Silver Shield Security v. The Commissioner Of The California Department Of
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 10 510312
Superior Court Judge Charlotte W. Woolard, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Silver Shield Security, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald A Peters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald A Peters +1 415 973 3182
No Logo Silver Shield Security, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald A Peters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald A Peters +1 415 973 3182
No Logo The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen W. Yiu +1 415 703 5385 +1 415 703 5480 karen.yiu@doj.ca.gov
State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by State Compensation Insurance Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sapper, Judith Debra +1 323 526 2134
No Logo The Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of John N. Frye

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John N. Frye +1 650 577 0889 +1 650 345 9875 JFryeLaw@cs.com
Cause of Action Writs Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./admin. Agen
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Court Filing
Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Silver Shield Security's Motion For Petition For A Writ Of Administrative Mandamus [c.c.p. 1094.5] Is Denied. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Loretta M. Giorgi, Reporter: Karla Ellis-davis, Csr #12998
    Blank 27 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011
    Mini-minutes For Jan-25-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
      Blank 26 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011
      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Denying Petition For Writ Of Adminstrative Mandmus Filed By Respondent The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
        Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Order Denying Petition For Writ Of Administrative Mandamus
        Order Denying Petition For Writ Of Administrative Mandamus
          Blank 24 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Court Filing
          Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Silver Shield Security's Motion For Petition For A Writ Of Administrative Mandamus [ccp 1094.5]. No Appearance On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling - Continued From Jan-05-2011 To Jan-25-2011 On The Court's Own Motion. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard, Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
            Blank 23 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011
            Mini-minutes For Jan-05-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
              Blank 22 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Court Filing
              Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Silver Shield Security's Motion For Petition For A Writ Of Administrative Mandamus [c.c.p. 1094.5] Is Continued To January 5, 2011 At 9:30 A.m. In Dept. 302 On The Court's Own Motion. Moving Party To Lodge The Record With The Court And Provide Courtesy Copy Of The Motion With A Cover Letter Reflecting The New Hearing Date. Sflr 2.6b. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard, Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                Blank 21 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010
                Mini-minutes For Dec-17-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010
                  Notice Of Unavailability Of Yiu, Karen W On Nov-11-2010 Through Nov-29-2010 Filed By Respondent The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                    Blank 19 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010
                    Lodgment Of Non-california Authorities In Opposition To First Amended Petition For Writ Of Mandamus; Proof Of Service Filed By Intervenor The Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California
                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010
                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To First Amended Petition Of Writ Of Administrative Mandamus Filed By Intervenor The Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California
                        Blank 17 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010
                        Opposition To First Amended Petition For Administrative Mandamus Filed By Respondent The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                          Blank 16 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010
                          Index Of Non-ca Authorities In Support Of Opposition To First Amended Petition Filed By Respondent The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                            Blank 15 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010
                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To First Amended Petition For Writ Of Adminstrative Mandamus Filed By Intervenor State Compensation Insurance Fund
                              Blank 14 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010
                              Notice Of Motion For Petition For A Writ Of Administrative Mandamus [ccp 1094.5], Proof Of Service Filed By Petitioner Silver Shield Security Hearing Set For Dec-17-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                Blank 13 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010
                                Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt Served On The Commissioner Of The State Of California, Dept. Of Insurance Filed By Plaintiff Silver Shield Security
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010
                                  Response To First Amended Pewtition Fo Rwrit Of Administrative Mandamus Filed By Respondent The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010
                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Response To Petitioner Silver Shield Security's First Amended Petition For Writ Of Administrative Mandamus Filed By Intervenor State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010
                                      Response To Petitioner Silver Shield Security's First Amended Petition For Writ Of Administrative Mandamus Filed By Intervenor State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010
                                        Response To Petitioner's First Amended Petition For Writ Of Administrative Mandamus Filed By Intervenor The Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010
                                          Law And Motion, 302, Petitioner Silver Shield Security Notice Of Hearing Re Writ Of Administrative Mandamus, Set For 05/13/10, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010
                                            Opposition To State Compensation Insurance Fund And Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau's Ex Parte Application For Leave To Intervene And Motion To Vacate Hearing Date Filed By Petitioner Silver Shield Security
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010
                                              Declaration Of Ronald A. Peters In Support Of Petitioner's Consolidated Oppos To State Compensation Insurance Fund And Workers' Comensation Insurance Rating Bureau's Ex Parte Application For Leave To Intervene And Motion To Vacat Hearing Date Filed By Petitioner Silver Shield Security
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 First Amended Petition For Writ Of Administrative Mandamus (correcting
                                                First Amended Petition For Writ Of Administrative Mandamus (correcting Caption Only) Filed By Petitioner Silver Shield Security
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010
                                                  Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For A Hearing On Its Motion For Leave To Intervene, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Intervenor The Workers' Compensation Insurance Rating Bureau Of California
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010
                                                    Ex Parte Application For Order For Leave To Intervene In Action And, In The Alternative, To Vacate The Hearing Date, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Intervenor State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010
                                                      Petitioners Notice Of Hearing Re Writ Of Administrative Mandamus, Proof Of Service, Affidavit Filed By Petitioner Silver Shield Security Hearing Set For May-13-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010
                                                        Petition For Writ Of Mandate/ Prohibition/ Certification Filed By Petitioner Silver Shield Security As To Respondent The Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                                                          Space Space

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?