Defense Logistics Support, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 15-04845
District Judge David M. Warren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 2:43 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Defense Logistics Support, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stubbs & Perdue, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr. +1 919 870 6258 +1 919 870 6259 tstubbs@stubbsperdue.com
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: 9/7/2015 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 09/06/2015. (Related Doc # 7) (Admin.) (Entered: 09/07/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: 9/7/2015 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
    BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 09/06/2015. (Related Doc # 4) (Admin.) (Entered: 09/07/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: 9/7/2015 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 09/06/2015. (Related Doc # 3) (Admin.) (Entered: 09/07/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: 9/7/2015 Order Regarding Administration Of Estate
        Order Regarding Administration of Estate. Added Bankruptcy Administrator as party. (adi) (Entered: 09/07/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Order To File Plan And Disclosure Statement And Notice Of Status ConferenceCourt Filing
          Order to File Plan and Disclosure Statement and Notice of Status Conference . Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/3/2015. Disclosure Statement due by 12/3/2015. Status hearing to be held on 10/5/2015 at 10:45 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge Warren. (Donleycott, Sarah) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Note To Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date
            Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date 11(a) status conference (parker, roxanne) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Deficiency Notice - Petitions (BNC)
              DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Trawick H Stubbs, Jr. re: Petition. In order for this case to be administered, it is necessary that the following item(s) be filed by the date(s) indicated: Schedules A - J, Statement of Affairs and Statement of Current Monthly Income. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1008, all petitions, lists, schedules, statements, and amendments should be verified or contain an unsworn declaration as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1746. The three day mailing period as provided for under Rule 9006(f), Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, does not apply. Incomplete Filings due by 9/18/2015. Disclosure of Compensation due by 9/18/2015. Summary of Schedules due by 9/18/2015. (parker, roxanne) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Order To Appear For Examination
                Order to Appear for Examination (Trevor J. Kracker) . (parker, roxanne) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
                  Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/6/2015 at 10:00 AM at Greenville 341 Meeting Room. Last day to file complaint is 12/7/2015. Proofs of Claims due by 1/4/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/2/2016. (parker, roxanne) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Corporate Resolution
                    Corporate Resolution filed by Trawick H Stubbs Jr. on behalf of Defense Logistics Support, Inc.. (Stubbs, Trawick) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Voluntary Petition-Chapter 11
                      Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Defense Logistics Support, Inc. (Stubbs, Trawick) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 406 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?