Trevor Charles, et al v. Thomas Atkinson, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 15-30775

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 6:45 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503223566 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
BRIEFING SUSPENDED as it was issued prematurely. A motion for reconsideration is pending in district court.. A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [15-30775] (AGL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503213496 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/09/2015 for Appellants Jennifer Charles and Trevor Charles. [15-30775] (SMH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503199327 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
      INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8014872-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [15-30775] (MAS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503180065 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
        PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Jennifer Charles and Mr. Trevor Charles [15-30775] (MAS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 20 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?