Mohammed Jawad v. Robert Gates, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 15-5250

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 3:31 AM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207770848 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
JOINT APPENDIX [1589845] filed by Mohammed Jawad. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 12/21/2015 ] [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207770837 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
    APPELLANT BRIEF [1589841] filed by Mohammed Jawad [Service Date: 12/21/2015 ] Length of Brief: 13,513. [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207758059 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
      CLERK'S ORDER [1583047] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 12/21/2015. APPENDIX due 12/21/2015. APPELLEE Brief due on 01/20/2016. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 02/03/2016 [15-5250]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207748055 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
        UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1577599] submitted by Mohammed Jawad [Service Date: 10/09/2015 ] [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207748052 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
          TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1577598] filed by Mohammed Jawad [Service Date: 10/09/2015 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207748049 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
            STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1577597] filed by Mohammed Jawad [Service Date: 10/09/2015 ] [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207748046 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
              STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1577596] filed by Mohammed Jawad [Service Date: 10/09/2015 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207748043 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1577595] filed by Eric S. Montalvo on behalf of Appellant Mohammed Jawad. [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207748040 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                  DOCKETING STATEMENT [1577594] filed by Mohammed Jawad [Service Date: 10/09/2015 ] [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207748037 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1577593] filed by Mohammed Jawad [Service Date: 10/09/2015 ] [15-5250] (Montalvo, Eric)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207745642 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                      CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1576284] filed by Nelson J. Cannon, Bantz Craddock, Gordon R. England, Robert M. Gates, James T. Hill, Jay Hood, James M. McGarrah, Daniel McNeill, Richard Meyers, Geoffrey D. Miller, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald H. Rumsfeld, James G. Stavridis, Frank Sweigart, USA and Paul Wolfowitz [Service Date: 10/02/2015 ] [15-5250] (Yelin, Lewis)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207745328 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1576087] filed by Lewis S. Yelin and co-counsel Matthew M. Collette on behalf of Appellees Nelson J. Cannon, Bantz Craddock, Gordon R. England, Robert M. Gates, James T. Hill, Jay Hood, James M. McGarrah, Daniel McNeill, Richard Meyers, Geoffrey D. Miller, Peter Pace, Esteban Rodriguez, Donald H. Rumsfeld, James G. Stavridis, Frank Sweigart, USA and Paul Wolfowitz. [15-5250] (Yelin, Lewis)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207738009 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                          CLERK'S ORDER [1572001] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/09/2015. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/09/2015. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/09/2015. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/09/2015. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/09/2015. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 10/09/2015. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/09/2015. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/09/2015. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/26/2015. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/09/2015. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/09/2015. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/09/2015. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/26/2015 [15-5250]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207738006 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                            LETTER [1571999] sent regarding attorney membership to Eric Sebastian Montalvo for Mohammed Jawad. Application for Admission due 10/09/2015. [15-5250]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207738003 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL [1571997] filed by Mohammed Jawad seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00811-ESH. Assigned USCA Case Number [15-5250]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?