Gerskovich v. Iocco
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-07280
District Judge Richard M. Berman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 2:14 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alex Gershkovich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stecklow Cohen & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo Alex Gerskovich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WylieLaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wylie M. Stecklow +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 ecf@wylielaw.com
No Logo Alexander Gershkovich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alexander Gershkovich

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Gershkovich
v.
No Logo , a municipal entity The City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
Space Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Arresting Officer 10074, Defendant
No Logo Arresting Officer 2635, Defendant
No Logo Arresting Officer 719, Defendant
No Logo Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Arresting Officer Shield No. 719, Defendant
No Logo Arresting Officer Shielf No. 2635, Defendant
No Logo Captain Mark Iocco, Defendant
No Logo Chief of Department Joseph Esposito, Defendant
No Logo City of NY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a municipal entity Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo James McNamara, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Arresting Officer African-American Sergeant, Defendant
No Logo John Doe-Officers 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Esposito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Former NYPD Chief of Patrol Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Former NYPD Chief of Patrol Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo NYPD Sergeant Doe African-American Sergeant, Defendant
No Logo NYPD ASSISTANT CHIEF Thomas P. Purtell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo NYPD Captain Mark Iocco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo PO Daniel Cross, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo PO Ivan Bautista, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Commissioner Ray Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Ray, Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Steven Anger, Defendant
No Logo The City of New York , a municipal entity, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Thomas Purtell, Defendant
No Logo Defendants "Pre-Arraignment" John Doe Officers, All Defendants
No Logo Marisa Holmes (non-party), Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Adam Rothman +1 212 227 2980 rothman.jeffrey@gmail.com
No Logo OWS Media Group Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Hillgardner +1 718 657 0606 +1 718 657 5692 tjhillgardner@verizon.net
No Logo Ows Media Group, Inc., Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Hillgardner +1 718 657 0606 +1 718 657 5692 tjhillgardner@verizon.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331fa
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed with prejudice; as further set forth in this Order. Clerk to close this case. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/8/2017) (cf) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 191 Letter re: Adjourn 10/30/17 Conference filed by Alex Gershkovich. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to November 30, 2017 at 12:45 pm. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2017 at 12:45 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/27/2017) (clt) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10-27-17 re: Adjourn 10/30/17 Conference. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 189 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The settlement conference with principals is adjourned to Thursday, Sept. 28, at 3:30 p.m. A senior official from the Comptroller's office must be present. Settlement Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 03:30 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/12/2017) (cf) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Respectfully Requesting an Adjournment of the Settlement Conference Scheduled for September 19, 2017 addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated September 11, 2017. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Mark Iocco.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 185 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Respectfully Requesting an Adjournment of the Trial Scheduled for November 14, 2017 and of All Related Deadlines addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated Sep filed by Mark Iocco, a municipal entity The City of New York, Steven Anger. ENDORSEMENT: A settlement conference with principals is scheduled for Tuesday, Sept. 19, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A senior official from New York City's Comptroller's Office shall be present in person, and not by phone. (Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/11/2017) (cf) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated September 11, 2017 re: Respectfully Responding to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Request for an Adjournment of the Trial Date and All Related Deadlines. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Mark Iocco.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 09/08/2017 re: Opposition to Defense request to adjourn trial date. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Respectfully Requesting an Adjournment of the Trial Scheduled for November 14, 2017 and of All Related Deadlines addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated September 8, 2017. Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated August 1, 2017 re: Responding to and Opposing Plaintiff's Request for a Representative from the Comptroller's Office to Appear in Person at Any Settlement Conference. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Mark Iocco.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 183 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 letterCourt Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 08/01/2017 re: Require Defense Client to Appear at Aug 4 Conference. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying 178 Letter Motion for Conference; denying 180 Motion for Reconsideration. For the substantive reasons stated herein, and also because approval had not been granted to the City to file a motion for reconsideration, the motions for a pre-motion conference [# 178] and for reconsideration [#180] are denied. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/1/2017) (cf) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 180 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 171 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, . . Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Mark Iocco. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                            MOTION for Reconsideration re; 171 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, . Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Mark Iocco.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 letterCourt Filing
                              LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum dated July 27, 2017 re: defendants' request for a pre-motion conference regarding a motion for reconsideration. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 171 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Respectfully Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference to Discuss Defendants' Anticipated Motion for Reconsideration under Local Civil Rule 6.3 addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated July 27, 2017. Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Court Filing
                                  AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/25/2017) (cf) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 175 Letter, filed by Mark Iocco, Steven Anger, Thomas P. Purtell. ENDORSEMENT: Representative from the office of the Comptroller need not be present in Court, but should be on stand by, via telephone. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/24/2017) (cf) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated July 24, 2017 re: Respectfully Seeking Clarification as to the Court's Order that "Principals" Must Appear at the Settlement/Scheduling Conference. Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco, Thomas P. Purtell.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 173 re: Objecting to Request for Adjournment, denying 172 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: Settlement Conference will proceed as scheduled on July 25, 2017 at 9:00. Principals are required to appear. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/20/2017) (cf) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          COUNTER LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 07/19/2017 re: Objecting to Request for Adjournment. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Respectfully Requesting an Adjournment of the "Scheduling/Settlement" Conference Scheduled for July 25, 2017 addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated July 19, 2017. Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco, Thomas P. Purtell.(Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              DECISION & ORDER denying 139 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated herein above, Defendants' motion for summary judgment [#139] is denied. Plaintiff's cross-motion for partial summary judgment [#152] is also denied. A scheduling/settlement conference with principals is hereby scheduled for Tuesday, July 25, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/17/2017) (clt) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                COURT EXHIBIT A. (cf) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh dated July 12, 2017 re: Respectfully writing in response to Plaintiff's July 11, 2017, Letter to address the arguments raised therein.. Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco, Thomas P. Purtell.(Faddis, Hannah) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 07/11/2017 re: Request for Order re Personal Electronic Device (Laptop). Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Order re Personal Electronic Device)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq. dated July 11, 2017 re: the parties' respective motions for summary judgment. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER: Brief oral argument regarding Defendants' motion for summary judgment [# 139] is hereby scheduled for Thursday, July 13, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (Oral Argument set for 7/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/27/2017) (cf) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Joy Tolulope Anakhu terminated (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/22/2017) (cf) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            DECLARATION of Joy T. Anakhu in Support re: 163 MOTION for Joy T. Anakhu to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Joy T. Anakhu to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Brachah Goykadosh, on behalf of Defendants dated May 16, 2017 re: 160 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument regarding the parties' summary judgment motions addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum dated May 12, 2017. . Document filed by Mark Iocco, Thomas P. Purtell. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: granting 160 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. A date for oral argument will be further set by the Court. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/15/2017) (ap) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument regarding the parties' summary judgment motions addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum dated May 12, 2017. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brachah Goykadosh on behalf of Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Mark Iocco, Thomas P. Purtell. (Goykadosh, Brachah) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Robinson on behalf of Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell. (Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Mark Iocco. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            DECLARATION of Joy T. Anakhu, Supplemental Declaration in Support re: 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Mark Iocco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q)(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Mark Iocco. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 153 Letter filed by Alex Gershkovich. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff may re-file the Declaration. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/15/2017) (mro) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum dated March 10, 2017 re: mistake in the filing of summary judgment papers. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in support of motion for partial summary judgment and motion to strike. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO 140 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      DECLARATION of Wylie M. Stecklow in Opposition re: 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Scott A. Korenbaum in Opposition re: 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit)(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's motion papers due by 3/3; Defendants' reply due by 3/17. Replies due by 3/17/2017. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/24/2017) (cf) Modified on 2/24/2017 (cf). (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendants' motion for summary judgment addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq. dated February 23, 2017. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 2/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum dated 2/2/2017 re: Counsel for Plaintiff write to address defendants' contention, contained in the February 1, 2017 letter of Joy T. Anakhu, Esq., that "Plaintiff has offered no explanation as to why he failed to adhere to the briefing schedule already set by the Court and now attempts to disrupt the schedule and also burden the Court due to his unexplained failure. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff can raise all appropriate issues within the confines of his opposition to Defendants motion for S.J. (same schedule and same page limit). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/4/2017) Copies Sent Via ECF By Chambers. (js) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq. dated February 2, 2017 re: plaintiff's request to file a cross-motion for partial summary judgment. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Joy T. Anakhu dated February 1, 2017 re: Opposition to Plaintiff's Request to File a Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott A. Korenbaum dated February 1, 2017 re: permission to file a cross-motion for partial summary judgement. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Joy T. Anakhu in Support re: 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Steven Anger, Mark Iocco,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED AS FOLLOWS: 1. Plaintiff hereby dismisses, with prejudice, all claims against the following defendants: (1) Joseph Esposito; (2) Thomas Purtell; (3) James McNamara; (4) Raymond Kelly; and (5) Michael Bloomberg; 2. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, filed March 11, 2016, is deemed to contain the following claims against the following defendants: 1) False Arrest against defendants Iocco and Anger; 2) deprivation of fair trial against Iocco; 3) First Amendment claims against Iocco and Anger; and 4) municipal liability against the City of New York. All other claims are dismissed with prejudice. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED: On Consent. Ray Kelly, James McNamara (NYPD Deputy Chief), Thomas Purtell (NYPD Assistant Chief), Michael Bloomberg and Joseph Esposito (Former NYPD Chief of Patrol) terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/25/2017) (cf) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 136 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/28/2016) (cf) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew Lucas dated 12/23/2016. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 134 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference is adjourned to November 22, 2016 @ 9:30 a.m. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/22/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/9/2016) (cf) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference presently set for 11/15/16, addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew Lucas dated 11/4/2016. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott A. Korenbaum on behalf of Alex Gershkovich. (Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 129 Letter filed by Alex Gershkovich. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on Tuesday, November 15 @ 10 a.m. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/31/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER. Having considered Plaintiff's applications, and in light of the history of discovery in this case, with which this Court is well familiar, Plaintiff's application for additional discovery is denied, and as further specified and set forth in this Order. Plaintiff has made no showing that Defendants have refused to stipulate to the authenticity of the documents, if they are otherwise found admissible. Discovery in this action is closed. The following deadline(s) was terminated: Discovery Deadline. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 10/26/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 10/24/2016 re: 122 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document 121 Letter,, addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10-14-2016. Opposition to October 14, 2016 Letter, docket entry 121 . Document filed by Steven Anger, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie Stecklow dated 10/20/2016 re: Summary Judgment. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10-14-2016 re: 2 Discovery Depositions remaining. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Transcript of 10-11-16 Court Proceeding, # 2 Exhibit B 3 Supporting Depositions, # 3 Exhibit C 3 Criminal Complaints, # 4 Exhibit D Transcript pages from Cramer Trial September 2013, # 5 Exhibit E 3 ADA Data Sheets, # 6 Exhibit F 3 DANY Paralegal Communication History, # 7 Exhibit DANY Deposition Notice, # 8 Exhibit Letter of ADA Robin McCabe)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2016 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 122 Motion to Seal Document. Plaintiff seeks to file a letter with multiple exhibits that include certain documents that are sealed pursuant to New York Criminal Procedure Law 160.50. Plaintiff's counsel, after consulting with ECF help desk, filed the letter with certain exhibits in full (Exhibits A, D, G, H) and certain exhibits had a single page indicating this exhibit was FILED UNDER SEAL (Exhibits B, C, E, F). It is therefore ORDERED the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEAL Exhibits B, C, E, F of Plaintiff's letter dated October 14, 2016. (This resolves Dkt. 122.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 10/14/2016) (mro) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Defendants' Anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Joy T. Anakhu dated October 14, 2016. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION to Seal Document 121 Letter,, addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10-14-2016. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 127 Letter) - LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10-14-2016 re: 2 Discovery Depositions remaining. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Transcript of 10-11-16 Court Proceeding, # 2 Exhibit B 3 Supporting Depositions, # 3 Exhibit C 3 Criminal Complaints, # 4 Exhibit D Transcript of Cramer Trial September 2013, # 5 Exhibit E 3 DA Data Sheets, # 6 Exhibit F 3 DANY Paralegal Communication History, # 7 Exhibit G DANY Deposition Notice, # 8 Exhibit H Letter of ADA Robin McCabe)(Stecklow, Wylie) Modified on 10/18/2016 (db). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION: THE PARTIES AGREE that each and every claim against Defendants Cross and Bautista is hereby dismissed with prejudice from this litigation. These individuals are no longer defendants in this matter. (As further set forth in this Order.) Ivan Bautista and Daniel Cross terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/11/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 116 Letter Motion for Discovery. First, as to Defendants' application to compel the compliance of non-party Reuters America LLC with a subpoena, the Court notes that (a) the only proof of service submitted with Defendants' application (Dkt. 116-2) purports to evidence personal service, but twice misidentifies the non-party as "Renters America, LLC," casting some doubt on the validity of service; (b) Defendants' application was made prior to the return date on the subpoena, and was thus premature; (c) assuming service was made on October 4, 2016, as suggested by the purported proof of service, Defendants applied to this Court for relief only three days thereafter, which was not a reasonable amount time to expect compliance; and (d) Defendants well knew that discovery was scheduled to be completed in this case by October 11, 2016, and that no extensions were likely to be granted, calling into question why the information sought, if relevant and necessary to any defense, was not sought earlier. Second, as to Defendants' application to quash the subpoena served by Plaintiff on non-party Lower Manhattan Security Initiative, Defendants have not even demonstrated that they have standing to make such a motion, much less demonstrated that they are entitled to the relief sought on any ground enumerated in Rule 45(d)(3). This Court does note, however, that, if this non-party did not respond to the subpoena by its specified return date of October 10, 2016, this Court would not be inclined to entertain an application to compel compliance, for the same reason stated above at (d) -- i.e., Plaintiff, like Defendants, was well aware of the discovery deadline in this case, and was obliged to seek any necessary discovery sufficiently in advance of the deadline to allow for its completion. This Court sees no legitimate reason why either subpoena that has been placed before the Court could not have been served months ago, and thus sees no reason why the discovery period should be extended to allow for this non-party discovery to be completed. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 115 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10/07/2016 re: Close of Discovery and open items. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. ENDORSEMENT: We can discuss on Oct. 11 at the 11 a.m. conference. See the Court's remarks at the prior conference that it "w[ould] not allow any discovery to take place after [Oct. 11]." So ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/7/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10/10/2016 re: Reply to Lucas Letter Docket 116.. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (NYPD notice of demonstration, irrelevant POPS), # 2 Exhibit B No 240.20(05) in case)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Discovery Regarding Reuters Subp and LMSI Subp addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 10/7/2016. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reuters Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit B - Aff of Svc, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Reuters Subpoena, # 4 Exhibit D - LMSI Subpoena, # 5 Exhibit E - Conf. Transcript, # 6 Exhibit F - MV Cox Order and Ltr, # 7 Exhibit G - MV Cox Opp)(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 10/07/2016 re: Close of Discovery and open items. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 113 Letter filed by Alexander Gershkovich re: Joint Discovery Letter as required by Docket 112. ENDORSEMENT: While the parties are free to enter into discovery stipulations consistent with rule 29, all discovery is to be completed by 10/11/16, as made clear by Judge Berman and this Court. As for item #9, referenced herein, this Court does not understand Plaintiff to be seeking reconsideration by this letter, nor has this Court received an such request by any separate submission. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 10/11/2016.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 10/4/2016) (kko) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 09/30/2016 re: Joint Discovery Letter as required by Docket 112. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Once again, the parties have written a series of letters to this Court, updating the Court on their continuing meet-and-confer efforts to resolve various disputes, and again raising a number of disputes as to which, it seems, they have not been able to reach accord. (See Dkts. 106-09.) This Court makes no ruling as to any dispute where it appears that counsel are still working together to reach resolution. As to the other issues now placed before this Court, the parties' disputes are resolved as further set forth in this order. All parties are directed to comply with the discovery directives of this Order no later than September 30, 2016. By that same date, counsel are directed to submit a single, joint status letter to this Court, no longer than three pages, listing any remaining discovery disputes. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 9/20/2016) (cla) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 8/10/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: confererce held on 8/10/2016 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 09/14/2016 re: City Allegation re NYC Planning Commission. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow re: 09/14/2016. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              COUNTER LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Lamar D. Winslow dated September 12, 2016 re: Plaintiff's Discovery Letter dated September 9, 2016. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity.(Winslow, Lamar) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 09/06/2016 re: Discovery Update. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. With respect to the potential witnesses who were arrested at or about the same time as Plaintiff's arrest: a. Under the protocol implemented by this Court, the responses of these witnesses, with regard to whether they are willing to have their identities disclosed to Plaintiff's counsel, were to be directed to Defendants' counsel, and not to the Court. It appears from Plaintiff's recent submissions that Defendants' counsel has not informed Plaintiff as to whether it received any such responses. Indeed, it appears that Defendants' counsel may not even have informed Plaintiff's counsel that three of the letters (all of which were initially mailed out from the Court) were returned to the Court as undeliverable-a fact my Chambers communicated to Defendants' counsel by voicemail message on July 13, 2016, with instructions to relay that information to Plaintiff's counsel. Given that the letters sent by the Court to the witnesses stated that, if a witness did not return the consent form within two weeks, then the Court would assume that the witness had no objection to the disclosure of his or her identity (see Dkt. 80), and given that the two weeks have now passed, Defendants' counsel is directed to provide Plaintiff's counsel immediately with the names of all individuals who either expressly consented to disclosure or who did not respond, unless their letters were returned in the mail as undeliverable. b. Plaintiff's request that this Court "so order" the subpoena directed to the Office of the District Attorney for New York County, for the production of the criminal complaints against the witnesses, is DENIED, in light of this Court's prior rulings regarding the important privacy interests protected by Section 160.50, as well as the fact that Plaintiff has not demonstrated the relevance of these criminal complaints to his claims. 2. Defendants' request to preclude Plaintiff from noticing any further depositions of any defendant in this action is DENIED. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks to depose any other defendant, however, he should notice such deposition promptly, to ensure that any deposition can be completed prior to the close of the discovery period. 3. The motion of non-party OWS Media Group Inc. to quash the subpoena served upon it is GRANTED, on the grounds that this entity apparently did not exist on the date of Plaintiff's arrest and that its counsel has represented to the Court that it is not in possession of any media from that date. 4. The parties are directed to contact this Court's Chambers to schedule a telephone conference to address the remaining discovery disputes raised by the parties' letters, specifically the disputes raised by Plaintiff regarding the adequacy of Defendants' responses to interrogatories and requests for admission. The Court expects, however, that the parties will confer fully, in good faith, to attempt to resolve these remaining disputes prior to any conference that is scheduled. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 8/25/2016) (mro) Modified on 8/29/2016 (mro). (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER terminating 99 Letter Motion to Compel, based on Dkt. 101 (counsel withdrawing letter). (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Letter Motion for Conference, To Quash Subpoena, and for Sanctions. The request for a conference is granted, nunc pro tunc to 8/3/16 (conference held that date). The motion to quash the subpoena directed to non-party witness Marisa Holmes is denied as moot, in light of the letter from Defendants' counsel, dated 8/12/16 (Dkt. 100), which seemingly indicates that Defendants are no longer seeking enforcement of the subpoena directed to this witness. This Court does not reach Defendants' current request to preclude Ms. Holmes as a fact witness (see id.), in light of the fact that Plaintiff has, to date, given no indication that he seeks to call her as a witness at trial, or to use any statement from her either in support of, or in opposition to, any summary judgment motion. If Plaintiff does seek to offer any testimony or statement by Ms. Holmes in support of his claims, then Plaintiff should inform Defendants of this promptly, so that her deposition can be taken in advance of the discovery cut-off. Ms. Holmes' request for sanctions against Defendants for service of the subpoena upon her is denied, for the reasons stated on the record at the 8/3/16 conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 7/29/2016 re: 7/29/16 Letter Motion to Compel, refiled as a Letter per the Court's August 10, 2016 Instructions on ECF. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Thomas J. Hillgardner, Esq. dated August 16, 2016 re: 90 LETTER MOTION to Compel OWS Media Group, Inc., to comply with subpoena issued 6/23/16 addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 7/29/2016. . Document filed by OWS Media Group Inc.. (Hillgardner, Thomas) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Lamar D. Winslow dated August 12, 2016 re: Plaintiff's Trio of Discovery Letters filed on August 9,2016. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity.(Winslow, Lamar) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            COUNTER LETTER MOTION to Compel OWS Media Group Inc. to Produce Docs / Appear for Deposition (in opposition to Letter Motion (Dkt. # 90)) addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Thomas J. Hillgardner, Esq. dated August 4, 2016. Document filed by OWS Media Group Inc., Ows Media Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Copy of Articles of Incorporation of OWS Media Group, Inc.)(Hillgardner, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 97 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. No later than 8/12/16, Defendant's counsel is directed to advise Mr. Rothman, as counsel for non-party Marisa Holmes, as to whether Defendant will withdraw the subpoena on Ms. Holmes in light of her declaration. If, by the close of business on 8/12, the subpoena is not withdrawn or the matter otherwise resolved through good-faith conference, then the further submission by Mr. Rothman shall be made by 8/19/16. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Jeffrey A. Rothman dated 8/10/16. Document filed by Marisa Holmes (non-party).(Rothman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie Stecklow dated 08-09-2016 re: Discovery Issues related to Privately Owned Public Space designation of 4 New York Plaza. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Relevant POPS Interrogatories and Responses, # 2 Exhibit B Relevant POPS Requests for Admissions, # 3 Exhibit C Letter from WMS to LW of 07-22-2016)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie Stecklow dated 08-09-2016 re: Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Defendants responses to Plaintiffs June 2, 2016 Interrogatories and Requests For Admission)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie Stecklow dated 08-09-2016 re: Discovery Update. Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Subpoena and AOS of James Klein, # 2 Exhibit B 30(b)(6) deposition notice of 08-03-16, # 3 Exhibit C Deposition of Martin Stolar 06-24-2016, # 4 Exhibit D Proposed DANY Subpoena for Court)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Matthew Flamm dated August 9, 2016 re: 90 LETTER MOTION to Compel OWS Media Group, Inc., to comply with subpoena issued 6/23/16 addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 7/29/2016. . Document filed by OWS Media Group Inc.. (Flamm, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Discovery Conference proceeding held on 08/03/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Discovery Conference held on 8/3/2016 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2016.(ca) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Compel OWS Media Group, Inc., to comply with subpoena issued 6/23/16 addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 7/29/2016. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 7/28/2016 re: 88 LETTER MOTION for Conference Letter motion to quash subpoena issued to non-party Marisa Holmes, and for sanctions addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Jeffrey A. Rothman dated 7/26/16. . Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Conference Letter motion to quash subpoena issued to non-party Marisa Holmes, and for sanctions addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Jeffrey A. Rothman dated 7/26/16. Document filed by Marisa Holmes (non-party). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Rothman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 86 Letter filed by Alex Gerskovich. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned until 8/10/16 @ 9:30. (Status Conference set for 8/10/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/15/2016) (cf) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 07/14/2016 re: Adjourn 7/28/16 conf to 8/1/16. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 06/16/2016 re: Update re discovery order Docket #68. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 83 Letter filed by Alex Gershkovich. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. 6/16/16 status conference is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/15/2016) (cf) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 06/15/2016 re: Cancellation of June 16, 2016 conference. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 52 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 78 Letter, filed by Mark Iocco,, a municipal entity The City of New York, City of NY, Thomas Purtell, Joseph Esposito, Daniel Cross, James McNamara, The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Thomas P. Purtell. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/31/2016) (cf) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: By Order dated May 9, 2016, this Court directed the parties to this action to submit a joint proposal for a protocol by which certain potential witnesses (whose arrest records are sealed pursuant to Section 160.50 of the New York Criminal Procedure Law) can be notified of the possible disclosure of their identities to Plaintiff's attorneys and can express a preference for non-disclosure. (Dkt. 68.) When the parties were unable to agree on a joint proposal, each side submitted its own proposed protocol. (Dkt. 74.) Having reviewed the parties' submissions, this Court proposes to contact the potential non-party witnesses using the language contained in the letter attached to this Order. The parties are directed to inform this Court of any objections to the Court's proposed language by June 3, 2016. Defendants' counsel is also directed to provide this Court with the names and contact information of the potential witnesses by that same date. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 5/31/2016) (kl) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 75 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. To the extent the City has not complied with paragraph 3 of this Court's Order of 5/9/16 (Dkt. 68), it is directed to do so without further delay. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew Lucas dated 5/27/2016 re: Stipulation and proposed order withdrawing certain claims. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              THIRD LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from David A. Thompson dated 05/20/2016 re: Docket #68 CPL 160.50 Protocol. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                COUNTER LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from David A. Thompson dated 05/19/2016 re: Defendants' Letter of Dkt 75 re 30b6. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to provide 30(b)(6) witness addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Lamar D. Winslow dated May 17, 2016. Document filed by, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Winslow, Lamar) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 05/17/2016 re: Joint Letter re Docket #68 Order. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiff's Protocol Letter Overview, # 2 Exhibit 1(A): Plaintiff's Suggested Protocol Letter - Plaintiff to WItness, # 3 Exhibit 1(B): Plaintiff's Suggested Protocol Letter - Court to WItness, # 4 Exhibit 2: Defendants' Suggested Protocol Letter - Court to Witness)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 05/16/2016 re: Joint Letter re Docket #68 Order. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER terminating 70 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Conference scheduled for 5/25/16 @11:30 am. Parties are to engage in good-faith settlement negotiations prior to conference. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/16/2016) (mro) Modified on 5/16/2016 (mro). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 05/13/2016 re: Defendants' Rule 12 Letter of 05/12/2016. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Leave to File R.12 Motion and request for a briefing schedule, addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew Lucas dated 5/12/16. Document filed by The City of New York, a municipal entity, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Wylie M. Stecklow dated May 10, 2016 re: Order of Redline in Docket # 62 and call-in number for conference of 5/12/16. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Second Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2: Redlined Version comparing Initial Complaint to Second Proposed Am. Complaint)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On April 12, 2016, this Court received a letter from Plaintiff's counsel regarding certain discovery disputes between the parties. (Dkt. 66.) By letter dated April 15, 2016, Defendants set out their position with respect to those disputes. (Dkt. 67.) As it then appeared to the Court that some of the issues raised in the parties' submissions may have been mooted, my Chambers contacted Plaintiff's counsel on April 26, 2016, to clarify which issues still remained outstanding. This Court having now reviewed and considered the parties' arguments with respect to what the Court understands to be the remaining issues, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: Defendants are directed to answer Plaintiff's Interrogatories Nos. 14 and 15 to the extent of their knowledge, consistent with Rule 33 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If, after conducting a reasonable investigation, Defendants are unable to answer these interrogatories in whole or in part, then, with respect to each sub-part in question, Defendants should state that they have made reasonable inquiry and assert lack of knowledge as the reason for their inability to answer. Given that Plaintiff seeks identifying information for only eight individuals who were arrested on the same date and at the same approximate location as Plaintiff, and that each of these arrestees may possess knowledge relevant to factual issues being disputed in this action, this Court finds that the privilege created by Section 160.50 of the New York Criminal Procedure Law "must yield...[to the] federal interest in presenting relevant information to a trier of fact." MacNamara v. City of New York, No. 04cv9612 (JCF), 2006 WL 3298911, at *2 (S.D.N.Y Nov. 13, 2006) (quoting United States v. One Parcel of Property at 31-33 York Street, 930 F.2d 139, 141 (2d Cir. 1991)). Nonetheless, in light of the policy underlying Section 160.50 and the need to protect the privacy interests of non-parties, this Court will first allow the non-party arrestees to be heard as to whether they have any objection to their identities being disclosed to Plaintiff or his counsel. See Spiegler v. City of New York, Nos. 04cv1066, 04cv1097 (RWS) (MHD), 2005 WL 2676671, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 2005); Bryant v. City of New York, No. 99cv11237, 2000 WL 1877082, at *2-3 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 27, 2000). Accordingly, the parties are directed to submit a joint proposal for a protocol by which these witnesses can be informed of the potential disclosure of their identities and can express a preference for non-disclosure. Should the parties conclude that the best approach would be for the Court to send its own letter to the witnesses, then the parties should submit jointly proposed language for such a letter. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 5/9/2016) (mro) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTER LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 4/15/16 re: Plaintiff's 4/12/16 Letter. Document filed by Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 4-12-2016 re: Discovery Update. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: 2 pages of Mass Arrest Report - Redacted, # 2 Exhibit 2: FRCP 30(b)(6) notice dated 3-15-16, # 3 Exhibit 3:case law regarding DANY documents)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The conference originally scheduled for Tuesday, April 12, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. is rescheduled for Tuesday, April 12, 2016 at 3:00p.m. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/12/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/11/2016) (cf) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Supboena Duces Tecum as to 30b6 NY DA Office document(s): See Exhibit A on May 9, 2016 at 2:00pm.Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 03/31/2016 re: Docket entry 61. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 8/6/2012 letter to NYPD from National Press Photographers Association)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 49 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss, dated February 22, 2016 [#49], is dismissed as moot. (See Letter, dated March 25, 2016, at 1.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/28/2016) (cf) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 60 Letter Motion for Conference; denying 60 Letter Motion to Stay. Plaintiff to respond by 3/31/16. Conference scheduled for 4/12/16 @ 10:00 and Discovery is NOT stayed in the interim. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/12/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/28/2016) (cf) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b) addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Joy T. Anakhu dated March 25, 2016., LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Outcome on 12(b) Motion addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Joy T. Anakhu dated March 25, 2016. Document filed by Steven Anger, Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell,, a municipal entity The City of New York.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. due to filing of Amended Complaint as of right pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(1)(B). Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 57 Letter filed by Alex Gershkovich. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Pleading to be accepted as of the date originally submited. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/21/2016) (cf) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 03/17/2016 re: FRCP 15. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 55 Amended Complaint 1 Complaint, against The City of New York, a municipal entity, Sergeant Doe African-American Sergeant, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. Related document: 55 Amended Complaint filed by Alexander Gershkovich, 1 Complaint, filed by Alex Gerskovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) Modified on 3/17/2016 (moh). (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 52 Amended Complaint,, 1 Complaint, 54 Amended Complaint,, against Alex Gershkovich with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich. Related document: 52 Amended Complaint,, filed by Alexander Gershkovich, Alex Gershkovich, 1 Complaint, filed by Alex Gerskovich, 54 Amended Complaint,, filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) Modified on 3/16/2016 (pc). (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 52 Amended Complaint 1 Complaint, against John Doe Arresting Officer African-American Sergeant, Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, City of NY, Daniel Cross, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alex Gershkovich. Related document: 52 Amended Complaint filed by Alexander Gershkovich, Alex Gershkovich, 1 Complaint, filed by Alex Gerskovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) Modified on 3/15/2016 (moh). (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 03/11/2016 re: Docket #52, filing of Amended Pleading as of Right. Document filed by Alex Gershkovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against John Doe Arresting Officer African-American Sergeant, Steven Anger, Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Alex Gerskovich, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Alexander Gershkovich, Alex Gershkovich. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Alex Gerskovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) Modified on 3/14/2016 (pc). (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. . Document filed by Steven Anger, Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Joy T. Anakhu in Support re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12.. Document filed by Steven Anger, Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Document filed by Steven Anger, Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074, Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: This Court has now received letters from both counsel, dated January 25 and 26, 2016 (Dkts. 46, 47), disagreeing as to the nature of the rulings made by Judge Berman at the January 19 conference; essentially accusing one another of failing to confer in good faith with respect to discovery disputes; and arguing as to whether the deadline for service of initial document requests and interrogatories should be extended for Plaintiff alone, or for all parties. Having reviewed and considered the parties' letters, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Absent stipulation by the parties otherwise, all parties, to the extent they have not already done so, shall serve their initial document requests and interrogatories no later than February 3, 2016. In their initial interrogatories, the parties may, as reasonable, seek information outside the scope of Local Civil Rule 33.3(a). 2. The discovery cut-off (for all discovery, including Monell discovery) remains at April 16, 2016. (See Dkt. 33.) The parties are free to stipulate to interim discovery deadlines, and are encouraged to work together on developing, for their own use, a detailed discovery plan that will enable them to complete both paper discovery and all depositions by April 16. Despite the potential burden of Monell discovery, counsel are cautioned that this Court will not entertain any request to extend the April 16 deadline that is not supported by a showing that counsel have made genuine and concerted efforts to complete all discovery by that date. 3. On a going-forward basis, this Court expects counsel for all parties to engage in good-faith cooperation with respect to discovery scheduling, and to make good-faith efforts to resolve any discovery disputes. The particular scheduling dispute that has been raised before this Court by the parties' recent letters borders on the frivolous and is certainly not the type of dispute that should have required judicial intervention. Counsel are cautioned that the Court expects improved cooperation in the future. 4. This Court will hold a telephonic case-management conference with counsel on March 3, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel are directed jointly to initiate a conference call to my Chambers at that time. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/3/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 2/1/2016) (mro) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 1/26/2016 re: Plaintiff's 1/25/16 Letter. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 01/25/2016 re: Discovery / Settlement Update and Extension Request. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635 served on 1/21/2016, answer due 2/11/2016. Service was accepted by PO Dicero #1466. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 42 Letter Motion to Adjourn Settlement Conference. After reviewing counsel's submissions with respect to potential settlement, and holding telephonic settlement conferences with the parties on 1/6/16 and 1/7/16, the Court is in agreement that an in-person settlement conference at this time would not be productive. Counsel are directed to provide this Court with a status letter regarding the prospects for settlement following their pre-motion conference before Judge Berman, scheduled for 1/19/16, and their service of initial document requests and interrogatories. This Court is also scheduling a telephonic case-management conference for 3/3/16 at 10:00 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Wylie Stecklow dated 01/06/2015 re: Reply to 12/31/15 letter of Defense seeking to cancel Settlement Conference. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Crim Complaint of Iocco against Gershkovich)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference - Tentative Settlement Conference set for January 7, 2016, addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Andrew Lucas dated 12/31/2015. Document filed by Steven Anger, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 40 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Extension granted until 1/8/16. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/23/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with December 21, 2015 order, addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew Lucas dated 12/23/2015. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 38 LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie Stecklow dated 12-18-2015 re: Pre-Motion Letter Requesting Leave seeking an extension of time to Serve 2 Defendants. ENDORSEMENT: PL's applications granted. NYC to supply names & addresses of 2 defs by 12/25/15. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/21/2015) (adc) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Wylie Stecklow dated 12-18-2015 re: Pre-Motion Letter Re Service. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074 served on 12/16/2015, answer due 1/6/2016. Service was accepted by PO Del-LLANO. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 35 Letter Motion for Conference. We can discuss @ 1/19/16 conference. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/16/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Andrew Lucas dated December 15, 2015. Document filed by City of NY.(Winslow, Lamar) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/19/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Parties do not consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Proceeding under SDNY Plan except for mediation which will occur before J. Freeman. Status of settlement discussions January 19, 2016 @ 10:00 am with principals. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2016. Discovery due by 4/16/2016. Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/19/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joseph Lucas on behalf of City of NY. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. City of NY served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Document Clerk NYC Law Dept. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Document Clerk NYC Law Dept. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ray Kelly served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Document Clerk NYC Law Dept. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Steven Anger served on 9/21/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by Desk Officer Molina #10137. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Thomas Purtell served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. James McNamara served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Mark Iocco served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by PAA Calvin Jeetoo. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Joseph Esposito served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Purtell. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James McNamara. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ray Kelly. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Iocco. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Esposito. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Bloomberg. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Anger. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arresting Officer Shield No. 10074. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arresting Officer Shield No. 2635. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arresting Officer Shield No. 719. (pc) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief Purtell, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief McNamara, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Former Commissioner Kelly, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Captain Iocco, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Former Chief Esposito, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Bloomberg, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief Anger, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arresting Officer #10074, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arresting Officer #2635, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arresting Officer #719, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Wylie M. Stecklow dated 09/16/2015 re: Related Case to Packard. Document filed by Alex Gerskovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Arresting Officer 10074, Arresting Officer 2635, Arresting Officer 719, John Doe Arresting Officer African-American Sergeant, Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, City of NY, John Doe-Officers 1-10, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas Purtell. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11390750)Document filed by Alex Gerskovich.(Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 293 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?