Michali Toumazou, et al v. Turkish Republic Of Northern, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 14-7170

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 1:00 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 3240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207778120 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1593754] filed (without memorandum) that all orders of the district court on appeal be affirmed. (SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS) withholding issuance of the mandate. Before Judges: Henderson, Griffith and Kavanaugh. [14-7170]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207769615 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
    RESPONSE [1589237] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to order [1587985-2] [Service Date: 12/17/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207767335 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      PER CURIAM ORDER [1587985], on the court’s own motion, that appellants may file a written response to the December 10, 2015 oral argument of appellees, not to exceed 5 pages. The response is due by 4:00 p.m. on December 17, 2015. An audio recording of the December 10, 2015 oral argument in this case may be accessed in the section on oral arguments, audio recordings on the court’s website www.cadc.uscourts.gov. In addition to electronic filing, paper copies of the submission are to be hand delivered to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Henderson, Griffith and Kavanaugh. [14-7170]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207763392 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
        PER CURIAM ORDER [1585838] filed granting appellees' motion for divided oral argument [1585566-2] [14-7170]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207762826 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
          MOTION [1585566] filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Group, HSBC Holdings PLC and Turkish Republic of Northern Cyprus regarding oral argument attorneys per side (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/10/2015) [Service Date: 11/25/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Hughes, Paul)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207762596 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
            PER CURIAM ORDER [1585448] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 10 Minutes, Appellees - 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 12/03/2015 [14-7170]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207744849 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
              CLERK'S ORDER [1575794] filed scheduling oral argument on Thursday, 12/10/2015. [14-7170]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207717413 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1560824] by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC to motion concerning appendix deferral [1558782-2], motion for leave to adduce additional evidence [1558782-3], motion to extend time [1558782-4], motion to stay case [1558782-5] [Service Date: 07/02/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Hughes, Paul)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207714836 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE FILED [1559455] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to adopt motion [Service Date: 06/25/2015 ] [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207714037 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1559004] by Turkish Republic of Northern Cyprus to motion to adopt brief [1558042-2] [Service Date: 06/22/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [14-7170] (Saltzman, David)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207713652 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                      RELIEF ADDED--RELIEF REPLACED--MOTION filed [1558782] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to extend time to file brief and appendix (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/02/2015), to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/02/2015) [Service Date: 06/19/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170]--[Edited 07/02/2015 by LMC]--[Edited 06/22/2015 by JJA] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207713422 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE FILED [1558652] by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC to motion to extend time. [Service Date: 06/19/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Hughes, Paul)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207712744 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                          MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1558045] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou [Service Date: 06/18/2015 ] Length of Brief: 3012 words. [14-7170]--[Edited 06/18/2015 by JJA] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207712733 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                            MOTION filed [1558042] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to extend time to file reply brief. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/02/2015) [Service Date: 06/18/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170]--[Edited 06/18/2015 by JJA] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207707750 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1555403] granting appellants' unopposed motion to extend time and modify the briefing schedule [1554697-2], The final revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Reply Brief due 06/12/2015. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 06/19/2015. Final Briefs due 07/10/2015. [14-7170]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207706430 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1554697] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to extend time to file reply to 06/12/2015. Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207702976 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                  APPELLEE BRIEF [1552824] filed by Turkish Republic of Northern Cyprus [Service Date: 05/15/2015 ] Length of Brief: 12,274. [14-7170] (Saltzman, David)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207702596 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                    APPELLEE BRIEF [1552624] filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC [Service Date: 05/14/2015 ] Length of Brief: 4,750 Words. [14-7170] (Hughes, Paul)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207700382 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1551345] granting motion to amend the case caption [1539695-2]. Before Judges: Henderson, Kavanaugh and Wilkins. [14-7170]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207698124 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1550037] Upon consideration of appellees’ unopposed motion to preclude plaintiffs-appellants from filing additional revised opening briefs, to strike prior versions of that brief and for an extension of time, it is ORDERED that the motion be granted. The Clerk is directed to file appellants' brief [1548518-2] and to strike appellants' brief and errata [1546084-2], [1547578-2]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the following revised briefing schedule will now apply in this case: APPELLEES' Initial Brief due on 05/15/2015. APPELLANTS' Initial Reply Brief due 05/29/2015. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 06/05/2015. All Final Briefs due 06/19/2015. [14-7170]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207695955 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                          MOTION filed [1548921] by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC and Turkish Republic Of Northern Cyprus to Preclude Plaintiffs-Appellants from Filing Additional Revised Opening Briefs. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/07/2015), to strike the brief (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/07/2015), to extend time to file brief to 05/15/2015. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/07/2015) [Service Date: 04/23/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Hughes, Paul)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207695205 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                            MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1548518] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou [Service Date: 04/21/2015 ] [14-7170]--[Edited 04/22/2015 by JJA] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 01207689013 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1545158] granting motion to extend time [1545001-2], setting revised briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 04/06/2015. APPELLEE Brief due on 05/06/2015. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/20/2015. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 05/27/2015. APPELLANT Final Brief due 06/10/2015. APPELLEE Final Brief due on 06/10/2015. APPELLANT Final Reply Brief due 06/10/2015 [14-7170]
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207688715 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1545001] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to extend time to file brief to 04/06/2015. Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207685451 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY FILED [1543209] by Turkish Republic Of Northern Cyprus to response [Service Date: 03/19/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Saltzman, David)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207683879 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1542339] granting appellants' unopposed motion to extend time [1542017-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 03/30/2015. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/29/2015. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/13/2015. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 05/20/2015. Final Briefs due 06/03/2015. [14-7170]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207683404 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1542098] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to motion for other relief [1539695-2] [Service Date: 03/12/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207683258 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1542017] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to extend time to file brief to 03/30/2015. Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207679020 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION filed [1539695] by Turkish Republic Of Northern Cyprus For an Order Amending the Case Caption. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/12/2015) [Service Date: 02/26/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170]--[Edited 03/02/2015 by AY-Modified Service Date] (Saltzman, David)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207675465 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE FILED [1537642] by Turkish Republic Of Northern Cyprus to terminate attorney [Service Date: 02/13/2015 ] [14-7170] (Perles, Steven)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207672003 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                              CLERK'S ORDER filed [1535749] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 03/16/2015. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/15/2015. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 04/29/2015. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 05/06/2015. Final Briefs due 05/20/2015. [14-7170]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 01207665817 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1532512] granting motion to extend time [1524845-2] to file initial submissions. [14-7170]
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207654154 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1526129] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou [Service Date: 12/08/2014 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207654151 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1526128] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou [Service Date: 12/08/2014 ] [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 01207654148 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1526125] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou [Service Date: 12/08/2014 ] [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207654137 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        DOCKETING STATEMENT [1526122] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou [Service Date: 12/08/2014 ] [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207651810 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          EMERGENCY MOTION filed [1524845] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to extend time to file initial submissions to 12/08/2014. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/15/2014) [Service Date: 12/01/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207651742 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1524823] filed by Turkish Republic Of Northern Cyprus [Service Date: 12/01/2014 ] [14-7170] (Saltzman, David)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207651727 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1524818] filed by David S. Saltzman on behalf of Appellee Turkish Republic Of Northern Cyprus. [14-7170] (Saltzman, David)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207651324 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1524636] filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC [Service Date: 12/01/2014 ] [14-7170] (Ware, Michael)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207651318 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1524634] filed by Michael O. Ware and co-counsel Paul W. Hughes on behalf of Appellees HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC. [14-7170] (Ware, Michael)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207730010 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1567680] granting appellees' motion to strike appellants' reply brief based on court order. The Clerk is directed to note the docket accordingly. [1567618-2] [14-7170]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207729909 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION filed [1567618] by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Group, HSBC Holdings PLC and Turkish Republic of Northern Cyprus to strike the reply (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/27/2015) [Service Date: 08/13/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170] (Hughes, Paul)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 01207729082 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1567109] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou [Service Date: 08/10/2015 ] Length of Brief: 7138 words. [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207728630 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          CLERK'S ORDER filed [1566905] granting appellants' unopposed emergency motion to extend time to file appellants' final briefs [1566716-2], Appellants' final briefs are now due on August 10, 2015. [14-7170]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207728209 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            EMERGENCY UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1566716] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou to extend time to file final brief. [Service Date: 08/06/2015 ] Pages: 1-10. [14-7170]--[Edited 08/07/2015 by JJA] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 01207728174 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1566704] filed by Turkish Republic of Northern Cyprus [Service Date: 08/06/2015 ] Length of Brief: 12,467. [14-7170] (Saltzman, David)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207728058 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1566643] filed by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC [Service Date: 08/06/2015 ] Length of Brief: 4,750 Words. [14-7170] (Hughes, Paul)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207727815 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  APPENDIX [1566501] filed by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/06/2015 ] [14-7170] (Tsimpedes, Athan)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207725680 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1565373] denying motion for leave to file reply brief out of time [1558042-2]; denying motion to extend or stay the deadline for filing the final briefs and joint deferred appendix [1558782-4]. Before Judges: Henderson, Millett and Wilkins. [14-7170]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 01207690772
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207642002 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1519827] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/01/2014. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 12/01/2014. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/01/2014. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/01/2014. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/01/2014. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 12/01/2014. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/01/2014. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/01/2014. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/15/2014; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 12/01/2014. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/01/2014. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/01/2014. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/15/2014 [14-7170]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 01207641996 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1519824] by Nicolas Kantzilaris, Maroulla Tompazou and Michali Toumazou seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:09-cv-01967-PLF. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-7170]
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?