Parker v. Exeter Finance Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:15-cv-01468

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 3:05 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Report and Recommendations
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Transmittal of initial appeal package
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER adopting 15 Report and Recommendation; affirming 17 Magistrate Judge Baker's October 20, 2015 Order denying Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 16 ); and directing the Clerk to strike 18 Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/28/2015. (SN)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied and the amended complaint be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 10/7/2015. (LAK)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Seal
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Interested persons order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?