Wachovia Securities Llc Et Al v. Jason L Laney Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 09 509172
Superior Court Judge Charlotte W. Woolard, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Wachovia Securities, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Wachovia Securities, LLC, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
v.
No Logo Laney, Jason L, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Court Judgment - General
The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Wachovia Securities Llc Recover From Respondent Laney, Jason L $352,867.02 Principal, $112,000.00 Attorney Fees, $128,220.92 Interest, $279.00 Costs, Total Judgment $593,366.94, See Scanned Doc (no Sase, Copy In 302 Outbox)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 10 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009
    Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $279.00 Total Costs, Mature Date May-06-2009, Filed By Plaintiff Wachovia Securities Llc
      Blank 9 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009
      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Wachovia Securities Llc
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Order
        Order Granting Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Pursuant To Ccp Section 1285 Et Seq
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 7 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009
          Mini-minutes For Mar-25-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 302
            Blank 6 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009 Court Filing
            Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Wachovia Securities Llc's Notice Of Hearing On Petitioner Wachovia Securities, Llc's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Enter Judgment. No Appearances On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Granted. No Opposition Filed. (prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard, Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
              Blank 5 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009
              Response To Non-opposition To Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Wachovia Securities Llc
                Blank 4 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009
                Pos Of Notice Of Hearing; Summons; Memo P/a; Declaration Of Christopher Stecher Filed By Petitioner Wachovia Securities Llc
                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009
                  Notice Of Hearing On Petitioner Wachovia Securities, Llc's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Enter Judgment; Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Wachovia Securities Llc Hearing Set For Mar-25-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009
                    Summons Issued To Petitioner Wachovia Securities Llc
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009
                      Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Wachovia Securities Llc As To Respondent Laney, Jason L Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 47 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?