Palmer Gardens LLC et al v. Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-05830
District Judge Kimba M. Wood, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 31, 2017 at 11:41 PM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Acacio Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Alan Maltz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Anh Ngoc Truong, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Beaver Metal, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Christine Singh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Creditbox Universal, SL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Felisa Hernandez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Henry Gross, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Herbert Gerstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Hubert Tsai, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Janet Maltz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Joyce Gernstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Michael Hadjedj, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Palmer Gardens LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Rachel Gerstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Randall A. Meckel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Sean Tran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Xue, Feng, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
v.
No Logo 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Akerman LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Akerman Senterfitt, LLP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Domb +1 212 880 3800 +1 212 880 8965 martin.domb@akerman.com
No Logo Alex Sapir, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Bayrock Group, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo BayRock Spring Street LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Core Group Marketing, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Trump, Eric, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ivanka Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Julius Schwatz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Oliver Dacourt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Geller +1 212 825 0365 william_geller@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm Of Adam Leitman Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Leitman Bailey +1 212 825 0365
No Logo Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Rodrigo Nino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Shaun Osher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Tevif Arif, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Thomas Postilio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
Trump International Hotels Management LLC Trump International Hotels Management LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Trump Marks Soho LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331(a)rp
Nature of Suit 290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: all claims interposed by Plaintiffs in the above-entitled action, and all counterclaims that were or could have been asserted by any Defendant, are dismissed with prejudice, without costs to any party as against the other. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Any pending motions are moot. Motions terminated: 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Bayrock Group LLC, Shaun Osher, Eric Trump, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Alex Sapir, BayRock Spring Street LLC, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Donald J. Trump, Julius Schwatz, Donald Trump, Thomas Postilio, Ivanka Trump, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Core Group Marketing, LLC, Rodrigo Nino, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC, Tevif Arif. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/8/2011) (ft) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Tevif Arif, Bayrock Group LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Beaver Metal, LLC, Core Group Marketing, LLC, Oliver Dacourt, Rodrigo Nino, Shaun Osher, Thomas Postilio, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Alex Sapir, Julius Schwatz, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of William J. Geller in Opposition re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Beaver Metal, LLC, Creditbox Universal, SL, Oliver Dacourt, Xue Feng, Joyce Gernstein, Herbert Gerstein, Rachel Gerstein, Henry Gross, Michael Hadjedj, Felisa Hernandez, Alan Maltz, Janet Maltz, Randall A. Meckel, Palmer Gardens LLC, Acacio Rodriguez, Christine Singh, Sean Tran, Anh Ngoc Truong, Hubert Tsai. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Architect's Report, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Tax Opinion, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Tsai-Singh Assignment)(Geller, William) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Beaver Metal, LLC, Creditbox Universal, SL, Oliver Dacourt, Xue Feng, Joyce Gernstein, Herbert Gerstein, Rachel Gerstein, Henry Gross, Michael Hadjedj, Felisa Hernandez, Alan Maltz, Janet Maltz, Randall A. Meckel, Palmer Gardens LLC, Acacio Rodriguez, Christine Singh, Sean Tran, Anh Ngoc Truong, Hubert Tsai. (Geller, William) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William J. Geller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Adam Leitman Bailey, P.C., 120 Broadway, 17 Fl., New York, NY, US 10271, 212.825.0365. (Geller, William) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            STIPULATION IN LIEU OF ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AKERMAN SENTERFITT LLP, AS ESCROW AGENT According to its records and to the best of its knowledge, information and belief, Akerman received deposits with respect to the named plaintiffs in the amounts and on the approximate dates set forth in the attached Schedule A, and Akerman holds in escrow the total of such deposits plus accrued interest to date, as set forth in Schedule A, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 1/19/11) (cd) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Tevif Arif, Bayrock Group LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Core Group Marketing, LLC, Rodrigo Nino, Shaun Osher, Thomas Postilio, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Alex Sapir, Julius Schwatz, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                AFFIRMATION of Fred D. Weinstein in Support re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Tevif Arif, Bayrock Group LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Core Group Marketing, LLC, Rodrigo Nino, Shaun Osher, Thomas Postilio, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Alex Sapir, Julius Schwatz, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Part II, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Part III, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A Part IV, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A Part V, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B Part I, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B Part II, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit B Part III, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit B Part IV, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit B Part V, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Tevif Arif, Bayrock Group LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Core Group Marketing, LLC, Rodrigo Nino, Shaun Osher, Thomas Postilio, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Alex Sapir, Julius Schwatz, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC. Responses due by 2/18/2011(Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/22/2010 before Judge Kimba M. Wood. (ab) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 3 Amended Complaint,,,, against 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Akerman Senterfitt, LLP, Tevif Arif, Bayrock Group LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Core Group Marketing, LLC, Oliver Dacourt, Rodrigo Nino, Shaun Osher, Thomas Postilio, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Alex Sapir, Julius Schwatz, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hubert Tsai, Michael Hadjedj, Rachel Gerstein, Palmer Gardens LLC, Anh Ngoc Truong, Creditbox Universal, SL, Randall A. Meckel, Xue Feng, Acacio Rodriguez, Sean Tran, Janet Maltz, Joyce Gernstein, Henry Gross, Beaver Metal, LLC, Felisa Hernandez, Christine Singh, Herbert Gerstein, Alan Maltz. Related document: 3 FIRST Amended Complaint filed by Creditbox Universal, SL, Christine Singh, Xue Feng, Hubert Tsai, Rachel Gerstein, Joyce Gernstein, Felisa Hernandez, Alan Maltz, Janet Maltz, Henry Gross, Palmer Gardens LLC, Beaver Metal, LLC, Michael Hadjedj, Acacio Rodriguez, Randall A. Meckel, Herbert Gerstein.(mbe) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER Second Amended Complaint due by 12/6/2010. Motion to Dismiss due by 1/7/2011. Response due by 2/18/2011, Reply due by 3/4/2011. Defendants' moving brief and Plaintiffs' opposition shall be no longer than 35 pages, and Defendants' reply brief shall be no longer than 15 pages. On consent, Plaintiffs will defer the filing of a motion for partial summary judgment until after the Court has disposed of Defendants' motion to dismiss. The parties need not enter into a Scheduling Order or a Discovery Plan at this time. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/23/10) (cd) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin Domb on behalf of Akerman Senterfitt, LLP (Domb, Martin) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            STIPULATION re First Amended Complaint: Core Group Marketing, LLC answer due 1/7/2011; Shaun Osher answer due 1/7/2011; Thomas Postilio answer due 1/7/2011. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/22/10) (cd) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              STIPULATION re First Amended Complaint: Akerman Senterfitt, LLP answer due 1/7/2011. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/22/10) (cd) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                STIPULATION re First amended complaint: Tevif Arif answer due 1/7/2011; Bayrock Group LLC answer due 1/7/2011; Bayrock Spring Street LLC answer due 1/7/2011; Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC answer due 1/7/2011; Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC answer due 1/7/2011; Rodrigo Nino answer due 1/7/2011; Prodigy International NYC, LLC answer due 1/7/2011; Alex Sapir answer due 1/7/2011; Julius Schwatz answer due 1/7/2011; Donald J. Trump answer due 1/7/2011; Donald Trump answer due 1/7/2011; Eric Trump answer due 1/7/2011; Ivanka Trump answer due 1/7/2011; Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC answer due 1/7/2011; Trump Marks Soho LLC answer due 1/7/2011. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/22/10) (cd) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying 246 Spring Street Holdings II LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization Realty LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization Holdings LLC, Sapir Organization Spring Street LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Trump Soho Member LLC, Donka Soho Member LLC, The Sapir Group LLC, Bayrock Group, LLC, RIF International Group, Inc., TIHM Member Corp., Trump Marks Soho License Corp., Prodigy Development Sales, LLC, SDS Prodigy, LLC, SDS Investments, LLC as Corporate Parent. Document filed by 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Bayrock Group LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC.(Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Akerman Senterfitt & Eidson, P.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Akerman Senterfitt, LLP.(Domb, Martin) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. no Corporate Parent. Document filed by Core Group Marketing, LLC.(Resnik, Richard) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from William J. Geller dated 11/4/2010 re: Counsel request an adjournment of the FRCP 16 conference scheduled for 11/9/2010 for 11/17 or 11/22/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The Rule 16 conference is scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on November 22, 2010. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 11/5/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/9/2010 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Kimba M. Wood. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/21/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint,,, against 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Akerman Senterfitt, LLP, Tevif Arif, Bayrock Group LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Core Group Marketing, LLC, Oliver Dacourt, Rodrigo Nino, Shaun Osher, Thomas Postilio, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Alex Sapir, Julius Schwatz, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hubert Tsai, Michael Hadjedj, Rachel Gerstein, Palmer Gardens LLC, Creditbox Universal, SL, Randall A. Meckel, Xue Feng, Acacio Rodriguez, Janet Maltz, Joyce Gernstein, Henry Gross, Beaver Metal, LLC, Felisa Hernandez, Christine Singh, Herbert Gerstein, Alan Maltz. Related document: 1 Complaint,,, filed by Creditbox Universal, SL, Christine Singh, Xue Feng, Hubert Tsai, Rachel Gerstein, Joyce Gernstein, Felisa Hernandez, Alan Maltz, Janet Maltz, Henry Gross, Palmer Gardens LLC, Beaver Metal, LLC, Acacio Rodriguez, Randall A. Meckel, Herbert Gerstein.(rdz) (ama). (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Beaver Metal, LLC, Creditbox Universal, SL, Xue Feng, Joyce Gernstein, Herbert Gerstein, Rachel Gerstein, Henry Gross, Felisa Hernandez, Alan Maltz, Janet Maltz, Randall A. Meckel, Palmer Gardens LLC, Acacio Rodriguez, Christine Singh, Hubert Tsai.(mbe) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against 246 Spring Street Holdings II, LLC, Akerman Senterfitt, LLP, Tevif Arif, Bayrock Group LLC, Bayrock Spring Street LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Organization LLC, Bayrock/Sapir Realty LLC, Core Group Marketing, LLC, Rodrigo Nino, Shaun Osher, Thomas Postilio, Prodigy International NYC, LLC, Alex Sapir, Julius Schwatz, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Eric Trump, Ivanka Trump, Trump International Hotels Managemnt LLC, Trump Marks Soho LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 910881)Document filed by Hubert Tsai, Rachel Gerstein, Palmer Gardens LLC, Creditbox Universal, SL, Randall A. Meckel, Xue Feng, Acacio Rodriguez, Janet Maltz, Joyce Gernstein, Henry Gross, Beaver Metal, LLC, Felisa Hernandez, Christine Singh, Herbert Gerstein, Alan Maltz. (Attachments: # 1 part 2)(mbe) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 829 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?