Carol Lubin v. Delta Airlines, Incorporated
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 15-60609

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 9:07 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503248312 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
COURT ORDER dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction (IN DETAIL) [8044771-2]. Judge: TMR , Judge: CH , Judge: JEG [15-60609] (AGL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503184171 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
    TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [15-60609]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Carol Lubin advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 09/08/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Ferrell; Attorney for Appellee: Spratlin [15-60609] (Wayne E. Ferrell Jr.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503184094 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
      DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Transcript Order received from Appellant Ms. Carol Lubin because it must be filed electronically rather than in paper form [15-60609] (AGL)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503176056 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
        PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Carol Lubin. [15-60609] (DLJ)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 73 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?