Cedeno
Federal Court Proceeding Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-mc-22725-FAM
District Judge Federico A. Moreno, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 6:53 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eligio Cedeno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MARCUS & AUERBACH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Auerbach +1 215 885 2250 +1 888 875 0469 auerbach@marcusauerbach.com
Space JEROME M. MARCUS +1 610 664 1184 +1 888 875 0469 jmarcus@marcusauerbach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Edward Patricoff, Jr. +1 305 379 9189 +3819 381 381 9982 hpatricoff@shutts-law.com
Office Miami
Filed 9/14/2009
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX DONT USE THIS CODE
Terminated 9/21/2009
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,EGT
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Clerk's Notice (Other)Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE that [16] MOTION to appoint Commissioner in aid of Litigation before foreign tribunal filed by Eligio Cedeno has been reassigned to Judge Altonaga. (vp)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 ~Notice (other)
    CERTIFICATION OF EMERGENCY by Eligio Cedeno re [16] MOTION to appoint Commissioner in aid of Litigation before foreign tribunal (tb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      EMERGENCY MOTION to appoint Commissioner in aid of Litigation before foreign tribunal by Eligio Cedeno. (tb)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Sealed Document +
        ORDER Granting Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Eletronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filing (jc). Modified text on 9/21/2009 (jc).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
          ORDER Denying Petition to Appoint Commissioner in Aid of Litigation before Foreign Tribunal. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/18/2009. (cm)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
            SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 15 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
              LREF
              Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
              SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 15 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
                LREF
                Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 13 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
                  LREF
                  Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                  SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 12 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
                    LREF
                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                    SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 11 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                      ORDER Denying [6] Motion to Withdraw and Strike Petition and Order Denying Motion to Seal Court File. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/18/2009.(cm)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER Denying Petition without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/18/2009.(cm)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009, Terminated: 9/18/2009 Motion to Withdraw Document
                          MOTION to Withdraw Document and Strike Petition From Record by Eligio Cedeno. Responses due by 10/5/2009 (Patricoff, Harold)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                            SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5 restricted/sealed until further notice. (nc)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno: Hearing on emergency petition to appoint commissioner held on 9/15/2009. Court Reporter: Jill Hardy-Hobbs, Phone: 305-523-5118 (sc)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                MOTION for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filings for Jonathan Auerbach and Jerome Marcus. Filing Fee $150. Receipt # 1008289-90. (cw) Modified on 9/21/2009 (jc).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Setting Hearing for 9/15/2009 at 3:45 P.M. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/14/2009. (cm)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory
                                    APPLICATION for Letter Rogatory. Filing fee $ 39.00 Receipt#: 1008274, filed by Eligio Cedeno.(mmo)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?