Yates et al v. Davis et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Eastern District Court, Case No. 0:15-cv-00062
District Judge David L. Bunning, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 11:27 PM ST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Yates, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by nkylawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rene B. Heinrich +1 859 491 3888 +1 859 491 1888 rheinrich@nkylawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by roushandstilzlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Kash Stilz, Jr. +1 859 291 8400 +1 859 291 6555 kash@roushandstilzlaw.com
No Logo Will Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by nkylawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rene B. Heinrich +1 859 491 3888 +1 859 491 1888 rheinrich@nkylawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by roushandstilzlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Kash Stilz, Jr. +1 859 291 8400 +1 859 291 6555 kash@roushandstilzlaw.com
v.
No Logo Kim Davis, Defendant
No Logo Rowan County, Kentucky, Defendant
No Logo Kim Davis, Official Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
AGREED ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Kim Davis and Rowan County shall have until fourteen (14) days after the earlier of the final resolution by USCA for 6CCA on the merits of Kim Davis' appeals from this Court's orders in the case of Miller, et al v. Davis, et al No. 0:15-cv-44-DLB, which are currently docketed in the Sixth Circuit Case Nos. 15-5880, 15-5961, and 15-5978, or the entry of a case management scheduling order by this Court in the aforementioned case or the case of Ermold, et al v. Davis, et al, No. 0:15-cv-46-DLB, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/17/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/17/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rowan County, Kentucky. (Mando, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
      Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Christman, Jonathan) Modified on 9/17/2015 to add filers (KSS). (Entered: 09/16/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Yates, Will Smith via Certified Mail to Rowan County, Kentucky served on 8/31/2015, answer due 9/21/2015. (Stilz, William) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Donahue, Anthony) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Yates, Will Smith via Certified Mail to Kim Davis served on 8/31/2015, answer due 9/21/2015; Kim Davis served on 8/31/2015, answer due 9/21/2015. (Stilz, William) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 6 Motion FOR Jonathan D. Christman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis, Kim Davis (Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3302996). Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/11/15. (KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter be and hereby is reassigned to Honorable Judge David L. Bunning, Judge of the Eastern District of Kentucky, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/26/2015.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Jonathan D. Christman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis, Kim Davis ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3302996) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing)(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                    Summons Issued as to Kim Davis, Rowan County, Kentucky; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (KSS) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3291855), filed by James Yates, Will Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Assignment, # 3 Summons Kim Davis Rowan County Clerk, # 4 Summons Blevins Rowan Co. Judge Executive)(KSS) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 931 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?