer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [203] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Michael A. Kamins entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [204] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of YETI's Expert Isabella Cunningham entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 203 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Kamins Report, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration to Mot to Exclude Kamins Report, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 18, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 32, # (36) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Kamins Report) (Harris, Bailey) 204 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/19/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Cunningham (LOC), # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration to Mot to Exclude Cunningham (LOC), # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Mot to Exclude Cunningham (LOC)) (Harris, Bailey) 205 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Expert Dan Nelson. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 206 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Yeti's Alleged Expert Jim Draper. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Fish Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 207 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Plaintiff's Expert Jeffrey M. Samuels (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 208 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/28/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Yeti's Expert Wayne Hoyer. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Fish Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 209 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM), # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM), # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit N, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit O, # (19) Sealed Document Prop Order re Motion to Exclude Cunningham (SM)) (Harris, Bailey) 210 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Yeti's Michael A. Kamins. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 18, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 32, # (34) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 211 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 01/27/2017 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Isabella Cunningham on Likelihood of Confusion. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 212 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ORDER GRANTING [197] Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 213 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ re Invalidity, # (3) Sealed Document Fish Declaration to MSJ re Invalidity, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit A - Sec 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 1, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 2, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 3, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 4, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 5, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 6, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit B - Sec 7, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (18) Sealed Document Proposed Order to MSJ re Invalidity) (Harris, Bailey) 214 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS FOR ITS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 215 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Peter Golder, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 216 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ re Functionality, # (3) Sealed Document Sara Fish Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 1, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 2, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 3, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 14 part 4, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (22) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (23) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (24) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 1, # (25) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 2, # (26) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 3, # (27) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 4, # (28) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 5, # (29) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 6, # (30) Sealed Document Exhibit 18 part 7, # (31) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (32) Sealed Document Exhibit 20, # (33) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (34) Sealed Document Exhibit 22, # (35) Sealed Document Exhibit 23, # (36) Sealed Document Exhibit 24, # (37) Sealed Document Exhibit 25, # (38) Sealed Document Exhibit 26, # (39) Sealed Document Exhibit 27, # (40) Sealed Document Exhibit 28, # (41) Sealed Document Exhibit 29, # (42) Sealed Document Exhibit 30, # (43) Sealed Document Exhibit 31, # (44) Sealed Document Exhibit 32 part 1, # (45) Sealed Document Exhibit 32 part 2, # (46) Sealed Document Exhibit 33, # (47) Sealed Document Exhibit 34, # (48) Sealed Document Exhibit 35, # (49) Sealed Document Exhibit 36, # (50) Sealed Document Exhibit 37, # (51) Sealed Document Proposed Order for MSJ) (Harris, Bailey) 217 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinion Testimony of Dennis Kovach, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 218 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/20/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document YETI's Opposed Motion to Strike the Report of, or in the Alternative, to Exclude the Testimony of Tulin Erdem, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (10) Proposed Order) (Rechtien, Timothy) 219 Filed & Entered: 12/19/2016Terminated: 12/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document MSJ - No Secondary Meaning, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO MSJ - No Secondary Meaning, # (4) Sealed Document Prop Order, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 6-1, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 6-2, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 9, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 10, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (17) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (18) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (19) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (20) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (21) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (22) Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [91] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims filed by Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016, Terminated: 8/1/2016 Motion to Join
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Join , MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims, MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [90] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Yeti Coolers, LLC.(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 17, # (3) Exhibit 18, # (4) Exhibit 19, # (5) Exhibit 20, # (6) Exhibit 21, # (7) Exhibit 22, # (8) Exhibit 23, # (9) Exhibit 24, # (10) Exhibit 25, # (11) Exhibit 26, # (12) Exhibit 27, # (13) Exhibit 28, # (14) Exhibit 29)(Krashin, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [83] MOTION to Dismiss RTIC's Counterclaims Relating to Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability and MOTION to Strike [70] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Certain of RTIC's Affirmative Defenses) MOTION to Stay filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Text Order GRANTING [92] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Mr. Battey is withdrawn as attorney of record for YETI, and the Clerk is ordered to terminate CM/ECF notices to Mr. Battey in the above action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text Order GRANTING [92] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Mr. Battey is withdrawn as attorney of record for YETI, and the Clerk is ordered to terminate CM/ECF notices to Mr. Battey in the above action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016, Terminated: 5/18/2016 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas R. Battey by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016, Terminated: 8/1/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [64] Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Bailey Harris added to party James Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Bailey Harris added to party John Jacobsen(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Yeti Coolers, LLC by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen.(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: John Jacobsen answer due 5/13/2016. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text Order GRANTING [89] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant Jacobsens answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before May 13, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016, Terminated: 5/13/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [64] Amended Complaint by John Jacobsen. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Attachment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to [83] MOTION to Dismiss RTIC's Counterclaims Relating to Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability and MOTION to Strike [70] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Certain of RTIC's Affirmative Defenses) MOTION to Stay by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Berghammer, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript filed of Markman Proceedings held on April 29, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Markman Hearing. Court Reporter: Pamela J. Andsola, Telephone number: 210-244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 5/31/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016, (Andasola, Pamela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Transcript Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript filed of Markman Proceedings held on April 28, 2016.Proceedings Transcribed: Markman Hearing. Court Reporter: Pamela J. Andasola, Telephone number: 210-244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 5/31/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016, (Andasola, Pamela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 Deficiency NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joseph Berghammer: re [83] MOTION to Dismiss RTIC's Counterclaims Relating to Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability and MOTION to Strike [70] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Certain of RTIC's Affirmative Defenses) MOTION to Stay. Proposed Orders are Required when a non-dispositive Motion (Strike and Sever/Stay) is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion. In the Docket Text, type "(Proposed Order)". (klw) 86 Filed & Entered: 05/10/2016 Transcript Filed Transcript filed of Markman Proceedings held on April 28, 2016.Proceedings Transcribed: Markman Hearing. Court Reporter: Pamela J. Andasola, Telephone number: 210-244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 5/31/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016, (Andasola, Pamela) 87 Filed & Entered: 05/10/2016 Transcript Filed Transcript filed of Markman Proceedings held on April 29, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Markman Hearing. Court Reporter: Pamela J. Andsola, Telephone number: 210-244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 5/31/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016, (Andasola, Pamela) 88 Filed & Entered: 05/10/2016 Attachment ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to [83] MOTION to Dismiss RTIC's Counterclaims Relating to Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability and MOTION to Strike [70] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Certain of RTIC's Affirmative Defenses) MOTION to Stay by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Berghammer, Joseph) 89 Filed & Entered: 05/12/2016Terminated: 05/13/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [64] Amended Complaint by John Jacobsen. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 05/13/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Text Order GRANTING [89] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant Jacobsens answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before May 13, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp) Filed & Entered: 05/13/2016 Set/Reset Answer Deadline Set/Reset Deadlines: John Jacobsen answer due 5/13/2016. (td) 90 Filed & Entered: 05/13/2016 Answer to Amended Complaint ANSWER to [64] Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Bailey Harris added to party James Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Bailey Harris added to party John Jacobsen(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Yeti Coolers, LLC by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen.(Harris, Bailey) 91 Filed & Entered: 05/13/2016Terminated: 08/01/2016 Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 92 Filed & Entered: 05/17/2016Terminated: 05/18/2016 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas R. Battey by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) Filed & Entered: 05/18/2016 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Text Order GRANTING [92] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Mr. Battey is withdrawn as attorney of record for YETI, and the Clerk is ordered to terminate CM/ECF notices to Mr. Battey in the above action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dd) 93 Filed & Entered: 05/23/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [83] MOTION to Dismiss RTIC's Counterclaims Relating to Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability and MOTION to Strike [70] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Certain of RTIC's Affirmative Defenses) MOTION to Stay filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Harris, Bailey) 94 Filed & Entered: 05/24/2016 Brief BRIEF by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 17, # (3) Exhibit 18, # (4) Exhibit 19, # (5) Exhibit 20, # (6) Exhibit 21, # (7) Exhibit 22, # (8) Exhibit 23, # (9) Exhibit 24, # (10) Exhibit 25, # (11) Exhibit 26, # (12) Exhibit 27, # (13) Exhibit 28, # (14) Exhibit 29)(Krashin, Michael) 95 Filed & Entered: 05/24/2016 Brief BRIEF by RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Harris, Bailey) 96 Filed & Entered: 05/25/2016 Answer to Counterclaim ANSWER to [90] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Yeti Coolers, LLC.(Krashin, Michael) 97 Filed & Entered: 05/25/2016Terminated: 08/01/2016 Motion to Join MOTION to Join , MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims, MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 98 Filed & Entered: 05/25/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [91] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims filed by Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5)(Krashin, Michael) 99 Filed & Entered: 05/26/2016 Deficiency Notice DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Michael Krashin: re [98] Response in Opposition to Motion. (td) 100 Filed & Entered: 05/26/2016 Attachment ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to [98] Response in Opposition to Motion, by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Krashin, Michael) 101 Filed & Entered: 05/31/2016Terminated: 08/01/2016 Motion to Redact Transcript Opposed MOTION to Redact re [86] Transcript by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) 102 Filed & Entered: 05/31/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [83] MOTION to Dismiss RTIC's Counterclaims Relating to Antitrust, Tortious Interference and Unenforceability and MOTION to Strike [70] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Certain of RTIC's Affirmative Defenses) MOTION to Stay filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Berghammer, Joseph) 103 Filed & Entered: 06/01/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, re [91] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Infringement Claims filed by Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey) 104 Filed & Entered: 06/07/2016 Brief BRIEF regarding [95] Brief by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 30, # (3) Exhibit 31)(Krashin, Michael) 105 Filed & Entered: 06/07/2016 Notice of Filing NOTICE of Filing JOINT Notice of Filing of the Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) The Parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Krashin, Michael) 106 Filed & Entered: 06/08/2016 Brief BRIEF by RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Harris, Bailey) 107 Filed & Entered: 06/08/2016 Response RESPONSE Corrected Rebuttal Post-Markman Brief by RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Harris, Bailey) 108 Filed & Entered: 07/05/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE of Filing Report and Recommendations of the Special Master Regarding United States Patent No.'s 8,910,819 and 9,187,232 by Karl Bayer (Attachments: # (1) Memo in Support Claim Summary, # (2) Memo in Support Claim Chart)(Bayer, Karl) 109 Filed & Entered: 07/12/2016 Notice (Other) NOTICE of Filing Revised Report and Recommendations of the Special Master Regarding United States Patent No.'s, 8,910,819 and 9,187,232 by Karl Bayer (Attachments: # (1) Memo in Support Revised Claim Summary Chart, # (2) Memo in Support)(Bayer, Karl) 110 Filed & Entered: 08/01/2016 Order on Motion to Dismiss ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [91] Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [97] Motion to Dismiss and Strike; GRANTING [101] Motion to Redact re [86] Transcript. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 111 Filed & Entered: 08/01/2016 Redacted Transcript Redacted Transcript filed re: [86] Transcript. (Andasola, Pamela) 112 Filed & Entered: 08/31/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party James Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party John Jacobsen(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party RTIC Coolers, LLC(pty:dft) (Arbaugh, Natalie) 113 Filed & Entered: 09/06/2016 Amended Answer to Complaint AMENDED ANSWER to Second [64] Amended Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Yeti Coolers, LLC by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. (Harris, Bailey) 114 Filed & Entered: 09/12/2016Terminated: 09/13/2016 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 09/13/2016 Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Text Order GRANTING [114] Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The dispositive motions deadline is now December 5, 2016. Trial remains set for February 21, 2017. The parties are advised that no further delays will be granted. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Filed: 09/13/2016Entered: 09/14/2016 Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/5/2016. (td) 115 Filed & Entered: 09/13/2016Terminated: 09/19/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris for Elizabeth Brenckman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8842742) by on behalf of RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 09/19/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [115] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Elizabeth Brenckman entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 116 Filed: 09/21/2016Entered: 09/22/2016 Order ORDER ADOPTING [109] Revised Report and Recommendation filed by Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 117 Filed & Entered: 09/23/2016 Answer to Counterclaim ANSWER to [113] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Yeti Coolers, LLC.(Krashin, Michael) 118 Filed & Entered: 09/28/2016Terminated: 10/04/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Timothy J. Rechtien ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8888387) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin) 119 Filed & Entered: 09/30/2016Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 120 Filed & Entered: 10/03/2016 Order ORDER REFERRING [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Kayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) Filed & Entered: 10/04/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [118] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Timothy J. Rechtien entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 121 Filed & Entered: 10/04/2016Terminated: 10/05/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh on behalf of Michael A. Bittner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8908140) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) Filed & Entered: 10/05/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [121] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Michael A. Bittner entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 122 Filed & Entered: 10/07/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 123 Filed & Entered: 10/10/2016Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Saranya Raghavan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8925303) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin) 124 Filed & Entered: 10/10/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Fred Smith)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 10/12/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [123] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Saranya Raghavan entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 125 Filed & Entered: 10/12/2016Terminated: 10/12/2016 Motion to Withdraw Joint MOTION to Withdraw [119] MOTION to Compel Regarding Expert Fred Smith and to De-Designate Improperly Marked Prior Art by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Musselman, P.) 126 Filed: 10/12/2016Entered: 10/13/2016 Order on Motion to Compel ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT [119] Motion to Compel; GRANTING [125] Joint Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 127 Filed & Entered: 10/13/2016Terminated: 10/14/2016 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 128 Filed & Entered: 10/13/2016Terminated: 12/06/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Exhibit 13, # (16) Exhibit 14, # (17) Exhibit 15, # (18) Exhibit 16, # (19) Exhibit 17, # (20) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 10/14/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Text Order GRANTING [127] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Two Additional Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 129 Filed & Entered: 10/17/2016 Order ORDER REFERRING [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 130 Filed & Entered: 10/19/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Proposed Order)(Webb, Victoria) 131 Filed & Entered: 10/21/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc S. Cooperman on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Marc S. Cooperman added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Cooperman, Marc) 132 Filed & Entered: 10/21/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Compel Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Timothy J. Rechtien, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17, # (19) Exhibit 18, # (20) Exhibit 19, # (21) Exhibit 20, # (22) Exhibit 21, # (23) Exhibit 22, # (24) Exhibit 23, # (25) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 133 Filed & Entered: 10/21/2016Terminated: 10/24/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document YETI's Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 7, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 8, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 11, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit 12, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit 14, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit 15, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit 16, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit 17, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit 19, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit 21, # (17) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 10/24/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [133] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 134 Filed & Entered: 10/24/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3, # (2) Exhibit 4, # (3) Exhibit 5, # (4) Exhibit 6, # (5) Exhibit 7, # (6) Exhibit 8, # (7) Exhibit 11, # (8) Exhibit 12, # (9) Exhibit 13, # (10) Exhibit 14, # (11) Exhibit 15, # (12) Exhibit 16, # (13) Exhibit 17, # (14) Exhibit 19, # (15) Exhibit 21) (td) 135 Filed & Entered: 10/25/2016Terminated: 11/02/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of William Rueger Poynter ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8975121) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 136 Filed & Entered: 10/25/2016Terminated: 11/02/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Katrina G. Eash ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8975167) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 137 Filed & Entered: 10/26/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [134] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 138 Filed & Entered: 10/27/2016 Order ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information, [134] Sealed Motion filed ( Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td) 139 Filed & Entered: 10/28/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [128] MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Witness and to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen (Harris, Bailey) 140 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 11/02/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [135] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty William Rueger Poynter entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) Filed & Entered: 11/02/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [136] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Katrina G. Eash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 141 Filed & Entered: 11/04/2016Terminated: 11/10/2016 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Resolve Docket No. 128 by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 142 Filed & Entered: 11/07/2016 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4)(Krashin, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2016: # (6) SEALED Exhibit) (klw). 143 Filed & Entered: 11/07/2016Terminated: 11/10/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document YETI's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) 144 Filed & Entered: 11/08/2016 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2016 re [134] Sealed Motion filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [132] Opposed MOTION to Compel RTIC to Produce Discovery Related to RTIC's Employees, RTIC's Customer Service Phone Calls, and RTIC's Financial Information filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR Gold - ERO.)(td) Filed & Entered: 11/10/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [143] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 145 Filed & Entered: 11/10/2016 Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines ORDER GRANTING [141] Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Discovery due by 12/6/2016, Motions due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 146 Filed & Entered: 11/14/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Mark S. Puzella ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9034037) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 147 Filed & Entered: 11/14/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of Sheryl Koval Garko ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9034097) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 148 Filed & Entered: 11/15/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Laatsch Fink on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katherine Laatsch Fink added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Fink, Katherine) 149 Filed & Entered: 11/15/2016Terminated: 11/16/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Jason S. Shull ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9036191) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin) Filed & Entered: 11/16/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [146] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Mark S. Puzella entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) Filed & Entered: 11/16/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [147] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Sheryl Koval Garko entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) Filed & Entered: 11/16/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [149] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Jason S. Shull entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 150 Filed & Entered: 11/16/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackob Ben-Ezra on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC (Ben-Ezra, Jackob) 151 Filed: 11/16/2016Entered: 11/17/2016 Order on Sealed Motion ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [134] Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm) 152 Filed & Entered: 11/18/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Pieter van Es on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney J. Pieter van Es added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (van Es, J.) 153 Filed & Entered: 11/23/2016 Transcript Filed Transcript filed of Proceedings held on November 8, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion to Compel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/14/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2017, (Rodriguez, Arlinda) 154 Filed & Entered: 11/30/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Quash MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Harris, Bailey) 155 Filed & Entered: 11/30/2016Terminated: 12/01/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael L. Krashin, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 156 Filed & Entered: 11/30/2016Terminated: 12/01/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Motion to Compel, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit 1, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit 2, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit 3, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit 4, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit 5, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit 6, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit 13, # (9) Proposed Order) (Krashin, Michael) Filed & Entered: 12/01/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [156] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) Filed & Entered: 12/01/2016 Order on Motion to Compel Text Order MOOTING [155] YETI's Redacted Motion to Compel, entered by Judge Robert Pitman, in light of [157] YETI's Sealed Motion to Compel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 157 Filed & Entered: 12/01/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 13) (td) 158 Filed: 12/01/2016Entered: 12/02/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [157] Sealed Motion to Compel filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 159 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2016Terminated: 12/05/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Motion to Compel, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO Motion to Compel, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Proposed Order on Motion to Compel) (Harris, Bailey) 160 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2016Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bailey Harris on behalf of John R. Lane ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9088714) by on behalf of James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 12/05/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [159] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 161 Filed & Entered: 12/05/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion to Compel filed (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Harris Decl ISO, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Propsed Order) (td) 162 Filed & Entered: 12/05/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 163 Filed & Entered: 12/05/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Quash Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Webb Declaration ISO Motion to Quash, # (2) Exhibit 1 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (3) Exhibit 2 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (4) Exhibit 3 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (5) Exhibit 4 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (6) Exhibit 5 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (7) Exhibit 6 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (8) Exhibit 7 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (9) Exhibit 8 - ISO Webb Decl. ISO Motion to Quash, # (10) Proposed Order)(Meek, Kevin) 164 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Order ORDER REFERRING [162] MOTION to Compel a Supplemental Response to Defs' Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on the Topic of Yeti's Trade Dress filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen to Special Master Karl Bayer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) 165 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by RTIC Coolers, LLC, James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, [163] Opposed MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Rick Wittenbraker and David Bullock filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 166 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katie L. Becker on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:cd), Attorney Katie L. Becker added to party Yeti Coolers, LLC(pty:pla) (Becker, Katie) 167 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek for Scott A. Burrow ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9095515) by on behalf of Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Meek, Kevin) 168 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Compel Second MOTION to Compel , MOTION for Contempt , MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files by Yeti Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Berghammer, Joseph) 169 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 170 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016 Order Setting Hearing on Motion ORDER Setting Hearing on [154] Third-Party Denise Marie Martin's Motion to Quash, [157] YETI's Motion to Compel, [161] Defendants' Motion to Compel the Continuation of the 30(b)(6) Deposition of YETI Coolers, LLC's Designated Deponent Corey Maynard, [163] Opposed Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas, and [168] YETI's Second Motion to Compel and Motion for Contempt and Sanctions Regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files. (Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin; Response to any motions due by 5:00 pm on 12/12/2016). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (kkc) 171 Filed & Entered: 12/06/2016Terminated: 12/07/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Sealed Document Opposed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R. M. Webb, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (15) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (16) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (17) Proposed Order) (Webb, Victoria) Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Text Order GRANTING [171] YETI's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja) 172 Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Sealed Motion Sealed Motion for Compelling The Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Declaration of Victoria R.M. Webb, # (2) Sealed Document Exhibit A, # (3) Sealed Document Exhibit B, # (4) Sealed Document Exhibit C, # (5) Sealed Document Exhibit D, # (6) Sealed Document Exhibit E, # (7) Sealed Document Exhibit F, # (8) Sealed Document Exhibit G, # (9) Sealed Document Exhibit H, # (10) Sealed Document Exhibit I, # (11) Sealed Document Exhibit J, # (12) Sealed Document Exhibit K, # (13) Sealed Document Exhibit L, # (14) Sealed Document Exhibit M, # (15) Sealed Document Proposed Order) (td) 173 Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016 Order Referring Motion ORDER REFERRING MOTION: [172] Sealed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen filed filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td) 174 Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016 Order Setting Hearing on Motion ORDER Setting Hearing on [172] Sealed Motion for Compelling the Continued Deposition of John Jacobsen: Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td) 175 Filed & Entered: 12/07/2016 Response to Motion RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [154] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Non-Party Denise Martin filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen and Notice of Withdrawal of YETI's Subpoena to Denise Martin (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Krashin, Michael) 176 Filed & Entered: 12/09/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC, re [161] Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant RTIC Coolers, LLC, Defendant James Jacobsen, Defendant John Jacobsen to Compel the Continuation of the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Corey Maynard (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Berghammer, Joseph) 177 Filed & Entered: 12/09/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Document Proposed Order - Motion to Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Brief ISO of Motion to Compel Supplemetal Response to Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of 30(b)(6) Witness on Topic of Trade Dress, # (3) Sealed Document Harris Declaration, # (4) Sealed Document Ex 1, # (5) Sealed Document Ex 2, # (6) Sealed Document Ex 3, # (7) Sealed Document Ex 4, # (8) Sealed Document Ex 5, # (9) Sealed Document Ex 6, # (10) Sealed Document Ex 7, # (11) Sealed Document Ex 8, # (12) Sealed Document Prop Order - Brief ISO of Motion to Compel Supplemetal Response to Interrogatory No. 19 and/or Designation of 30(b)(6) Witness on Topic of Trade Dress) (Harris, Bailey) Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [167] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Scott A. Burrow entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Text Order GRANTING [160] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney John R. Lane entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) 178 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016Terminated: 12/30/2016 Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Affidavit of Sara Fish, # (6) Proposed Order)(Musselman, P.) 179 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [155] MOTION to Compel Production and Continuation of James Jacobsen's Deposition filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Harris, Bailey) 180 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016Terminated: 12/13/2016 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # (2) Sealed Document Opposition to Joint Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas of Wittenbraker and Bullock, # (3) Sealed Document Declaration of Eash In Support of Opposition, # (4) Sealed Document Ex. A to Opposition, # (5) Sealed Document Ex. B to Opposition, # (6) Sealed Document Ex. C to Opposition, # (7) Sealed Document Ex. D to Opposition, # (8) Sealed Document Ex. E to Opposition, # (9) Sealed Document Ex. F to Opposition, # (10) Sealed Document Ex. G to Opposition, # (11) Sealed Document Ex. H to Opposition, # (12) Sealed Document Ex. I to Opposition, # (13) Sealed Document Ex. J to Opposition, # (14) Sealed Document Ex. K to Opposition, # (15) Sealed Document Ex. L to Opposition, # (16) Sealed Document Ex. M to Opposition, # (17) Sealed Document Ex. N to Opposition, # (18) Sealed Document Ex. O to Opposition, # (19) Sealed Document Proposed Order to Opposition) (Harris, Bailey) 181 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [168] Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Contempt MOTION for Sanctions regarding Defendants Failure to Produce Customer Service Audio Files filed by Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Harris Declaration, # (2) Affidavit Marinelli Declaration, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Proposed Order)(Brenckman, Elizabeth) 182 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James Jacobsen, John Jacobsen, RTIC Coolers, LLC, re [172] Sealed Motion filed filed by Plaintiff Yeti Coolers, LLC (Attachments: # (