Wright, Steven v. Teasdale, Adam
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00577

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 5:31 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Judgment - Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 42 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff Steven O. Wright against defendant Adam Teasdale in the amount of $28,500. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/24/2017. (arw)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Declaration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Brief in Support
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Deposition
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Deposition
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Deposition
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Declaration
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Declaration
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Brief in Support
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Conference Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Declaration (not in support of motion)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity Citizenship due 11/5/2015. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/22/2015. (voc)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?