Packard v. The City Of New York 1 Center Street New York, New York 10007
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-07130
District Judge Analisa Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 28, 2021 at 4:10 PM DT (1.6 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMADON DELLERBA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo Ari Cowan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo CHARLES MEACHEM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo CHRIS PHILLIPS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo CONNOR HICKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo Edward Beck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo GEORGE PACKARD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo LARRY SWETMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo Michelle Berger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gilbert Cooper +1 212 545 4717 kcooper@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MCNAMARA, Defendant
No Logo JOSEPH ESPOSITO, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL BLOOMBERG"
No Logo Ray, Kelly, Defendant
No Logo STEVEN ANGER, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS P PURTELL,, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (348) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Statement of Relatedness
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Preclude
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Preclude
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Preclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Preclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated August 7, 2018 re: ECF No. 187 - Corrected Version. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 187 Status Report, filed by Ari Cowan, Michelle Berger, Edward Beck, George Packard. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request to extend discovery for the limited purposes set forth in Section (1) below is GRANTED. The parties are directed to appear for a Telephone Conference on Wednesday, August 8, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. to address the remaining discovery disputes. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 212-805-0110 once all parties are on the line. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 10/31/2018.), (Telephone Conference set for 8/8/2018 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/1/2018) (kl) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT. Joint letter regarding remaining discovery schedule and disputes as ordered by ECF No. 184 Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER terminating 185 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has not missed the deadline to request a pre-motion conference on its anticipated motion for summary judgment. Pursuant to Paragraph 8 of the Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, ECF No. 31, the pre-motion letter must be filed no later than fourteen days after the close of fact discovery. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/25/2018) (cf) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Respectfully Seeking the Court's Guidance as to the Date that Any Request for a Pre-Motion Conference to Discuss Defendant's Anticipated Rule 56 Motion Is Due Or in the Alternate Respectfully Seeking an Extension of Time to File a Pre-Motion Conference Request and Local Civil Rule 56.1 Statement of Facts addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brachah Goykadosh dated July 24, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' July 17, 2018 Status Report seeking an extension of the fact discovery deadline for certain depositions and indicating that there are other discovery issues that will require judicial intervention. (ECF No. 183.) Fact discovery in this action is set to finally close on August 1, 2018, nearly three years after the case was filed. The Court will not grant an open-ended extension of that deadline. Thus, it is hereby Ordered as follows: 1. No later than Tuesday, July 31, 2018 the parties shall file a joint letter setting forth a proposed schedule for the completion of all discovery, including expert discovery,which shall conclude no later than October 31, 2018. 2. The joint letter shall also raise any remaining disputes regarding fact discovery and should show good cause as to why the requested discovery was not completed prior to the August 1, 2018 fact discovery deadline. 3. The parties must meet and confer prior to submitting the joint letter and negotiate in good faith to resolve any and all remaining discovery issues before raising them with the Court. The Court expects the parties to approach discovery disputes in a spirit of compromise and to be cooperative and reasonable with one another so as to avoid undue burden and expense. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/17/2018) (mro) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT. Regarding deposition schedule Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), George Packard(Individually).(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, through their undersigned counsel, that Plaintiffs Larry Swetman and Charles Meacham pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), hereby voluntarily dismiss their claims in the above-captioned action against the City of New York. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/16/2018) (cf) Modified on 7/16/2018 (cf). (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 174 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference: Before the Court is a Letter-Motion by Plaintiffs for a Local Rule 37.2 Conference to compel Defendant, City of New York ("City") to respond to certain interrogatories, and to provide a signature verifying its responses. (ECF No. 174.) The City opposes and requests that the Court deny Plaintiffs' request for a conference. (ECF No. 179.) Plaintiffs also submitted a reply (ECF No. 180), which the Court has considered. The Letter-Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as follows: 1. The Court finds that, given the issues before it, there is no need for a conference, and the motion for a conference is DENIED, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/12/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated July 12, 2018 re: 174 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to compel Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' Initial Interrogatories addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated July 6, 2018. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Alison S. Mitchell dated July 11, 2018 re: 174 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to compel Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' Initial Interrogatories addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated July 6, 2018. . Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 175 Status Report, filed by Ari Cowan, Michelle Berger, Charles Meachem, Edward Beck, George Packard. ENDORSEMENT: Motion to file unredacted version of ECF No. 174 under seal is GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/9/2018) (cf) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Discovery Hearing proceeding held on 5/16/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (rro) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Discovery Hearing held on 5/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018.(rro) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT. Regarding status of Plaintiff Charles Meacham Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to compel Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' Initial Interrogatories addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated July 6, 2018. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying without prejudice 170 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; denying without prejudice 171 Letter Motion to Compel. Pending before the Court are dueling Letter-Motions regarding a subpoena duces tecum served by the City of New York on Plaintiffs' counsel, Wylie M. Stecklow (ECF Nos. 170 and 171). These Letter-Motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court has reviewed the subpoena (ECF No. 170-1) and finds it to be overbroad. Further, based upon the Declaration of Mr. Stecklow (ECF No. 170-2), the Court finds that the subpoena is unduly burdensome. Any amended subpoena served by the City on Mr. Stecklow must be narrowly tailored and laser-focused to obtain specific documents or things that are not available from other sources. The parties are strongly urged by the Court to cooperate with one another with respect to further disputes regarding any amended subpoena (or any other discovery issues) in order to resolve them without Court intervention. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/6/2018) (kl) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 163 Letter Motion for Discovery. Pending before the Court is a Letter-Motion, dated June 28, 2018, by the City of New York (the "City") for a protective order, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 and 30, precluding the deposition of non-party Thomas Purtell (ECF No. 163). Plaintiffs opposed the Letter-Motion by letter dated July 2, 2018 (ECF No. 166). The City's Letter-Motion is DENIED. The Court finds in its discretion that the burden needed to obtain a protective order has not been met here. Notably, Mr. Purtell was identified by the City in its initial disclosures as an "individual likely to have discoverable information" to wit, "facts and circumstances underlying plaintiffs' complaint." (See ECF No. 166 at 2). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/6/2018) (kl) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION to Compel and Reply Letter in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash (ECF Dkt. Entry 170) addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Alison S. Mitchell dated July 5, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to quash the subpoena issued on counsel, for a protective order preventing further subpoenas of counsel, and for sanctions addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated July 5, 2018. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Cooper, Kevin) Modified on 7/16/2018 (db). (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 167 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' request is GRANTED on consent. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 7/6/2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/3/2018) (kl) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal 161 Letter Motion to Compel. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' requests to compel and for sanctions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewal in the event that Plaintiffs fail to comply with the Court's 6/18/18 Order (ECF No. 159) by July 6, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/3/2018) (kl) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to apply for commission for the deposition of Charles Meacham addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated July 2, 2018. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated July 2, 2018 re: 163 LETTER MOTION for Discovery re: Request For Protective Order Precluding Deposition of Chief Thomas Purtell addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Amy Robinson dated June 28, 2018. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 [Under Seal], # 3 Exhibit 3)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying without prejudice 164 Letter Motion for Discovery. ENDORSEMENT: The Court denies Plaintiffs' motion without prejudice. Based upon Plaintiffs' submission, the Court finds that Mr. Berry does not qualify as a notarizing officer under 22 C.F.R. 9256. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/29/2018) (kl) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Discovery and for Commission Pursuant to FRCP 28(b)(1)(D) addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated June 28, 2018. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Kevin) Modified on 7/9/2018 (ldi). (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Discovery re: Request For Protective Order Precluding Deposition of Chief Thomas Purtell addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Amy Robinson dated June 28, 2018. Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated June 27, 2018 re: 161 LETTER MOTION to Compel in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter filed on June 26, 2018 (ECF Dkt. Entry No. 160) addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Alison S. Mitchell dated June 27, 2018. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Compel in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter filed on June 26, 2018 (ECF Dkt. Entry No. 160) addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Alison S. Mitchell dated June 27, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated June 26, 2018 re: Deposition of Plaintiff Meacham. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION AND ORDER re: 153 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Respectfully Requesting that the Court Order Plaintiffs Ari Cowan and Charles Meachum to Appear In Person for Their Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated June 11, 2018, filed by The City Of New York. For the foregoing reasons, the City's motion and Meacham's cross-motion are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Meacham shall advise the Court and the City no later than June 25, 2018 whether he will be arranging, and paying the additional expenses for, his deposition by videoconference in Taiwan, or if he will be traveling to New York City for his deposition. In addition, no later than June 25, 2018, he shall advise the City of dates he is available for his deposition. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/18/2018) (kl) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin Cooper dated June 18, 2018 re: ECF No. 155-1. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF No. 155-1 and Exhibit)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated June 15, 2018 re: 153 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Respectfully Requesting that the Court Order Plaintiffs Ari Cowan and Charles Meachum to Appear In Person for Their Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated June 11, 2 and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for a Protective Order. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Stipulation Removing Plaintiff Larry Swetman as a Class Representative. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated June 14, 2018 re: 153 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Respectfully Requesting that the Court Order Plaintiffs Ari Cowan and Charles Meachum to Appear In Person for Their Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated June 11, 2 . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The parties contacted Chambers regarding a dispute that arose during the deposition of class representative George Packard. The City seeks to ask Mr. Packard questions regarding YouTube videos of his arrest. Counsel for Plaintiffs objects on the basis that the videos were not produced prior to the deposition. It is hereby Ordered that, based on the City's representation that the videos are publicly available, the City may question Mr. Packard about such videos, subject to later objections by Plaintiffs' counsel regarding the videos' authenticity and/or admissibility at trial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/13/2018) (Text Only Order) (Aaron, Stewart) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Discovery Respectfully Requesting that the Court Order Plaintiffs Ari Cowan and Charles Meachum to Appear In Person for Their Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated June 11, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Before the Court is a discovery dispute regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Notice as set forth in ECF Nos. 143 to 145 and 147 to 151. Following a conference with the parties on June 6, 2018, and for the reasons stated on the record, it is hereby Ordered as follows: 1. All Testimony Topics shall be limited to the period of 2004 through 2012, unless otherwise indicated in this Order. 2. Testimony Topic I (A) regarding "Legal Positions Adopted or Implemented" is stricken in its entirety. 3. Testimony Topics II (A)(5)-(7) are limited to events listed in Plaintiffs' Exhibit D2 (ECF No. 150-1) numbered 3 through 15. 4. Testimony Topic II (B)(10) regarding the definition of public protests and assemblies in public places" is stricken. 5. Testimony Topic II(B)(11) is modified to strike 11(c), (f) and (k). 6. Testimony Topic 14 is stricken to the extent Plaintiffs seek to inquire about specific documents. However, Plaintiffs may inquire regarding the City's policies and practices, if any, with respect to monitoring newspaper articles, press reports, legislative testimony and/or other similar types of discourse. 7. Testimony Topic III(A)(21) shall be limited to "The pedestrian and vehicular traffic plan for the Relevant Area during the Class period." 8. Testimony Topics III(A)(27)-(29) are stricken. 9. Testimony Topics III(A)(34)-(36) are stricken, as they were withdrawn by Plaintiff. 10. Testimony Topics III(A)(44)-(45) are stricken based on the City's representation that it will not assert a defense that any lack of training was the result of a lack of funding and/or resources. This Order does not address the Testimony Topics that were modified based upon agreement by the parties. Defendant's request regarding bifurcation should be directed to Judge Torres. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/7/2018) (js) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Wylie Stecklow dated 06-05-2018 re: Exhibit H. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H - 2nd try Use this One)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated June 5, 2018 re: Exhibits for ECF No. 149 (Second Letter from Wylie M. Stecklow). Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D2, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Wylie M. Stecklow dated June 5, 2018 re: 30(b)(6) Issues. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Amy Robinson dated June 4, 2018 re: Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Status Letter re: 30(b)(6) Notice. Document filed by City Of New York.(Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Amy Robinson dated June 1, 2018 re: Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Dated May 31, 2018. Document filed by City Of New York.(Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 144 Letter filed by City Of New York, re: 145 LETTER filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' May 25, 2018 letter by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, June 4, 2018. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, must be filed no later than Tuesday, June 5, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. The parties are directed to appear via Telephone for a conference on June 6, 2018, at 4:00 p.m. EST. The parties shall call the Courts conference line at 212-805-0110 once all parties are on the line. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/1/2018) (ras) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated May 31, 2018 re: Defendant's Extension Request (Dkt. No. 144). Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Amy Robinson dated May 31, 2018 re: Clarification as to Deadline for Response. Document filed by City Of New York.(Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT. From Wylie Stecklow re: Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 130 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; terminating 136 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. 1. Defendant City of New York (the "City") shall make Inspector Raganella available for a fact deposition no later than June 15, 2018. 2. The City's Document Request No. 33 shall be limited to paraphernalia drafted, created, edited or distributed by any purported class representative between January 1, 2011 and September 30, 2012. Further, for any materials distributed anywhere other than New York City, Request No. 33 is limited to materials related to how to behave at a protest and/or how to interact with the police or other law enforcement officials. 3. In response to the City's Document Request No. 35, Plaintiff Charles Meachem shall make further diligent efforts to locate photographs and/or videos taken by him from September 2011 through September 2012. 4. Plaintiffs shall produce documents responsive to the City's Document Request No. 36, except that, for the period from October 1, 2012 to present, the Request is limited to social media postings by Plaintiffs pertaining to protest activity involving law enforcement. 5. The City's Document Request No. 37 shall be limited to social media postings by Plaintiffs from 2004 to present pertaining to Republican National Convention protests in New York City. 6. Plaintiffs shall produce any documents responsive to Request Nos. 33 and 35-37 no later than one week prior to the deposition of any Plaintiff. 7. If the City wishes to pursue discovery of documents in the possession, custody or control of Plantiffs' counsel, it must comply with the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. 8. The parties shall meet and confer regarding remaining disputes relating to Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) notice. No later than Friday, May 25, 2018, Plaintiffs shall file a Letter-Motion regarding any remaining disputes pertaining to this topic. Plaintiffs' May 15, 2018 Letter (ECF No. 141) may be incorporated in Plaintiffs' Letter-Motion. The City is, therefore, granted leave to file up to a six-page Letter Response. The remaining issues raised in the parties' Letter-Motions, including Plaintiffs' compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 regarding computation of damages and the possible spoliation of video evidence, have been resolved by the parties and are deemed moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 5/16/2018) (mml) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Wylie Stecklow dated 05/15/2018 re: Scope of Time frame for 30b6 deposition. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 30b6 Notice, # 2 Exhibit B Exhibit to 30b6 Notice)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated May 14, 2018 re: 136 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Respectfully Requesting a Local Civil Rule 37.2 Conference to Discuss Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Rule 26; Plaintiffs' Failure to Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests Despite t . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated May 11, 2018 re: 136 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Respectfully Requesting a Local Civil Rule 37.2 Conference to Discuss Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Rule 26; Plaintiffs' Failure to Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests Despite t . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The parties are directed to appear for a conference in the above- captioned matter in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 on Wednesday, May 16, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. EST to address the discovery disputes reflected in ECF Nos. 130 and 136. It is the Court's intention to decide such dispute after the conference, based on the parties' letters and matters discussed during the conference, unless a party shows by separate application good cause why more formal briefing should be required. ( Discovery Hearing set for 5/16/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 5/10/2018) (js) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Response in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated May 9, 2018 re: 130 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference pertaining to the Deposition of Inspector Raganella addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated May 3, 2018. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Respectfully Requesting a Local Civil Rule 37.2 Conference to Discuss Plaintiffs' Failure to Comply with Rule 26; Plaintiffs' Failure to Respond to Defendant's Discovery Requests Despite the Existence of Responsive Documents; and a Potential Spoliation Issue in this Matter addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated May 8, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Amy Robinson dated May 8, 2018 re: 130 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference pertaining to the Deposition of Inspector Raganella addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated May 3, 2018. . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Robinson on behalf of City Of New York. (Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 132 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Request GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have four pages to reply as needed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 5/7/2018) (js) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Respectfully Requesting Leave to File a 4 Page Letter Motion for a Local Civil Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated May 7, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference pertaining to the Deposition of Inspector Raganella addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated May 3, 2018. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the City's Letter Motion (ECF No. 125) for an extension of time to file its Answer. The City shall file its Answer on ECF no later than May 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. re: 125 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, Respectfully Requesting a Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated April 13, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/30/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 125 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, Respectfully Requesting a Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated April 13, . Document filed by City Of New York. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Kevin Cooper in Opposition re: 125 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, Respectfully Requesting a Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated April 13,. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 125 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, Respectfully Requesting a Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated April 13, . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, Respectfully Requesting a Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated April 13, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Answer)(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Amy Robinson dated April 11, 2018 re: Court's Order dated April 11, 2018. Document filed by City Of New York.(Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 122 Letter, filed by Michelle Berger, Charles Meachem. ENDORSEMENT: The request as to Mr. Meacham is granted on consent. The City of New York shall provide its position regarding Mr. Berger's release by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 11, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/11/2018) (kl) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Wylie Stecklow dated 04/10/2018 re: 160.50 Releases - extension of time for 1 (or maybe 2) of 6. Document filed by Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated).(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: No later than April 13, 2018, the City shall file its motion for leave to file a late Answer. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the City's motion no later than April 20, 2018, and the City shall file any reply no later than April 25, 2018. The deadline to complete discovery is extended until August 1, 2018. Any further extensions of the discovery deadline will be granted only for good cause shown, and then only for a limited purpose. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the Letter-Motions at ECF Nos. 112 and 115. (Discovery due by 8/1/2018. Motions due by 4/13/2018. Responses due by 4/20/2018. Replies due by 4/25/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/3/2018) (ras) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS CONNOR HICKS, CHRIS PHILLIPS, AND AMADON DELLERBA VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE: Plaintiffs Connor Hicks, Chris Phillips, and Amadon DellErba, by their undersigned counsel and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), hereby voluntarily dismiss their claims in the above-captioned action against the City of New York, without prejudice, as further set forth in this Order. The City Of New York, terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/29/2018) (cf) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 118 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Request GRANTED. The parties are directed to appear via Telephone for a conference in the above-captioned matter on Monday, April 2, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/2/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/28/2018) (anc) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Respectfully Requesting an Adjournment of the Telephone Conference Scheduled for April 5, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated March 28, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to appear via Telephone for a conference in the above-captioned matter on Thursday, April 5, 2018, at 4:00 p.m. EST; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED.(Telephone Conference set for 4/5/2018 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/28/2018) (anc) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, only as to the below listed Plaintiffs, and without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) Modified on 3/29/2018 (km). (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Alison S. Mitchell dated March 27, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated March 27, 2018 re: 112 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Respectfully Requesting a Pre-Motion Discovery Conference, as Required by Local Civil Rule 37.2, to Discuss Outstanding Discovery Concerning Plaintiffs' Arrest Histories addressed to Magistrate Respectfully and Very Briefly Replying to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Request for a Local Civil Rule 37.2 Conference to Discuss Defendant's Request for a List of Plaintiffs' Arrest Histories, as Authorized by Local Civil Rule 83.10. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin G. Cooper dated March 26, 2018 re: 112 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Respectfully Requesting a Pre-Motion Discovery Conference, as Required by Local Civil Rule 37.2, to Discuss Outstanding Discovery Concerning Plaintiffs' Arrest Histories addressed to Magistrate . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Respectfully Requesting a Pre-Motion Discovery Conference, as Required by Local Civil Rule 37.2, to Discuss Outstanding Discovery Concerning Plaintiffs' Arrest Histories addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Brachah Goykadosh dated March 23, 2018. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 109 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron)(Text Only Order) (Aaron, Stewart) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Kevin Cooper dated December 6, 2017 re: 109 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Alison S. Mitchell dated December 1, 2017. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Alison S. Mitchell dated December 1, 2017. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying without prejudice 106 Letter Motion for Discovery. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Alison S. Mitchell dated 11/6/2017 re: 106 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Kevin Cooper dated November 3, 2017. . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Kevin Cooper dated November 3, 2017. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10/24/2017 re: Joint Request for extension of Discovery cutoff. Document filed by Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brachah Goykadosh on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 10/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Gary Moy, New Attorney: Brachah Goykadosh Respectfully Requesting that the Court Substitute Senior Counsel Gary Moy with Assistant Corporation Counsel Brachah Goykadosh addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendant dated October 15, 2017. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Gary Moy dated October 11, 2017)(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 10/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER terminating 96 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 99 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Kevin Cooper dated October 13, 2017 re: 99 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time regarding production of District Attorney and Criminal Court Files addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Alison S. Mitchell dated 10/13/17. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time regarding production of District Attorney and Criminal Court Files addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Alison S. Mitchell dated 10/13/17. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Counsel from David Thompson dated 10/5/2017 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs writes they are in receipt of defendant's request for an extension to respond to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Document Requests (the "Requests"). Plaintiffs will agree to an extension with the following conditions. Defendants will respond to the document requests on October 28, 2017 by identifying any objections to the requests. in particular by asserting any objections concerning the intelligibility of the requests or to their relevance; Defendants will respond to the document requests on December 1, 2017 by producing responsive documents: This agreement for an extension of time will be submitted to the Court to be So Ordered. ENDORSEMENT: This plan approved by Court 10/10/2017. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 10/10/2017) (js) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from David A. Thompson dated October 6, 2017 re: 96 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Plaintiffs' Second Set of Document Requests addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Alison S. Mitchell dated 10/6/17. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' proposed compromise)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Plaintiffs' Second Set of Document Requests addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Alison S. Mitchell dated 10/6/17. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNSEALING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the New York City Police Department, as well as the Criminal Court of the State of New York, and the New York County District Attorney's Office, shall not be bound by the statutory sealing requirements of CPL § 160.50 for all documents relating to and arising out of the arrest and prosecution of potential class members who were arrested m or around downtown Manhattan on September 15, 16, 17, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the use of the above-referenced records is restricted to use in the above entitled civil rights action and shall be protected by the parties as confidential, except as needed for the prosecution or defense of the instant action. Additionally, the contact information of the non-parties (this does not include the names, or the underlying information concerning the investigations, arrests, and prosecutions, which may be shared with the parties) contained in these records shall be kept confidential, for "attorneys' eyes only," and shall only be used by the attorney and his or her law firm and/or agents for the purpose of communicating with absent class members, witnesses or the service of subpoenas, and shall not be disclosed to the parties, or any other person, and such information shall not be included in documents publicly filed with the Court, absent a 160.50 waiver being signed by the individual. If the underlying information concerning the investigations, arrests, and prosecutions that are contained in these records are filed publicly, the names of the individuals involved, other than the parties, shall either be redacted or replaced with a pseudonym (e.g., Class Member 1, Class Member 2, etc.) or be identified by their initials, to protect their privacy interests. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 9/25/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Wylie Stecklow dated 09/22/2017 re: Proposed Unsealing Order. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed order)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Alison S. Mitchell dated 9/11/2017 re: Respectfully Responding to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion Letter Dated September 8, 2017. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Kevin G. Cooper dated September 8, 2017 re: 89 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Alison S. Mitchell dated 8/31/17. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from David A. Thompson dated 09/07/2017 re: 30(b)(6) Deposition. Document filed by Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 08-23-2017 67 page objections of Defendants)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Alison S. Mitchell dated 8/31/17. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from David A. Thompson dated August 22, 2017. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part 84 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Extension to produce responsive documents on or before August 31, 2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Sue Mitchell on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Mitchell, Alison) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Kevin G. Cooper dated August 9, 2017 re: 84 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for an additional 60 days, until October 6, 2017, to produce (i) documents responsive to plaintiffs First Set of Document Requests and, in the event that defendant is unable to complete production by that date, . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for an additional 60 days, until October 6, 2017, to produce (i) documents responsive to plaintiffs First Set of Document Requests and, in the event that defendant is unable to complete production by that date, (ii) affidavit(s) explaining the process that must be undertaken and the approximate time it will take to produce documents addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Gary Moy dated 8/7/2017. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elizabeth M. Daitz)(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons stated above, Defendant's motion for reconsideration is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 62. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/17/2017) (anc) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Parties shall meet and confer regarding all outstanding discovery by July 27, 2017. For Requests 9, 10, 11, 12 and any other outstanding requests of Plaintiff's First Set of Document Requests, the Parties shall make reasonable proposals to each other concerning the documents to be produced after discussing the City's burdens of production and the Plaintiffs' entitlement to discovery. (As further set forth in this Order.) Plaintiffs are not entitled to documents in Request No. 21, as there has been no showing that discovery related to spoliation is relevant. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 7/13/2017) (cf) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendant City of New York dated June 27, 2017 re: Respectfully Writing to Correct Certain Misstatements by Plaintiffs in Their Reply Letter dated June 21, 2017. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 06/21/2017 re: Reply re Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated).(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendant City of New York dated June 20, 2017 re: Responding to and Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Certain Discovery. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated June 13, 2017 re: Respectfully Requesting until June 20, 2017 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 06/06/2017 re: Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Discovery Demands and Responses)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 6/5/2017) (mml) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Joy T. Anakhu in Support re: 74 MOTION for Joy T. Anakhu to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Joy T. Anakhu to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Andrew Lucas in Support re: 72 MOTION for Andrew Lucas to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Andrew Lucas to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Gary Moy dated 5/7/2017 re: response to plaintiffs' May 1, 2017 letter. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 05/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Kevin Cooper dated May 1, 2017. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re Court's Order dated March 2, 2017 (Docket Entry No. 59). . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Moy, Gary) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 67 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. Replies due by 4/14/2017. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/7/2017) (mro) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to plaintiffs' opposition memorandum, from April 11, 2017 until April 14, 2017 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Gary Moy dated 4/7/2017. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re Court's Order dated March 2, 2017 (Docket Entry No. 59). . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 64 Letter filed by Ari Cowan, Michelle Berger, Amadon Dellerba, Charles Meachem, Chris Phillips, Connor Hicks, Edward Beck, Larry Swetman, George Packard. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. (Responses due by 4/4/2017) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/29/2017) (cf) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 03/28/2017 re: Request for 3 additional business days to file opposition to Defendants' motion to reconsider. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), George Packard(Individually), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated).(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re Court's Order dated March 2, 2017 (Docket Entry No. 59). . Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Moy, Gary) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re Court's Order dated March 2, 2017 (Docket Entry No. 59). Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Accordingly, the parties should consult with Judge Ellis about a discovery plan, and any relevant concerns regarding the scope of discovery or privileged documents, now that the Court has resolved Defendants' motion to dismiss. The Clerk of Court is further ORDERED to lift the stay in this case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/3/2017) (cf) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants move to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (As further set forth in this Order.) For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion to dismiss the false arrest claim is GRANTED as to the Chief Defendants and DENIED as to the City. Defendants' motion to dismiss the § 1983 claim against the City is GRANTED as to the unconstitutional policy and practice claim and DENIED as to the failure to train claim. Defendants' motion to dismiss the § 1983 claim against Bloomberg, Kelly, and the Chief Defendants is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 41 and to terminate Bloomberg, Kelly, Esposito, Purtell, Anger, and McNamara from this action. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/2/2017) (cf) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection re: 57 Order on Motion for Discovery, objection pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) to the Honorable Ronald L. Ellis's February 14, 2017 Order. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 53 Motion for Discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to lift the stay with respect to core documents is GRANTED. The Parties shall submit a joint discovery plan to the Court on or before February 21, 2017. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 2/14/2017) (cla) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION for Discovery - Partially Lift the Discovery Stay. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 53 MOTION for Discovery - Partially Lift the Discovery Stay. . Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,. (Moy, Gary) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION for Discovery - Partially Lift the Discovery Stay. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Thompson Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Thompson Ex A, # 3 Exhibit Thompson Ex B, # 4 Exhibit Thompson Ex C, # 5 Affidavit Stecklow Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit Stecklow Ex A, # 7 Exhibit Stecklow Ex B)(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Discovery - Partially Lift the Discovery Stay. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) Plaintiffs file a motion to lift the stay of discovery by December 14, 2016. (2) Defendants file a response on or before December 28, 2016. (3) Plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed on or before January 4, 2017. (Motions due by 12/14/2016., Responses due by 12/28/2016, Replies due by 1/4/2017.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 11/29/2016) (cla) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: See ECF Nos. 48, 49. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. Motions referred to Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/21/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Gary Moy dated 10/3/2016 re: enclosing for the Courts' consideration a Memorandum and Order, dated September 30, 2016, by the Honorable Kevin P. Castel in the matter of Luke Richardson v. City of New York, et al., No. 15 Civ. 5775 (PKC) (SDNY), in which Judge Castel dismissed municipal and supervisory liability claims similarly related to OWS that are also the subject of defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion pending before Your Honor. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Judge Castel Memorandum and Order, # 2 Exhibit Richardson Amended Complaint)(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Gary Moy dated 9/16/2016 re: opposition to plaintiffs' September 13, 2016 application requesting a pre-motion conference or a briefing schedule to life Judge Torres's stay of discovery pending resolution of defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,.(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Jeffrey G. Smith, Wylie Stecklow dated Sept. 13, 2016. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/31/2016) (mro) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,. (Moy, Gary) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters dated February 10, 12 and 16, 2016, it is ORDERED that all proceedings and deadlines are STAYED pending the Court's resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/23/2016) (kko) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,. (Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Gary Moy in Support re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,.(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Gary Moy dated 2/16/2016 re: response to plaintiffs' letter dated February 12, 2016 (Docket Entry No. 39) regarding request to stay discovery pending resolution of defendants' fully dispositive Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,.(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kevin Cooper dated February 12, 2016 re: 34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Gary Moy dated 2/5/2016. Re: Dkt 38 Letter Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Gary Moy dated 2/10/2016 re: requesting stay of discovery pending resolution of defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,.(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Joy Anakhu and Andrew Lucas, New Attorney: Gary Moy, Address: Office of the Corporation Counsel, 100 Church Street, New York, New York, USA 10007, 212-356-3522. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Anakhu Declaration, # 2 Lucas Declaration)(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss. DENIED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/8/2016) (kko) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kevin Cooper dated February 8, 2016 re: 34 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Gary Moy dated 2/5/2016. . Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Gary Moy dated 2/5/2016. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,.(Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Moy on behalf of Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,. (Moy, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2016. (ds) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Depositions to be completed by 4/15/2016. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 5/12/2016. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than 6/27/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/21/2016) (mro) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The parties having appeared before the Court on January 21, 2016, it is ORDERED that: 1. Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by February 18, 2016; 2. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition papers by March 17, 2016; and 3. Defendants shall reply by March 31, 2016. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 27. SO ORDERED. Terminating 27 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Joy T. Anakhu dated January 14, 2016. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/21/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 19, 2016 is RESCHEDULED to 12:30 p.m. on January 21, 2016. (Initial Conference set for 1/21/2016 at 12:30 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/19/2016) (kko) Modified on 1/19/2016 (kko). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jeffrey G. Smith dated January 14, 2016 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually). (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Plan)(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Joy T. Anakhu dated January 14, 2016. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint. GRANTED to the extent that by January 14, 2016, Defendants shall answer the complaint or submit a letter requesting a pre-motion conference pursuant to Rule III of this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/16/2015) (kko) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Joy T. Anakhu dated December 14, 2015. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, The City Of New York,.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 23 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The case management conference scheduled for November 13, 2015 is ADJOURNED to January 19, 2016, at 4:15 p.m. The parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan by January 14, 2016. (Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2016 at 04:15 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/9/2015) (kko) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Kevin Cooper dated 11/9/2015. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually).(Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED to the extent that by December 14, 2015, Defendant City of New York shall answer the complaint or submit a letter requesting a pre-motion conference pursuant to Paragraph III of this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. SO ORDERED. The City Of New York, answer due 12/14/2015. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/13/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew Lucas dated 10/9/2015. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joseph Lucas on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dara Lynn Weiss on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Weiss, Dara) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Michael Bloomberg served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Document Clerk NYC Law Dept. Document filed by Chris Phillips(Individually); Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated); George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Amadon Dellerba(Individually); Ari Cowan(Individually). (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ray Kelly served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Document Clerk NYC Law Dept. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually); Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Chris Phillips(Individually); Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated); George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Amadon Dellerba(Individually); Connor Hicks(Individually). (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The City Of New York, served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually); Chris Phillips(Individually); Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Michelle Berger(Individually); George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Amadon Dellerba(Individually); Ari Cowan(Individually); Connor Hicks(Individually). (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. James McNamara served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated); George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Amadon Dellerba(Individually); Connor Hicks(Individually). (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Steven Anger served on 9/21/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by Desk Officer Molina #10137. Document filed by Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated); George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Amadon Dellerba(Individually); Connor Hicks(Individually). (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Joseph Esposito served on 9/21/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Edward Beck(individually); Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Chris Phillips(Individually); Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated); George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Amadon Dellerba(Individually); Connor Hicks(Individually). (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint,. Thomas P. Purtell served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Chris Phillips(Individually); Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Michelle Berger(Individually); George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated); Amadon Dellerba(Individually); Charles Meachem(Individually); Larry Swetman(Individually); Ari Cowan(Individually). (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Janine Lee Pollack on behalf of Edward Beck(individually), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), George Packard(Individually), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Pollack, Janine) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Allen Thompson on behalf of Edward Beck(individually), Edward Beck(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Michelle Berger(Individually), Ari Cowan(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Ari Cowan(Individually), Amadon Dellerba(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Amadon Dellerba(Individually), Connor Hicks(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Connor Hicks(Individually), Charles Meachem(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Charles Meachem(Individually), George Packard(Individually), George Packard(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Chris Phillips(Individually), Larry Swetman(On behalf of all others similarly situated), Larry Swetman(Individually). (Thompson, David) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 09/16/2015 re: Related Case of Gerskovich. Document filed by George Packard(Individually).(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/16/2015 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/14/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against City of New York, Michael Former Mayor Bloomberg, Joseph Former NYPD Chief of Patrol Esposito, Ray Former NYPD Commisioner Kelly, Thomas P NYPD Chief Purtell, Steven NYPD Deputy Chief Anger, James NYPD Deputy Chief McNamara. Document filed by Edward Beck, Michelle Berger, Chris Phillips, Connor Hicks, Larry Swetman, Amadon Dellerba, George Packard, Charles Meachem, Ari Cowan.(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Gilbert Cooper on behalf of GEORGE PACKARD, LARRY SWETMAN, MICHELLE BERGER, Edward Beck, Ari Cowan, AMADON DELLERBA, CONNOR HICKS, CHARLES MEACHEM, CHRIS PHILLIPS. (Cooper, Kevin) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MICHAEL BLOOMBERG, JOSEPH ESPOSITO, STEVEN ANGER, City of New York, Ray Kelly, JAMES MCNAMARA, THOMAS P PURTELL,. (rch) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wylie M. Stecklow on behalf of GEORGE PACKARD, LARRY SWETMAN, MICHELLE BERGER, Edward Beck, Ari Cowan, AMADON DELLERBA, CONNOR HICKS, CHARLES MEACHEM, CHRIS PHILLIPS. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE CITY OF NEW YORK, a municipal entity, FORMER NYPD CHIEF OF PATROL JOSEPH ESPOSITO, FORMER NYPD COMMISIONER RAY KELLY, FORMER MAYOR MICHAEL BLOOMBERG, NYPD CHIEF THOMAS P. PURTELL, NYPD DEPUTY CHIEF STEVEN ANGER, NYPD DEPUTY CHIEF JAMES MCNAMARA,, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by GEORGE PACKARD, LARRY SWETMAN, MICHELLE BERGER, Edward Beck, Ari Cowan, AMADON DELLERBA, CONNOR HICKS, CHARLES MEACHEM, CHRIS PHILLIPS. (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against MICHAEL BLOOMBERG, JOSEPH ESPOSITO, STEVEN ANGER, Ray Kelly, JAMES MCNAMARA, THOMAS P PURTELL,, The City Of New York 1 Center Street New York, New York 10007. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11373352)Document filed by CHRIS PHILLIPS, Edward Beck, GEORGE PACKARD, CHARLES MEACHEM, MICHELLE BERGER, AMADON DELLERBA, LARRY SWETMAN, Ari Cowan, CONNOR HICKS.(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 659 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?