WBS, Inc. v. Juan Croucier et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-07251

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2020 at 3:04 PM EDT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Croucier Productions, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Juan Carlos Croucier, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo One Management, Defendant

Represented by Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com
No Logo Rob Hoffman, Defendant

Represented by Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com
No Logo Robert Blotzer, Counter-Defendant
No Logo ROES, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Wbs, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Thomas J Hanrahan, Mediator (ADR Panel)

Represented by TPHanrahan Dispute Solutions

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P Hanrahan +1 310 871 4521 tom@tphanrahan.com
  Entries (247) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Ruling
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Ruling
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/14/2019, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Supplement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Strike
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/31/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Response
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Response
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 159 , 119 , 115 , 107 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS). (lc) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: RE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT'S INFRINGEMENT; LACK OF AFFIRMATIVEDEFENSES; PLAINTIFF'S OWNERSHIP; DEFENDANT'S STALE COUNTERCLAIMS; AND DEFENDANT'S CONVERSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF 107 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT 115 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF WBS, INC.'S COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS 119 .Court and counsel confer as reflected on the record. The matters are taken under submission. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (lc) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Pregerson will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9C on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/29/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 175 , Statement (Motion related), 176 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect events selected.. The correct event is: Amendment (Motion related) re no. 175. Proposed statement of uncontroverted facts (supplmental) should have been submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiffs REQUEST to Strike and for Court to Decline to Consider Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment per L.R. 7-5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant's Infringement; Lack of Affirmative Defenses; P 159 . The following error(s) was found: Missing Proposed order which was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Juan Carlos Croucier pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to Robert Blotzer. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to Objection/Opposition (Motion related), 49 Evidentiary Objections filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), 40 Evidentiary Objections filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant's use of Plaintiff's Trademarks to infer a current association with Plaintiff, to only use the word mark when Defendant refers to himself as "formerly of" or " 39 re Declaration of Drew Sherman filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re: APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant's use of Plaintiff's Trademarks to infer a current association with Plaintiff, to only use the word mark when Defendant refers to himself as "formerly of" or "former m 9 re Declaration of Robert Blotzer filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 115 filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E to Declaration of Juan Croucier, # 2 Declaration of Stephen Pearcy)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant's Infringement; Lack of Affirmative Defenses; Plaintiff's Ownership; Defendant's stale counterclaims; and Defendant's Conversion 107 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Drew H. Sherman ISO Reply to Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A to Dec of DHS ISO Reply)(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff WBS, Inc.'s Complaint 119 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Mellos, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of WBS's Opposition to Defendant Juan Croucier's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mellos, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 115 Response to Defendant's Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Mellos, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 115 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Drew H. Sherman, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Dec of Sherman)(Mellos, Anthony) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed Audio-Recording re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), 128 (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION and Response in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff WBS, Inc.'s Complaint 119 Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff WBS, Inc.'s Complaint 119 filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Juan Croucier, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Declaration of David Shein, Esq., # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendants Hoffman and One Management's Notice (Other) 118 ; NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff WBS, Inc.'s Complaint 119 ; Statement (Motion related), 121 ; Motion Related Document 122 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect events selected. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Correct event for no. 118 ( the actual motion) is : Motion for Summary Judgment; Correct event for no. 119(the memorandum only in support)is : Memorandum in support of Motion. Re no. 121, and 122, the proposed statement of uncontroverted facts and proposed order: these should have been efiled under the wrong events, but should have been submitted as separate attachments to a main document.In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so.. (lc) Modified on 10/27/2016 (lc). (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff WBS, Inc.'s Complaint 119 filed by Defendants Rob Hoffman, One Management. (Perez, Geronimo) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT of Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Law NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff WBS, Inc.'s Complaint 119 filed by Defendants Rob Hoffman, One Management. (Perez, Geronimo) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff WBS, Inc.'s Complaint 119 filed by Defendants Rob Hoffman, One Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Perez, Geronimo) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff WBS, Inc.'s Complaint filed by Defendants Rob Hoffman, One Management. Motion set for hearing on 10/31/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Rob Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Declaration Declaration of Geronimo Perez, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Perez, Geronimo) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Rob Hoffman, One Management. (Perez, Geronimo) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 115 (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 115 filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Juan Carlos Croucier. Motion set for hearing on 10/31/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Juan Croucier, # 2 Declaration of David Shein, Esq., # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Appendix Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, # 10 Proposed Order) (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING DEFENdANTS 109 EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO OCTOBER 31,2016 10:00 AM 10 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Hoffman Notice (Other) 110 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Joinder. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment from October 24, 2016 to October 31, 2016 109 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant and Counterclaimaint Juan Carlos Croucier, upon Counter-Defendant Robert Blotzer served on 9/26/2016, answer due 10/17/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Blotzer, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE filed by Defendants Rob Hoffman, One Management. Notice of Joinder to Defendant Juan Croucier's Ex Parte Application [D/E# 109] (Perez, Geronimo) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment from October 24, 2016 to October 31, 2016 filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONTENTIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant's Infringement; Lack of Affirmative Defenses; Plaintiff's Ownership; Defendant's stale counterclaims; and Defendant's Conversion 107 filed by Counter Defendant WBS, Inc., Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Mellos, Anthony) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant's Infringement; Lack of Affirmative Defenses; Plaintiff's Ownership; Defendant's stale counterclaims; and Defendant's Conversion filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Drew H. Sherman ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Dec. of Sherman, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Dec. of Sherman, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Dec. of Sherman, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Dec. of Sherman, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Dec. of Sherman, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Dec. of Sherman, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Dec. of Sherman, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit H - Dec. of Sherman, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit I - Dec. of Sherman, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit J - Dec. of Sherman, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit K - Dec. of Sherman, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit L - Dec. of Sherman, # 15 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Mellos, Anthony) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims of Defendant filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendants WBS, Inc. 94 is hereby continued from August 8, 2016 to September 19, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (lom) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Defendant 94 filed by Counter Defendant WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Defendant 94 filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Drew H. Sherman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Defendant 94 Declaration in Reply to Defendant's Opposition filed by Counter Defendant WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Defendant 94 filed by Counter Defendant WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the Motion for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave filed by Plaintiff 81 set for July 25, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (lc) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Defendant 94 filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave, 79 81 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims of Defendant filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendants WBS, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration) (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: denying 90 Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition. The Ex Parte Application is denied because it is deficient in at least the following respects. First, the filing thereof on the discovery cut-off of July 1, 2016, does not comport with the Scheduling Order both because the Ex Parte Application necessarily calls for a further deposition to take place after the discovery cut-off, and because any hearing thereon necessarily could not take place prior to the discovery cut-off. Second, the Ex Parte Application provides insufficient specificity regarding questions posed/ refused to be answered so as to enable the Court to assess whether, absent the foregoing procedural deficiency, it would otherwise have been appropriate to grant relief. See order for further details. (hr) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Robert Blotzer re Second Deposition of Robert Blotzer 90 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet of Drew H. Sherman ISO Opposition to Ex Parte)(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Robert Blotzer re Second Deposition of Robert Blotzer 90 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Robert Blotzer re Second Deposition of Robert Blotzer filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Shein)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave, 79 81 filed by Counter Claimant Juan Carlos Croucier, Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY/IMPROPERLY NOTICED MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: denying 66 Motion to Compel. As Plaintiff's Motion was not properly noticed for hearing on June 28, 2016, and in order to bring the matter into compliance with the Local Rules, this Court, on June 8, 2016, issued an order continuing the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to July 5, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. and set a briefing schedule consistent with Local Rules 7-9 and 7-10. Based upon the Court's further consideration of this matter, it is apparent that Plaintiff's Motion was untimely when filed because it could not properly have been noticed for hearing under the Local Rules and the District Judge's Scheduling Order for a date before the July 1, 2016 discovery cut-off. In light of the foregoing, the Court deems this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument, vacates the current July 5, 2016 hearing date, submits Plaintiff's Motion, and denies it without prejudice as untimely. See order for further details. (hr) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT JUAN CROCIERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF ROBERT BLOTZER (DOCKET NO. 82 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: On June 27, 2016, defendant Juan Croucier filed an Ex Parte Application to Compel the Deposition of Robert Blotzer ("Ex Parte Application"). On June 28, 2016, plaintiff filed an Opposition to the Ex Parte Application. Also on June 28, 2016, defendant filed a reply. Although counsel vehemently complain about, and cast aspersions against one another, the Court need not address or resolve such matters as it nonetheless appears from the parties' submissions that they essentially agree that the deposition in issue can go forward on June 30, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. To the extent the Ex Parte Application so requests, it is granted. Defendant shall forthwith serve an appropriate amended deposition notice. Robert Blotzer is ordered to appear for deposition on the foregoing date and time as reflected in the amended deposition notice. To the extent the Ex Parte Application requests any other relief, it is denied. (hr) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Robert Blotzer 82 filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth Freundlich, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Robert Blotzer 82 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Drew H. Sherman ISO Opposition to Ex Parte Motion to Compel)(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF HEARING ON (1) DEFENDANT JUAN CROUCIER'S MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM WBS, INC. ("DEFENDANT'S MOTION") (DOCKET NO. 63);(2) DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ("DEFENDANT'S REQUEST") (DOCKET NO. 64); AND (3) CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION; (2) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST; AND (3) DENYING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: See order for details. Tape #: C/S 06/27/16. (hr) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSE TO EXPARTE APPLICATION (DOCKET NO. 82 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: Absent a resolution of this matter between the parties - which the Court strongly encourages and the filing of a notice advising the Court of the same, plaintiff is ordered to file a response to the Ex Parte Application by 12:00 p.m. on Tuesday, June 28, 2016. Such response must reflect dates up to the current discovery cut-off on which plaintiff's counsel and Robert Blotzer are available for deposition. In the unlikely event that plaintiff's response reflects that there is/are no such date(s), the response should include declarations of plaintiff and Blotzer detailing such individuals' activities on each of the following dates: June 29, 2016, June 30, 2016, and July 1, 2016. (hr) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Robert Blotzer filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Shein, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave, 79 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintif's Motion for Reconsideration and Relief from an Order, # 2 Declaration of DHS ISO Plaintif's Motion for Reconsideration and Relief, # 3 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Relief) (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 06/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendant WBS, Inc., Robert Blotzer; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant Croucier Productions, Inc., Juan Carlos Croucier.(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Defendants' unopposed Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order and Leave to File Counterclaim 53 is GRANTED. Defendants shall file the counterclaim within ten days of the date of this Order. (vv) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the MOTION TO FILE COUNTERCLAIM OF JUAN CROUCIER FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS CROUCIER, CROUCIER PRODUCTIONS, INC. (Dkt. No. 53) 53 set for June 20, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (vv) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting 73 APPLICATION to Seal Document. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff's application to seal Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2. (hr) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT to Joint MOTION to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses from WBS, Inc. 63 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition in Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Production Responses and Sufficient Admissions 66 filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Shein, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT /Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Shein in Support of Supplemental Brief re APPLICATION to file document /Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Shein in Support of Supplemental Brief under seal 73 , Protective Order 62 filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2- Under Seal)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to file document /Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Shein in Support of Supplemental Brief under seal filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to Joint MOTION to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses from WBS, Inc. 63 Supplemental Brief filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Shein, # 2 Exhibit 1 & 2 TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) CONTINUING HEARING ON IMPROPERLY NOTICED MOTION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re: MOTION to Compel Production Responses and Sufficient Admissions 66 . As Plaintiff's Motion was not properly noticed for hearing on June 28, 2016, and in order to bring this matter into compliance with the Local Rules, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion is continued to July 5, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant's opposition is due on June 14, 2016. Plaintiff's reply is due on June 21, 2016. See order for details. (hr) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT A2 2nd Half to MOTION to Compel Production Responses and Sufficient Admissions 66 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT A2 1st Half to MOTION to Compel Production Responses and Sufficient Admissions 66 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT A1 to MOTION to Compel Production Responses and Sufficient Admissions 66 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Drew H. Sherman in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel MOTION to Compel Production Responses and Sufficient Admissions 66 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production Responses and Sufficient Admissions filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2016 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Compel)(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) CONTINUING HEARING ON IMPROPERLY NOTICED MOTION (DOCKET NO. 63 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Pursuant to Local Rule 37-3, a discovery motion accompanied by a joint stipulation is to be noticed for hearing on the presiding judge's regular motion day not earlier than twenty-one (21) days after its filing. As Defendant's Motion was not properly noticed for hearing on the current hearing date of June 20, 2016, and in order to bring this matter into compliance with the Local Rules, the hearing on Defendant's Motion is continued to June 27, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. In accordance with Local Rule 37-2.3, any supplemental memoranda are due by not later than June 13, 2016. (dml) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Joint MOTION to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses from WBS, Inc. 63 filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Compel Supplemental Discovery Responses from WBS, Inc. filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2016 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Joint Stipulation re Motion to Compel, # 2 Declaration of David Shein, Esq., # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian re Stipulation for Protective Order 61 . See order for details. (hr) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time is DENIED 55 . On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motion to File Counterclaim 53 is continued from June 6, 2016 to June 20, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. The fact discovery cutoff is extended to July 1, 2016. (lc) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Thomas J Hanrahan: Mediation held on May 3, 2016. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Hanrahan, Thomas) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Robert John Blotzer in support of opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Counterclaim of Juan Croucier; and Modification of Scheduling Orde 53 55 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the MOTION TO FILE COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY DEFENDANT JUAN CARLOS CROUCIER, CROUCIER PRODUCTIONS, INC. 47 set for May 16, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby VACATED and deemed MOOT. (lc) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Counterclaim of Juan Croucier; and Modification of Scheduling Orde 53 55 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Drew H. Sherman ISO Opposition to Ex Parte)(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Counterclaim of Juan Croucier; and Modification of Scheduling Orde 53 filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rob Hoffman, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Declaration of Jason Green, # 4 Proposed Order) (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Counterclaim of Juan Croucier; and Modification of Scheduling Orde 53 filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Counterclaim of Juan Croucier; and Modification of Scheduling Orde filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Juan Croucier, # 2 Declaration of Rob Hoffman, # 3 Declaration of Jason Green, # 4 Declaration of David Shein, Esq., # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Juan Croucier, # 6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Juan Croucier, # 7 Exhibit C to Declaration of Juan Croucier, # 8 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Rob Hoffman, # 9 Exhibit A - (Proposed) Counterclaim of Juan Croucier, # 10 Proposed Order) (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Tyler Mellos counsel for Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. Adding A. Tyler Mellos as counsel of record for WBS, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Attorney Anthony Tyler Mellos added to party WBS, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mellos, Anthony) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave, 47 filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to File Counterclaim; Declaration of Juan Croucier 47 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Drew H. Sherman ISO Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend)(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to File Counterclaim; Declaration of Juan Croucier 47 filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to File Counterclaim; Declaration of Juan Croucier filed by Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- (Proposed) Counterclaim, # 2 Declaration of Juan Croucier, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Proposed Order) (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M Doniger counsel for Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. Adding David R. Shein as counsel of record for Defendant Juan Croucier and Croucier Productions Inc for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Juan Croucier, Croucier Productions Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Kaiser, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Leave to to file First Amended Answer filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-- First Amended Answer, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kaiser, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson Pursuant to FRCP 16(b): Counsel must agree on date for the disclosure of expert witness reports pursuant to FRCP 26(a)2; LAST DAY TO JOIN OTHER PARTIES AND TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS : 3/11/16 ; FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF: 6/15/16; EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF: 8/31/16; LAST DAY TO FILE MOTIONS: 8/30/16; FINAL PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE : 1/9/17 11:00 AM; JURY TRIAL : 1/17/17 9:00 AM. (lc) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Assigned) - (ADR-2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 and Demand for Jury Trial filed by defendants Rob Hoffman, One Management.(Attorney Geronimo Perez added to party Rob Hoffman(pty:dft), Attorney Geronimo Perez added to party One Management(pty:dft))(Perez, Geronimo) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Duarte Authorized Person to Receive Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Rob Hoffman 24 , REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant One Management 23 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. The Return receipts on both defendants were addressed to Attention: Andrew Hunter, however the receipts were signed not by Andrew Hunter (a partner as stated in declaration in support). The signature is illegible ( Tessie Edarte?) and is not marked as an agent for service of process for either defendant. Also it is noted that the same return receipt no.7013-263000007995-8235 is used as proof for both defendants, no separate return receipt was found for Rob Hoffman. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (lc) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc., upon Defendant One Management served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andrew Hunter Partner in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc., upon Defendant Rob Hoffman served on 12/1/2015, answer due 12/22/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc., (Attorney Michael Jason Kaiser added to party Juan Carlos Croucier(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Jason Kaiser added to party Croucier Productions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kaiser, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc..(Attorney Kenneth D Freundlich added to party Juan Carlos Croucier(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth D Freundlich added to party Croucier Productions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Freundlich, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc., upon Defendant Croucier Productions, Inc. served on 10/12/2015, answer due 11/2/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mark Clement, Agent of Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc., upon Defendant Juan Carlos Croucier served on 10/9/2015, answer due 10/30/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Juan Croucier in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Juan Carlos Croucier, Croucier Productions, Inc., Rob Hoffman, One Management. (jp) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jp) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc., (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16451551 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff WBS, Inc.. (Attorney Drew Harris Sherman added to party WBS, Inc.(pty:pla))(Sherman, Drew) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?