District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Cedeno v. Intech Group
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 10-3861

Tags
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 2:44 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abc, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alfredo Pardo Acosta, Defendant
No Logo Consorcio Microstar, Defendant
No Logo Corporate John Doe Defendants 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Edgar Hernandez Behrens, Defendant
No Logo Gonzalo E. Vazquez Perez, Defendant
No Logo Gustavo Arraiz, Defendant
No Logo Individual John Doe, Defendants 1-30, Defendant
No Logo Julian Isaias Rodrigue Diaz, Defendant
No Logo Maigualida Angulo, Defendant
No Logo Maria Espinoza De Robles, Defendant
No Logo Pedro Carreno, Defendant
No Logo Ricardo Fernandez Barrueco, Defendant
No Logo Subject A, Defendant
No Logo Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert B. Buehler +1 212 918 3000
Space Lisa J. Fried +1 212 909 0658
Space Dennis Henry Tracey +1 212 918 3524
No Logo Alhambra Investments Llc, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Edouard Dans +1 212 203 7600 +1 646 365 3401 pedans01@yahoo.com
Space Erimar von der Osten +1 305 445 2500
Space Catherine Chesney Grieve +1 305 445 2500
Space Andres Rivero +1 305 445 2500
No Logo Domingo Martinez, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Intech Group, Incorporated, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman A. Moscowitz +1 305 379 8300
No Logo Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erimar von der Osten +1 305 445 2500
Space Catherine Chesney Grieve +1 305 445 2500
Space Andres Rivero +1 305 445 2500
No Logo Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary E. Davidson +1 305 375 9220
Space Michael Diaz
Space Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
No Logo Werner Braschi, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Elizabeth Raffanello +1 305 858 2900
No Logo Cedel International Investment, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Auerbach +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604
Space Jeffrey S. Bucholtz +1 202 737 0500
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 234 0090
Space Thomas Dewey +1 212 943 9000
Space Jerome M. Marcus +1 215 885 2250
Space Zachary D. Tripp +1 202 416 0258
No Logo Eligio Cedeno, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Auerbach +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604
Space Jeffrey S. Bucholtz +1 202 737 0500
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 234 0090
Space Thomas Dewey +1 212 943 9000
Space Jerome M. Marcus +1 215 885 2250
Space Zachary D. Tripp +1 202 416 0258
United States of America United States of America, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse Furman +1 212 637 2475
Space Douglas Neal Letter +1 202 225 9700
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703
Space Lewis Yelin +1 202 514 3425
Nature of Suit 3470 - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations (RICO)
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=09-cv-9716
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=09-cv-9716
  Entries (191) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/06/2012, to SDNY (NYNY), ISSUED.[629792] [10-3861] [Entered: 06/06/2012 11:42 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
    STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[629785] [10-3861] [Entered: 06/06/2012 11:40 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
      CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/06/2012, to SDNY (NYNY), ISSUED.[629764] [10-3861] [Entered: 06/06/2012 11:36 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
        STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED.[629760] [10-3861] [Entered: 06/06/2012 11:34 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
          CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/06/2012, to SDNY (NYNY), ISSUED.[629744] [10-3861] [Entered: 06/06/2012 11:30 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
            STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED.[629741] [10-3861] [Entered: 06/06/2012 11:28 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
              CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/05/2012, to SDNY(NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[629068] [10-3861] [Entered: 06/05/2012 04:12 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED.[629057] [10-3861] [Entered: 06/05/2012 04:09 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                  JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[539065] [10-3861] [Entered: 02/29/2012 03:32 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201664280 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                    CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/06/2012, to SDNY (NYNY), ISSUED.[629792] [10-3861]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201664258 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                      STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[629785] [10-3861]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201664207 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                        CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/06/2012, to SDNY (NYNY), ISSUED.[629764] [10-3861]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201664192 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                          STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED.[629760] [10-3861]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201664158 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                            CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/06/2012, to SDNY (NYNY), ISSUED.[629744] [10-3861]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201664149 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                              STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED.[629741] [10-3861]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201662414 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/05/2012, to SDNY(NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[629068] [10-3861]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201662382 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                  STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED.[629057] [10-3861]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201425824 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                    JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[539065] [10-3861]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                      CURED DEFECTIVE Itemized Bill of Costs [245], on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED.[520672] [10-3861]
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201377440 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                        ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 02/07/2012 by CM/ECF.[520644] [10-3861]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201376952 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                          ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 02/08/2012 by CM/ECF.[520456] [10-3861]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201376250 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Itemized Bill of Costs, [238], on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED.[520185] [10-3861]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201376139 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                              ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 02/07/2012 by CM/ECF.[520151] [10-3861]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201375850 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 02/07/2012 by CM/ECF.[520047] [10-3861]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                  CURED DEFECTIVE ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS [232], on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[516516] [10-3861]
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201366490 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                    ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED. Service date 02/02/2012 by CM/ECF.[516488] [10-3861]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201365278 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Itemized Bill of Costs, [228], on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[516009] [10-3861]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                        ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED. Service date 02/02/2012 by CM/ECF.[515749] [10-3861]
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201340614 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                          SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirmed, by GC, RAK, BDB, FILED.[506643] [10-3861]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                            ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[516636] [10-3861]
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                              ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[516281] [10-3861]
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201365948 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[516280] [10-3861]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201366892 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[516635] [10-3861]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201255172 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    LETTER, dated 12/15/2011, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, RECEIVED. Service date 12/15/2011 by CM/ECF.[474271] [10-3861]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      CASE, before GC, RAK*, BDP, C.JJ., HEARD.[473861] [10-3861]
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201252291 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to respond [214] filed by Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, granting motion for leave to respond [218] filed by Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, by <edit judges>, FILED. [473153][222] [10-3861]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201245650 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          LETTER, dated 12/12/2011, on behalf of Appellee Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, RECEIVED. Service date 12/12/2011 by CM/ECF.[470604] [10-3861]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201242284 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION, for leave to respond, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 12/09/2011 by CM/ECF. [469273] [10-3861]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201241336 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 12/09/2011 by CM/ECF.[468922] [10-3861]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201226348 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION, for leave to respond, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 12/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [463114] [10-3861]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201225535 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  LETTER, dated 12/02/2011, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, RECEIVED. Service date 11/23/2011 by CM/ECF.[462803] [10-3861]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201224194 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    LETTER, dated 12/02/2011, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, RECEIVED. Service date 11/23/2011 by CM/ECF.[462274] [10-3861]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201202490 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION ORDER, granting non party amicus motion to file amicus curiae brief and to participate in oral argument, [199], FILED. [454039][211] [10-3861]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        ATTORNEY, Douglas Neal Letter for United States of America, in case 10-3861 , [208], ADDED.[449724] [10-3861]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201190522 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/16/2011 by CM/ECF. [449510] [10-3861]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            ATTORNEY, Lewis Yelin for United States of America, in case 10-3861 , [205], ADDED.[449089] [10-3861]
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201189346 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, United States of America , FILED. Service date 11/16/2011 by CM/ECF. [449058] [10-3861]--[Edited 11/16/2011 by DH]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                ATTORNEY, Jesse Furman for United States of America, in case 10-3861 , [201], ADDED.[449031] [10-3861]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ATTORNEY, Benjamin H. Torrance for United States of America, in case 10-3861 , [200], ADDED.[448994] [10-3861]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae United States of America, ADDED.[448982] [10-3861]--[Edited 11/16/2011 by DH]
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201188050 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, United States of America--[Edited 11/16/2011 by DH] , FILED. Service date 11/16/2011 by CM/ECF. [448563] [10-3861]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201186792 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, United States of America , FILED. Service date 11/15/2011 by CM/ECF. [448069] [10-3861]--[Edited 11/16/2011 by DH]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201186774 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date11/15/2011 by CM/ECF.[448064] [10-3861]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201186770 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, United States of America , FILED. Service date 11/15/2011 by CM/ECF. [448063] [10-3861]--[Edited 11/16/2011 by DH]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201178664 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 11/10/2011 by CM/ECF. [444918] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201174580 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 11/09/2011 by CM/ECF. [443379] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201174443 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Werner Braschi, FILED. Service date 11/09/2011 by CM/ECF. [443328] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201174234 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 11/09/2011 by CM/ECF. [443247] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201174178 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED. Service date 11/09/2011 by CM/ECF. [443228] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201171652 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 11/08/2011 by CM/ECF. [442282] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201168221 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[440971] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201166974 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[440525] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201156913 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 11/02/2011, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, RECEIVED. Service date 11/02/2011 by CM/ECF.[436719] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00201142188 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 10/27/2011, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, RECEIVED. Service date 10/27/2011 by CM/ECF.[431144] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 12/15/2011, A Panel, SET.[431131] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 12/12/2011, A, PROPOSED.[384544] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020969785 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 08/15/2011 by CM/ECF. [365112] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020904824 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jerome M Marcus, Esq. for Appellant Eligio Cedeno and Cedel International Investment, FILED. Service date 07/15/2011 by CM/ECF. [340437] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020895598 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Andres Rivero for Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 07/12/2011 by CM/ECF. [336849] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020890208 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time filed by Appellant Eligio Cedeno and Cedel International Investment; granting motion to file oversized brief filed by Appellant Eligio Cedeno and Cedel International Investment, [157], [157], by RR, FILED. [334821][171] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020888544 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mrs. Susan Elizabeth Raffanello for Appellee Werner Braschi, FILED. Service date 07/08/2011 by CM/ECF. [334189] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020887911 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Norman A Moscowitz, Esq. for Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED. Service date 07/08/2011 by CM/ECF. [333950] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020887420 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Carlos Fernando Gonzalez, Esq. for Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 07/08/2011 by CM/ECF. [333767] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020887253 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Robert B. Buehler for Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 07/08/2011 by CM/ECF. [333704] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, Erimar von der Osten for Alhambra Investments LLC Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, in case 10-3861 , [159], ADDED.[332814] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY, Catherine Chesney Grieve for Alhambra Investments LLC Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, in case 10-3861 , [158], ADDED.[332809] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020882298 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 07/06/2011 by CM/ECF. [331863] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020882279 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 07/06/2011 by CM/ECF. [331856] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020881648 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION, to extend time to, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 07/06/2011 by CM/ECF. [331617] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020876452 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 07/01/2011 by CM/ECF. [329598] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020876326 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 07/01/2011 by CM/ECF. [329544] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY, Robert B. Buehler for Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, in case 10-3861 , [143], ADDED.[327906] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, Lisa J Fried for Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, in case 10-3861 , [142], ADDED.[327901] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Notice of Appearance As Additional Counsel [139], on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED.[327877] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Brief [138], on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[327868] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020870582 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 06/29/2011 by CM/ECF. [327399] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020870552 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 06/29/2011 by CM/ECF. [327388] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020870254 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED. Service date 06/29/2011 by CM/ECF. [327291] [10-3861]--[Edited 06/30/2011 by DH]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020870092 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER, dated 06/28/2011, on behalf of Appellee Werner Braschi, RECEIVED. Service date 06/28/2011 by CM/ECF.[327228] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020870005 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance As Additional Counsel, [137], [136], on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED.[327194] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020869990 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief, [135], on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[327185] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 06/29/2011 by CM/ECF. [327094] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 06/29/2011 by CM/ECF. [327088] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED. Service date 06/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [326497] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020815333 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time filed by Appellant Eligio Cedeno and Cedel International Investment, [130], FILED. [306270][134] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020814649 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION, to extend time to, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 06/03/2011 by CM/ECF. [306008] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Brief [125], on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED.[305618] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020813279 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 06/02/2011 by CM/ECF. [305483] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020812816 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief, [124], on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED.[305295] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 06/01/2011 by CM/ECF. [304333] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Letter [121], on behalf of Appellant Eligio Cedeno, FILED.[282721] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020748525 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER, dated 05/03/2011, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, RECEIVED. Service date 05/04/2011 by CM/ECF.[280846] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020746540 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [120], on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED.[280122] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER, dated 05/03/2011, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, RECEIVED. Service date 05/03/2011 by CM/ECF.[279688] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020715919 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez Brief due date as 07/01/2011, FILED.[268550] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020708263 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna Brief due date as 06/01/2011, FILED.[265680] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020708097 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Werner Braschi Brief due date as 07/01/2011, FILED.[265631] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020707958 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero Brief due date as 07/01/2011, FILED.[265575] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020701969 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, informing Court of proposed due date 06/01/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 04/14/2011 by CM/ECF.[263324] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Scheduling Notification [104], on behalf of Appellee Werner Braschi, FILED.[262560] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Scheduling Notification [103], on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[262557] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020699846 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Werner Braschi, informing Court of proposed due date 07/01/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF.[262505] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020699225 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, informing Court of proposed due date 07/01/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF.[262268] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020699135 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [101], on behalf of Appellee Werner Braschi, FILED.[262231] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020699121 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Scheduling Notification, [100], on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[262225] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Werner Braschi, informing Court of proposed due date 07/01/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF.[262123] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, informing Court of proposed due date 07/01/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF.[262050] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020698125 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, informing Court of proposed due date 07/01/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF.[261843] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020697691 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo Brief due date as 07/01/2011, FILED.[261675] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020695010 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, informing Court of proposed due date 07/01/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 04/12/2011 by CM/ECF.[260627] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY, Jeffrey S. Bucholtz for Cedel International Investment Eligio Cedeno, in case 10-3861 , [81], ADDED.[252652] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020674241 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT APPENDIX, (VOLUME II), on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 04/04/2011 by CM/ECF. [252621] [10-3861]--[Edited 04/05/2011 by DH]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020674200 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT APPENDIX, (VOLUME I), on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 04/04/2011 by CM/ECF. [252601] [10-3861]--[Edited 04/05/2011 by DH]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020674168 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 04/04/2011 by CM/ECF. [252590] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY, Zachary D Tripp for Cedel International Investment Eligio Cedeno, in case 10-3861 , [80], ADDED.[252429] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY, Paul D Clement for Cedel International Investment Eligio Cedeno, in case 10-3861 , [79], ADDED.[252425] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020673269 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 04/04/2011 by CM/ECF. [252245] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020673247 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 04/04/2011 by CM/ECF. [252237] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020673233 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 04/04/2011 by CM/ECF. [252232] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY, Jerome M Marcus for Cedel International Investment Eligio Cedeno, in case 10-3861 , [77], ADDED.[236145] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020631114 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 03/16/2011 by CM/ECF. [236128] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020624306 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFIED SUPPLEMENTAL INDEX OF RECORD ON APPEAL, FILED.[233595] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [62], on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED.[221419] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY, Jonathan Auerbach for Cedel International Investment Eligio Cedeno, in case 10-3861, [68], ADDED.[217492] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020582313 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION ORDER, granting support filed filed by Appellant Eligio Cedeno and Cedel International Investment, [57], by RKW, FILED. [217477][73] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020576275 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [57], on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 02/22/2011 by CM/ECF.[215134][69] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020574341 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 02/18/2011 by CM/ECF. [214421] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [65], on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED.[214101] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020572764 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 02/18/2011 by CM/ECF. [213808] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020571054 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [63], [64], on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED.[213120] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 02/17/2011 by CM/ECF. [212658] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 02/17/2011 by CM/ECF. [212491] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020569231 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [60], on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED.[212430] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 02/16/2011 by CM/ECF. [212115] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020566828 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION, to extend time to 04/04/2011, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 02/16/2011 by CM/ECF. [211540] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020553948 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    1st SUPPLEMENTAL INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[206593] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [51], on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, CURED.[164762] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY, Andres Rivero for Alhambra Investments LLC Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, in case 10-3861 , [52], ADDED.[164745] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020436396 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 12/08/2010 by CM/ECF. [162330] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020430986 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [50], on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED.[160272] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 12/04/2005 by CM/ECF. [159722] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY, Susan E. Raffanello, [48], in place of Glenn Peter Berger, SUBSTITUTED.[148045] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020397162 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Werner Braschi, FILED. Service date 11/16/2010 by CM/ECF. [147568] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020395069 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno Brief due as 03/04/2011. Joint Appendix due as 03/04/2011, FILED.[146808] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT scheduling notification letter [42], on behalf of Appellant Eligio Cedeno, CURED.[145655] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020388756 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, informing Court of proposed due date 03/04/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 11/11/2010 by CM/ECF.[144434] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020388639 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, scheduling notification letter, [41], on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED.[144395] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, informing Court of proposed due date 03/04/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 11/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[143894] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY, Gary E Davidson for Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, in case 10-3861 , [38], ADDED.[141985] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020380653 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 12/06/2010, Start Time: 10:00 AM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[141461] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020378867 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 11/05/2010 by CM/ECF. [140763] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [35], on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, CURED.[138819] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020372080 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED. Service date 11/02/2010 by CM/ECF.[138218] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020372032 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [34], on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED.[138197] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero, FILED. Service date 11/02/2010 by CM/ECF.[138082] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020369693 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, to Appellee Werner Braschi, Intech Group, Incorporated, Domingo Martinez and Jose Jesus Zambrano Lucero , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[137324] [10-3861]--[Edited 11/02/2010 by EM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY, Carlos Fernando Gonzalez, Margaret Perez for Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, in case 10-3861 , [30], [29], ADDED.[134788] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel [27], [25], on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, CURED.[134785] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020361099 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 10/28/2010 by CM/ECF. [134154] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020361073 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 10/28/2010 by CM/ECF. [134146] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020361033 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 10/28/2010 by CM/ECF. [134135] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020360897 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [26], on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED.[134077] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 10/27/2010 by CM/ECF. [133970] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020360130 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [19], [18], [17], on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED.[133801] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020359968 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/09/2010, Start Time: 10:00 AM, Conference Note: Correction: This conference is scheduled for 11/9/10, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[133750] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020359954 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/09/2010, Start Time: 10:00 AM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[133743] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020358034 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Erin Murphy, ASSIGNED.[133007] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 10/26/2010 by CM/ECF.[132259] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 10/26/2010 by CM/ECF. [132177] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 10/26/2010 by CM/ECF. [132156] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY, Michael Diaz, Jr., [10], in place of attorney Guillermo Gleizer, SUBSTITUTED.[132083] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020355352 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 10/26/2010 by CM/ECF.[132023] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020355344 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 10/26/2010 by CM/ECF.[132019] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020355333 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. Service date 10/25/2010 by US mail.[132016] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020355277 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ruben Rogelio Idler Osuna, FILED. Service date 10/26/2010 by CM/ECF. [131999] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020342249 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, appeal will be dismissed effective 11/02/2010, unless appellant submits forms C and D, FILED.[127021] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020331903 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Alhambra Investments LLC and Juan Felipe Lara Fernandez, FILED. Service date 10/12/2010 by CM/ECF.[123076] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020330700 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Adina Mercedes Bastida Castillo, FILED. Service date 10/12/2010 by CM/ECF.[122619] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020307068 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[113826] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020307060 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/20/2010, RECEIVED.[113823] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0020307035 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Cedel International Investment and Eligio Cedeno, FILED. [113816] [10-3861]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?