City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund v. Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-07111

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 11:08 PM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
v.
No Logo Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Defendant
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Harold Braff +1 212 558 4705 +1 212 558 3333 braffd@sullcrom.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen S. McArthur +1 202 956 7575 mcarthurk@sullcrom.com
No Logo Bmo Capital Markets Corp., Defendant
BNP Paribas Securities Corporation BNP Paribas Securities Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "BNP Paribas Securities Corp."
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant
No Logo Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Defendant
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Campbell +1 212 455 3137 +1 212 455 2502 patrick.campbell@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Elbaum +1 212 668 1900 +1 212 668 0315 david.elbaum@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey H. Knox +1 212 455 2502 jeffrey.knox@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Rice , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 trice@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Omari Largos Royter Mason +1 607 342 8752 +1 212 455 2502 omason@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon Price Torres +1 212 455 2232 +1 212 455 2502 storres@stblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Woll +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 dwoll@stblaw.com
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman, Sachs & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Ehrenberg +1 212 558 3269 +1 212 558 3588 ehrenbergs@sullcrom.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan L Shapiro +1 212 558 3410 +1 212 291 9490 shapirojl@sullcrom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth P Papez +1 202 282 5678 epapez@winston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Yale Sperling +1 312 558 7941 +1 312 558 5700 rsperling@winston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susannah P. Torpey +1 212 294 4690 +1 212 294 4700 STorpey@winston.com
HSBC Securities USA, Inc. HSBC Securities USA, Inc., Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Defendant
No Logo Jefferies Llc, Defendant
Unknown Role, Mikohn Gaming Corp
Unknown Role, Jefferies & Co Inc
Unknown Role, Jef Holding Co Inc
Unknown Role, Iporussia Inc
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc
No Logo Mizuho Securities Usa Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart Jay Baskin +1 212 848 4000 +1 646 848 4974 sbaskin@shearman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerome S. Fortinsky +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 jfortinsky@shearman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Nathanson +1 212 848 8611 +1 646 848 8611 john.nathanson@shearman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Shally +1 212 848 4700 +1 646 848 4700 jshally@shearman.com
Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nomura Securities International, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Nomura Holdings, Inc.
RBC Capital Markets, LLC RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Rbs Securities, Inc., Defendant
SG Americas Securities, LLC SG Americas Securities, LLC, Defendant
No Logo TD Securities (USA) Inc., Defendant
UBS Securities LLC UBS Securities LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 15
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Withdraw
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 65 Motion for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/8/2015) (mro) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Adam Kirsch on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Kirsch, Mark) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas, Inc., Other Affiliate UBS Group AG for UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC.(Levin, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabrielle Frances Levin on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Levin, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America Inc. for Nomura Securities International, Inc.. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc..(Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Lyon Holley on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Flug Davidoff on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Davidoff, Amanda) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the above-captioned action under Case No. 15 Civ. 5794 (PGG). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/30/2015) (spo) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                      MOTION for William J. Kolasky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11445960. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolasky, William) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Alexander Schwartz on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Y. Sperling dated 9/25/2015 re: 9/3/2015 consolidation order, and Court's 9/24/2015 request for parties' positions on consolidation, on behalf of all Defendants. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Sperling, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald & Co..(Popok, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Steven Popok on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Popok, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Paul on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Paul, David) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER: The parties will make a submission by September 28, 2015, addressing whether they object to the consolidation of the above-captioned cases with fourteen related class actions under Case No. 15 Civ. 5794 (PGG). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/24/2015) (mro) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Malik Havalic on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Havalic, Malik) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ethan Edward Litwin on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. (Litwin, Ethan) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Group LLC, Corporate Parent Limestone Merger Sub LLC, Corporate Parent Leucadia National Corporation for Jefferies LLC. Document filed by Jefferies LLC.(Schacter, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of Jefferies LLC. (Schacter, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sophie Charlotte Rohnke on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Rohnke, Sophie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leah Friedman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Friedman, Leah) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC. Document filed by RBC Capital Markets, LLC.(Fishman, Marshall) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Fishman, Marshall) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Steven Fishman on behalf of SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Fishman, Todd) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Societe Generale for SG Americas Securities, LLC. Document filed by SG Americas Securities, LLC.(Esseks, David) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David C. Esseks on behalf of SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc for RBS Securities Inc.. Document filed by RBS Securities Inc..(Cohen, Joel) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joel Murray Cohen on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (Cohen, Joel) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Carrie King on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (King, Melissa) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg Donald Andres on behalf of RBS Securities Inc.. (Andres, Greg) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Statsky Smith on behalf of City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Smith, Dana) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Judah Aranoff on behalf of City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Aranoff, Ronald) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Madison Eckles on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Eckles, Paul) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shepard Goldfein on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Goldfein, Shepard) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CitiGroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products,Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate The Bank of Nova Scotia for Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency. Document filed by Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency.(Pepperman, Richard) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Joseph Hughes, III on behalf of Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency. (Hughes, John) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency. (Pepperman, Richard) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John D. Friel on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Friel, John) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Yeres on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Yeres, David) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp.. Document filed by BMO Capital Markets Corp..(Houck, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert G. Houck on behalf of BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Houck, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Campbell on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Campbell, Patrick) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Omari Largos Royter Mason on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Mason, Omari) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Price Torres on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Torres, Shannon) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susannah Providence Torpey on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Torpey, Susannah) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Elbaum on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Elbaum, David) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Elizabeth P. Papez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11378215. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Certificates of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Papez, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey H. Knox on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Knox, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Woll on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Woll, David) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas C. Rice on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Robert Y. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11378155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sperling, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DB US Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Lucas Shapiro on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Ehrenberg on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Ehrenberg, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Shane, Penny) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Penny Shane on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. (Shane, Penny) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 15-cv-05794. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund.(Bernstein, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bernstein, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against BMO Capital Markets Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities (USA) Inc., UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund.(Bernstein, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Suzanne McArthur on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (McArthur, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent barclays bank plc, Corporate Parent Barclays Group U.S., Inc. for Barclays Capital Inc.. Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Braff, David) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harold Braff on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc.. (Braff, David) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Corporate Parent Mizuho Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Mizuho Securities Co., Ltd. for Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. Document filed by Mizuho Securities USA Inc..(Fortinsky, Jerome) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Shally on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Shally, Joanna) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John A. Nathanson on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome Steven Fortinsky on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Fortinsky, Jerome) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Jay Baskin on behalf of Mizuho Securities USA Inc.. (Baskin, Stuart) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund.(Bernstein, Stanley) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING -PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bernstein, Stanley) Modified on 9/11/2015 (dgo). (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of Nova Scotia, New York Agency; BMO Capital Markets Corp.; BNP Paribas Securities Corp.; Barclays Capital Inc.; Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.; Citigroup Global Markets Inc.; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; Daiwa Capital Markets America Inc.; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Goldman, Sachs & Co.; HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.; Jefferies LLC; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated; Mizuho Securities USA Inc.; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC; Nomura Securities International, Inc.; RBC Capital Markets, LLC; RBS Securities Inc.; SG Americas Securities, LLC; TD Securities (USA) LLC; and UBS Securities LLC, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Bernstein, Stanley) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11369399)Document filed by City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund.(Bernstein, Stanley) Modified on 9/11/2015 (dgo). (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?