USA v. Chilowitz
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-00080
District Judge John F. Keenan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 4:26 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Ira Chilowitz, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Pedro J. Batalla Jr. Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Pedro J. Batalla +1 718 585 2233 +1 718 585 8640 batalla.law@verizon.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Ira Chilowitz re: Defendant's application for early termination of the remaining period of probation. The Court has considered the factors set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3553(a) and finds that Chilowitz has not presented any grounds for relieving him of the obligation to complete his sentence. The application for early termination of probation is denied. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/17/2011)(ab) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Ira Chilowitz re 26 Judgment, in the amount of $27,325.00. Judgment satisfied on 10/20/09. (ja) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      JUDGMENT: As to Ira Chilowitz (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Probation: 3 Years on each count to run concurrently with each other. The above drug testing condition is suspended, based on the court's determination that the defendant poses a low risk of future substance abuse. The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. The defendant is to adhere to the Additional Probation Terms as indicated on page 2(a)of this document. The defendant is to pay an assessment fee of $325.00 as a lump sum payment due immediately. The defendant is to pay restitution in the amount of $27,000.00 payable to the Clerk, U.S. District Court, for disbursement to Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc. Restitution is to be paid in full by October 8,2009. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/8/2009)(dnd) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER: As to Ira Chilowitz, addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Peter J. Batalla Jr. dated 3/11/2009. re: I am writing on behalf of my client, Ira Chilowitz, who is scheduled to be sentenced On March 19,2009 before your honor. We respectfully request that the above matter be adjourned from March 19, 2009 to June 8, 2009 at 10:15 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. The sentencing is adjourned until June 8, 2009 at 10:15 a.m. So Ordered. As to Ira Chilowitz( Sentencing set for 6/8/2009 at 10:15 AM before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/11/2009)(dnd) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER as to Ira Chilowitz, addressed to Judge Keenan, from Peter I. Batalla, Jr., atty for the dft, dated 12/1/08, re: request permission for Mr. Chilowitz to travel to Knoxville, Tennessee, from 12/10/08 to 12/17/08. AUSA Joshua Klein does not have any objections to this request. -- Judge endorsed: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 12/4/08)(ja) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER as to Ira Chilowitz addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Peter J. Batalla, Jr. dated 7/2/08 Counsel requests permission for Mr. Chilowitz to travel to Maryland, from July 10, 2008 to July 15, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered.. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/7/08)(mme) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER as to Ira Chilowitz, addressed to Judge Keenan, from Peter J. Batalla, Jr., atty for dft, dated 5/1/08, re: request permission for Mr. Chilowitz to travel to Hersey, Pennsylvania from 7/29/08 to 8/1/08. AUSA Joshua Klein does not object to this request. -- Judge endorsed: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 5/5/08)(ja) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                ENDORSED LETTER as to Ira Chilowitz addressed to Judge Keenan from Peter J. Batalla, Jr dated 6/22/07 re: To request permission for Mr. Chilowitz to travel to Coopertown, NY from July 12, 2007 to July 15, 2007..JUDGE MEMO-ENDORSEMENT...Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/25/07)(jw) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Ira Chilowitz, addressed to Judge Keenan, from Peter J. Batalla, Jr., Atty for dft, dated 4/20/07, re: request permission for Mr. Chilowitz to travel to Tennessee for the Memorial Day weekend, from 5/25/07 to 5/31/07. AUSA Joshua Klein does not have any objections to this request. -- Judge endorsed: Application granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 4/23/07)(ja) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ira Chilowitz held on 1/31/07 before Judge John F. Keenan. (tro) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Ira Chilowitz, addressed to Judge Keenan, from Peter J. Batalla, Jr., dated 3/7/07, re: request permssion for Mr. Chilowitz to travel to La Vegas, Nevada from 3/23/07 to 3/26/07. AUSA Joshua Klein does not object to this request. -- Judge endorsed: Application granted. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/9/07)(ja) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ira Chilowitz held on 1/31/07 before Judge John F. Keenan. (tro) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Ira Chilowitz. (pr) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                            INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Ira Chilowitz (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (pr) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Ira Chilowitz. (pr) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                AFFIRMATION of Joshua Klein in Support Of the application for an extension of the order of continuance, filed by USA as to Ira Chilowitz. (ccu) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
                                  AFFIRMATION of Joshua Klein in Support Of the application for an extension of the order of continuance, filed by USA as to Ira Chilowitz. (ccu) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
                                    AFFIRMATION of Joshua Klein in Support Of the application for an extension of the order of continuance, filed by USA as to Ira Chilowitz. (ccu, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None
                                      AFFIRMATION of Joshua Klein in Support Of the application for an extension of the order of continuance, filed by USA as to Ira Chilowitz. (ccu, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None
                                        AFFIRMATION of Joseph V. DeMarco in Support Of the application for an extension of the order of continuance, filed by USA as to Ira Chilowitz. (ccu, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None
                                          AFFIRMATION of Joshua Klein in Support Of the application for an extension of the order of continuance, filed by USA as to Ira Chilowitz. (ccu, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Ira Chilowitz. Time excluded from 8/14/06 until 9/13/06. (Signed by Judge Douglas F. Eaton on 8/14/06)(ccu, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                              ADVICE OF PENALTIES AND SANCTIONS as to Ira Chilowitz. (dif, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                PRB APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Ira Chilowitz in amount of $ 100,000 PRB, Co-Signed by Deft's Wife; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Deft to be Released upon When Deft Executes the Bond; Remaining Conditions to be Met by 7/18/2006 (dif, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Attorney Peter Batalla. Jr. appearing for Ira Chilowitz. (dif, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/14/2006 as to Ira Chilowitz. (dif, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      COMPLAINT as to Ira Chilowitz (1). In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 371, 2314, 1030 (a) (2) (C) (Conspiracy to Engage in Interstate Transportation of Stolen Property; Unauthorized Computer Access) (Signed by Judge Henry B. Pitman ) (dif, ) [1:06-mj-01011-UA] (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 796 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?