USA v. Shapiro et al
Criminal Case Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:15-cr-00155-RNC-1

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 19, 2021 at 12:19 PM DT (1.9 months ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Liam Brennan +1 203 821 3835 +1 203 773 5378 Liam.Brennan3@usdoj.gov
Space Heather Cherry +1 203 821 3719 heather.cherry@usdoj.gov
Space David E. Novick +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 821 3829 david.novick@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Ross Shapiro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 508 6134 +1 212 938 3833 mukaseym@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Petrillo Klein & Boxer Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Klein +1 212 370 0330 +1 212 370 0391 jklein@pkbllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Petrillo Klein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mirah Epstein Curzer +1 212 326 3612 mcurzer@pkbllp.com
Space Amy Lester +1 212 370 0330 +1 212 370 0391 alester@pkbllp.com
Space Guy T. Petrillo +1 212 370 0330 +1 212 609 6921 gpetrillo@pkbllp.com
Space Leonid Sandlar +1 212 370 0330 +1 212 370 0391 lsandlar@pkbllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reid & Riege, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas V. Daily +1 860 240 1067 +1 860 240 1002 tdaily@reidandriege.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office New Haven
Filed 9/3/2015
County Fairfield
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2-3
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
Count 4-10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2s-3s
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
Count 4s-9s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 1ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2ss-3ss
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
Count 4ss-9ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 1sss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2sss-3sss
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
Count 4sss-9sss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags EFILE,MOTREF
  Entries (506) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Reply/Response Misc
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 2/8/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Reply/Response Misc
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Leave to File
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Modify Conditions of Release
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Sever Defendant
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ross Shapiro re 440 MOTION for Acquittal, 400 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment on Due Process Grounds (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 483 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Ross Shapiro (1). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/25/2017. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins. (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins re 440 MOTION for Acquittal, 400 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment on Due Process Grounds (Novick, David)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT Excerpt of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Motions Hearing held on 05.04.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2018. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Set Deadlines as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins 440 MOTION for Acquittal. Responses due by 10/20/2017. Replies due by 10/30/2017. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 477 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/20/2017 to File Response to defendants' post-trial motions. Any Reply is due 10/30/2017. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/3/2017. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RESPONSE/REPLY by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins re 477 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Lester, Amy)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendants' post-trial motions until October 20, 2017 by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins. (Novick, David)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support by Ross Shapiro re 440 MOTION for Acquittal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Curzer, Mirah) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 473 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Ross Shapiro (1). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/24/2017. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ross Shapiro. (Sandlar, Leonid) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XXI) held on 06.15.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XX) held on 06.14.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XIX) held on 06.13.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XVIII) held on 06.12.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XVII) held on 06.08.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XVI) held on 06.07.07 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XV) held on 06.06.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XIV) held on 06.05.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XIII) held on 06.01.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XII) held on 05.30.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. XI) held on 05.25.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. X) held on 05.24.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. IX) held on 05.23.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. VIII) held on 05.22.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. VII) held on 05.18.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. VI) held on 05.17.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. V) held on 05.16.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters Jury Trial (Vol. IV) held on 05.11.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. III) held on 05.10.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. II) held on 05.09.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Jury Trial (Vol. I) held on 05.08.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2017. (Warner, D.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Oral argument regarding post trial motions set for 11/8/2017 at 2:00 PM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 441 Motion for Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/6/2017. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Docket Entry Correction as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins re 442 Scheduling Order. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/6/17. (Glynn, T.) Modified on 7/6/2017 to delete proposed. (Glynn, T.).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order Re: Entry of Scheduling Order and the Exclusion of Time by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lester, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Acquittal or Alternatively, for a New Trial by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR - MOTION for Acquittal or, Alternatively, for a New Trial by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Lester, Amy) Modified - entered in error as to Tyler Peters on 6/28/2017 (Glynn, T.).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unredacted Foreperson's Signature
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Unredacted document with FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE regarding Jury Verdict, 431 as to defendants Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Access to the pdf document is restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(e). (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Court Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                          COURT EXHIBIT LIST as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                              JURY VERDICT with foreperson's signature redacted as to Michael Gramins (2) Guilty on Count 1sss; Ross Shapiro (1) Not Guilty on Count 2sss-3sss, 4sss-9sss and Michael Gramins (2) Not Guilty on Count 2sss, 4sss-8sss and Tyler Peters (3) Not Guilty on Count 1sss, 2sss-3sss, 4sss-9sss. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/15/2017. 57 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/14/2017. Jury Trial Continued to 6/15/17 at 9:30 a.m.. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/13/2017. Jury Trial Continued to 6/14/17 at 9:30 a.m. Total Time: 2 hours and 25 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/12/2017. Jury Trial Continued to June 13, 2017 @ 9:30 a.m. Total Time: 2 hours and 23 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/8/2017. Jury Trial Continued to 6/12/17 @ 9:30 a.m. 21 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [400] MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment on Due Process Grounds -- Letter in Further Support of Motion (Brown, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/7/2017. Jury Trial Continued to 6/8/17 @ 9:30 a.m. Total Time: 1 hour and 32 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Letter Regarding Jury Note by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: granting [419] Motion Request for Curative Instruction as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/6/2017 re [419] Joint MOTION Request for Curative Instruction filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro; Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/6/2017. Jury Trial Continued to 6/7/17 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 2 hours and 51 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Letter Motion re References Made During Summation by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [419] Joint MOTION Request for Curative Instruction (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017, Terminated: 6/6/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION Request for Curative Instruction by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Brown, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: denying [404] Motion to Strike as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/5/2017 re [404] MOTION to Strike filed by USA; Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/5/2017. Jury Trial Continued to 6/6/17 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 5 hours and 38 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: denying [410] Motion to Strike as to Ross Shapiro (1); denying [411] Motion to Strike as to Michael Gramins (2); denying [412] Motion to Strike as to Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/1/2017 re [412] MOTION to Strike filed by Tyler Peters, [411] MOTION to Strike Surplusage filed by Michael Gramins, [410] MOTION to Strike filed by Ross Shapiro; Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 6/1/2017. Jury Trial Continued to June 5, 2017 @ 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 5 hours and 56 minutes (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Re: Jury Instructions and in Response to Government's Letter Dkt 414 by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [414] Notice (Other) (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Exhibit A to Ltr re Jury Instructions by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [414] Notice (Other) (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Ltr. re Jury Instructions by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [412] MOTION to Strike (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017, Terminated: 6/1/2017 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Letter Motion to Strike Overt Act U by Ross Shapiro (Sandlar, Leonid) Modified to correct to motion on 5/31/2017 (Enderlin, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Entry Correction as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [408] Jury Trial- REPLACEMENT PDF ADDED TO CORRECT DATE OF TRIAL (5/30/17). (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: taking under advisement [403] ORAL Motion for Acquittal as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); granting [407] ORAL Motion to Strike Overt Act X as to Ross Shapiro (1); granting [405] ORAL Motion to Strike Overt Act KLM as to Tyler Peters (3); granting [406] ORAL Motion to Strike Overt Act T as to Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/30/2017 re [406] ORAL MOTION to Strike filed by Tyler Peters, [403] ORAL MOTION for Acquittal filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [405] ORAL MOTION to Strike filed by Tyler Peters, [407] ORAL MOTION to Strike filed by Ross Shapiro; Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/30/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until June 1, 2017 @ 9:30 a.m... Total Time: 5 hours and 16 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2017: # (1) REPLACEMENT PDF) (Glynn, T.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 407 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017, Terminated: 5/30/2017 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL MOTION to Strike Overt Act X by Ross Shapiro. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017, Terminated: 6/5/2017 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Strike of Letter Re: Government's Motion to Strike by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Cherry, Heather) Modified on 6/5/2017 to change to motion event/relief (Bozek, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 403 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL MOTION for Acquittal by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant To Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29(a) by Ross Shapiro as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/29/2017, Entered: 5/29/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment on Due Process Grounds by Ross Shapiro as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/29/2017, Entered: 5/29/2017 Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/29/2017, Entered: 5/29/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Letter Regarding Government Summary Charts by Ross Shapiro (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/25/2017. Jury Trial Continued to May 30, 2017 @ 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 5 hours and 20 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Letter Regarding Government Summary Charts by Ross Shapiro (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Letter by Ross Shapiro re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike SurplusageMOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Letter Regarding Jury Instructions by Ross Shapiro as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/24/2017. Jury Trial Continued to May 25, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 11 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/23/2017. Jury Trial Continued to May 24, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 15 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/22/2017. Jury Trial Continued to May 23, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 17 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/18/2017. Jury Trial Continued to May 22, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 8 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/17/2017. Jury Trial Continued to May 18, 2017 @ 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 21 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/16/2017 Jury Trial Continued to May 17, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 31 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE in reply, in further support of the admissibility of Government Exhibit 28B by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [382] Notice (Other), [383] Notice (Other) (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney update in case as to Tyler Peters. (Owens, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 5/13/2017, Entered: 5/13/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Government's Position Regarding Exhibit 28B by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 28A, # (2) Exhibit 28B, # (3) Exhibit 28C, # (4) Exhibit 28D, # (5) Exhibit 28Z, # (6) Exhibit 23Z)(Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/11/2017. Jury Trial Continued to May 16, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 39 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/10/2017 Jury Trial Continued to May 11, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/9/2017 Jury Trial Continued Until May 10, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 24 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Trial as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/8/2017. Jury Trial Continued to May 9, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.. Total Time: 6 hours and 29 minutes (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 376 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Order on Motion to Sever DefendantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [369] Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/4/17. (Karges, K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: denying [328] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/4/2017 re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike SurplusageMOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment filed by Ross Shapiro ; Jury Selection as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/4/2017. Total Time: 4 hours and 13 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Jury SelectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Jury Selection as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 5/3/2017, Voir Dire begun on 5/3/2017 Ross Shapiro (1) on Count 1,1s,1ss,1sss,2-3,2s-3s,2ss-3ss,2sss-3sss,4-10,4s-9s,4ss-9ss,4sss-9sss and Michael Gramins (2) on Count 1,1s,1ss,1sss,2-3,2s-3s,2ss-3ss,2sss-3sss,4-10,4s-9s,4ss-9ss,4sss-9sss and Tyler Peters (3) on Count 1,1s,1ss,1sss,2-3,2s-3s,2ss-3ss,2sss-3sss,4-10,4s-9s,4ss-9ss,4sss-9sss Total Time: 8 hours and 28 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [369] MOTION to Sever Defendant (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: 5/2/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Telephone Conference held on 04.24.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support by Ross Shapiro as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike SurplusageMOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike SurplusageMOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment (Second Supplemental Response) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1: Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine, United States v. Steinberg, Case No. 1:12-cr-121(RJS) (S.D.N.Y.), Dkt. # 305, # (2) Exhibit 2: Government's Opposition to Motion in Limine in United States v. Steinberg, Case No. 1:12-cr-121(RJS) (S.D.N.Y.), Dkt. # 308, # (3) Exhibit 3: Transcript of Pretrial Conference, November 14, 2013, United States v. Steinberg, Case No. 1:12-cr-121(RJS) (S.D.N.Y.), # (4) Exhibit 4: Trial Transcript in United States v. Michael Steinberg, December 3, 2013)(Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: 4/27/2017, Terminated: 5/4/2017 Motion to Sever Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Sever Defendant by Ross Shapiro. (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Order on Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: denying [328] Motion in Limine to Strike Surplusage as to Ross Shapiro (1); taking under advisement [328] Motion in Limine to Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment as to Ross Shapiro (1); denying without prejudice to renewal [159] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); granting [160] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); granting in part and denying in part [162] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); granting [163] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); granting in part and denying in part [164] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); denying [165] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); granting [166] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); denying without prejudice to renewal [167] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); denying without prejudice to renewal [187] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); Telephone Status Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 4/24/2017; Telephone Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 4/24/2017 re [164] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Defendants Acted as Agents or Brokers or Owed Any Agency Duties to Counterparties filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike Surplusage, MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment filed by Ross Shapiro, [162] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [167] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Profitability filed by USA, [163] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of FINRA Study Guides Absent Proper Foundation filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value filed by USA, [165] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims filed by USA, [159] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Absence of Criminal Activity filed by USA, [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation filed by Michael Gramins, [187] MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Other Broker Dealers filed by USA. Total Time: 2 hours and 08 minutes (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 365 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting motion to compel the government to produce the identities of co-conspirators, ECF No. [327], for substantially the reasons stated by the defendants. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/24/17. (Karges, K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters Type of Hearing: Pretrial Hearing. Held on April 13, 2017 before Judge R. Chatigny. Court Reporter: I. Sanchez-Farnham. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2017. (Sanchez, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support by Ross Shapiro re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike Surplusage, or, Alternatively, Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 361 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: 4/20/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [360] Motion For Permission to bring Electronic Devices as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/20/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017, Terminated: 4/20/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION Permission To Bring Electronic Devices Into Courtroom During Trial by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike Surplusage, or, Alternatively, Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [335] MOTION for Attorney(s) Amy Lester to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4355680) by Ross Shapiro (Lester, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 357 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/24/2017 9:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny re: Status, Jury Selection/Questionnaires. Government counsel shall initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 356 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CANCELLATION NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Status Conference cancelled for 4/18/2017 at 3:00 PM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re: telephone call 4/18/17 @ 3:00 p.m.. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 355 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/18/2017 at 3:00 PM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny.Counsel for the government will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Pretrial Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 4/13/2017. Total Time: 3 hours and 43 minutes. (Court Reporter Sanchez, Farnham, I..)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Reply/Response Misc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/REPLY by Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [328] Motion in Limine Memorandum of Law in Partial Support and Partial Opposition (Wohlstadter, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Trial Memo
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRIAL MEMO Reply in Support of Omnibus Trial Memo by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ross Shapiro re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike Surplusage, or, Alternatively, Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 350 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [349] Motion to Seal as to Ross Shapiro (1). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/11/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017, Terminated: 4/11/2017 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ROSS SHAPIROS MOTION IN LIMINE TO STRIKE SURPLUSAGE, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, ADMIT EVIDENCE RELATING TO NOMURAS INTERNAL REVIEW, AND PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR MENTION OF JESSE LITVAKS INDICTMENT by Ross Shapiro. (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 348 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document: UN-REDACTED Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Ross Shapiro's Motion in Limine to Strike Surplusage, or, Alternatively, Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment by Ross Shapiro re [347] Reply to Response, - (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ross Shapiro re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike Surplusage, or, Alternatively, Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part [300] motion to modify conditions of release as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 4/10/17. (Brierley, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 343 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 4/10/17. Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [328] MOTION in Limine to Strike Surplusage, or, Alternatively, Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [327] MOTION to Compel Identities of Unindicted Co-Conspirators MOTION to Preclude Evidence (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Reply/Response Misc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE/REPLY by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [329] Trial Memo (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy Lester appearing for Ross Shapiro (Lester, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters Type of Hearing: Bond Hearing. Held on 03-22-17 before Judge Donna Martinez. Court Reporter: John Brandon. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/4/2017. (Allen, W.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 336 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [335] Motion for Attorney Amy Lester to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice as to Ross Shapiro (1). Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/3/2017. Signed by Clerk on 04/04/2017. (Shafer, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017, Terminated: 4/4/2017 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Amy Lester to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4355680). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Amy Lester)(Daily, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney update in case as to Ross Shapiro. Attorney Amy Lester for Ross Shapiro added. (Villano, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 334 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [333] Motion for Attorney Daniel P. Filor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Gramins (2). Signed by Clerk on 03/31/2017. (Shafer, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 3/31/2017 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel P. Filor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4352053). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing)(Garber, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 332 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [331] Motion to Seal as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/30/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017, Terminated: 3/30/2017 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to Document 329 by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 330 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 4/3/17. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Trial Memo
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL MEMO by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence Relating to Nomura's Internal Review, and Preclude Evidence or Mention of Jesse Litvak's Indictment by Ross Shapiro. (Curzer, Mirah). Added MOTION Relief on 4/25/2017 (Glynn, T.). Modified on 4/25/2017 to split motion(Glynn, T.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Identities of Unindicted Co-Conspirators, MOTION to Preclude Evidence by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 326 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [325] motion for order directing early return of subpoena duces tecum under Rule 17(c)(1), in the absence of any objection by the government. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/27/17. (Karges, K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017, Terminated: 3/27/2017 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Re: re Early return of Subpoena Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(C)(1) by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Template Subpoena)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: taking under advisement [300] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); Bond Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 3/22/2017; Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 3/22/2017 re [300] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro. Total Time: 1 hour(Court Reporter J. Brandon.) (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 323 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [306] Motion for Order Directing Early Return of Subpoenas Duces Tecum under Rule 17(c)(1), as modified per party agreement, see ECF No. [322]. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/20/17. (Karges, K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [306] MOTION for Order Re: Early Return of Subpoenas Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Support (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit revised Subpoena)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters, Telephone Conference held on 03.09.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2017. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 320 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Bond Hearing via teleconference set for 3/22/2017 at 11:00 AM, re: [300] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release before Judge Donna F. Martinez. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 319 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting defendants' motion [313] to waive appearance at arraignment pursuant to Rule 10(b) as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/16/17. (Constantine, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [313] Joint MOTION To Waive Appearance at Arraingment on the Second and Third Superseding Indictments, or, In the Alternative, To Appear Via Video Teleconference re [307] Indictment, [193] Indictment, filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/16/17. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017 Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: 3/15/2017, Terminated: 3/16/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION To Waive Appearance at Arraingment on the Second and Third Superseding Indictments, or, In the Alternative, To Appear Via Video Teleconference re [307] Indictment, [193] Indictment, by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- WAIVER OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT SIGNED BY ALL DEFENDANTS)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: granting [304] Motion for Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 3/9/2017 re [304] Joint MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoena Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro ; Status Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 3/9/2017. 55 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 311 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: Rule 17(c) subpoenas set for 3/9/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [300] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release in Further Support of Motion to Modify Bail Conditions (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [304] Joint MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoena Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 Unredacted Foreperson's Signature
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unredacted document with FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE as to defendant(s)Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Access to the pdf document is restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(e). (Gould, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT returned before Judge Janet Bond Arterton with the signature of the foreperson redacted. Grand jury number N-15-1 as to Ross Shapiro (1) count(s) 1sss, 2sss-3sss, 4sss-9sss, Michael Gramins (2) count(s) 1sss, 2sss-3sss, 4sss-9sss, Tyler Peters (3) count(s) 1sss, 2sss-3sss, 4sss-9sss. (Gould, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017, Terminated: 3/20/2017 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Re: Early Return of Subpoenas by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit Subpoena)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission by Tyler Peters (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [300] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel E. Clarkson appearing for Michael Gramins (Clarkson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017, Terminated: 3/9/2017 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoena Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: 8/16/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert S. Frenchman appearing for Michael Gramins (Frenchman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 303 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 5/2/17. Jury Selection set for 5/3/2017 and 5/4/17 at 9:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) No Contact List)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Telephone Conference held on 01.06.17 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2017. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 298 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2017, 5/8/2017, 5/9/2017, 5/10/2017, 5/11/2017, 5/16/2017, 5/17/2017, 5/18/2017, 5/22/2017, 5/23/2017, 5/24/2017, 5/25/17, 5/30/2017, 5/31/2017, 6/1/2017, 6/5/2017, 6/6/2017, 6/7/2017, 6/8/2017, 6/12/2017, 6/13/2017, 6/14/2017, 6/15/2017, 6/19/2017, 6/20/2017, 6/21/2017, 6/22/2017, 6/27/2017, 6/28/2017, 6/29/2017 and 6/30/2017 at 9:30 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey B. Sklaroff appearing for Michael Gramins (Sklaroff, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CANCELLATION NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Trial will not go forward on Friday, 6/2/2017 at 9:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 220 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [214], [215], [216], [217], [218] Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Gramins (2). Signed by Clerk on 8/15/16. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael G Chase appearing for Michael Gramins (Chase, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: Jury trial cancelled for Friday, June 2, 2017. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 296 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2017, 5/8/2017, 5/9/2017, 5/10/2017, 5/11/2017, 5/16/2017, 5/17/2017, 5/18/2017, 5/22/2017, 5/23/2017, 5/24/2017, 5/25/2017, 5/30/2017, 5/31/2017, 6/1/2017, 6/2/2017, 6/5/2017, 6/6/2017, 6/7/2017, 6/8/2017, 6/12/2017, 6/13/2017, 6/14/2017, 6/15/2017, 6/19/2017, 6/20/2017, 6/21/2017, 6/22/2017, 6/27/2017, 6/28/2017, 6/29/2017 and 6/30/2017 at 9:30 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016, Terminated: 8/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) Kate E. Olivieri to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4101100). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Garber, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: Proposed Voir Dire Questions due 3/15/2017; Proposed Jury Instructions due 3/15/2017; Jury Selection set for 5/2/2017 at 9:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/12/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016, Terminated: 8/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel E. Clarkson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4101091). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Garber, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 294 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephone Conference Re: Jury Selection/Questionnaires set for 4/24/2017 at 9:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016, Terminated: 8/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) Kedar S. Bhatia to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4101078). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Garber, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 293 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016, Terminated: 8/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert S. Frenchman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4101059). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Garber, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 292 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Selection set for 5/2/2017 & 5/3/2017 at 9:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Trial to commence 5/4/2017 at 9:30AM. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016, Terminated: 8/15/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey B. Sklaroff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4101030). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Garber, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 291 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Order on Sealed MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [279] Sealed Motion as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/11/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ross H. Garber appearing for Michael Gramins (Garber, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury selection will take place on May 2 and May 3 with evidence to begin May 4. Prospective jurors will come to the Court to fill out questionnaires on March 28. The parties will receive a copy of the completed questionnaires at the final pretrial conference to be held on April 3. Counsel will confer and submit a list of jurors to be excused by stipulation, as well as any for cause challenges, by April 18. A conference to review any such challenges based on responses to the questionnaire will be held on April 24. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/11/17. (Karges, K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendants' Objections to the Government'a Comments to Proposed Juror Questionnaire by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [286] Notice (Other) (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 289 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting ORAL [276] Motion to modify 17(c)(1) subpoena as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2) (see minutes dkt. # 277). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/10/17. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: Re: August 18, 2016 @ 10AM. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [280] Motion to Continue as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/10/17. (Karges, K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Defendants' Comments to Proposed Juror Questionnaire by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Government's Comments to Proposed Juror Questionnaire by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Court's Proposed Juror Questionnaire distributed 12/7/16)(Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: taking under advisement [280] Motion to Continue as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); Telephone Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 1/6/2017 re [280] MOTION to Continue and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act - REDACTED filed by USA. Total Time: 1 hour and 30 minutes (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 284 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: Motion to Continue [280] set for 1/6/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference held on 12.21.16 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2017. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [280] MOTION to Continue and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act - REDACTED, [279] SEALED MOTION Motion to Continue and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act - (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 281 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [278] Motion to Seal as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/3/2017. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017, Terminated: 1/10/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act - REDACTED by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 279 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017, Terminated: 1/11/2017 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION Motion to Continue and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act - by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Government's Motion to Continue and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: granting [265] Motion for Order as to Tyler Peters (3); granting [276] ORAL Motion to modify 17(c)(1) subpoena as to Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 12/21/2016 re [276] ORAL MOTION to modify 17(c)(1) subpoena by Tyler Peters, [265] MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoena Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) filed by Tyler Peters. 19 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 276 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016, Terminated: 1/10/2017 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL MOTION to modify 17(c)(1) subpoena by Tyler Peters as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 270 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: Rule 17(c) Subpoenas set for 12/21/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only)with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 197 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [194] Motion for Order as to Michael Gramins (2). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/4/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 269 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Order on Motion to AdoptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Denying as Moot motion to adopt [ECF No. 249] in light of the Court's speedy trial findings on 12/8/16 [ECF No. 268]. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/12/16. (Karges, K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: 12/8/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters, SPEEDY TRIAL EXCLUDABLE START as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Time excluded from 10/18/16 until 2/27/17. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/8/16. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: 12/7/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 12/7/2016 re [265] MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoena Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) filed by Tyler Peters, Telephone Conference re: Jury selection as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 12/7/2016. 21 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: 12/6/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, and Tyler Peters. Court Conference held on 11.28.16 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 264 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: Jury Selection set for 12/7/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Counsel will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 263 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [262] Nunc pro tunc Motion to Excuse Defendant's Appearance at the November 28, 2016 hearing as to Ross Shapiro (1). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/30/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Nunc Pro Tunc to Excuse Defendant's Appearance by Ross Shapiro. Docket #261 corrected. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016, Terminated: 11/29/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR: MOTION Nunc Pro Tunc to Excuse Defendant's Appearance by Ross Shapiro as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Curzer, Mirah) Modified on 11/30/2016 (Sundie, T).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/28/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [155] MOTION for Attorney(s) David Wohlstadter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4055338) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - State of New York)(Manning, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:In Court Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 11/28/2016. Total Time: 1 hour and 8 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 11/26/2016, Entered: 11/26/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE (Supplemental) Regarding Status of Disputes over Expert Disclosures by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re Defendants position on expert disclsoure issues by Michael Gramins as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Govt November 8 Letter, # (2) Exhibit 2- Revised Disclosure for Dr. Fabozzi, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Redline for Dr. Fabozzi, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Revised Disclosures for Favet and Vahey, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Redline for Favet, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Redline for Vahey, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Revised Disclosure for Dr. Ellison, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Redline for Dr. Ellison)(Frenchman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Regarding Status of Disputes over Expert Disclosures by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Government's November 8, 2016 Letter Regarding Expert Disclosures, # (2) Exhibit B: Defendant's November 15, 2016 Revised Disclosure, # (3) Exhibit C: Government's September 22, 2016 Letter Regarding Expert Disclosures, # (4) Exhibit D: Defendant's October 17, 2016 Response to Government's 9/17/16 Letter)(Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 255 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. IN COURT Conference set for 11/28/2016 at 2:00 PM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins and Tyler Peters. Hearing on Motions held on 10.26.16 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2017. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Order on Motion to AdoptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: taking under advisement [249] Motion to Adopt as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); taking under advisement [160] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); taking under advisement [162] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); taking under advisement [166] Motion in Limine as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); granting in part and denying in part [172] Motion as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 10/26/2016 re [162] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [249] MOTION to Adopt Proposed Findings Regarding Speedy Trial Act filed by USA, [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value filed by USA, [172] MOTION Regarding Expert filed by USA, [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation filed by Michael Gramins. Total Time: 2 hours and 51 minutes. (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Reply/Response Misc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE/REPLY by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [162] Motion in Limine, [159] Motion in Limine, [166] Motion in Limine (Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine and in Further Opposition to the Government's Motions in Limine) (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [159] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Absence of Criminal Activity, [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value, [172] MOTION Regarding Expert -- Supplemental Post-Hearing Brief (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1: September 22, 2016 Letter from Government to Defense Counsel, # (2) Exhibit 2: October 17, 2016 Letter from Attorney Marc Mukasey to Government)(Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 250 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [243] Motion for Scheduling Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). The Proposed Scheduling Order, ECF No. 244 is the operative Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/18/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016, Terminated: 12/12/2016 Motion to Adopt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Adopt Proposed Findings Regarding Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESCHEDULED Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [187] MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Other Broker Dealers, [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value, [165] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims, [162] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions, [167] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Profitability, [159] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Absence of Criminal Activity, [164] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Defendants Acted as Agents or Brokers or Owed Any Agency Duties to Counterparties, [163] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of FINRA Study Guides Absent Proper Foundation, [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 246 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 245 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: 10/4/2016 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters [187] MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Other Broker Dealers, [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value, [165] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims, [162] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions, [167] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Profitability, [159] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Absence of Criminal Activity, [164] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Defendants Acted as Agents or Brokers or Owed Any Agency Duties to Counterparties, [163] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of FINRA Study Guides Absent Proper Foundation, [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/3/16. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016, Terminated: 10/18/2016 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Order Re: Revised Pretrial Calendar by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference held on 09.06.16 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2016. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: 7/21/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [170] Motion for Attorney Michael L. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice as to Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2016. (Shafer, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Motions hearing held on 09.02.16 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2016. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016, Terminated: 7/21/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael L. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4074741). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael L. Brown, # (2) Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Manning, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 240 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 10/18/16. Jury Selection set for 2/27/2017 at 9:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Telephone Status Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 9/6/2016. 16 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 238 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: Trial Scheduling set for 9/6/2016 at 4:00 PM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. The Government will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 237 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER regarding trial schedule as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: At the pretrial conference on September 2, both sides reported that they are available to begin the trial with jury selection on October 18. At the Court's urging, the parties considered the likelihood that many prospective jurors will seek to be excused due to scheduling conflicts, a problem that is likely to be attenuated if jury selection is postponed until after January 1. After a recess, the defendants reported that they would like to adhere to the existing schedule, notwithstanding the difficulty of empaneling a jury to serve from mid-October through mid-December. After further discussion and another recess, both sides agreed that it would make sense to postpone jury selection until after the holidays but they could not agree on a new date. The defendants asked for a date in early January; the government stated that it cannot proceed until late February. In view of the parties' submissions, which the Court credits, it appears that we must either go forward on the existing schedule or postpone the trial until late February. A telephone conference to address this problem will be held today at 4:00. The government will make arrangements for the conference call. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/6/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 236 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [186] Motion for Leave to File as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/2/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: granting [173] Motion for Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 9/2/2016 re [164] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Defendants Acted as Agents or Brokers or Owed Any Agency Duties to Counterparties filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [173] MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [162] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [167] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Profitability filed by USA, [163] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of FINRA Study Guides Absent Proper Foundation filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value filed by USA, [165] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims filed by USA, [159] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Absence of Criminal Activity filed by USA, [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation filed by Michael Gramins, [187] MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Other Broker Dealers filed by USA. Total Time: 2 hours and 33 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/27/2016 Reply/Response Misc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE/REPLY by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters Defendants' Notice Re: Deadline to Request a Continuance (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [187] MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Other Broker Dealers (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: 8/24/2016 Reply/Response Misc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE/REPLY by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [173] Motion for Order, [223] Memorandum in Support of Motion (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [173] MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) ; Response to Supplemental Memorandum (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1: Government's Letter of August 11, 2016)(Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [172] MOTION Regarding Expert (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [187] MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Other Broker Dealers (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [173] MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Defendants Re: August 15, 2016 Deadline to Request a Continuance by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [155] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Wohlstadter as to Tyler Peters (3). Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/30/2016. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/16. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: 8/12/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters Type of Hearing: Telephone Conference held on 08.02.16 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2016. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: 6/30/2016, Terminated: 7/1/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) David Wohlstadter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4055338). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of David Wohlstadter)(Manning, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 211 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny in case as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters [187] MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Other Broker Dealers, [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value, [165] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims, [162] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions, [167] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Profitability, [159] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Absence of Criminal Activity, [164] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Defendants Acted as Agents or Brokers or Owed Any Agency Duties to Counterparties, [163] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of FINRA Study Guides Absent Proper Foundation, [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: Re: August 18, 2016 @ 10AM. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 210 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [208] Motion for Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/10/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 209 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document: Proposed Subpoena to Counterparty A by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [208] MOTION for Order Re: on Consent for Permission to Issue Additional Subpoena Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) - (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016, Terminated: 8/10/2016 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order Re: on Consent for Permission to Issue Additional Subpoena Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: 8/8/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [172] MOTION Regarding Expert Witnesses (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Frank Fabozzi's CV)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [121] MOTION for Attorney(s) Alex Spiro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3934761) (Spiro, Alex)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: 6/6/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [121] MOTION for Attorney(s) Alex Spiro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3934761) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [167] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Profitability (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Reply/Response Misc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE/REPLY by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [181] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Evidence of Absence of Criminal Activity in Uncharged Transactions (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [164] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Defendants Acted as Agents or Brokers or Owed Any Agency Duties to Counterparties (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [163] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of FINRA Study Guides Absent Proper Foundation (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [162] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Reply/Response Misc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE/REPLY by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [180] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David E. Novick appearing for USA (Novick, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 196 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [194] Motion for Order as to Ross Shapiro (1). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/4/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 195 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [194] Motion for Order as to Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/4/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/3/2016, Terminated: 8/4/2016 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Re: Joint Motion on Consent for Permission to Issue Subpoenas Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) that Call for the Production of Responsive Materials to Defense Counsel Rather than to the Court by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/3/2016 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT returned before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. Grand jury number N-15-1 as to Ross Shapiro (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss-3ss, 4ss-9ss, Michael Gramins (2) count(s) 1ss, 2ss-3ss, 4ss-9ss, Tyler Peters (3) count(s) 1ss, 2ss-3ss, 4ss-9ss. (Caffrey, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 192 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/3/2016 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2016 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny re Motions in Liminie as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Telephone Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 8/2/2016 re [173] MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro. Total Time: 1 hour and 45 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [173] MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/2/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. The government will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Panchenko, I)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Other Broker Dealers by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: 7/27/2016, Terminated: 9/2/2016 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Leave to File Late by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: taking under advisement [110] Motion to Dismiss as to Tyler Peters (3); taking under advisement [112] Motion to Sever Defendant as to Tyler Peters (3); Motion Hearing as to Tyler Peters held on 4/6/2016 re [112] MOTION to Sever Defendant filed by Tyler Peters, [110] Joint MOTION to Dismiss and for a Bill of Particulars filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro. Total Time: 2 hours and 11 minutes (Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [167] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Profitability (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Motion Hearing as to Michael Gramins held on 4/6/2016 re [110] Joint MOTION to Dismiss and for a Bill of Particulars filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro. Total Time: 2 hours and 11 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [166] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [164] Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Defendants Acted as Agents or Brokers or Owed Any Agency Duties to Counterparties (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [159] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Absence of Criminal Activity (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Tyler Peters re [112] MOTION to Sever Defendant Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant Tyler Peters' Motion to Sever (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [165] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [163] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of FINRA Study Guides Absent Proper Foundation (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [121] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tyler Peters (3) for Alex Spiro. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/16/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/16. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [162] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 177 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [174] Motion to Seal as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/25/2016. (Panchenko, I)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016, Terminated: 3/17/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) Alex Spiro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3934761). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Affidavit of Alex Spiro)(Manning, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 176 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document: Appendix by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [174] MOTION to Seal - (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document: Exhibit A by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [174] MOTION to Seal - (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: 7/25/2016, Terminated: 7/25/2016 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Appendix)(Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016, Terminated: 9/2/2016 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order Re: Directing Early Return of Subpoenas Duces Tecum Under Rule 17(c)(1) by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Appendix)(Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Tyler Peters re [112] MOTION to Sever Defendant (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: 7/22/2016, Terminated: 10/26/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Regarding Expert by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/15/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Type of Hearing: Status Conference held on 07.01.16 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2016. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Profitability by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support by Tyler Peters re [112] MOTION to Sever Defendant (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Fair Market Value by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016, Terminated: 7/1/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Sever Defendant by Tyler Peters. (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Blaming Victims by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1, # (2) Exhibit Ex. 2)(Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Defendants Acted as Agents or Brokers or Owed Any Agency Duties to Counterparties by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4)(Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude Admission of FINRA Study Guides Absent Proper Foundation by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence and References to the PPIP Program and Identities of Passive Investors in the Funds Managed by the Counterparty Institutions by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support by Michael Gramins as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [160] Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence and argument regarding the defendants' compensation by Michael Gramins as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: 7/8/2016, Terminated: 4/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Absence of Criminal Activity by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 158 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016 Order on Motion for DisclosureCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [109] Motion for Discovery as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); denying [114] Motion for Discovery as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); denying without prejudice [108] Motion for Disclosure as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); and denying without prejudice [139] Motion to Preclude as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). The parties represent that they are working toward resolving outstanding discovery disputes. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/6/2016. (Panchenko, I)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Order on Motion to Sever DefendantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: denying [110] Motion to Dismiss as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); granting [147] Motion for Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); denying [110] Motion for Bill of Particulars as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3); denying without prejudice to renewal [112] Motion to Sever Defendant as to Tyler Peters (3); Status Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 7/1/2016; Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 7/1/2016 re [147] Motion to Amend Protective Order filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [110] MOTION for Bill of ParticularsJoint MOTION to Dismiss and for a Bill of Particulars filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro, [112] MOTION to Sever Defendant filed by Tyler Peters. 41 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 154 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESCHEDULED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 6/28/16. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. The government will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [100] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Gregory W. Nye withdrawn from case. as to Michael Gramins (2). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/27/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE in Anticipation of Status Conference by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [99] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Philip J. Bezanson withdrawn from case. as to Michael Gramins (2). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/27/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 152 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Entry Correction as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [144] Calendar Entry, Telephone number corrected as 860-240-2629. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Gregory W. Nye to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Gramins. (Nye, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [150] Motion for Extension of Time as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Defendants have until June 27, 2016, to locate and disclose an additional expert witness; the deadline to submit motions in limine related to proposed experts is extended to July 22; the deadline to submit responses to those motions in limine is extended to August 8; and the deadline to submit replies is extended to August 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/14/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016, Terminated: 1/27/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Philip J. Bezanson to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Gramins. (Bezanson, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: 6/14/2016, Terminated: 6/14/2016 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time of Certain Deadlines /Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines by Tyler Peters as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [97] Consent Motion for Extension of Time as to Tyler Peters (3). Deadline to File Pretrial Motions January 29, 2016;Government's Response to Pretrial Motions due February 26, 2016; Defendants' Reply to Government's Response to Pretrial Motions due March 18, 2016. Further extensions of these deadlines are unlikely to be granted due to the oral argument scheduled for 4/6/2016. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/21/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016, Terminated: 7/1/2016 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Amend Protective Order by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016, Terminated: 1/21/2016
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions from January 22, 2016 until January 29, 2016 by Tyler Peters. (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [139] MOTION to Preclude Undisclosed Discovery (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by Ross Shapiro as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [139] MOTION to Preclude Undisclosed Discovery (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 6/28/2016 at 3:30 PM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. The government will initiate the call to chambers at 860-240-2629 (conference line only) with all counsel on the line. (Glynn, T.) Modified on 6/27/2016 to correct phone number (Glynn, T.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part [140] Motion for Extension of Time as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/20/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: taking under advisement [85] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Tyler Peters (3); Bond Hearing as to Tyler Peters held on 1/6/2016; Motion Hearing as to Tyler Peters held on 1/6/2016 re [85] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release / Defendants' Motion to Modify Bail Conditions filed by Michael Gramins. Total Time: 1 hour and 9 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.) (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: 5/20/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: After considering the defendants' motion for extension of time (ECF 140) and the government's opposition (ECF 141), the motion is granted in part and the current schedule is hereby modified as follows: party witness lists, exhibit lists, Jencks and reverse-Jencks material, and expert disclosures: June 13; motions in limine: July 8; responses to motions in limine: July 25; replies to motions in limine: August 5. All other dates remain in effect. To the extent the defendants need to seek relief from the protective order in the parallel civil action, they must act promptly to avoid delay here. The parties will provide the Clerk with suggested dates for oral argument on motions in limine. A status conference will be held by telephone on June 28 at 3:30. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/20/16. (Chatigny, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: taking under advisement [85] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Michael Gramins (2); Bond Hearing as to Michael Gramins held on 1/6/2016; Motion Hearing as to Michael Gramins held on 1/6/2016 re [85] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release / Defendants' Motion to Modify Bail Conditions filed by Michael Gramins. Total Time: 1 hour and 9 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.) (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [140] MOTION for Extension of Time of Certain Interim Deadlines (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016, Terminated: 5/20/2016 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time of Certain Interim Deadlines by Ross Shapiro as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Amended Schedule)(Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: Bond Hearings set for 1/6/2016 at 11:00 AM in East Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016, Terminated: 7/6/2016 Motion to Preclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Preclude Undisclosed Discovery by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting defendants' motion [137] to waive appearance at arraignment pursuant to Rule 10(b) as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/13/16. (Constantine, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016, Terminated: 5/13/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Waive Appearance re [115] Indictment, by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Waiver)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [135] Motion for Leave to File as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/2/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: 5/2/2016, Terminated: 5/2/2016 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [132] Motion for Protective Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/26/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters Type of Hearing: Oral Argument held on 04.06.16 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2016. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: 4/22/2016, Terminated: 4/26/2016 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Re: Protective Order by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [119] MOTION for Attorney(s) Mirah Curzer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3924315) by Ross Shapiro (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: taking under advisement [110] Motion to Dismiss as to Ross Shapiro (1); Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro held on 4/6/2016 re [110] Joint MOTION to Dismiss and for a Bill of Particulars filed by Tyler Peters, Michael Gramins, Ross Shapiro. Total Time: 2 hours and 11 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Tyler Peters on 9/10/2015 (Anastasio, F.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [124] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/21/2016. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Michael Gramins on 9/10/2015 (Anastasio, F.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [110] Joint MOTION to Dismiss and for a Bill of Particulars (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 USM Return Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Ross Shapiro on 9/10/2015 (Anastasio, F.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016, Terminated: 3/21/2016 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mirah Curzer appearing for Ross Shapiro (Curzer, Mirah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [119] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mirah Curzer as to Ross Shapiro (1). Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/8/2016. Signed by Clerk on 3/9/16. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016, Terminated: 3/9/2016 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Attorney Mirah Curzer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3924315). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mirah Curzer)(Daily, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [110] Joint MOTION to Dismiss and for a Bill of Particulars (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters Type of Hearing: Motion. Held on 1/6/2016 before Judge Martinez. Court Reporter: N/A. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2016. (Mayhew, Nathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT returned before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. Grand jury number N-15-1 as to Ross Shapiro (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 4s-9s, Michael Gramins (2) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 4s-9s, Tyler Peters (3) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 4s-9s. (Nuzzi, T) Modified text on 2/5/2016 (Nuzzi, T).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016, Terminated: 7/6/2016 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION for Discovery (Corrected motion) by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [110] Joint MOTION to Dismiss and for a Bill of Particulars (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Joshua Klein)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016, Terminated: 7/1/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss and for a Bill of Particulars by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Sandlar, Leonid). Added MOTION for Bill of Particulars on 7/1/2016 (Glynn, T.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016, Terminated: 7/6/2016 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Discovery by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Philip J. Bezanson appearing for Michael Gramins (Bezanson, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016, Terminated: 7/6/2016 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Disclosure of Affirmative Defenses by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc L. Mukasey appearing for Michael Gramins (Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Surety Information Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Surety Information Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Surety Information Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Surety Information Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Surety Bond Entered as to Ross Shapiro in amount of $10,000,000.00. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' [85] motion to modify conditions of release and [91] amended motion to modify conditions of release as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, and Tyler Peters. See attached order. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 1/19/16. (Brierley, K)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [91] Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release , [85] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release / Defendants' Motion to Modify Bail Conditions (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016, Terminated: 1/19/2016 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: taking under advisement [85] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Ross Shapiro (1); granting [87] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Ross Shapiro (1); Bond Hearing as to Ross Shapiro held on 1/6/2016; Motion Hearing as to Ross Shapiro held on 1/6/2016 re [85] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release / Defendants' Motion to Modify Bail Conditions filed by Michael Gramins, [87] Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Ross Shapiro. Total Time: 1 hour and 9 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.) (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [85] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release / Defendants' Motion to Modify Bail Conditions (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: 9/28/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Philip J. Bezanson [55] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Gramins (2). Signed by Clerk on 9/28/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ross Shapiro re [87] Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015, Terminated: 9/28/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Philip J. Bezanson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3745355). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Nye, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot [86] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Ross Shapiro (1) in light of the filing of a superseding motion seeking the same relief [87]. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 12/18/15. (Martinez, Donna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015, Terminated: 1/6/2016 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Ross Shapiro. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015, Terminated: 12/18/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Ross Shapiro. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015, Terminated: 1/19/2016 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release / Defendants' Motion to Modify Bail Conditions by Michael Gramins as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mukasey, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [15] MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Tully to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728217) (Tully, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters Type of Hearing: Initial Presentment. Held on 9/10/15 before Judge Donna Martinez. Court Reporter: Suzanne Benoit. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2016. (Benoit, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [28] MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig Carpenito to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3732135) (Carpenito, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. Type of Hearing: Status Conference held on 10.07.15 before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Court Reporter: Darlene A. Warner. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2016. (Warner, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [14] MOTION for Attorney(s) Brett D. Jaffee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728197) (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot [64] Motion to Continue as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3) in light of ECF No. 78 ; denying as moot [64] Motion for Speedy Trial as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3) in light of ECF No. 78. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/27/2015. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph G. Tully appearing for Tyler Peters (Tully, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 USM Return Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Ross Shapiro on 9/10/2015 (Anastasio, F.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Craig Carpenito appearing for Tyler Peters (Carpenito, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [66] Motion to Continue as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). The parties' joint request for a continuance of the trial date until October 2016 has been granted after a hearing. See ECF Doc. 71. Crediting the representations of counsel concerning the nature of the case, the volume of discovery, the need for third party discovery, and the likelihood of motion practice, the Court hereby finds that it is unreasonable to expect adequate preparation for pretrial proceedings or for the trial itself within the time limits established by the Speedy Trial Act, see 18 U.S.C. section 3161(h)(7)(B)(ii), and that failure to grant the requested continuance would unreasonably deny counsel reasonable time needed for effective preparation, taking into account the exercise of due diligence, see 18 U.S.C. section 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/26/15. (Chatigny, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brett D. Jaffe appearing for Tyler Peters (Jaffe, Brett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Jury Selection set for 10/18/2016 at 9:00AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [28] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig Carpenito as to Tyler Peters (3). Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/15/2015. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [15] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph G. Tully as to Tyler Peters (3). Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/15/2015. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral Argument re: Motions in limine set for 8/18/2016 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [14] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brett D. Jaffee as to Tyler Peters (3). Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/15/2015. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Surety Information Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral Argument on Pretrial Motions set for 4/6/2016 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Bail Information Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED BAIL INFORMATION SHEET by Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [71] Motion for Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/22/2015. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ross Shapiro Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 9/11/15. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot [70] Motion for Order as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3) in light of ECF No. 71. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/212015. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015, Terminated: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig Carpenito to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3732135). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Craig Carpenito)(Manning, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Surety Bond Entered as to Ross Shapiro in amount of $1,000,000.00. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015, Terminated: 10/22/2015 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION for Order Re: Adopt Proposed Trial Schedule by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/17/2015, Entered: 10/17/2015, Terminated: 10/21/2015 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order Re: Adopt Proposed Trial Schedule by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Cherry, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny:Pretrial Conference as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters held on 10/7/2015. 35 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.)(Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015, Terminated: 10/26/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue until October 2016 and Consent to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Scheduling Order)(Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua Klein appearing for Ross Shapiro (Klein, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015, Terminated: 10/27/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue until May 2016, MOTION for Speedy Trial Exclusion of Time by USA as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order for Trial and Pretrial Motions)(Brennan, Liam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [58] MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3750072) (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Tyler Peters (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Joshua Klein [58] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ross Shapiro (1). Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/4/2015. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED BAIL INFORMATION SHEET by Tyler Peters (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Entry Correction as to Ross Shapiro re [58] MOTION for Attorney Joshua Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3750072). Added replacement declaration. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Tyler Peters Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 9/11/15. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [25] MOTION for Attorney(s) Leonid Sandlar to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Surety Bond Entered as to Tyler Peters in amount of $1,000,000.00. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re [26] MOTION for Attorney(s) Guy Petrillo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Michael Gramins (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015, Terminated: 10/5/2015 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3750072). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joshua Klein)(Daily, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2015: # (2) Replacement PDF) (Sundie, T).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED BAIL INFORMATION SHEET by Michael Gramins (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [54] Motion for Extension of Time as to Ross Shapiro (1), Michael Gramins (2), Tyler Peters (3). The motion is granted with respect to the suspension of the current pretrial deadlines, subject to the filing of the appropriate speedy trial waivers. The parties will submit a proposed scheduling order to be discussed at the pretrial conference on October 7, 2015, after which the Court will enter a new scheduling order. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/30/2015. (Rickevicius, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Michael Gramins Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 9/11/15. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015, Terminated: 9/30/2015 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time by Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters. (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Surety Bond Entered as to Michael Gramins in amount of $1,000,000.00. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Leonid Sandlar appearing for Ross Shapiro (Sandlar, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney(s) Guy Petrillo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728316). (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: 9/25/2015 Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Guy Petrillo appearing for Ross Shapiro (Petrillo, Guy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney(s) Leonid Sandlar to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728301). (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [26] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Guy Petrillo as to Ross Shapiro (1) Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/14/2015. Signed by Clerk on 9/15/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [25] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leonid Sandlar as to Ross Shapiro (1) Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/14/2015. Signed by Clerk on 9/15/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez:Initial Appearance as to Tyler Peters held on 9/10/2015, Arraignment as to Tyler Peters (3) Counts 1,2-3,4-10 held on 9/10/2015, Bond Hearing as to Tyler Peters held on 9/10/2015, Plea entered by Tyler Peters (3) Not Guilty on counts 1,2-3,4-10, indictment. Time 29 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.)(Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Entry Correction as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters re [24] Calendar Entry, Corrected to reflect Pretrial Conference, not FINAL. (Glynn, T.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez:Initial Appearance as to Michael Gramins held on 9/10/2015, Arraignment as to Michael Gramins (2) Counts 1,2-3,4-10 held on 9/10/2015, Bond Hearing as to Michael Gramins held on 9/10/2015, Plea entered by Michael Gramins (2) Not Guilty on counts 1,2-3,4-10, indictment. Time 29 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.)(Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference With Clients Present set for 10/7/2015 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. (Glynn, T.) Modified on 9/15/2015 to delete FINAL (Glynn, T.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Marc L. Mukasey [16] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Gramins (2). Signed by Clerk on 9/10/15. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Surety Information Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Bail Information Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED BAIL INFORMATION SHEET by Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ross Shapiro Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 9/11/15. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Surety Bond Entered as to Ross Shapiro in amount of $1,000,000.00. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015, Terminated: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Tully to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728217). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Joseph G. Tully)(Manning, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney(s) Guy Petrillo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728316). (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015, Terminated: 9/16/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney(s) Brett D. Jaffee to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728197). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Declaration of Brett D. Jaffe)(Manning, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) Leonid Sandlar to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728301). (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen V. Manning appearing for Tyler Peters (Manning, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters; Substantive Motions due 10/1/2015, Government Response due 10/8/2015, Proposed Voir Dire Questions due 11/3/2015, Proposed Jury Instructions due 11/3/2015, Jury Selection set for 11/10/2015 at 9:00 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 9/10/15. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    0Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez:Initial Appearance as to Ross Shapiro held on 9/10/2015, Arraignment as to Ross Shapiro (1) Counts 1,2-3,4-10 held on 9/10/2015, Bond Hearing as to Ross Shapiro held on 9/10/2015, Plea entered by Ross Shapiro (1) Not Guilty on counts 1,2-3,4-10, indictment. Time 29 minutes(Court Reporter FTR.)(Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Self Surrender of Tyler Peters (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015, Terminated: 9/10/2015 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR: MOTION for Attorney(s) Guy Petrillo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728316). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Guy Petrillo)(Daily, Thomas) Modified on 9/14/2015; motion filed on wrong defendants (Sundie, T).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Self Surrender of Michael Gramins (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015, Terminated: 9/10/2015 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR: MOTION for Attorney(s) Leonid Sandlar to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-3728301). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Leonid Sandlar)(Daily, Thomas) Modified on 9/14/2015; motion filed on wrong defendants (Sundie, T).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Self Surrender of Ross Shapiro (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas V. Daily appearing for Ross Shapiro (Daily, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Marc L. Mukasey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. $75 fee paid, receipt number CTXH00009530. (Sundie, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/8/2015. (Freberg, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory W. Nye appearing for Michael Gramins (Nye, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER as to Ross Shapiro, Michael Gramins, Tyler Peters - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/8/2015. (Freberg, B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 6,054 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?