Arviso et al v. Smartpay Leasing, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-04087
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 14, 2017 at 11:07 PM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Linda Arviso, Plaintiff

Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 scott@bursor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Timothy Fisher +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 ltfisher@bursor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yeremey O. Krivoshey +1 925 300 4455 +1 925 407 2700 ykrivoshey@bursor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annick Marie Persinger +1 925 300 4455 +1 925 407 2700 apersinger@bursor.com
No Logo Schaminka Weaver, Plaintiff

Represented by Bursor & Fisher PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Bursor +1 212 989 9113 +1 212 989 9163 scott@bursor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Timothy Fisher +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 ltfisher@bursor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yeremey O. Krivoshey +1 925 300 4455 +1 925 407 2700 ykrivoshey@bursor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annick Marie Persinger +1 925 300 4455 +1 925 407 2700 apersinger@bursor.com
v.
No Logo Better Finance, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Billfloat Inc., Defendant
No Logo Smartpay Leasing Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Terminate Civil Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Spero on 7/28/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/27/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET# 40 *** ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for all discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/27/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016) Modified on 7/27/2016 (tlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Motion Hearing as to 30 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Further Case Management Conference held on 2/29/2016. Plaintiff requested a referral to a magistrate judge for a settlement conference; Defendant would like to address this matter after the Court enters it's ruling on the motion to stay and the pending motion to compel arbitration. Motion is taken under submission and the Court will issue a written order.Total Time in Court 30 minutes. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. Plaintiff Attorney Timothy Fisher. Defendant Attorney Harijot Khalsa. This is a text only Minute Entry (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/21/2015. Class discovery is stayed until the pleadings are settled. Defendant's answer/response to the Amended Complaint is due by 12/28/2015. Opposition due by 01/29/2016. Reply due by 02/10/2016. Motion Hearing and Further Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2016. Case is referred to Private ADR to be completed within 120 days following the settlement of the pleadings. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Timothy Fisher. Defendant Attorney Benjamin Hutnick by telephone. This is a text only Minute Entry (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/22/2015) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Thelton E. Henderson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Henderson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2015 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Proposed Summons
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 68 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?