ORDER granting 264 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to submit settlement papers with respect to claims against defendants SONY, Woodridge, TVM, and NBCUniversal is extended to November 22, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis)(Text Only Order) (Francis, James) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for preliminary settlement approval and status of the parties' efforts to finalize settlement documents addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from James Vagnini dated 10/31/2016. Document filed by Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer.(Vagnini, James) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for limited purpose of Approval of settlement and entry of final judgment thereon with respect to Plaintiffs' claims against Warner Bros. Defendants only. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/28/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
ORDER denying 261 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application DENIED. Plaintiffs and Defendants Sony Pictures Television Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc., TVM Productions, Inc. and NBCUniversal have been referred to Judge Francis for "[a]pproval of settlement and entry of final judgment" (Dkt. Nos. 227, 247, 259). Their motion to extend the deadline to file a motion for preliminary settlement approval must be sent to Judge Francis. Plaintiffs and Warner Bros. Defendants state that they intend to file their motion for preliminary settlement approval with Judge Francis but have not sought an order of reference to Judge Francis for settlement or any other purpose. The Court interprets their statement as an application for referral like those quoted above. The application is granted and the referral will be separately issued. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/28/2016) (tn) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for preliminary approval of a settlement and status of the parties' efforts to finalize the settlement documents addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from James Vagnini dated 10/26/2016. Document filed by Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer.(Vagnini, James) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for limited purpose of approval of settlement and entry of final judgment thereon with respect to Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Woodridge Productions, Inc. only. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/6/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Seth E. Pierce and Matthew Berman dated October 6, 2016 re: Request for Referral to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Order of Reference to a Magistrate Judge)(Pierce, Seth) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
ORDER granting 251 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File: Application GRANTED. Any motion for preliminary approval of a settlement shall be filed by October 31, 2016. If no motion has been filed by that date, the parties shall file a joint letter including a proposed schedule for completion of individual fact discovery with respect to the named and opt-in plaintiffs. The parties must notify the Court promptly if they intend to seek an order of reference to Judge Francis for the purpose of approving any settlement. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (106 in 1:16-cv-01409-JCF) Letter filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC, (249 in 1:15-cv-07206-LGS) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Preliminary Approval addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Seth E. Pierce and Robert J. Valli dated September 29, 2016 filed by Woodridge Productions, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, Inc. (We anticipate being able to submit a proposed settlement agreement for preliminary approval to Your Honor by October 28, 2016.) ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/30/2016) (ama) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 242 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED in part. The parties shall file a joint letter apprising the Court of the status of any motion seeking preliminary approval of a settlement by October 31, 2016. If no motion has been filed by that date, the parties must include in the joint letter a proposed schedule for completion of individual fact discovery with respect to the named and opt-in plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/30/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion Seeking Preliminary Approval of a Settlement and Certification of a Settlement Class addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christopher A. Parlo dated September 30, 2016. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc..(Parlo, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
ORDER granting 249 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File: Application GRANTED. Any motion for preliminary approval of a settlement shall be filed by October 31, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Preliminary Approval addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Seth E. Pierce and Robert J. Valli dated September 29, 2016. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Pierce, Seth) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Liza M. Velazquez and James Vagnini dated September 29, 2016 re: status by all Plaintiffs and Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Document filed by NBC Universal Media LLC.(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for CONSENT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 636(c) FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF Approval of settlement and entry of final judgment thereon with respect to Plaintiff's claims only against Defendant TVM Productions, Inc.. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/23/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Seth E. Pierce and Matthew Berman dated September 23, 2016 re: Request for a Referral to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV. Document filed by TVM Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Order of Reference to a Magistrate Judge)(Pierce, Seth) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
ORDER granting 240 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application GRANTED. As to the settlements between Plaintiffs and Defendants Warner Bros. Television and Bonanza Productions Inc., the settling parties shall file motions for preliminary approval by September 30, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the April 20, 2016 Scheduling Order Deadlines by Plaintiffs and NBCUniversal Media, LLC addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez and James Vagnini dated September 1, 2016. Document filed by NBC Universal Media LLC.(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
ORDER granting 239 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application GRANTED. As to the settlements between Plaintiffs and Defendants TVM Productions, Inc., Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Woodridge Productions, Inc., the settling parties shall file motions for preliminary approval by September 30, 2016 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion Seeking Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Certification of a Settlement Class addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christopher A. Parlo dated August 31, 2016. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc..(Parlo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Motions for Preliminary Approval addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Matthew L. Berman and Seth E. Pierce dated August 31, 2016. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., TVM Productions, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Pierce, Seth) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Matthew L. Berman dated August 12, 2016 re: Status by Plaintiffs and Defendants. Document filed by Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer.(Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Matthew L. Berman dated August 12, 2016 re: Status Update. Document filed by Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer.(Vagnini, James) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for limited purpose of approval of settlement and entry of final judgment with respect to Plaintiffs' claims only against Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/14/2016) (kko) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
STIPULATION RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR SONY PICTURES TELEVISION INC. AND WOODRIDGE PRODUCTIONS, INC.: NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by Sony, Woodridge, Proskauer and MSK that MSK be substituted as counsel for Sony and Woodridge upon the order of this Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Edna Doris Guerrasio, Elise Michelle Bloom and Rachel S. Philion as counsel for Woodridge Productions, Inc. and Edna Doris Guerrasio and Elise Michelle Bloom as counsel for Sony Pictures Television, Inc.; and substitute David B. Gordon and Seth E. Pierce as counsel for Defendants Woodridge Productions, Inc. and Sony Pictures Television, Inc. SO ORDERED. Attorney David B. Gordon, Seth E. Pierce for Sony Pictures Television, Inc., David B. Gordon, Seth E. Pierce for Woodridge Productions, Inc. added. Attorney Rachel S Philion; Elise Michelle Bloom and Edna Doris Guerrasio terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/14/2016) (kko) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 224 Letter, filed by NBC Universal Media LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs and NBCUniversal shall submit a separate notice, consent and reference form in the Leach action by July 15, 2016, to be signed only by Plaintiffs and NBCUniversal. A separate referral order will be issued upon the Court's receipt of the form. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/13/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez and James Vagnini dated July 12, 2016 re: status by all Plaintiffs and Defendant NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Document filed by NBC Universal Media LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge)(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edna Doris Guerrasio on behalf of Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Guerrasio, Edna) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that all parties shall submit a single joint status letter by August 12, 2016. In addition to the items listed in Individual Rule IV.A.2., the letter shall provide an update of the various ongoing mediations. It is further ORDERED that, if Plaintiffs reach a settlement with any individual defendant before August 12, 2016, the settling parties shall jointly inform the Court by filing a letter on ECF within three days of reaching a settlement in principle. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the Sony Defendants' motion to sever is adjourned sine die. It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to the April 20, 2016, scheduling order, any motion seeking preliminary approval of a settlement and certification of a settlement class shall be filed by September 1, 2016. It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to the April 20, 2016, scheduling order, individual fact discovery with respect to the named and opt-in plaintiffs shall be completed by September 30, 2016. (Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2016. Motions due by 9/1/2016.) The following deadline(s) was terminated: Response Deadline. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/2/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elise M. Bloom dated 6/1/16 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burns, Jason) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Seth E. Pierce and James Vagnini dated June 1, 2016 re: Status Update by Plaintiffs and TVM Productions, Inc.. Document filed by TVM Productions, Inc..(Pierce, Seth) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
DECLARATION of EDWARD LAMMI in Support re: 203 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims Against Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Woodridge Productions, Inc... Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
DECLARATION of ELISE M. BLOOM in Support re: 203 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims Against Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Woodridge Productions, Inc... Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kurt B. Ford)(Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 203 MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims Against Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Woodridge Productions, Inc.. . Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
MOTION to Sever Plaintiffs' Claims Against Sony Pictures Television Inc. and Woodridge Productions, Inc.. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez and James Vagnini dated June 1, 2016 re: Status by Plaintiffs and NBC Universal Media LLC. Document filed by NBC Universal Media LLC.(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 198 Letter, filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiffs and Defendants Warner Bros. Television and Bonanza Productions Inc. shall exchange initial disclosures by May 31, 2016. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/12/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jason D. Burns dated May 12, 2016 re: requesting that the Court so-order the parties agreed-upon May 31, 2016 deadline for Warner Bros. and Bonanza to exchange initial disclosures. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc..(Burns, Jason) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez, Seth E. Pierce, James Vagnini, Amanda N. Slatin, Elise M. Bloom dated May 12, 2016 re: Status by All Parties. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., NBC Universal Media, LLC, Sony Pictures Television, Inc., TVM Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
ANSWER to 148 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc..(Parlo, Christopher) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
ORDER granting 184 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application GRANTED. Warner Bros. Television and Bonanza Productions Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint by April 29, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 148 Amended Complaint,, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jason D. Burns dated April 22, 2016. Document filed by Bonanza Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc..(Burns, Jason) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ordered that: Discovery due by 5/31/2016.Motions due by 9/1/2016. Responses due by 6/15/2016 Replies due by 6/22/2016. Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/20/2016) (ama) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chelsea Lynn Conanan on behalf of Bonanza Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Conanan, Chelsea) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason David Burns on behalf of Bonanza Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television Production Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc.. (Burns, Jason) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
ORDER granting 170 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Initial Disclosures. Application GRANTED. The deadline for Warner Bros. Television, Bonanza Productions, Inc., and Plaintiffs to exchange initial disclosures is adjourned sine die. The parties shall provide a proposed revised deadline to exchange initial disclosures by May 12, 2016. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 170. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/18/2016) (kko) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Exchange Initial Disclosures addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christopher A. Parlo dated April 18, 2016. Document filed by Bonanza Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc..(Parlo, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 167 Letter re: Status of settlement discussions, filed by NBC Universal Media LLC. ENDORSEMENT: This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Francis for a settlement conference to take place after the completion of preliminary discovery on May 26, 2016. Within one week after the completion of the settlement conference, the parties shall submit a joint letter notifying the Court whether settlement efforts were successful. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/15/2016) (spo) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez and James Vagnini dated April 14, 2016 re: status of settlement discussions by All Plaintiffs and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Document filed by NBC Universal Media LLC.(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christopher A. Parlo dated April 14, 2016 re: status letter pursuant to the Case Management Plan. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc..(Parlo, Christopher) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from James Vagnini and Seth Pierce dated April 14, 2016 re: Current Status of the Case. Document filed by TVM Productions, Inc..(Pierce, Seth) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elise M. Bloom dated 4/14/16 re: Current Status of the Case. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 162 Letter, filed by TVM Productions, Inc., Bonanza Productions Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc., NBC Universal Media LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The time to file any motion to sever or to dismiss improper defendants is extended to June 1, 2016. Any amended scheduling order will be issued after the April 20, 2016, conference. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/12/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez, Seth E. Pierce, James Vagnini, Amanda N. Slatin, Elise M. Bloom dated April 11, 2016 re: Third Status by All Parties. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., NBC Universal Media LLC, Sony Pictures Television, Inc., TVM Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez, Seth E. Pierce, James Vagnini, Amanda N. Slatin, Elise M. Bloom dated March 23, 2016 re: Second Status by All Parties. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., NBC Universal Media LLC, Sony Pictures Television, Inc., TVM Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elise M. Bloom dated March 22, 2016 re: Amended Letter in Opposition to the Relatedness Statement filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel on March 4, 2016 in the matter entitled [Morgan, et al v. Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., et al., 16-cv-1402 (RJS)]. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elise M. Bloom dated March 22, 2016 re: Opposition to Relatedness Statement filed on March 4, 2016 in the matter entitled [Morgan, et al v. Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., et al., 16-cv01402 (RJS)]. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
ORDER: Plaintiffs and Defendants hereby stipulate that the deadline for Defendants to move to sever is continued to April 21, 2016. If any of Defendants file such motion(s), oppositions to any such motion shall be filed by May 5, 2016, and replies to any such motion shall be filed by May 12, 2016. Application GRANTED. Any motions to sever shall be filed by April 21, 2016. Any responses shall be filed by May 5, 2016. Any replies shall be filed by May 12, 2016. To avoid duplicative filings, the parties shall consult with all relevant parties before submitting stipulations and proposed orders concerning case management. Any future proposed stipulation shall indicate whether all Defendants are bound, or otherwise make clear which individual Defendants are covered. ( Motions due by 4/21/2016., Responses due by 5/5/2016, Replies due by 5/12/2016.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/8/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs and TVM Productions, Inc. ("TVM") stipulate as follows: 1. The Court's case management order sets a deadline of March 10, 2016 for any party to tile any "motion to sever or to dismiss improper defendants." Order, Paragraph 13(a), ECF 138. 2. Plaintiffs and TVM have been meeting and conferring for the past several weeks regarding TVM's planned motion to sever the claims asserted against TVM. 3. The parties believe that further discussions on this and related case management issues (including an early mediation) would be fruitful and could obviate the need for motion practice on the severance issue. NOW, THEREFORE, subject to Court approval, Plaintiffs and TVM hereby stipulate that the deadline for TVM to move to sever the claims asserted against TVM is continued to March 31, 2016. If TVM does file such a motion, the time periods specified in the case management plan, at Paragraphs 13(b) and (c), shall be used to calculate the deadlines for filing any opposition and reply. Any motion to sever or dismiss improper defendants shall be filed by March 31, 2016. Any responses shall be filed by April 14, 2016. Any replies shall be filed by April 21, 2016. The parties shall notify chambers if they seek a referral to mediation. (Motions due by 3/31/2016., Responses due by 4/14/2016, Replies due by 4/21/2016.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/7/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez, Seth E. Pierce, James Vagnini, Amanda N. Slatin, Elise M. Bloom dated February 23, 2016 re: Status by All Parties. Document filed by Bonanza Productions Inc., NBC Universal Media LLC, Sony Pictures Television, Inc., TVM Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, the plaintiffs Corey Leach, Anthony Jacob, Priamo Fermin, Neftali Pellot and Gary Phifer, individually and of behalf of all others similarly situated and their undersigned counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntary dismissed, without prejudice, against the defendant MADWOMAN IN THE ATTIC. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/9/2016) (kgo) Modified on 2/9/2016 (kgo). (Entered: 02/09/2016)
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 145 Amended Complaint against Bonanza Productions Inc., Madwoman in the Attic, Inc., NBC Universal Media LLC, Prospect Park Networks, LLC, Sony Pictures Television, Inc., TVM Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Corey Leach. Related document: 145 Amended Complaint filed by Priamo Fermin, Gary Phifer, Neftali Pellot, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach.(Valli, Robert) Modified on 2/10/2016 (moh). Accepted as per conversation with A. Villicastin Modified on 3/2/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 02/09/2016)
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 145 Amended Complaint against Madwoman in the Attic, Inc., Prospect Park Networks, LLC, Sony Pictures Television, Inc., TVM Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc., NBC Universal Media LLC, Bonanza Productions Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Shamarl Wilson, Miguel A. Morel, Birk Beck Anthony, Anthony Leach Sr., Christian Pellot, Luis Mendez, Clinton Ovando Spence, Justin Leach, Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas, Kenny Chin, Robert Tracey, Maria Gonzalez, Ravi Paul Dhanasar, Sandra B. Rivas, Donna Skinner, Craig Gillespie, Sean McMillan, Andrew Robinson, Priamo Fermin, Hector Camacho, John A. Carusi, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Anthony Jacob, Andrea Barnes, Sheriba Jackson, Stevie Leach Jr., Leslie Francis, Jamar King, Anthony Birk Beck, Wade McKnight, Garnett Morgan, Cedric Brown, Marvelous Solano, Ferdie Headlam, Alan G. Bennett, Neftali Pellot, Johnathan Tucker, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Barrington E. Wilson, Raynier Delgadillo, Devon Bailey, Stephan M Leach, Ali Muhammed, Gary Phifer, John C. Perez, Leon Cecil Mclane, Frederick Diaz, Fay Williams, Hameen Rasullah, Alexander Campbell, William June, James Hundley, Joscelyn Earl Wint, Maximo Garcia, Andrea Gainer, Eric Casseus, Corey Leach, Dionicio Chambers, Isaac Samuel Bruton, Miguel A. Fermin, Leroy Reid, William Smaw, Justin Miguel Fermin, Nicholas McKnight, Carolyn Forrest. Related document: 145 Amended Complaint filed by Priamo Fermin, Gary Phifer, Neftali Pellot, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach.(Valli, Robert) Modified on 2/9/2016 (moh). (Entered: 02/08/2016)
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 22 Amended Complaint 3 Complaint, 60 Amended Complaint, against Bonanza Productions, Inc., Madwoman in the Attic, Inc., Prospect Park Productions, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc., NBC Universal Media, LLC, TVM Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a Division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Corey Leach. Related document: 22 Amended Complaint, filed by Priamo Fermin, Gary Phifer, Neftali Pellot, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, 3 Complaint filed by Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, 60 Amended Complaint, filed by William June, Nicholas McKnight, Shamarl Wilson, Priamo Fermin, Dionicio Chambers, Anthony Leach Sr., Maximo Garcia, Clinton Ovando Spence, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Neftali Pellot, James Hundley, Leon Cecil Mclane, Carolyn Forrest, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Stevie Leach Jr., Sean McMillan, Christian Pellot, Garnett Morgan, Maria Gonzalez, Gary Phifer, William Smaw, Wade McKnight, Jamar King, Robert Tracey, Fay Williams, Alexander Campbell, Justin Leach, Craig Gillespie, Barrington E. Wilson, Stephan M Leach, Anthony Jacob, Raynier Delgadillo, Hameen Rasullah, Sheriba Jackson, Corey Leach, Kenny Chin, Joscelyn Earl Wint.(Valli, Robert) Modified on 2/8/2016 (moh). (Entered: 02/05/2016)
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Defendants named in the caption as Central Casting Corporation, Central Casting Services and Entertainment Partners, and counsel for Plaintiffs and opt-in plaintiffs, that the claims against Defendants named in the caption as Entertainment Partners, Central Casting Services and Central Casting Corporation are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice from the entire action. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/1/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, the plaintiffs Corey Leach, Anthony Jacob, Priamo Fermin, Neftali Pellot and Gary Phifer, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and their undersigned counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntary dismissed, without prejudice, against the defendant BAD ROBOT PRODUCTIONS, INC., Bad Robot Productions, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/28/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, the plaintiffs Corey Leach, Anthony Jacob, Priamo Fermin, Neftali Pellot and Gary Phifer, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and their undersigned counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntary dismissed, without prejudice, against the defendant WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/28/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, the plaintiffs Corey Leach, Anthony Jacob, Priamo Fermin, Neftali Pellot and Gary Phifer, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and their undersigned counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntary dismissed, without prejudice, against the defendant DREAMWORKS ANIMATION TELEVISION, INC., DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/28/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Unless already filed, responsive pleadings of defendants shall be due the later of April 19, 2016 or the time set forth by Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Plaintiffs request a jury trial on all issues so triable. It is defendants' position that any issue not required by law to be tried to a jury, including but not limited to any determination of equitable remedies, liquidated damages, or attorneys' fees or costs, is not to be tried to a jury, as those remedies and damages are to be decided by the Court. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days, if as to the named plaintiffs only. If this action is and remains certified as a class/collective action for trial, then the parties will be able to provide an estimate for the length of trial at a later date once they know the class size and scope of evidence. By February 23, 2016 and April 11, 2016 (in anticipation of the conference, w/ a proposed schedule) the parties shall submit a status letter, as outlined in Individual Rule IV.A.2. Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 2/5/2016. Motions due by 3/10/2016. Responses due by 3/24/2016. Replies due by 3/31/2016. Fact Discovery due by 3/30/2016. Discovery due by 3/30/2016. Status Conference set for 4/20/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8, 9(a), 13(a)-(c) and 14(a)-(d) into the Court's calendar. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/28/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez, Elise M. Bloom, Seth E. Pierce, Amanda N. Slatin and James Vagnini dated January 27, 2016 re: Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Birk Beck Anthony, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Devon Bailey, Andrea Barnes, Alan G. Bennett, Anthony Birk Beck, Bonanza Productions, Inc., Cedric Brown, Isaac Samuel Bruton, Hector Camacho, Alexander Campbell, John A. Carusi, Eric Casseus, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Ravi Paul Dhanasar, Frederick Diaz, Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas, Justin Miguel Fermin, Miguel A. Fermin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Fox Television Studios, Inc., Andrea Gainer, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, Ferdie Headlam, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Luis Mendez, Miguel A. Morel, Garnett Morgan, Ali Muhammed, NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, John C. Perez, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, Sandra B. Rivas, Andrew Robinson, Donna Skinner, William Smaw, Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Johnathan Tucker, Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Television LLC, Warner Brothers Television, Inc., Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner Inc., Corporate Parent Warner Communications LLC for Warner Bros. Television Production Inc.. Document filed by Warner Bros. Television Production Inc..(Slatin, Amanda) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner Inc., Corporate Parent Warner Communications Inc., Corporate Parent Castle Rock Entertainment for Bonanza Productions, Inc.. Document filed by Bonanza Productions, Inc..(Slatin, Amanda) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
ORDER: WHEREAS, on January 20, 2016, a conference was held. For the reasons stated at the conference, it is hereby ORDERED that, by January 27, 2016, the parties shall file a joint letter containing a proposed schedule for the first phase of fact discovery. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/20/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Alan Parlo on behalf of Bonanza Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Television Production Inc.. (Parlo, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner Inc. for Warner Bros. Television Production Inc.. Document filed by Warner Bros. Television Production Inc..(Slatin, Amanda) Modified on 1/20/2016 (lb). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Studios USA Television LLC, Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, Universal Television LLC. Document filed by NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Studios USA Television LLC, Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, Universal Television LLC.(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen Frances Brooks on behalf of NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Studios USA Television LLC, Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, Universal Television LLC. (Brooks, Kristen) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria H. Keane on behalf of NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Studios USA Television LLC, Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, Universal Television LLC. (Keane, Maria) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Liza May Velazquez on behalf of NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Studios USA Television LLC, Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, Universal Television LLC. (Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roberta Ann Kaplan on behalf of NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Studios USA Television LLC, Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, Universal Television LLC. (Kaplan, Roberta) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner Inc. for Bonanza Productions, Inc.. Document filed by Bonanza Productions, Inc..(Slatin, Amanda) Modified on 1/20/2016 (lb). (Entered: 01/15/2016)
ORDER granting 116 Motion for Seth Eric Pierce to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
ORDER granting 119 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application GRANTED. Davis Entertainment Company, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint by February 12, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc., Corporate Parent Fox Entertainment Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Fox Television Studios, Inc., Other Affiliate TVM Productions, Inc. for Fox Television Studios, Inc.. Document filed by Fox Television Studios, Inc..(Gordon, David) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 60 Amended Complaint,,,,,, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Liza M. Velazquez and Elise M. Bloom dated January 14, 2016. Document filed by Davis Entertainment Company.(Velazquez, Liza) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Amanda N. Slatin dated January 13, 2016 re: Joint letter of the parties pursuant to the initial conference Order (Dkt. No. 14). Document filed by Bonanza Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Slatin, Amanda) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, the plaintiffs Corey Leach, Anthony Jacob, Priamo Fermin, Neftali Pellet and Gary Phifer, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and their undersigned counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntary dismissed, without prejudice, against the defendant Wolf Films, Inc. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/13/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
MOTION for Seth Eric Pierce to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Motion. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox Television Studios, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Pierce, Seth) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Wolf Films, Inc.. Document filed by Shamarl Wilson, Miguel A. Morel, Birk Beck Anthony, Anthony Leach Sr., Christian Pellot, Luis Mendez, Clinton Ovando Spence, Justin Leach, Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas, Kenny Chin, Robert Tracey, Maria Gonzalez, Ravi Paul Dhanasar, Sandra B. Rivas, Donna Skinner, Craig Gillespie, Sean McMillan, Andrew Robinson, Priamo Fermin, Hector Camacho, John A. Carusi, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Anthony Jacob, Andrea Barnes, Sheriba Jackson, Stevie Leach Jr., Jamar King, Anthony Birk Beck, Wade McKnight, Garnett Morgan, Cedric Brown, Ferdie Headlam, Alan G. Bennett, Neftali Pellot, Johnathan Tucker, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Barrington E. Wilson, Raynier Delgadillo, Devon Bailey, Stephan M Leach, Ali Muhammed, Gary Phifer, John C. Perez, Leon Cecil Mclane, Frederick Diaz, Fay Williams, Hameen Rasullah, Alexander Campbell, William June, James Hundley, Maximo Garcia, Joscelyn Earl Wint, Andrea Gainer, Eric Casseus, Corey Leach, Dionicio Chambers, Isaac Samuel Bruton, Miguel A. Fermin, William Smaw, Justin Miguel Fermin, Nicholas McKnight, Carolyn Forrest. (Berman, Matthew) Modified on 1/13/2016 (jk). (Entered: 01/12/2016)
ORDER granting 112 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application GRANTED. Defendants Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Warner Bros. Television, a division of WB Studio Enterprises Inc., and Bonanza Productions Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint by January 29, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
ORDER granting 111 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Application GRANTED. The NBC entities shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint by January 29, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Amanda N. Slatin dated January 8, 2016. Document filed by Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc..(Slatin, Amanda) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 60 Amended Complaint,,,,,, addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Roberta A. Kaplan dated January 8, 2016. Document filed by Madwoman in the Attic, Inc., NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Studios USA Television LLC, Universal Broadcasting Television, Inc., Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Network Television LLC, Universal Television LLC, Wolf Films, Inc..(Kaplan, Roberta) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Seth Eric Pierce to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11813801. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fox Television Studios, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Seth) Modified on 1/8/2016 (sdi). (Entered: 01/07/2016)
ORDER granting 106 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Application GRANTED. Defendant Bad Robot Productions, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint by January 22, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant Bad Robot Productions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Amanda N. Slatin dated December 30, 2015. Document filed by Bonanza Productions, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc..(Slatin, Amanda) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
ORDER denying 100 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application DENIED. As indicated in the Court's November 6, 2015, order, no further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elise M. Bloom dated 12/18/2015. Document filed by Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC waiver sent on 11/13/2015, answer due 1/12/2016. Document filed by Shamarl Wilson; Miguel A. Morel; Birk Beck Anthony; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Luis Mendez; Clinton Ovando Spence; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas; Robert Tracey; Maria Gonzalez; Ravi Paul Dhanasar; Donna Skinner; Craig Gillespie; Sean McMillan; Andrew Robinson; Priamo Fermin; Hector Camacho; John A. Carusi; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Anthony Jacob; Andrea Barnes; Sheriba Jackson; Stevie Leach Jr. ; Jamar King; Anthony Birk Beck; Wade McKnight; Garnett Morgan; Cedric Brown; Alan G. Bennett; Neftali Pellot ; Johnathan Tucker; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Barrington E. Wilson; Raynier Delgadillo; Stephan M Leach ; Ali Muhammed; Gary Phifer; John C. Perez; Leon Cecil Mclane; Frederick Diaz; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; William June; James Hundley ; Maximo Garcia; Joscelyn Earl Wint; Andrea Gainer; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Isaac Samuel Bruton; William Smaw; Justin Miguel Fermin; Nicholas McKnight; Carolyn Forrest. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Universal Cable Productions LLC waiver sent on 11/13/2015, answer due 1/12/2016. Document filed by Shamarl Wilson; Miguel A. Morel; Birk Beck Anthony; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Luis Mendez; Clinton Ovando Spence; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas; Robert Tracey; Maria Gonzalez; Ravi Paul Dhanasar; Donna Skinner; Craig Gillespie; Sean McMillan; Andrew Robinson; Priamo Fermin; Hector Camacho; John A. Carusi; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Anthony Jacob; Andrea Barnes; Sheriba Jackson; Stevie Leach Jr. ; Jamar King; Anthony Birk Beck; Wade McKnight; Garnett Morgan; Cedric Brown; Alan G. Bennett; Neftali Pellot ; Johnathan Tucker; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Barrington E. Wilson; Raynier Delgadillo; Stephan M Leach ; Ali Muhammed; Gary Phifer; John C. Perez; Leon Cecil Mclane; Frederick Diaz; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; William June; James Hundley ; Maximo Garcia; Joscelyn Earl Wint; Andrea Gainer; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Isaac Samuel Bruton; William Smaw; Justin Miguel Fermin; Nicholas McKnight; Carolyn Forrest. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bonanza Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 11/16/2015, answer due 1/15/2016. Document filed by Shamarl Wilson; Miguel A. Morel; Birk Beck Anthony; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Luis Mendez; Clinton Ovando Spence; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas; Robert Tracey; Maria Gonzalez; Ravi Paul Dhanasar; Donna Skinner; Craig Gillespie; Sean McMillan; Andrew Robinson; Priamo Fermin; Hector Camacho; John A. Carusi; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Anthony Jacob; Andrea Barnes; Sheriba Jackson; Stevie Leach Jr. ; Jamar King; Anthony Birk Beck; Wade McKnight; Garnett Morgan; Cedric Brown; Alan G. Bennett; Neftali Pellot ; Johnathan Tucker; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Barrington E. Wilson; Raynier Delgadillo; Stephan M Leach ; Ali Muhammed; Gary Phifer; John C. Perez; Leon Cecil Mclane; Frederick Diaz; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; William June; James Hundley ; Maximo Garcia; Joscelyn Earl Wint; Andrea Gainer; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Isaac Samuel Bruton; William Smaw; Justin Miguel Fermin; Nicholas McKnight; Carolyn Forrest. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. waiver sent on 11/13/2015, answer due 1/12/2016. Document filed by Shamarl Wilson; Miguel A. Morel; Birk Beck Anthony; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Luis Mendez; Clinton Ovando Spence; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas; Robert Tracey; Maria Gonzalez; Ravi Paul Dhanasar; Donna Skinner; Craig Gillespie; Sean McMillan; Andrew Robinson; Priamo Fermin; Hector Camacho; John A. Carusi; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Anthony Jacob; Andrea Barnes; Sheriba Jackson; Stevie Leach Jr. ; Jamar King; Anthony Birk Beck; Wade McKnight; Garnett Morgan; Cedric Brown; Alan G. Bennett; Neftali Pellot ; Johnathan Tucker; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Barrington E. Wilson; Raynier Delgadillo; Stephan M Leach ; Ali Muhammed; Gary Phifer; John C. Perez; Leon Cecil Mclane; Frederick Diaz; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; William June; James Hundley ; Maximo Garcia; Joscelyn Earl Wint; Andrea Gainer; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Isaac Samuel Bruton; William Smaw; Justin Miguel Fermin; Nicholas McKnight; Carolyn Forrest. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Fox Television Studios, Inc. waiver sent on 11/16/2015, answer due 1/15/2016. Document filed by Shamarl Wilson; Miguel A. Morel; Birk Beck Anthony; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Luis Mendez; Clinton Ovando Spence; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas; Robert Tracey; Maria Gonzalez; Ravi Paul Dhanasar; Donna Skinner; Craig Gillespie; Sean McMillan; Andrew Robinson; Priamo Fermin; Hector Camacho; John A. Carusi; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Anthony Jacob; Andrea Barnes; Sheriba Jackson; Stevie Leach Jr. ; Jamar King; Anthony Birk Beck; Wade McKnight; Garnett Morgan; Cedric Brown; Alan G. Bennett; Neftali Pellot ; Johnathan Tucker; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Barrington E. Wilson; Raynier Delgadillo; Stephan M Leach ; Ali Muhammed; Gary Phifer; John C. Perez; Leon Cecil Mclane; Frederick Diaz; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; William June; James Hundley ; Maximo Garcia; Joscelyn Earl Wint; Andrea Gainer; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Isaac Samuel Bruton; William Smaw; Justin Miguel Fermin; Nicholas McKnight; Carolyn Forrest. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Universal Television LLC waiver sent on 11/13/2015, answer due 1/12/2016. Document filed by Shamarl Wilson; Miguel A. Morel; Birk Beck Anthony; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Luis Mendez; Clinton Ovando Spence; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas; Robert Tracey; Maria Gonzalez; Donna Skinner; Craig Gillespie; Sean McMillan; Andrew Robinson; Priamo Fermin; Hector Camacho; John A. Carusi; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Anthony Jacob; Andrea Barnes; Sheriba Jackson; Stevie Leach Jr. ; Jamar King; Anthony Birk Beck; Wade McKnight; Garnett Morgan; Cedric Brown; Alan G. Bennett; Neftali Pellot ; Johnathan Tucker; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Barrington E. Wilson; Raynier Delgadillo; Stephan M Leach ; Ali Muhammed; Gary Phifer; John C. Perez; Leon Cecil Mclane; Frederick Diaz; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; William June; James Hundley ; Maximo Garcia; Joscelyn Earl Wint; Andrea Gainer; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Isaac Samuel Bruton; William Smaw; Nicholas McKnight; Justin Miguel Fermin; Carolyn Forrest. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bad Robot Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 11/6/2015, answer due 1/5/2016. Document filed by Shamarl Wilson; Miguel A. Morel; Birk Beck Anthony; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Clinton Ovando Spence; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas; Robert Tracey; Maria Gonzalez; Craig Gillespie; Sean McMillan; Andrew Robinson; Priamo Fermin; Hector Camacho; John A. Carusi; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Anthony Jacob; Andrea Barnes; Sheriba Jackson; Stevie Leach Jr. ; Jamar King; Anthony Birk Beck; Wade McKnight; Garnett Morgan; Cedric Brown; Alan G. Bennett; Neftali Pellot ; Johnathan Tucker; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Barrington E. Wilson; Raynier Delgadillo; Stephan M Leach ; Ali Muhammed; Gary Phifer; John C. Perez; Leon Cecil Mclane; Frederick Diaz; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; William June; James Hundley ; Maximo Garcia; Joscelyn Earl Wint; Andrea Gainer; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Isaac Samuel Bruton; William Smaw; Nicholas McKnight; Justin Miguel Fermin; Carolyn Forrest. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of a copy of the Initial Pretrial Order and the Court's Individual Rules served on Sony Pictures; Woodbridge Productions, Inc. on 12/04/2015. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Birk Beck Anthony, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Anthony Birk Beck, Cedric Brown, Isaac Samuel Bruton, Hector Camacho, Alexander Campbell, John A. Carusi, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Frederick Diaz, Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas, Justin Miguel Fermin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Andrea Gainer, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Miguel A. Morel, Garnett Morgan, Ali Muhammed, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, John C. Perez, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, Andrew Robinson, William Smaw, Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Johnathan Tucker, Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons, second amended complaint, two waiver of service of summons form, a prepaid means of returning the form, a copy of the Court's individual practices and a copy of the initial pretrial order served on Warner Bros. Television Production Inc.; Entertainment Partners on 11-17-2015. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Birk Beck Anthony, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Anthony Birk Beck, Cedric Brown, Isaac Samuel Bruton, Alexander Campbell, John A. Carusi, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Frederick Diaz, Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas, Justin Miguel Fermin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Andrea Gainer, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Miguel A. Morel, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, John C. Perez, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, Andrew Robinson, William Smaw, Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Johnathan Tucker, Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons, second amended complaint, two waiver of service of summons form, a prepaid means of returning the form, a copy of the Court's individual practices and a copy of the initial pretrial order served on Wolf Films, Inc.; Studios USA Television LLC; Bad Robot Productions, Inc.; Bonanza Productions, Inc.; Esperanto Filmoj, Inc.; Madwoman in the Attic, Inc.; DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc.; Yellow Brick Road Productions, LLC; Fox Television Studios, Inc. on 11-16-2015. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Birk Beck Anthony, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Anthony Birk Beck, Cedric Brown, Isaac Samuel Bruton, Alexander Campbell, John A. Carusi, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Frederick Diaz, Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas, Justin Miguel Fermin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Andrea Gainer, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Miguel A. Morel, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, John C. Perez, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, Andrew Robinson, William Smaw, Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Johnathan Tucker, Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons, second amended complaint, two waiver of service of summons form, a prepaid means of returning the form, a copy of the Court's individual practices and a copy of the initial pretrial order served on NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC; NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC; Central Casting Corporation; Davis Entertainment Company; Universal Network Television LLC; Universal Broadcasting Television, Inc.; Universal Television LLC; Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.; Jeff Eastin Film Productions, Inc.; Universal Cable Productions LLC; Prospect Park Networks, LLC on 11-23-2015. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Birk Beck Anthony, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Anthony Birk Beck, Cedric Brown, Isaac Samuel Bruton, Alexander Campbell, John A. Carusi, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Frederick Diaz, Rafael Herberito Diaz Rivas, Justin Miguel Fermin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Andrea Gainer, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Miguel A. Morel, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, John C. Perez, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, Andrew Robinson, William Smaw, Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Johnathan Tucker, Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bad Robot Productions, Inc., Bonanza Productions, Inc., DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc., Esperanto Filmoj, Inc., Fox Television Studios, Inc., Madwoman in the Attic, Inc., National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Studios USA Television LLC, Wolf Films, Inc., Yellow Brick Road Productions, LLC. (moh) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Woodbridge Productions, Inc.; Entertainment Partners, re: 60 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Birk Beck Anthony, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Anthony Birk Beck, Cedric Brown, Alexander Campbell, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Justin Miguel Fermin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Andrea Gainer, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Miguel A. Morel, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, Andrew Robinson, William Smaw, Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Broadcasting Company, Inc.; Sony Pictures Television, Inc.; Wolf Films, Inc.; Studios USA Television LLC; Bad Robot Productions, Inc.; Bonanza Productions, Inc.; Esperanto Filmoj, Inc.; Madwoman in the Attic, Inc.; DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc.; Yellow Brick Road Productions LLC; Fox Television Studios, Inc., re: 60 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Birk Beck Anthony, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Anthony Birk Beck, Cedric Brown, Alexander Campbell, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Justin Miguel Fermin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Andrea Gainer, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Miguel A. Morel, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, Andrew Robinson, William Smaw, Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Casting Corporation, Davis Entertainment Company, Jeff Eastin Film Productions, Inc., NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Prospect Park Networks, LLC, Universal Broadcasting Television, Inc., Universal Cable Productions LLC, Universal Network Television, Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Television Production Inc.. (moh) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED IS NOT AN AMENDED SUMMONS - - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to National Broadcasting Company, Inc.; Sony Pictures Television, Inc.; Woodbridge Productions, Inc.; Wolf Films, Inc.; Studios USA Television LLC; Bad Robot Productions, Inc.; Bonanza Productions, Inc.; Esperanto Filmoj, Inc.; Madwoman in the Attic, Inc.; DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc.; Yellow Brick Road Productions, LLC; Fox Television Studios, Inc.; Entertainment Partners, re: 60 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Santiago Astacio,Sr., Alexander Campbell, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, William Smaw, Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Vagnini, James) Modified on 11/10/2015 (moh). (Entered: 11/09/2015)
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC; NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC; Central Casting Corporation; Davis Entertainment Company; Universal Network Television; Universal Broadcasting Television, Inc.; Universal Television LLC; Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.; Warner Bros. Television Production, Inc.; Jeff Eastin Film Production, Inc.; Universal Cable Productions LLC; Prospect Park Networks, LLC, re: 60 Amended Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Santiago Astacio,Sr., Alexander Campbell, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Sheriba Jackson, Anthony Jacob, William June, Jamar King, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, William Smaw, Clinton Ovando Spence, Robert Tracey, Fay Williams, Barrington E. Wilson, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 22 Amended Complaint,,, against Bad Robot Productions, Inc., Bonanza Productions, Inc., DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc., Entertainment Partners, Esperanto Filmoj, Inc., Fox Television Studios, Inc., Madwoman in the Attic, Inc., National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Studios USA Television LLC, Wolf Films, Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc., NBC Universal Digital Solutions LLC, NBC Universal Television Studio Digital Development LLC, Central Casting Corporation, Davis Entertainment Company, Universal Network Television LLC, Universal Broadcasting Television, Inc., Universal Television LLC, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Warner Bros. Television Production Inc., Jeff Eastin Film Productions, Inc., Universal Cable Productions LLC, Prospect Park Networks, LLC, Yellow Brick Road Productions, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jamar King, Garnett Morgan, Wade McKnight, Shamarl Wilson, Neftali Pellot, Anthony Leach Sr., Christian Pellot, Barrington E. Wilson, Clinton Ovando Spence, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Justin Leach, Raynier Delgadillo, Kenny Chin, Robert Tracey, Gary Phifer, Stephan M Leach, Maria Gonzalez, Leon Cecil Mclane, Fay Williams, Hameen Rasullah, Alexander Campbell, William June, James Hundley, Joscelyn Earl Wint, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Corey Leach, Dionicio Chambers, Sean McMillan, William Smaw, Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Santiago Astacio,Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Sheriba Jackson, Carolyn Forrest, Stevie Leach Jr.. Related document: 22 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Priamo Fermin, Gary Phifer, Neftali Pellot, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach.(Vagnini, James) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
ORDER granting 44 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting 44 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application GRANTED. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. The initialpretrial conference, currently scheduled for November 18, 2015, is adjourned to January 20, 2016, at10:40 a.m. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. ( Initial Conference set for 1/20/2016 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/6/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Broadcasting Company, Inc.; Wolf Films, Inc.; Studios USA Television LLC; Universal Network Television; Universal Media Studios; Universal Television; Bad Robot Productions, Inc.; Bonanza Productions, Inc.; Esperanto Filmoj, Inc.; Warner Brothers Entertainment, Inc.; Warner Brothers Television, Inc.; Madwoman in the Attic, Inc.; Dream Works Animation Television, Inc.; Yellow Brick Road Productions LLC; Jeff Eastin & Warrior George Productions, Inc.; Fox Television Studios, Inc.; Universal Cable Productions, Inc.; Prospect Park Productions, Inc., re: 22 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Santiago Astacio,Sr., Alexander Campbell, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, William Smaw, Robert Tracey, Fay Williams, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to NBC Universal Television Group; Sony Pictures; Central Casting Services; Davis Entertainment; Woodbridge Productions, Inc.; Entertainment Partners, re: 22 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Santiago Astacio,Sr., Alexander Campbell, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Raynier Delgadillo, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Carolyn Forrest, Maximo Garcia, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Leon Cecil Mclane, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, William Smaw, Robert Tracey, Fay Williams, Shamarl Wilson, Joscelyn Earl Wint. (Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Woodridge Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2015, answer due 11/23/2015. Document filed by Garnett Morgan; Wade McKnight; Shamarl Wilson; Neftali Pellot ; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Gary Phifer; Maria Gonzalez; Stephan M Leach ; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; James Hundley ; Craig Gillespie; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Sean McMillan; William Smaw; Priamo Fermin; Anthony Jacob; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Nicholas McKnight; Stevie Leach Jr.. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Matthew L. Berman dated 11-05-2015., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Matthew L. Berman dated 11-05-2015.( Return Date set for 11/10/2015 at 09:30 AM.) Document filed by Santiago Astacio,Sr., Alexander Campbell, Dionicio Chambers, Kenny Chin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Craig Gillespie, Maria Gonzalez, James Hundley, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Nicholas McKnight, Wade McKnight, Sean McMillan, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer, Hameen Rasullah, William Smaw, Fay Williams, Shamarl Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Clean Copy of Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Redlined Copy of Proposed Amended Complaint)(Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sony Pictures waiver sent on 9/23/2015, answer due 11/23/2015. Document filed by Garnett Morgan; Wade McKnight; Shamarl Wilson; Neftali Pellot ; Anthony Leach Sr. ; Christian Pellot ; Ronald Fitzpatrick; Justin Leach; Kenny Chin; Gary Phifer; Maria Gonzalez; Stephan M Leach ; Fay Williams; Hameen Rasullah; Alexander Campbell; James Hundley ; Craig Gillespie; Corey Leach; Dionicio Chambers; Sean McMillan; William Smaw; Priamo Fermin; Anthony Jacob; Santiago Astacio,Sr.; Nicholas McKnight; Stevie Leach Jr.. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Wyn Kane on behalf of Santiago Astacio,Sr., Kenny Chin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Craig Gillespie, James Hundley, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Sean McMillan, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer. (Kane, Sara) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Matthew L. Berman on behalf of Santiago Astacio,Sr., Kenny Chin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Craig Gillespie, James Hundley, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Sean McMillan, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer. New Address: Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP, 600 Old Country Road, Suite 519, Garden City, New York, 11530, 516-203-7180. (Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew L. Berman on behalf of Santiago Astacio,Sr., Kenny Chin, Priamo Fermin, Ronald Fitzpatrick, Craig Gillespie, James Hundley, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Justin Leach, Stephan M Leach, Stevie Leach Jr., Anthony Leach Sr., Sean McMillan, Garnett Morgan, Christian Pellot, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer. (Berman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Broadcasting Company, Inc.;NBC Universal Television Group; Sony Pictures Television, Inc.;Central Casting Services;Davis Entertainment LLC;Woodbridge Productions, Inc.;Wolf Films, Inc.;Studios USA Television LLC;Universal Network Television;Universal Media Studios;Universal Television;Bad Robot Productions, Inc.;Bonanza Productions, Inc.;Esperanto Filmoj, Inc.;Warner Brothers Entertainment, Inc.;Warner Brothers Television, Inc.;Madwoman in the Attic, Inc.;DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc.;Yellow Brick Road Productions LLC;Jeff Eastin & Warrior George Productions, Inc.;Fox Television Studios, Inc.;Universal Cable Productions, Inc.;Prospect Park Productions, Inc.; and Entertainment Partners, re: 22 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer. (Vagnini, James) Modified on 10/20/2015 (moh). (Entered: 10/19/2015)
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO PARTY - - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to National Broadcasting Company, Inc.;NBC Universal Television Group; Sony Pictures Television, Inc.;Central Casting Services;Davis Entertainment LLC;Woodbridge Productions, Inc.;Wolf Films, Inc.;Studios USA Television LLC;Universal Network Television;Universal Media Studios;Universal Television;Bad Robot Productions, Inc.;Bonanza Productions, Inc.;Esperanto Filmoj, Inc.;Warner Brothers Entertainment, Inc.;Warner Brothers Television, Inc.;Madwoman in the Attic, Inc.;DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc.;Yellow Brick Road Productions LLC;Jeff Eastin & Warrior George Productions, Inc.;Fox Television Studios, Inc.;Universal Cable Productions, Inc.;Prospect Park Productions, Inc.; and Entertainment Partners, re: 22 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Priamo Fermin, Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach, Neftali Pellot, Gary Phifer. (Vagnini, James) Modified on 10/19/2015 (moh). (Entered: 10/16/2015)
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 3 Complaint against Central Casting Services, Entertainment Partners, NBC Universal Television Group, Woodridge Productions, Inc., National Broadcasting Company, Inc., Sony Pictures Television, Inc., Davis Entertainment LLC, Wolf Films, Inc., Studios USA Television LLC, Universal Network Television, Universal Media Studios, Universal Television, Bad Robot Productions, Inc., Bonanza Productions, Inc., Esperanto Filmoj, Inc., Warner Brothers Entertainment, Inc., Warner Brothers Television, Inc., Madwoman in the Attic, Inc., DreamWorks Animation Television, Inc., Yellow Brick Road Productions LLC, Jeff Eastin & Warrior George Productions, Inc., Fox Television Studios, Inc., Universal Cable Productions, Inc., Prospect Park Productions, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Corey Leach, Anthony Jacob, Gary Phifer, Priamo Fermin, Neftali Pellot. Related document: 3 Complaint filed by Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach.(Vagnini, James) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Sony Corporation for Sony Pictures, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. Document filed by Sony Pictures, Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Bloom, Elise) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NAME ENTERED INCORRECTLY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate sony pictures Television Inc., Other Affiliate woodridge productions inc. for Sony Pictures, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. Document filed by Sony Pictures, Woodridge Productions, Inc..(Bloom, Elise) Modified on 10/13/2015 (lb). (Entered: 10/12/2015)
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/18/2015 at 11:10 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/30/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Casting Services, Davis Entertainment, Entertainment Partners, NBC Universal Television Group, Sony Pictures, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (pc) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NBC Universal Television Group, Sony Pictures, Central Casting Services, Davis Entertainment, Woodbridge Productions Inc and Entertainment Partners, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach. (Vagnini, James) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
COMPLAINT against Central Casting Services, Davis Entertainment, Entertainment Partners, NBC Universal Television Group, Sony Pictures, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. Document filed by Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach.(Vagnini, James) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NBC Universal Television Group, Sony Pictures, Central Casting Services, Davis Entertainment, Woodridge Productions, Inc., Entertainment Partners, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Jacob, Corey Leach. (Valli, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
COMPLAINT against Central Casting, Davis Entertainment, Entertainment Partners, NBC Universal Television Group, Sony Pictures Enterainment Inc., Woodridge Productions, Inc.. Document filed by Corey Leach, Anthony Jacob.(Valli, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2015)