Bayou Shores SNF, LLC v. Secretary of Health and Human, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 14-13740

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 5:38 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107681102 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
ORDER: Motion to dismiss case with prejudice filed by Appellant Bayou Shores SNF, LLC is GRANTED. [7263894-2] AJ and RSR
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107639715 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION to dismiss appeal with prejudice filed by Bayou Shores SNF, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [7263894-1] (ECF: William Rissler)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107633143 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda Julin McNamara for Sylvia Mathews Burwell, Secretary of Human and Health Services and Marilyn Tavenner, Admin. of Centers for Medicard & Medicaid Services (ECF: Linda McNamara)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107620227 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
        CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Bayou Shores SNF, LLC on 08/15/2014. Fee Status: Fee Paid.
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 114 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?