Kidd v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00083-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Martha E. Kidd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cookanddifranco.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina DiFranco +1 410 223 1590 +1 410 223 1594 tdifranco@cookanddifranco.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E. ARTZ, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Edward Artz +1 703 243 3500 +1 703 524 8770 wartz@artzlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dominique Danielle Michel +1 703 519 8080 +1 703 519 8084

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Joseph Baines +1 410 332 8600 +1 410 332 8953 EBaines@saul.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen M Schenning +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 209 3124 stephen.schenning@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/10/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Tort Claim
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 11/9/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER MODIFYING Settlement Order previously entered to allow each party 60 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m 12/6/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001, Terminated: 12/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
    UNOPPOSED MOTION by Martha E. Kidd to Extend Settlement . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Settlement OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER DISMISSING Case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 30 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Chief Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 11/9/01 ) (c/m 11/9/01-Chambers) (MICROFILMED) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Terminated Case
        Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Add and Terminate Judges
          CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001, Terminated: 7/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER GRANTING [17-1] Letter/motion of Defendant to Extend Stay of Litigation until further Order of Court and DIRECTING an update by 12/31/01. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 7/11/01) (c/m 7/11/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001, Terminated: 7/11/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              LETTER/MOTION by USA to Extend Stay of Litigation . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER SETTING Date for Settlement Conference. ( signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 6/19/01 ) (c/m 6/19/01-cw) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar for Settlement or other ADR Conference. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 6/13/01 ) (c/m 6/14/01-sd) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001, Terminated: 6/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING [14-1] motion of USA to issue a 45-day Stay the Court's Scheduling Order. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 6/14/01 ) (c/m 6/14/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001, Terminated: 6/14/2001 Motion to Stay
                      LETTER/MOTION by USA to issue a 45-day Stay the Court's Scheduling Order . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 4/18/01 ) (c/m 4/18/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 4/16/01 ) (c/m 4/16/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001, Terminated: 10/19/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct
                            LETTER/MOTION by Martha E. Kidd to Amend [10-1] Scheduling order . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 4/5/01) (c/m 4/5/01 skp) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001, Terminated: 11/9/2001 Answer
                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING [7-1] motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint SET Answer deadline to 4/4/01 for USA ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 3/21/01 ) (c/m 3/21/01-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001, Terminated: 3/21/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    MOTION by USA to Extend Time to Answer Complaint . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to USA 1/22/01 Answer due on 3/22/01 for USA (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER GRANTING [5-1] motion of Plaintiff for Dominique D Michel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 2/26/01 ) (c/i 2/27/01) (Fee Paid) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                          MOTION by Martha E. Kidd for Dominique D Michel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING [4-1] motion of Plaintiff for William E. Artz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 2/26/01 ) (c/i 2/27/01) (Fee Paid) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                              MOTION by Martha E. Kidd for William E. Artz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to USA 1/19/01 Answer due on 3/19/01 for USA (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Summons Issued
                                                  SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for USA (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT and exhibit A filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1172552 (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?