Opinion Corp. et al v. EIC Agency LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-07930
District Judge Valerie E. Caproni, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 4:53 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Syrov, Alex, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Alex Syrov"

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer & Greiner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RONALD D. COLEMAN +1 201 342 6000 +1 201 342 6611 rcoleman@archerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel G. MacMull +1 201 342 6000 +1 201 342 6611 jmacmull@archerlaw.com
No Logo Podolsky, Michael, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Michael Podolsky"

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer & Greiner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RONALD D. COLEMAN +1 201 342 6000 +1 201 342 6611 rcoleman@archerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel G. MacMull +1 201 342 6000 +1 201 342 6611 jmacmull@archerlaw.com
No Logo Opinion Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Opinion Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer & Greiner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RONALD D. COLEMAN +1 201 342 6000 +1 201 342 6611 rcoleman@archerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel G. MacMull +1 201 342 6000 +1 201 342 6611 jmacmull@archerlaw.com
v.
No Logo David H. Ledgin, Esq., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Ledgin +1 516 747 1210 +1 516 747 1211 davidledgin@aol.com
No Logo EIC Agency, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Ledgin +1 516 747 1210 +1 516 747 1211 davidledgin@aol.com
No Logo Sanford Wilk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Ledgin +1 516 747 1210 +1 516 747 1211 davidledgin@aol.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201dj
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Plaintiffs show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject-matter jurisdiction; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' brief in support of subject-matter jurisdiction shall be served and filed by April 30, 2014. Defendants' brief regarding subject-matter jurisdiction and their motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, if any, shall be served and filed by May 14, 2014. Plaintiffs' reply in further support of subject-matter jurisdiction and their opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss, if any, shall be served and filed by May 31, 2014. Defendants shall seek leave from the Court by June 3, 2014 if they would like to file a reply in further support of their motion to dismiss; and it is further ORDERED that all discovery and all deadlines, including Defendants' deadline to answer or move in response to the complaint, are STAYED pending this Court's determination of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/16/2014) (djc) Modified on 4/17/2014 (djc). (Entered: 04/17/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joel G. MacMull on behalf of all parties dated April 9, 2014 re: Joint Letter per 3/20/14 Order (Dkt. No. 21). Document filed by EIC Agency LLC, David H. Ledgin, Esq, Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov, Sanford Wilk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit to Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: Counsel are further directed to submit a joint letter to the Court no later than April 9, 2014 and appear for a status conference on April 16, 2014, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 4/16/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/20/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the conference in this matter presently scheduled for March 21, 2014 is adjourned to Friday, April 4, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 4/4/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/20/2014) (kgo) Modified on 3/20/2014 (kgo). (Entered: 03/20/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel G. MacMull on behalf of all parties dated March 18, 2014 re: Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: granting 17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to March 21, 2014, at 10:00 am. Status Conference set for 3/21/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/11/2014) (djc) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Adjourn Conference. Document filed by EIC Agency LLC, David H. Ledgin, Esq.(Ledgin, David) Modified on 2/14/2014 (ldi). (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel G. MacMull on behalf of all parties dated February 10, 2014 re: Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to 2/13/2014 at 11:30 A.M. The Clerk is directed to terminate the motion. (Dkt. No. 14) Conference reset for 2/13/2014 at 11:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/9/2014) (cd) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference date of January 10, 2014 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel G. MacMull dated January 8, 2014. Document filed by Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov.(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: that the conference in this matter presently scheduled for 1/3/2014 is adjourned to 1/10/2014 at 12:30 PM, in Courtroom 110 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007, before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/2/2014) (tn) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          COUNTER LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel G. MacMull dated December 27, 2013 re: Dkt. No. 11. Document filed by Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David H. Ledgin dated 12/26/2013 re: Pre-initial conference joint position letter. Document filed by EIC Agency LLC, David H. Ledgin, Esq, Sanford Wilk.(Ledgin, David) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel G. MacMull on behalf of all parties dated December 24, 2013 re: Pretrial Conference Letter. Document filed by EIC Agency LLC, David H. Ledgin, Esq, Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov, Sanford Wilk. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EIC Agency LLC, David H. Ledgin, Esq, Opinion Corp..(Ledgin, David) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov.(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    RESPONSE re: 5 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David H. Ledgin dated December 2, 2013.. Document filed by Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: Initial Conference presently set for 1/2/2014 is reset for 1/3/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/4/2013) (cd) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David H. Ledgin dated December 2, 2013. Document filed by EIC Agency LLC, David H. Ledgin, Esq, Sanford Wilk.(Ledgin, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joel G. MacMull dated November 26, 2013 re: Notice of Pretrial Conference Order dated 11/26/13. Document filed by Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky, Alex Syrov.(MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for Thursday, 1/2/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/26/2013) (cd) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. All Defendants. Service was accepted by David Ledgin, Esq.; Mike "Smith", recipient refused true last name. Document filed by Alex Syrov, Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky. (MacMull, Joel) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against EIC Agency LLC, David H. Ledgin, Esq, Sanford Wilk. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401080898)Document filed by Alex Syrov, Opinion Corp., Michael Podolsky.(msa) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 326 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?