District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Cedeno et al v. Intech Group et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-09716-JSR
District Judge Jed S. Rakoff, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 3:53 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABC, Plaintiff
No Logo Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey, Pegno & Kramarsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E.L. Dewey +1 212 943 9000 +1 212 943 4325 tdewey@dpklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Auerbach +1 215 885 2250 +1 888 875 0469 auerbach@marcusauerbach.com
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Eligio Cedeno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey, Pegno & Kramarsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E.L. Dewey +1 212 943 9000 +1 212 943 4325 tdewey@dpklaw.com
Space Chi-Ru Jou +1 212 943 9000 +1 212 943 4325 cjou@dpklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Auerbach +1 215 885 2250 +1 888 875 0469 auerbach@marcusauerbach.com
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
v.
No Logo Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DENNIS H. TRACEY, III +1 212 918 3000 +9183 918 918 3100 dennis.tracey@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Alfredo Pardo Acosta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Alhambra Investments LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine C. Grieve +1 305 374 3250 +1 305 374 7632 cgrieve@riveromestre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RIVERO MESTRE & CASTRO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andres Rivero +1 305 445 2500 +1 305 445 2505 arivero@rmc-attorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rivero, Palmer & Mestre L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erimar Von Der Osten +1 305 445 2500

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Edouard Dans +1 212 203 7600 +1 646 365 3401 pedans01@yahoo.com
No Logo Consorcio Microstar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Corporate John Doe Defendants 1-10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo DEF, Defendant
No Logo Domingo Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Edgar Hernandez Behrens, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Gonzalo E. Vazquez Perez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Gustavo Arraiz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Individual John Doe Defendants 1-30, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Intech Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Moscowitz & Moscowitz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norman Allen Moscowitz +1 305 379 8300 +3794 379 379 4404 nmoscowitz@moscowitz.com
No Logo Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine C. Grieve +1 305 374 3250 +1 305 374 7632 cgrieve@riveromestre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RIVERO MESTRE & CASTRO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erimar Von der Osten +1 305 445 2500 +1 305 445 2505 evonderOsten@riveromestre.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andres Rivero +1 305 445 2500 +1 305 445 2505 arivero@rmc-attorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Edouard Dans +1 212 203 7600 +1 646 365 3401 pedans01@yahoo.com
No Logo Julian Isaias Rodrigue Diaz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Maigualida Angulo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Maria Espinoza De Robles, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Pedro Carreno, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Ricardo Fernandez Barrueco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com
No Logo Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Diaz Reus & Targ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Edward Davidson +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 gdavidson@diazreus.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos Fernando Gonzalez +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 cgonzalez@diazreus.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Diaz, Jr. +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 mdiaz@diazreus.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Scott Purdie +1 305 375 9220 +1 305 375 8050 cpurdie@diazreus.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Priya Chaudhry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Priya Chaudhry +1 212 397 3370 priya@sc-harris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhode Island Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guillermo Ariel Gleizer +1 917 539 0175 +1 212 918 7958 ari.gui@gmail.com
No Logo Werner Braschi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Coffey Burlington, PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Elizabeth Raffanello +1 305 858 2900 +1 305 858 5261 sraffanello@coffeyburlington.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaffe & Asher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn P. Berger +1 212 687 3000 +1 212 687 9639 gberger@jaffeandasher.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald F. Luke +1 212 687 3000 +1 212 687 9639 dluke@jaffeandasher.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 11/23/2009
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County NewYork
Terminated 3/7/2013
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 10-3861-cv[US Court of Appeals, Second Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,ECF
  Entries (176) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013 Clerks Judgment
CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated March 4, 2013, final judgment is hereby entered and the complaint is dismissed with prejudice; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/7/13) (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter final judgment dismissing the complaint, with prejudice, and to close the case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/4/2013) (djc)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
      Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: [150] Order, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (djc)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Costs Taxed
        Costs Taxed as to [145] USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 10-3861-cv. in the amount of $61.20. Docketed as Judgment #12,0961 on 06/06/2012 in favor of Appellees Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez & Alhambra Investments, LLC against Appellants Eligio Cedeno, Cedel International Investment. (nd)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Costs Taxed
          Costs Taxed as to [145] USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 10-3861-cv. in the amount of $43.01. Docketed as Judgment #12,0960 on 06/06/2012 in favor of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero against Appellants Eligio Cedeno, Cedel International Investment. (nd)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Costs Taxed
            Costs Taxed as to [145] USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 10-3861-cv. in the amount of $76.80. Docketed as Judgment #12,0959 on 06/06/2012 in favor of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastidas Castillo against Appellants Eligio Cedeno, Cedel International Investment. (nd)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Costs Taxed
              Costs Taxed as to [145] USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 10-3861. in the amount of $172.13. Docketed as Judgment #12,0937 on 06/06/2012 in favor of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna against Apppellants Eligio Cedeno, Cedel International Investment. (nd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 USCA Mandate
                MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to [113] Notice of Appeal filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno USCA Case Number 10-3861-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 02/29/2012. (nd)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 Objection (non-motion)
                  Objection to Defendant's Bill of Costs. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Auerbach, Jonathan)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
                    Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: [145] USCA Mandate,. (nd)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                      ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Jonathan Auerbach to RE-FILE Document [143] Bill of Costs. Use the event type Objection(non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ka)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: 2/28/2012 Taxation of Costs
                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - BILL OF COSTS OBJECTION Document filed by Eligio Cedeno.(Auerbach, Jonathan) Modified on 2/29/2012 (ka).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Taxation of Costs
                          BILL OF COSTS Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-1 Bills, # (2) Exhibit A-2 Bills)(Gonzalez, Carlos)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Unavailability. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC. (Rivero, Andres)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 ~Notice (other)
                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #141) - NOTICE of Unavailability. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC. (Rivero, Andres) Modified on 7/7/2011 (ldi).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Unavailability. Document filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez. (Rivero, Andres)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #139) - NOTICE of Unavailability. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, Gonzalo E. Vazquez Perez. (Rivero, Andres) Modified on 7/7/2011 (ldi).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Order on Motion to ServeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER denying [132] Motion to Serve without prejudice to renewal of the Second Circuit were to reverse Judge Rakoff's August 24, 2010 Opinion and Order (Dkt. No. 104) holding that RICO cannot support a lawsuit in the United States over the alleged actions of various defendants in Venezuela. Finally, since any inquest as to damages at this time could affect the rights of the dismissed defendants if the Second Circuit were to reverse Judge Rakoff, the Court denies plaintiffs' application for inquest damages (Dkt. No. 114) without prejudice to its renewal after the Second Circuit rules on the appeal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 3/30/11). (djc)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                      CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. I have closed the above reference for magistrate judge statistical purposes. Reason: return to D.J. (eef)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                        DECLARATION of Antonio Rosich in Support re: [132] MOTION to Serve by Alternative Method.. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (Dewey, Thomas)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                          DECLARATION of Karina Shreefer in Support re: [132] MOTION to Serve by Alternative Method.. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (Dewey, Thomas)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                            DECLARATION of J. Martin Futrell in Support re: [132] MOTION to Serve by Alternative Method.. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (Dewey, Thomas)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [132] MOTION to Serve by Alternative Method.. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit One, # (2) Exhibit Two)(Dewey, Thomas)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011, Terminated: 3/30/2011 Motion to Serve
                                                MOTION to Serve by Alternative Method. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno.(Dewey, Thomas)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 Notice of Change of Address
                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Chi-Ru Jou on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Dewey Pegno & Kramarsky LLP, 777 Third Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10017, 212-943-9000. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 Notice of Change of Address
                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas E.L. Dewey on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Dewey Pegno & Kramarsky LLP, 777 Third Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10017, 212-943-9000. (Dewey, Thomas)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                      USCA Case Number 10-3861-cv from the US Court of Appeals, Second Circuit assigned to [113] Notice of Appeal filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (nd)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                        Second Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Supplemental Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for [120] Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA - Index, [122] Affirmation in Support of Motion filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [121] MOTION for Jerome M. Marcus and Jonathan Auerbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [119] Memo Endorsement, [125] MOTION to Seal Document. filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [118] Response filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [115] Notice (Other) filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC, [114] Statement of Damages filed by Eligio Cedeno, [126] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [124] Notice of Appearance filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [127] DECLARATION of Robert R. Amsterdam in Support filed by Cedel International Investment, Eligio Cedeno , [116] Notice (Other) filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC, [117] Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, [123] Notice of Appearance filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [129] Notice of Change of Address filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero USCA Case Number 10-3861, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd) Modified on 3/14/2011 (nd).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Notice of Change of Address
                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Norman A. Moscowitz on behalf of Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. New Address: Moscowitz & Moscowitz, P.A., 1111 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2050, Miami, FL, United States 33131, 305-379-8300. (Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA - Index
                                                            First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Supplemental Index to the record on Appeal for [113] Notice of Appeal filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno USCA Case Number 10-3861, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Supplemental Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (nd).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/29/2010 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [118] Response filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. Endorsement: 1. Plaintiffs to report by 3/25/11 re service, etc. as requested in the last paragraph. 2. Plaintiffs to advise the Court also by 3/25/11 re status of 2d Cir. appeal. Copies by ECF to: All Counsel, Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 12/28/10) (mro)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Response
                                                                RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (Dewey, Thomas)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: By December 23, 2010, plaintiffs are to either: (1) stipulate to dismissal without prejudice of the "Remaining Defendants, "or (2) show cause as to how the "Remaining Defendants" were properly served. By "Remaining Defendants," the Court means defendants other than those dismissed by Judge Rakoffs August 24,2010 and September 16,2010 Orders, and those he granted plaintiffs' motion for default on August 25, 2010. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 12/16/2010) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jpo)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    NOTICE of New Firm Name. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez. (Rivero, Andres)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                      NOTICE of of Unavailability. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez. (Rivero, Andres)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Statement of Damages
                                                                        STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit)(Auerbach, Jonathan)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010, Terminated: 2/29/2012 Notice of Appeal
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL from [111] Order of Dismissal, [110] Judgment,, [104] Memorandum & Opinion, Set Deadlines. Document filed by Cedel International Investment,Ltd., Eligio Cedeno. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 915668. (nd)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                                            Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for [81] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [63] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Eligio Cedeno, [10] Notice of Appearance filed by Eligio Cedeno, [75] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Eligio Cedeno, [79] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, [46] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [77] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Domingo R. Martinez. filed by Eligio Cedeno, [27] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Eligio Cedeno, [64] MOTION for Andres Rivero to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC, [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, [96] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Werner Braschi, Alhambra Investments LLC, Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [36] MOTION for Norman A. Moscowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [98] Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion,, filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [85] Certificate of Service Other filed by Werner Braschi, [65] MOTION for Catherine Grieve to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC, [60] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [51] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [6] Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, [20] Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Eligio Cedeno, [95] Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Werner Braschi, Alhambra Investments LLC, Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [55] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, [109] Certificate of Service Other filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [88] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, [67] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [58] Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, [68] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Eligio Cedeno, [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, [110] Judgment,, [92] Notice (Other) filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [108] Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, [103] Notice of Change of Address, filed by ABC, Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [102] Notice of Change of Address filed by ABC, Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [29] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Eligio Cedeno, [52] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [25] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [19] Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Eligio Cedeno, [35] MOTION for Susan E. Raffanello to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Werner Braschi, [23] Notice of Appearance filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [100] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Werner Braschi, Alhambra Investments LLC, Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [97] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Eligio Cedeno, [57] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, [16] Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Eligio Cedeno, [83] Certificate of Service as to USA, Certificate of Service Other filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [15] Notice of Change of Address filed by Werner Braschi, [104] Memorandum & Opinion, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, [9] Complaint,, filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [50] Notice of Appearance filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC, [106] Default Judgment Inquest, [80] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [72] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Intech Group, Inc.. filed by Eligio Cedeno, [24] MOTION for Carlos F. Gonzalez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [105] Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, [76] Declaration in Support of Motion,,,, filed by Eligio Cedeno, [5] Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, [7] Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [82] Reply to Response to Motion filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [43] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Werner Braschi, [87] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, [48] MOTION for Michael Diaz, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [11] Notice of Appearance filed by Eligio Cedeno, [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, [22] Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Eligio Cedeno, [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Werner Braschi, [111] Order of Dismissal, [13] Notice of Appearance filed by Werner Braschi, [107] Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, [40] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [69] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, [30] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Eligio Cedeno, [34] Notice of Substitution of Attorney,, filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [49] MOTION for Chad S. Purdie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [113] Notice of Appeal filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [78] Declaration in Support of Motion,,,, filed by Eligio Cedeno, [26] Notice of Appearance filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, [18] Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Eligio Cedeno, [21] Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Eligio Cedeno, [71] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, [45] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [93] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [32] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Eligio Cedeno, [62] Certificate of Service Other filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [28] Amended Complaint,,, filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno, [4] Order, [53] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [84] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Werner Braschi, [90] Certificate of Service Other, filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [112] Judgment, [31] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Eligio Cedeno, [89] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [70] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Eligio Cedeno, [33] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Eligio Cedeno, [66] MOTION for Erimar von der Osten to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC, [14] Notice of Appearance filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [86] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, [12] Pre-Conference Statement filed by Eligio Cedeno, [47] MOTION for Gary E. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [61] Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [94] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Eligio Cedeno, [44] Affidavit of Service Other filed by Werner Braschi, [17] Affidavit of Service Complaints filed by Eligio Cedeno, [99] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [38] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                              Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: [113] Notice of Appeal. (nd)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Transmission of Notice of Appeal to District Judge
                                                                                Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: [113] Notice of Appeal. (nd)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AND FURTHER PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, In it's Order and Partial Summary Judgment of September 8, 2010, the Court inadvertently neglected to note that the Court had also dismissed plaintiffs' complaint with respect to defendant Werner Braschi. Accordingly, plaintiffs' complainit against defendant Werner Braschi is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 09/16/2010) (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Righ to Appeal)(dt)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AND FURTHER PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT: Accordingly, plaintiffs' complaint against defendant Werner Braschi is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/16/2010) (js)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Default Judgment Order served on Martinez, Intech Group on 9/10/2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER AND PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT, The Court hereby enters partial final judgment, dismissing the case as to defendants Zambrano Lara, Idler Bastidas, Alhambra Investment LLC, Intech Group, Inc. and Martinez. Any defendants who have not been served, the Court hereby refers all such practices and proceedings to Magistrate Judge Peck, along with the inquest as to defendants Intech Group, Inc. and Martinez that has already been referred to him. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/8/10) (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. ENDORSEMENT: Referred as to all defendants not dismissed by Opinion and Order dated August 24, 2010. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/8/10) (db)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER: Judge Rakoff has entered a default judgment as to liability against defendants Intech Group and Domingo Martinez. (Dkt. No. 106; see also Dkt. No. 104.) Plaintiffs' submissions in support of inquest damages shall be served and filed by September 22, 2010. Defendant Intech Group's and defendant Martinez's opposition papers are due by October 6, 2010. Plaintiffs' counsel is to serve this Order on defendants and file proof of service with the Clerk of Court. Counsel are advised that my chambers (Room 1370, 500 Pearl Street) are to be provided with a courtesy copy of all papers hereafter filed with the Court. The parties are to follow the "Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck," a copy of which is attached. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 9/8/2010) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (jpo)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 9/8/2010. (mro)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Default Judgment InquestCourt Filing
                                                                                                DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Cedel Internatioanl Investment, and Eligio Cedeno against Intech Group, Inc., and Domingo Martinez. Ordered that this matter be referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck for an inquest. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/25/10) (ml)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/24/2010) (jmi)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                    OPINION AND ORDER #99349 Finally, since more than 120 days have passed since plaintiffs filed their original complaint against defendants Carreo, Vazquez, Fernandez, Rodriguez, Hernandez, Espinoza de Robles, Pardo, Angulo, Arriz, and Consorcio Microsoft and those defendants have not been served, the Court, while recognizing that the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure accord a plaintiff leave beyond 120 days to serve foreign defendants, hereby directs the plaintiff to inform the Court in writing, by no later than September 8, 2010, of what efforts, if any, have been made to serve those defendants and whether the Court should dismiss those defendants without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close documents numbered 37, 39, 42, 54, 56, 59, 72, and 77 on the docket of this case. SO ORDERED ( Status Report due by 9/8/2010.), Motions terminated: [77] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Domingo R. Martinez. filed by Eligio Cedeno, [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, [72] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Intech Group, Inc. filed by Eligio Cedeno, [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Werner Braschi, [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/24/2010) (jmi) Modified on 8/26/2010 (ajc).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan Auerbach on behalf of ABC, Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. New Address: Marcus & Auerbach LLC, 101 Greenwood Avenue, Suite 310, Jenkintown, Pennsylvania, USA 19046, 215-885-2250. (Auerbach, Jonathan)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jerome M. Marcus on behalf of ABC, Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. New Address: Marcus & Auerbach LLC, 101 Greenwood Avenue, Suite 310, Jenkintown, Pennsylvania, USA 19046, 215-885-2250. (Marcus, Jerome)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/13/2010 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ab)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                            JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC, Werner Braschi, Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna. (Tracey, Dennis)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion
                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (Dewey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of of Filing re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Dewey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Werner Braschi, Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Alhambra Investments LLC, Adina MercedesBastida Castillo. (Tracey, Dennis)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Memorandum of Law re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Werner Braschi, Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Alhambra Investments LLC, Adina MercedesBastida Castillo. (Tracey, Dennis)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 7/13/2010. Court reporter present-Karen Gorlaski. Oral Argument held on motions to dismiss. Court's decision reserved. (mro)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2010. (mro)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Dewey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Defendant Zambrano's Supplemental Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/13/2010 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ab)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply In Further Support Of Defendant Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna's Omnibus Motion to (1) Dismiss Amended Complaint [DE-28] For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction And Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted, And (2) Strike Scandalous Material. Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna. (Gonzalez, Carlos)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                      ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Chi-Ru Jou to RE-FILE Document [74] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Domingo R. Martinez. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each getting there own Document #. ***REMINDER*** (1) First Re-File the Motion for Default Judgment by itself. (2) File the Declaration in Support (with the exhibits attached), then link it to the newly filed Motion. (db)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna. (Gonzalez, Carlos)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                          ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Chi-Ru Jou to RE-FILE Document [73] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Intech Group, Inc.. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each getting there own Document #. ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY*** - Just Re-File the Declaration in Support of Motion (add the exhibits to this document), then link it to the [72] MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (db)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC. (Grieve, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez. (Grieve, Catherine)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo. (Tracey, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law served on Rivero, Palmer & Mestre on 7/1/10. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Werner Braschi. (Berger, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                                    CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [64] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [65] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [66] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $75.00, paid on 06/11/2010, Receipt Number 906142. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Werner Braschi. (Berger, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Certificate of Service as to USA
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [66] Motion for Erimar von der Osten to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/24/2010) (jmi)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [65] Motion for Catherine Grieve to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/24/2010) (jmi)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Note Rejection of Attempted Paper Filing in ECF Case
                                                                                                                                                                ***REJECTION OF ATTEMPTED PAPER FILING IN ECF CASE. The following document(s) Declaration Of Chi-Ru Jou In Support Of Certificate Of Default Against Domingo R. Martinez Chi-Ru Jou, was rejected by the Clerk's Office and must be FILED ELECTRONICALLY on the Court's ECF System. (jab)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Second Corrected. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Lewis Perry, # (2) Affidavit CV of Duque Corredor, # (3) Affidavit Declaration of Duque Corredor, # (4) Affidavit Declaration of Duque Corredor)(Dewey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Chi-Ru Jou in Support re: [77] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Domingo R. Martinez.. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. Clerk's Certificate, # (2) Exhibit B. Summons and Complaint, # (3) Exhibit B1. Complaint Ex. 1, # (4) Exhibit B1a. Complaint Ex. 1a, # (5) Exhibit B2. Complaint Ex. 2 Part 1 of 2, # (6) Exhibit B2. Complaint Ex. 2 Part 2 of 2, # (7) Exhibit B2a. Complaint Ex. 2a, # (8) Exhibit B3. Complaint Ex. 3, # (9) Exhibit B3a. Complaint Ex. 3a, # (10) Exhibit B4. Complaint Ex. 4, # (11) Exhibit B4a. Complaint Ex. 4a, # (12) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 1 of 5, # (13) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 2 of 5, # (14) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 3 of 5, # (15) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 4 of 5, # (16) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 5 of 5, # (17) Exhibit C. Amended Complaint, # (18) Exhibit D. Note re Exhibits to Amended Complaint, # (19) Exhibit E. Proof of Service of Complaint, # (20) Exhibit F. Proof of Service of Amended Complaint)(Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Default Judgment as to Domingo R. Martinez. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. Return Date set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM.(Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Chi-Ru Jou in Support re: [72] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Intech Group, Inc... Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. Clerk's Certificate, # (2) Exhibit B. Summons and Complaint, # (3) Exhibit B1. Complaint Ex. 1, # (4) Exhibit B1a. Complaint Ex. 1a, # (5) Exhibit B2. Complaint Ex. 2, # (6) Exhibit B2. Complaint Ex. 2 Part 2, # (7) Exhibit B2a. Complaint Ex. 2a, # (8) Exhibit B3. Complaint Ex. 3, # (9) Exhibit B3a. Complaint Ex. 3a, # (10) Exhibit B4. Complaint Ex. 4, # (11) Exhibit B4a. Complaint Ex. 4a, # (12) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 1 of 5, # (13) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 2 of 5, # (14) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 3 of 5, # (15) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 4 of 5, # (16) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 5 of 5, # (17) Exhibit C. Amended Complaint, # (18) Exhibit D. Note re Exhibits to Amended Complaint, # (19) Exhibit E. Proof of Service of Complaint, # (20) Exhibit F. Proof of Service of Amended Complaint)(Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Motions for Default Judgment Against Intech Group, Inc. and Domingo R. Martinez served on All Counsel on 06/22/2010. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Domingo R. Martinez. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. Return Date set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Chi-Ru Jou in Support of Default Judgment Against Domingo R. Martinez, # (2) Exhibit A. Clerk's Certificate, # (3) Exhibit B. Summons and Complaint, # (4) Exhibit B.1. Complaint Ex. 1, # (5) Exhibit B1a. Complaint Ex. 1a, # (6) Exhibit B2. Complaint Ex. 2, # (7) Exhibit B2a. Complaint Ex. 2a, # (8) Exhibit B3. Complaint Ex. 3, # (9) Exhibit B3a. Complaint Ex. 3a, # (10) Exhibit B4. Complaint Ex. 4, # (11) Exhibit B4a. Complaint Ex. 4a, # (12) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 1 of 5, # (13) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 2 of 5, # (14) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 3 of 5, # (15) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 4 of 5, # (16) Exhibit B5. Complaint Ex. 5 Part 5 of 5, # (17) Exhibit C. Amended Complaint, # (18) Exhibit D. Note re Exhibits to Amended Complaint, # (19) Exhibit E. Proof of Service for Complaint, # (20) Exhibit F. Proof of Service for Amended Complaint)(Jou, Chi-Ru) Modified on 6/23/2010 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Intech Group, Inc.. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. Return Date set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Chi-Ru Jou in Support of Default Judgment Against Intech Group, Inc., # (2) Exhibit Ex. A Clerk's Certificate, # (3) Exhibit Summons and Complaint, # (4) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 1, # (5) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 1a, # (6) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 2, Part 1 of 2, # (7) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 2 Part 2 of 2, # (8) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 2a, # (9) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 3, # (10) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 3a, # (11) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 4, # (12) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 4a, # (13) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 5 Part 1 of 5, # (14) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 5 Part 2 of 5, # (15) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 5 Part 3 of 5, # (16) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 5 Part 4 of 5, # (17) Exhibit Complaint Ex. 5 Part 5 of 5, # (18) Exhibit C Amended Complaint, # (19) Exhibit D Note re Exhibits to Amended Complaint, # (20) Exhibit Proof of Service of Complaint, # (21) Exhibit Proof of Service of Amended Complaint)(Jou, Chi-Ru) Modified on 6/23/2010 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Default Judgment as to Intech Group, Inc.. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. Return Date set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM.(Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Corrected. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Lewis Perry, # (2) Affidavit CV of Duque Corredor, # (3) Affidavit Declaration of Duque Corredor, # (4) Affidavit Declaration of Duque Corredor)(Marcus, Jerome)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Corrected. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Marcus, Jerome)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Lewis Perry, # (2) Affidavit Declaration of Duque Corredor, # (3) Affidavit Translation of Duque Corredor Declaration, # (4) Exhibit Duque Corredor CV)(Marcus, Jerome)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Marcus, Jerome)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting [64] Motion for Andres Rivero to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez and Alhambra Investments LLC. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/17/2010) (tro)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                            CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [48] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [49] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [47] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $75.00, paid on 05/27/2010, Receipt Number 905117. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Erimar von der Osten to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [36] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 05/19/2010, Receipt Number 904409. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Catherine Grieve to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [35] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 05/19/2010, Receipt Number 904370. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Andres Rivero to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint served on Alhambra Investments, LLC on 05/06/2010. Service was accepted by Karen Charbonneau, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Carlos Asuaje Crespo, Exhibit A to Declaration served on Eligio Cedeno, et al. on 06/07/2010. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Carlos Asuaje Crespo in Support re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Settlement, Dated August 5, 2008)(Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [59] MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Zambrano to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. Responses due by 6/21/2010 Return Date set for 6/28/2010 at 11:59 PM.(Moscowitz, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC.(Dans, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [56] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC. (Dans, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alhambra Investments LLC. Responses due by 6/21/2010(Dans, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [54] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez. (Dans, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez. Responses due by 6/21/2010(Dans, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting [49] Motion for Chad S. Purdie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/3/2010) (jfe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting [48] Motion for Michael Diaz, Jr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/3/2010) (jfe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting [47] Motion for Gary E. Davidso to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/3/2010) (jfe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Edouard Dans on behalf of Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Alhambra Investments LLC (Dans, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Glenn Peter Berger to RE-FILE Document [41] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each getting there own Document #. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Chad S. Purdie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Michael Diaz, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Gary E. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION : granting [36] Motion for Norman A. Moskowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/26/2010) (tve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting [35] Motion for Susan E. Raffanello to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/25/2010) (jpo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/18/2010. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss, Exhibit and Memorandum of Law served on Norman A. Moskowitz, Esq. on 5/24/10. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Werner Braschi. (Berger, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [42] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Werner Braschi. (Berger, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Werner Braschi. Responses due by 6/21/2010 Return Date set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Berger, Glenn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Werner Braschi. Responses due by 6/21/2010 Return Date set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Complaint, # (2) Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Werner Braschi's Motion to Dismiss, # (3) Certificate of Service)(Berger, Glenn) Modified on 5/25/2010 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [39] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna. (Gonzalez, Carlos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna. Responses due by 6/21/2010 Return Date set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM.(Gonzalez, Carlos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [37] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo. (Tracey, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Adina MercedesBastida Castillo. Responses due by 6/21/2010 Return Date set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment -- Certificate of Service)(Tracey, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Norman A. Moscowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [24] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 04/27/2010, Receipt Number 901686. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Susan E. Raffanello to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Werner Braschi.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Theresa M.B. Van Vliet, New Attorney: Norman Moscowitz, Address: Moscowitz & Moscowitz, P.A., 1111 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2050, Miami, Florida, U.S.A. 33131, 305-379-8300. Document filed by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A -Motion for Subsitution of Counsel, # (2) Exhibit B-Declaration of Jose Zambrano, # (3) Exhibit C- Declaration of Norman Moscowitz, # (4) Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel)(Elgidely, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint served on Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez on 05/11/2010. Service was accepted by Fabiana Pietri de Lara. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint served on Domingo R. Martinez on 05/07/2010. Service was accepted by Carla Guerrero. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint served on Intech Group, Inc. on 05/07/2010. Service was accepted by Carla Guerrero. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint served on Domingo R. Martinez on 05/07/2010. Service was accepted by Carla Louerrero. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint served on Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero on 05/10/2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [9] Complaint against Gustavo Arraiz, Consorcio Microstar, Intech Group, Inc., Domingo Martinez, Pedro Carreno, Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, Juan Lara Fernandez Fernandez, Werner Braschi, Gonzalo E. Vazquez Perez, Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Ricardo Fernandez Barrueco, Alhambra Investments LLC, Julian Isaias Rodrigue Diaz, Edgar Hernandez Behrens, Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, Maria Espinoza De Robles, Alfredo Pardo Acosta, Maigualida Angulo, Individual John Doe Defendants 1-30, Corporate John Doe Defendants 1-10.Document filed by Eligio Cedeno, Cedel Internatioanl Investment. Related document: [9] Complaint filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit)(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint served on Adina Mercedes Bastidas Castillo on 05/03/10. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis H. Tracey, III on behalf of Adina MercedesBastida Castillo (Tracey, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting [24] Motion for Carlos F. Gonzalez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/29/2010) (tve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Carlos F. Gonzalez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Interim Pretrial Status Conference held on 4/19/2010. (tro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Priya Chaudhry on behalf of Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna (Chaudhry, Priya)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Alhambra Investments LLC served on 3/29/2010, answer due 4/19/2010. Service was accepted by Karen Charbonneau. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/16/2010. (tro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Werner Braschi served on 4/2/2010, answer due 4/23/2010. Service was accepted by Werner Braschi. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Adina MercedesBastida Castillo served on 3/27/2010, answer due 4/19/2010. Service was accepted by Adina Mercedes Bastidas Castillo. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna served on 4/2/2010, answer due 4/23/2010. Service was accepted by Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. Service was accepted by Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Intech Group, Inc. served on 4/13/2010, answer due 5/4/2010. Service was accepted by Domingo R. Martinez. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 2/16/2011 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno.(mro) (nd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Domingo Martinez served on 4/13/2010, answer due 5/4/2010. Service was accepted by Ruben Dominguez. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno. (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 2/16/2011 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Robert R. Amsterdam in Support re: [125] MOTION for Leave to File Complaint under Seal. Document filed by Cedel International Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (mro) Modified on 2/24/2011 (mro).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Donald F. Luke on behalf of Werner Braschi. New Address: Jaffe & Asher LLP, 600 Third Avenue, New York, NY, U.S.A. 10016-1901, 212-687-3000. (Luke, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 2/16/2011 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [125] MOTION for Leave to File Complaint under Seal. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Guillermo Ariel Gleizer on behalf of Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna (Gleizer, Guillermo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 2/16/2011 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Complaint under Seal. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/18/2010, Entered: 4/18/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald F. Luke on behalf of Werner Braschi (Luke, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 2/16/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Auerbach on behalf of Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Pre-Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT Form D. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno.(Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 2/16/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome M. Marcus on behalf of Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chi-Ru Jou on behalf of Eligio Cedeno (Jou, Chi-Ru)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 2/16/2011 Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Thomas E. L. Dewey in Support re: [121] MOTION for Jerome M. Marcus and Jonathan Auerbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas E.L. Dewey on behalf of Eligio Cedeno (Dewey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 2/16/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Jerome M. Marcus and Jonathan Auerbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Eligio Cedeno.(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED COMPLAINT against Intech Group, Inc., Domingo Martinez, Pedro Carreno, Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, Juan Lara Fernandez Fernandez, Werner Braschi, Gonzalo E. Vazquez Perez, Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Ricardo Fernandez Barrueco, Alhambra Investments LLC, Julian Isaias Rodrigue Diaz, Edgar Hernandez Behrens, Adina MercedesBastida Castillo, Maria Espinoza De Robles, Alfredo Pardo Acosta, Maigualida Angulo, Individual John Doe Defendants 1-30, Corporate John Doe Defendants 1-10. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno, Cedel Internatioanl Investment. (as per unsealing order #4)(cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on March 15, 2010 at 11:50 am before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (eef)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT TO THE COURT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Unseal Complaint re: [4] Order. Document filed by Eligio Cedeno, Cedel Internatioanl Investment. (cd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/19/10) (cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jerome M. Marcus for Eligio Cedeno and Cedel Internatioanl Investment, Jonathan Auerbach for Eligio Cedeno and Cedel Internatioanl Investment admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/19/10) (cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO UNSEAL, The Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the case for docketing, except that the original Complaint will remain under seal. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 03/15/2010) (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/23/2009) (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (jri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?